Gilfanov v. Polyakov
Plaintiff: Rustam Yusufovich Gilfanov
Defendant: Maxym Valeriyovych Polyakov, Max Polyakov and Maxim Polyakov
Case Number: 4:2018cv03747
Filed: June 25, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Rustam Yusufovich Gilfanov (Cartee, Anthony) (Filed on 8/8/2018)
July 16, 2018 Filing 6 CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Rustam Yusufovich Gilfanov. (Cartee, Anthony) (Filed on 7/16/2018) Modified on 7/17/2018 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
June 26, 2018 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/18/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/25/2018 01:30 PM. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2018)
June 26, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Maxym Valeriyovych Polyakov. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2018)
June 25, 2018 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/9/2018. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2018)
June 25, 2018 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Cartee, Anthony) (Filed on 6/25/2018)
June 25, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION to Confirm Foreign Arbitration Award; Memorandum of Points and Authorities against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-12461169). Filed byRustam Yusufovich Gilfanov. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration and Exhibit "A", #2 Proposed Order, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cartee, Anthony) (Filed on 6/25/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gilfanov v. Polyakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maxym Valeriyovych Polyakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Max Polyakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maxim Polyakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rustam Yusufovich Gilfanov
Represented By: Anthony Benjamin Cartee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?