Elvis Alvira v. Intel Corporation et al
Plaintiff: ELVIS ALVIRA
Defendant: Robert H. Swan, Brian M. Krzanich and Intel Corporation
Petitioner: Daniel E. Tavares and Meerain Ali
Interested Party: Louisiana Sheriffs' Pension & Relief Fund
Case Number: 4:2018cv03416
Filed: June 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:78
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #47 Stipulation. The Alvira Action, Case 18-cv-3416-YGR is CONSOLIDATED with In re Intel Corporation Securities Litigation, 18-cv-00507-YGR. The Alvira action 18-cv-3416-YGR shall be closed. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2018)
July 26, 2018 Filing 47 JOINT STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER in Response to re #46 Order Setting Compliance Hearing Re: Filing of Joint Stipulation filed by Louisiana Sheriffs' Pension & Relief Fund, Elvis Alvira, Brian M. Krzanich, Robert H. Swan, Intel Corporation. (Stickney, David) (Filed on 7/26/2018) Modified on 7/27/2018 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
July 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER SETTING COMPLIANCE HEARING RE: FILING OF JOINT STIPULATION. Compliance hearing is set for Friday, 8/10/2018 09:01 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Joint stipulation filed by 8/3/2018. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 7/18/18. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2018)
July 3, 2018 Filing 45 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING COMPLIANCE HEARING. In light of the filing at Dkt. no. 44, the Compliance hearing set Friday, July 6, 2018 at 9:01 AM is VACATED. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2018)
June 29, 2018 Filing 44 Joint Statement In Response to re #43 Order June 15, 2018 Order Setting Compliance Hearing by Intel Corporation, Brian M. Krzanich, Robert H. Swan. (Gildersleeve, John) (Filed on 6/29/2018) Modified on 7/2/2018 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER SETTING COMPLIANCE HEARING. Compliance hearing is set for 7/6/2018 09:01 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Joint filing by 6/29/2018. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 6/15/2018. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2018)
June 12, 2018 Filing 42 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER SEC CLASS ACTION This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras SEC Class Action Notice due by 6/29/2018. Case Management Statement due by 9/3/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/10/2018 02:00 PM. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2018)
June 12, 2018 Filing 41 CLERK'S NOTICE: Case transferred to this district from Central District of California. All future filings should reflect case number 4:18-cv-03416-YGR. (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2018)
June 12, 2018 Filing 40 Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 2:18-cv-00223. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
June 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1404 #38 by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court hereby GRANTS Plaintiff's Motion to Transfer and ORDERS as follows: The above-captioned action shall be transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404. Case transferred electronically. MD JS-6. Case Terminated. (iv)
June 6, 2018 Filing 38 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California filed by Plaintiff Elvis Alvira. Motion set for hearing on 7/5/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Proposed Order) (Rosen, Laurence)
May 30, 2018 Filing 37 NOTICE of Order Appointing Louisiana Sheriffs' Pension & Relief Fund as the Lead Plaintiff filed by Interested Party Louisiana Sheriffs' Pension & Relief Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Stickney, David)
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin: granting #35 Non-Resident Attorney Steven M. Farina APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Intel Corporation, Brian M. Krzanich and Robert H. Swan, designating John M Gildersleeve as local counsel. (lom)
May 21, 2018 Filing 35 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Steven M. Farina to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Intel Corporation, Brian M. Krzanich, Robert H. Swan (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-21782663) filed by Defendants Intel Corp oration, Brian M. Krzanich, Robert H. Swan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Gildersleeve, John)
May 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin: GRANTING #32 Non-Resident Attorney George A. Borden APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Intel Corporation, Brian M. Krzanich and Robert H. Swan, designating John M. Gildersleeve as local counsel. (lt)
May 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin: GRANTING #31 Non-Resident Attorney Colette T. Connor APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Intel Corporation, Brian M. Krzanich and Robert H. Swan, designating John M. Gildersleeve as local counsel. (lt)
May 10, 2018 Filing 32 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney George A. Borden to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Intel Corporation, Brian M. Krzanich, Robert H. Swan (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-21729096) filed by Defendants Intel Corp oration, Brian M. Krzanich, Robert H. Swan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Gildersleeve, John)
May 10, 2018 Filing 31 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Colette T. Connor to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Intel Corporation, Brian M. Krzanich, Robert H. Swan (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-21728740) filed by Defendants Intel Cor poration, Brian M. Krzanich, Robert H. Swan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney John Michael Gildersleeve added to party Brian M. Krzanich(pty:dft), Attorney John Michael Gildersleeve added to party Robert H. Swan(pty:dft)) (Gildersleeve, John)
May 2, 2018 Filing 30 NOTICE FILING OF SUR REPLY filed by Lead Plaintiffs Meerain Ali, Daniel E. Tavares. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Pafiti, Jennifer)
April 19, 2018 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Margaret A Keeley on behalf of Defendants Brian M. Krzanich, Robert H. Swan (Attorney Margaret A Keeley added to party Brian M. Krzanich(pty:dft), Attorney Margaret A Keeley added to party Robert H. Swan(pty:dft))(Keeley, Margaret)
April 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin: GRANTING Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Meerain Ali and Daniel E. Tavares, designating Laurence M. Rosen as local counsel. (lt)
April 16, 2018 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Margaret A Keeley on behalf of Defendant Intel Corporation (Attorney Margaret A Keeley added to party Intel Corporation(pty:dft))(Keeley, Margaret)
April 13, 2018 Filing 26 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. On the court's own motion, the Motion for Appointment as Lead Plaintiffs and Approval of Counsel #11 is taken off the 4/19/2018 calendar and placed under submission. No appearances are required on 4/19/2018. An order with the court's ruling will issue. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 13, 2018 Filing 25 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Phillip Kim to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Movants Meerain Ali, Daniel E. Tavares (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-21585360) filed by Movants Meerain Ali, Daniel E. Tavares. (Attachment s: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Laurence M Rosen added to party Meerain Ali(pty:mov), Attorney Laurence M Rosen added to party Daniel E. Tavares(pty:mov)) (Rosen, Laurence)
April 11, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE TO PARTIES: Effective April 17, 2018, Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver will be located at the Edward R. Roybal Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, COURTROOM 590 on the 5th floor, located at 255 East Temple Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. All Court appearances shall be made in Courtroom 590 of the Roybal Federal Building, and all mandatory chambers copies shall be hand delivered to the judge's mail box located outside the Clerk's Office on the 12th floor of the Roybal Federal Building. The location for filing civil and criminal documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing and for viewing case files and other records services is located at the Roybal Federal Building, 255 East Temple Street, Room 180 (Terrace Level), Los Angeles, California 90012. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrey) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 5, 2018 Filing 23 NOTICE filed by Interested Party Louisiana Sheriffs' Pension & Relief Fund. of Filing of Reply Memorandum in Further Support of Motion to Consolidate in the Northern District of California (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Stickney, David)
April 5, 2018 Filing 22 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Appointment of Counsel NOTICE OF MOTION OF DANIEL E. TAVARES AND MEERAIN ALI FOR APPOINTMENT AS LEAD PLAINTIFFS AND APPROVAL OF COUNSEL #11 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MOTION OF DANIEL E. TAVARES AND MEERAIN ALI FOR APPOINTMENT AS LEAD PLAINTIFFS AND APPROVAL OF COUNSEL, AND IN OPPOSITION TO COMPETING MOTION filed by Movants Meerain Ali, Daniel E. Tavares. (Pafiti, Jennifer)
April 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER ON JOINT STIPULATION #19 by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Defendants are not required to respond to the initial complaint in this action. Once a lead plaintiff has been appointed, the parties will meet and confer and promptly submit a proposed schedule for the filing of a consolidated class action complaint and a motion to dismiss. (vdr)
March 30, 2018 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Intel Corporation, (Gildersleeve, John)
March 30, 2018 Filing 19 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Intel Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney John Michael Gildersleeve added to party Intel Corporation(pty:dft))(Gildersleeve, John)
March 29, 2018 Filing 18 DECLARATION of Jeremy A. Lieberman in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Appointment of Counsel NOTICE OF MOTION OF DANIEL E. TAVARES AND MEERAIN ALI FOR APPOINTMENT AS LEAD PLAINTIFFS AND APPROVAL OF COUNSEL #11 filed by Movants Meerain Ali, Daniel E. Tavares. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Pafiti, Jennifer)
March 29, 2018 Filing 17 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Appointment of Counsel NOTICE OF MOTION OF DANIEL E. TAVARES AND MEERAIN ALI FOR APPOINTMENT AS LEAD PLAINTIFFS AND APPROVAL OF COUNSEL #11 filed by Movants Meerain Ali, Daniel E. Tavares. (Pafiti, Jennifer)
March 29, 2018 Filing 16 Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Appointment of Counsel NOTICE OF MOTION OF DANIEL E. TAVARES AND MEERAIN ALI FOR APPOINTMENT AS LEAD PLAINTIFFS AND APPROVAL OF COUNSEL #11 filed by Interested Party Louisiana Sheriffs' Pension & Relief Fund. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David R. Stickney in Support of Louisiana Sheriffs' Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to the Motion of Daniel E. Tavares and Meerain Ail for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Counsel, #2 Exhibit A to the Declaration of David R. Stickney, #3 Exhibit B to the Declaration of David R. Stickney, #4 Exhibit C to the Declaration of David R. Stickney)(Stickney, David)
March 16, 2018 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Defendant Elvis Alvira, upon Defendant Intel Corporation served on 3/13/2018, answer due 4/3/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon AMY MCCLAREN (REGISTERED AGENT) in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Rosen, Laurence)
March 15, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE filed by Interested Party Louisiana Sheriffs' Pension & Relief Fund. of Filing of Motion to Consolidate in the Northern District of California (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Stickney, David)
March 12, 2018 Filing 13 DECLARATION of Jennifer Pafiti in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Appointment of Counsel NOTICE OF MOTION OF DANIEL E. TAVARES AND MEERAIN ALI FOR APPOINTMENT AS LEAD PLAINTIFFS AND APPROVAL OF COUNSEL #11 filed by Movants Meerain Ali, Daniel E. Tavares. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Press Release, #2 Exhibit B - Certifications, #3 Exhibit C - Loss Chart, #4 Exhibit D - Pomerantz Resume, #5 Exhibit E - Rosen Resume)(Pafiti, Jennifer)
March 12, 2018 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Appointment of Counsel NOTICE OF MOTION OF DANIEL E. TAVARES AND MEERAIN ALI FOR APPOINTMENT AS LEAD PLAINTIFFS AND APPROVAL OF COUNSEL #11 filed by Movants Meerain Ali, Daniel E. Tavares. (Pafiti, Jennifer)
March 12, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Appointment of Counsel NOTICE OF MOTION OF DANIEL E. TAVARES AND MEERAIN ALI FOR APPOINTMENT AS LEAD PLAINTIFFS AND APPROVAL OF COUNSEL filed by Movants Meerain Ali, Daniel E. Tavares. Motion set for hearing on 4/19/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Pafiti, Jennifer)
March 12, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Movants Daniel E. Tavares, Meerain Ali, (Attorney Jennifer Pafiti added to party Daniel E. Tavares(pty:mov), Attorney Jennifer Pafiti added to party Meerain Ali(pty:mov))(Pafiti, Jennifer)
January 12, 2018 Filing 9 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 16-05 by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Case transferred from Judge Dolly M. Gee to the calendar of Judge Fernando M. Olguin for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:18-cv-00223 FMO(RAOx). (rn)
January 10, 2018 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Intel Corporation, Brian M. Krzanich, Robert H. Swan. (ghap)
January 10, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
January 10, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (ghap)
January 10, 2018 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff ELVIS ALVIRA. (Rosen, Laurence)
January 10, 2018 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff ELVIS ALVIRA, (Rosen, Laurence)
January 10, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff ELVIS ALVIRA. (Rosen, Laurence)
January 10, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-21076077 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff ELVIS ALVIRA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit PSLRA Certification) (Attorney Laurence M Rosen added to party ELVIS ALVIRA(pty:pla))(Rosen, Laurence)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elvis Alvira v. Intel Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Daniel E. Tavares
Represented By: Laurence M Rosen
Represented By: Jennifer Pafiti
Represented By: Phillip Kim
Represented By: Laurence Matthew Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Meerain Ali
Represented By: Laurence M Rosen
Represented By: Jennifer Pafiti
Represented By: Phillip Kim
Represented By: Laurence Matthew Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert H. Swan
Represented By: George A Borden
Represented By: Margaret A Keeley
Represented By: Colette Connor
Represented By: Steven M. Farina
Represented By: John Michael Gildersleeve
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian M. Krzanich
Represented By: George A Borden
Represented By: Margaret A Keeley
Represented By: Colette Connor
Represented By: Steven M. Farina
Represented By: John Michael Gildersleeve
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intel Corporation
Represented By: George A Borden
Represented By: Margaret A Keeley
Represented By: Colette Connor
Represented By: Steven M. Farina
Represented By: John Michael Gildersleeve
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Louisiana Sheriffs' Pension & Relief Fund
Represented By: David R Stickney
Represented By: David R Kaplan
Represented By: David Ronald Stickney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELVIS ALVIRA
Represented By: Laurence M Rosen
Represented By: Laurence Matthew Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?