Nunn et al v. State of California et al
Plaintiff: Gerald Nunn and Judith Nunn
Defendant: State of California and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 4:2018cv03862
Filed: June 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Napa
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Housing/Accommodations
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 03/14/2019. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2019)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 69 Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting 57 Motion to Dismiss. Chase's motion to dismiss the complaint is granted. Plaintiffs' claims against it are dismissed without leave to amend. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2019)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT JP MORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.'S 31 MOTION TO DISMISS; GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' 44 MOTION TO DISMISS THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA; DENYING THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA'S 35 MOTION TO DISMISS AS MOOT by Judge William H. Orrick. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2018)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response/Opposition due by 10/17/2018. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 10/05/2018. (wholc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2018)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER DENYING TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF by Judge William H. Orrick denying 8 Motion for Permanent Injunction and 10 Ex Parte Application. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2018)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nunn et al v. State of California et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Nunn
Represented By: Ronald Henry Freshman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith Nunn
Represented By: Ronald Henry Freshman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: David Harford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?