United States of America v. $78,080 in United States Currency

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $78,080 in United States Currency
Claimant: CAIN KEVIN and Kevin Cain
Case Number: 4:2018cv04036
Filed: July 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Donna M Ryu
Referring Judge: Jeffrey S White
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #16 Stipulated Judgment of Forfeiture and dismissing action. Signed on 12/7/2018.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2018)
December 6, 2018 Filing 16 Settlement Agreement and [Proposed] Judgement of Forfeiture filed by United States of America and Kevin Cain. (Beausey, Karen) (Filed on 12/6/2018) Modified on 12/7/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 12/7/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/23/2019; Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/30/2019 01:30 PM re #13 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge, #14 Order Reassigning Case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 11/8/18. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2018) Modified on 11/21/2018 (ig, COURT STAFF).
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu for all further proceedings. Judge Jeffrey S. White no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 11/6/2018. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2018)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Ryu for All Purposes. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 11/5/18. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2018)
November 2, 2018 Filing 12 Joint Case Management Statement filed by United States of America, Cain Kevin, $78,080 in United States Currency. (Beausey, Karen) (Filed on 11/2/2018) Modified on 11/5/2018 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
August 9, 2018 Filing 11 SERVICE by Publication filed by United States of America. Last publication date 08/08/18. (Proof of Publication of Notice of Forfeiture Action) (Beausey, Karen) (Filed on 8/9/2018)
July 31, 2018 Filing 10 Claimant's Verified ANSWER to Complaint for Forfeiture In Rem with Jury Demand by CAIN KEVIN. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Service by Mail of Verified Answer)(Safier, Isaac) (Filed on 7/31/2018) Modified on 8/1/2018 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
July 31, 2018 Filing 9 Notice of Verified Claim and verified claim by Kevin Cain by CAIN KEVIN. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Service by Mail of Verified Claim)(Safier, Isaac) (Filed on 7/31/2018) Modified on 8/1/2018 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
July 31, 2018 Filing 8 Notice of Verified Claim and verified claim by $78,080 in United States Currency. (Safier, Isaac) (Filed on 7/31/2018) Modified on 8/1/2018 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
July 9, 2018 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America re #5 Warrant Issued, #4 Proposed Warrant, #1 Complaint, #6 Order,, Set Deadlines/Hearings, 2 Case Assigned by Intake,,, #3 Notice (Other) (Beausey, Karen) (Filed on 7/9/2018)
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/9/18. Case Management Statement due by 11/2/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/9/2018 11:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2018)
July 6, 2018 Filing 5 Warrant Issued as to $78,080 in United States Currency (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2018)
July 6, 2018 Filing 4 Proposed Warrant. (Beausey, Karen) (Filed on 7/6/2018)
July 6, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Forfeiture Action, filed by United States of America (Beausey, Karen) (Filed on 7/6/2018) Modified on 7/6/2018 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
July 5, 2018 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Jeffrey S. White. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2018)
July 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Verified Complaint for Forfeiture in Rem) against $78,080 in United States Currency. Filed byUnited States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Beausey, Karen) (Filed on 7/5/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $78,080 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $78,080 in United States Currency
Represented By: Isaac Michael Safier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Karen D. Beausey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: CAIN KEVIN
Represented By: Isaac Michael Safier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Kevin Cain
Represented By: Isaac Michael Safier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?