Farris et al v. 3M Company et al
Plaintiff: MELVA FARRIS and GARY FARRIS
Defendant: IMO INDUSTRIES, INC. (sued individually and as successor-in-interest to DELAVAL TURBINE, INC.), BORGWARNER MORSE TEC LLC individually and as successor-in-interest, parent, alter ego and equitable trustee of BORG-WARNER CORPORATION, VIGOR INDUSTRIAL LLC (individually and as successor-in-interest to TODD SHIPYARD CORPORATION), FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATION;, RICOH USA, INC. (individually and as successor-in-interest to SAVIN CORPORATION and as general manager of RICOH COMPANY, LTD.), Allied Packing and Supply, Inc., General Electric Company, Velan Valve Corp., PNEUMO ABEX, L.L.C (individually and as successor-in-interest to PNEUMO ABEX CORPORATION AND ABEX CORPORATION), Carrier Corporation, PARKER-HANNIFIN CORPORATION (individually and as successor-in-interest toSACOMA-SIERRA INC.), CLEAVER-BROOKS, INC. (individually and as successor-in-interest to DAVIS ENGINEERING COMPANY formerly known as AQUA-CHEM, INC. doing business as CLEAVER-BROOKS DIVISION), AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION (individually and as successor-in-interest to BUFFALO PUMPS, INC.), HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., (f/k/a ALLIED SIGNAL, INC., as successor-in-interest to the BENDIX CORPORATION), HENNESSY INDUSTRIES, INC. (individually and as successor-in-interest to AMMCO TOOLS, INC., TOSHIBA CORPORATION (served through its General Manager TOSHIBA AMERICA, INC., Maremont Corporation, CLA-VAL CO., RICOH COMPANY, LTD. (individually and as successor-in-interest to SAVIN CORPORATION and served through its General Manager RICOH USA, INC.), Copes-Vulcan Inc., TOSHIBA AMERICA, INC. (individually and as General Manager of TOSHIBA CORPORATION), 3M COMPANYf/k/a MINNESOTA MINING & MANUFACTURING COMPANY, KYOCERA INTERNATIONAL, INC. (individually and as successor-in-interest to MITA INDUSTRIAL COMPANY, LTD. and as general manager of KYOCERA CORPORATION), KYOCERA CORPORATION (individually and as successor-in-interest to MITA INDUSTRIAL COMPANY, LTD. and served through its General Manager KYOCERA INTERNATIONAL, INC.), CRANE CO. (individually and successor-in-interest to COCHRANE CORPORATION,, CBS CORPORATION (f/k/a VIACOM, INC. as successor-by-merger to CBS CORPORATION f/k/a WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION), RICOH USA, Inc. (erroneously sued and served as "RICOH USA, INC. (individually and as successor-in-interest to SAVIN CORPORATION and as general manager of RICOH COMPANY, LTD.)"), Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, 3M Company, RICOH COMPANY, LTD. (erroneously sued and served as "RICOH COMPANY LTD. (individually and as successor-in-interest to SAVIN CORPORATION and served through its General Manager, RICOH USA, INC.)&qu, BorgWarner Mose TEC LLC, Parker-Hannifin Corporation, IMO Industries, Inc., Allied Packing & Supply, Inc., Crane Co., Ricoh Company, Ltd., Toshiba America, Inc., Copes-Vulcan, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba America Business Solutions, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc., Cleaver-Brooks, Inc., Hennessy Industries, Inc., Vigor Industrial LLC, Borgwarner Morse Tec LLC, Kyocera Corporation, Fraser's Boiler Service, Inc., O'Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC, Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, Ricoh USA, Inc., Warren Pumps, LLC, Kyocera International, Inc., CBS Corporation, Pneumo Abex, L.L.C., CSK Auto, Inc., Cleaver-Brooks, Inc. individually and as successor-in-interest to Davis Engineering Company, formerly-known as Aqua-Chem, Inc., doing business as Cleaver-Brooks Division, Allied Signal, Inc., Viacom, Inc. and Minnesota Mining & Manufacturing Company
Case Number: 4:2018cv04186
Filed: July 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Jon S Tigar
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Filing 190 CLERKS NOTICE REGARDING LOCATION CHANGE FOR JUDGE JON S. TIGAR Effective August 26, 2019:Judge Jon S. Tigar's courtroom and chambers will be located at the Ronald V. Dellums Federal Building and United States Courthouse, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA 94612.On or after the effective date, all court appearances, filings, and deliveries of chambers copies must be made at the Oakland Courthouse (https://cand.uscourts.gov/locations). For updated scheduling information, please visit https://cand.uscourts.gov/jst. Judge Tigar's case assignments will be updated to reflect the correct office assignment (for example: 3:19-cv-00123-JST will now be 4:19-cv-00123-JST). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ecgS-adi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2019)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 189 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Judge Jon S. Tigar.(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2019)
August 8, 2019 Filing 188 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Dismissing Defendant Pneumo Abex LLC filed by Pneumo Abex, L.L.C.. (Brydon, John) (Filed on 8/8/2019)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 187 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Close of Expert Discovery due by 2/14/2020. Close of Fact Discovery due by 12/12/2019. Designation of Experts due by 1/10/2020. Dispositive Motion due by 2/28/2020. Pretrial Order due by 5/4/2020. Rebuttal Reports due by 1/24/2020. Jury Trial set for 6/15/2020 - 7/9/2020 08:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 31, 2019. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2019)
July 31, 2019 Filing 186 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jon S. Tigar: Further Case Management Conference held on 7/31/2019. Joint Stipulation to continue case deadlines #182 granted. Written order to issue. Total Time in Court: 5 minutes. Court Reporter: not reported. Attachment: minutes. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/31/2019)
July 30, 2019 Filing 185 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel David Jubelirer for Defendant Velan Valve Corp. (Jubelirer, Samuel) (Filed on 7/30/2019)
July 30, 2019 Filing 184 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel David Jubelirer for Defendant BorgWarner Morse TEC LLC as Successor-by-Merger to BorgWarner Corporation (Jubelirer, Samuel) (Filed on 7/30/2019)
July 24, 2019 Filing 183 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by CBS Corporation. (Empting, Erin) (Filed on 7/24/2019)
July 24, 2019 Filing 182 JOINT STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER to Continue Case Deadlines filed by CBS Corporation. (Empting, Erin) (Filed on 7/24/2019)
July 10, 2019 Filing 181 RESPONSE DEFENDANT TOSHIBA AMERICA BUSINESS SOLUTIONS, INC.'S RESPONSE TO CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER; ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Toshiba America Business Solutions, Inc.. (Engel, Robert) (Filed on 7/10/2019)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #179 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to G. Kenneth Robertson. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2019)
July 9, 2019 Filing 179 First MOTION & [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice G. Kenneth Robertson ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13501637.) filed by Velan Valve Corp.. (Barton, Arlene) (Filed on 7/9/2019) Modified on 7/10/2019 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 178 Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #174 Stipulation re Electronic Service. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2019)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 177 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER; ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Further Case Management Conference set for 7/31/2019 at 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 09, 19th Floor. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on 7/9/19. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2019)
July 8, 2019 Filing 176 NOTICE of Appearance by Xiao Jing Diego Wu Min (Wu Min, Xiao Jing) (Filed on 7/8/2019)
July 8, 2019 Filing 175 RESPONSE to Order re Discovery Dispute (Deposition of Plaintiff Gary Farris, ECF No. 172) by Gary Farris, Melva Farris. (Jones, Trey) (Filed on 7/8/2019)
July 8, 2019 Filing 174 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Electronic Service filed by Gary Farris, Melva Farris. (Jones, Trey) (Filed on 7/8/2019)
July 5, 2019 Filing 173 CLERK'S NOTICE CORRECTING HEARING TIME: The Further Case Management Conference set for 7/10/2019 will be held at 9:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 09, 19th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2019)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER RE DISCOVERY DISPUTE. Written confirmation of the date, time, and location of the deposition due by 7/8/2019. Further Case Management Conference set for 7/10/2019 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 09, 19th Floor. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 2, 2019. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2019)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 171 Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #170 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Kenneth Robertson. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2019)
July 1, 2019 Filing 170 MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-13482739) filed by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation. (Attachments: #(1) Certificate/Proof of Service)(Park, Charles) (Filed on 7/1/2019)
June 26, 2019 Filing 169 Letter from Foster Wheeler LLC re Plaintiffs deposition. (Park, Charles) (Filed on 6/26/2019)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 168 Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #167 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Lee W. Davis. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2019)
June 25, 2019 Filing 167 MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-13465109) filed by Gary Farris, Melva Farris. (Attachments: #(1) Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing)(Davis, Lee) (Filed on 6/25/2019)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting #165 Stipulation. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2019)
June 18, 2019 Filing 165 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Defendant Kyocera Corporation and Kyocera International filed by Gary Farris, Melva Farris. (Jones, Trey) (Filed on 6/18/2019)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 164 Order of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Defendant Allied Fluid Products Corp. fka Allied Packing & Supply, Inc. by Judge Jon S. Tigar. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2019)
June 18, 2019 Filing 163 JOINT STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF DEFENDANT ALLIED FLUID PRODUCTS CORP. FKA ALLIED PACKING & SUPLY, INC. filed by Allied Packing & Supply, Inc.. (Cordery, Theodore) (Filed on 6/18/2019)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND SETTING NEW SETTLEMENT PROCESS AND SCHEDULE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 5/31/2019. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2019)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER TO PLAINTIFFS TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 5/14/2019. Show Cause Response due by 5/28/2019. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2019)
May 13, 2019 Filing 160 ANSWER to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint filed by Honeywell International, Inc.. (Turner, Glen) (Filed on 5/13/2019)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER GRANTING SECOND MOTION TO DISMISS FIFTH CAUSE OF ACTION FOR MARKET SHARE LIABILITY by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting #137 Motion to Dismiss. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2019)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 158 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #157 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal without prejudice of Defendant General Electric Company filed by Gary Farris, Melva Farris. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 17, 2019. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2019)
April 16, 2019 Filing 157 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Defendant General Electric Company filed by Gary Farris, Melva Farris. (Jones, Trey) (Filed on 4/16/2019)
March 27, 2019 Filing 156 PLAINTIFFS RESPONSES TO TOSHIBA AMERICA BUSINESS SOLUTION, INC.S SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES filed by Gary Farris, Melva Farris. (Jones, Trey) (Filed on 3/27/2019)
March 27, 2019 Filing 155 PLAINTIFFS RESPONSES TO TOSHIBA AMERICA BUSINESS SOLUTION, INC.S REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION filed by Gary Farris, Melva Farris. (Jones, Trey) (Filed on 3/27/2019)
March 27, 2019 Filing 154 PLAINTIFFS RESPONSES TO TOSHIBA AMERICA BUSINESS SOLUTION, INC.S REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS filed by Gary Farris, Melva Farris. (Jones, Trey) (Filed on 3/27/2019)
March 7, 2019 Filing 153 DEFENDANT VIGOR INDUSTRIAL, LLC as successor-in-interest to TODD SHIPYARDS CORPORATION'S DISCLOSURE STATEMENT AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES (F.R.Civ.P. 7.1) (Steele, Demian) (Filed on 3/7/2019)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER RE: SETTLEMENT STATUS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 1/23/2019. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2019)
January 23, 2019 Filing 150 NOTICE filed by Maremont Corporation of Suggestion of Bankruptcy (Milbrodt, Jeremy) (Filed on 1/23/2019)
January 22, 2019 Filing 151 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Telephone Conference held with the parties on 1/22/2019. The Court will issue an order re: settlement. (Not Reported)(Time 00:20) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/22/2019)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER VACATING HEARING re #137 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Fifth Cause of Action for Market Share Liability filed by Honeywell International, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 15, 2019. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2019)
January 10, 2019 Filing 148 REPLY (re #137 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Fifth Cause of Action for Market Share Liability) filed by Honeywell International, Inc.. (Attachments: #(1) Declaration SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF GLEN TURNER IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' FIFTH CAUSE OF ACTION FOR MARKET SHARE LIABILITY)(Turner, Glen) (Filed on 1/10/2019)
January 3, 2019 Filing 147 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE to (re #137 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Fifth Cause of Action for Market Share Liability) filed by Gary Farris, Melva Farris. (Jones, Trey) (Filed on 1/3/2019)
December 28, 2018 Filing 146 ANSWER to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint for Personal Injury (Survivorship) filed by Pneumo Abex, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #(1) Certificate/Proof of Service)(Brydon, John) (Filed on 12/28/2018)
December 27, 2018 Filing 145 ANSWER to Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint For Personal Injury (Survivorship) filed by Velan Valve Corp.. (Barton, Arlene) (Filed on 12/27/2018)
December 27, 2018 Filing 144 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by IMO Industries, Inc. re #143 Answer to Amended Complaint (Corrected) (Bailey, Bobbie) (Filed on 12/27/2018)
December 26, 2018 Filing 143 ANSWER to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint for Personal Injunry (Survivorship) filed by IMO Industries, Inc.. (Bailey, Bobbie) (Filed on 12/26/2018)
December 26, 2018 Filing 142 ANSWER to Second Amended Complaint for Personal Injury filed by CLA-VAL Co.. (Lister, John) (Filed on 12/26/2018)
December 21, 2018 Filing 141 Certificate of Interested Entities by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Ampco-Pittsburgh Corporation, Other Affiliate Fireman's Fund Insurance Co, Other Affiliate Liberty Mutual, Other Affiliate Utica National Insurance Group, Other Affiliate Resolute Management Inc. for Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (Scadden, James) (Filed on 12/21/2018)
December 21, 2018 Filing 140 ANSWER to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, and Demand for Jury Trial filed by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (Scadden, James) (Filed on 12/21/2018)
December 21, 2018 Filing 139 Defendant Hennessy Industries, LLC (fka Hennessy Industries, Inc.) ANSWER to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint filed by Hennessy Industries, Inc.. (Dubois, Jacqueline) (Filed on 12/21/2018)
December 20, 2018 Filing 138 ANSWER to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint for Personal Injury; Demand for Jury Trial filed by Maremont Corporation. (Galfayan, Arpi) (Filed on 12/20/2018)
December 20, 2018 Filing 137 NOTICE OF MOTION & MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Fifth Cause of Action for Market Share Liability filed by Honeywell International, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 1/24/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 09, 19th Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 1/3/2019. Replies due by 1/10/2019. (Attachments: #(1) Declaration of Glen Turner, #(2) [Proposed] Order)(Ongaro, David) (Filed on 12/20/2018)
December 20, 2018 Filing 136 ANSWER to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint for Personal Injury (Survivorship) filed by Copes-Vulcan, Inc.. (Gage, Nicole) (Filed on 12/20/2018)
December 19, 2018 Filing 135 NOTICE filed by BorgWarner Morse TEC LLC of Initial Disclosures Pursuant To Federal Rules Of Civil Procedure, Rule 26 (Clawson, Kyle) (Filed on 12/19/2018)
December 19, 2018 Filing 134 ANSWER to Second Amended Complaint filed by Vigor Industrial LLC. (Steele, Demian) (Filed on 12/19/2018)
December 19, 2018 Filing 133 ANSWER to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint For Personal Injury (Survivorship)) filed by BorgWarner Morse TEC LLC. (Clawson, Kyle) (Filed on 12/19/2018)
December 19, 2018 Filing 132 ANSWER to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint for Personal Injury (Survivorship); Affirmative Defense, and Demand for Jury Trial filed by Toshiba America Business Solutions, Inc.. (Engel, Robert) (Filed on 12/19/2018)
December 19, 2018 Filing 131 ANSWER to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint for Personal Injury filed by Ricoh Company, Ltd.. (Back, Mary) (Filed on 12/19/2018)
December 19, 2018 Filing 130 ANSWER to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint for Personal Injury filed by Ricoh USA, Inc.. (Back, Mary) (Filed on 12/19/2018)
December 19, 2018 Filing 129 Answer to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint for Personal Injury (Survivorship) filed by Carrier Corporation. (Tran, Ronald) (Filed on 12/19/2018)
December 19, 2018 Filing 128 Answer to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint for Personal Injury (Survivorship) filed by Warren Pumps, LLC. (Tran, Ronald) (Filed on 12/19/2018)
December 18, 2018 Filing 127 NOTICE of Appearance by Mordecai D. Boone for Defendant 3M COMPANY (Boone, Mordecai) (Filed on 12/18/2018)
December 11, 2018 Filing 126 Certification of Interested Parties Pursuant to Local Rule 7-1.1 and Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 filed by 3M Company (Peatman, Stephanie) (Filed on 12/11/2018)
December 11, 2018 Filing 125 3M Company's ANSWER to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint for Personal Injury (Survivorship) filed by 3M Company. (Peatman, Stephanie) (Filed on 12/11/2018)
December 11, 2018 Filing 124 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons (FRCP 7.1; Civil L.R. 3-15) filed by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, Amec Foster Wheeler plc (Park, Charles) (Filed on 12/11/2018)
December 11, 2018 Filing 123 DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATIONS ANSWER to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint FOR PERSONAL INJURY (SURVIVORSHIP) filed by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation. (Park, Charles) (Filed on 12/11/2018)
December 11, 2018 Filing 122 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation.. (Park, Charles) (Filed on 12/11/2018)
December 11, 2018 Filing 121 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles S. Park FOR DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER (Park, Charles) (Filed on 12/11/2018)
December 11, 2018 Filing 120 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie G Peatman (Peatman, Stephanie) (Filed on 12/11/2018)
December 6, 2018 Filing 119 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY (SURVIVORSHIP); DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against All Defendants. Filed by Melva Farris, Gary Farris. (Jones, Trey) (Filed on 12/6/2018)
December 6, 2018 Filing 118 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Allied Packing & Supply, Inc... (Cordery, Theodore) (Filed on 12/6/2018)
December 6, 2018 Filing 117 NOTICE of Appearance by Theodore Thomas Cordery Allied Fluid Products Corp fka Allied Packing & Supply, Inc. (Cordery, Theodore) (Filed on 12/6/2018)
December 6, 2018 Filing 116 Certificate of Interested Entities by Allied Packing & Supply, Inc. (Allied Fluid Products Corp) (Cordery, Theodore) (Filed on 12/6/2018)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting #96 Motion to Dismiss. Amended Pleadings due by 1/7/2019. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2018)
December 5, 2018 Filing 114 NOTICE by Hennessy Industries, Inc. re Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Rule 26(a)(l) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Dubois, Jacqueline) (Filed on 12/5/2018)
December 5, 2018 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley for Settlement (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2018)
December 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 5, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2018)
December 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 112 SCHEDULING ORDER. Deadline to add parties or amend the pleadings 12/14/2018. Fact discovery cut-off 9/13/2019. Expert disclosures 9/27/2019. Expert rebuttal 10/11/2019. Expert discovery cut-off 11/1/2019. Deadline to file dispositive motions 11/14/2019. Pretrial conference statement due 1/31/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 2/7/2020 at 2:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Jury Trial set for 3/2/2020 - 3/26/2020 at 8:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 5, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2018)
December 5, 2018 Filing 111 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jon S. Tigar: Initial Case Management Conference held on 12/5/2018. Total Time in Court: 10 minutes. Court Reporter: Not reported. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/5/2018)
December 5, 2018 Filing 110 ANSWER to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint for Personal Injury filed by Allied Packing & Supply, Inc.. (Cordery, Theodore) (Filed on 12/5/2018)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER VACATING HEARING re #96 MOTION to Dismiss Fifth Cause of Action filed by Honeywell International, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 4, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2018)
December 3, 2018 Filing 108 NOTICE by Parker-Hannifin Corporation re Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Rule 26(a)(l) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Patterson, Christopher) (Filed on 12/3/2018)
November 29, 2018 Filing 107 AMENDED Joint Case Management Statement filed by Gary Farris, Melva Farris. (Jones, Trey) (Filed on 11/29/2018)
November 27, 2018 Filing 106 REPLY (re #96 MOTION to Dismiss Fifth Cause of Action) filed by Honeywell International, Inc.. (Ongaro, David) (Filed on 11/27/2018)
November 27, 2018 Filing 105 Joint Case Management Statement filed by Gary Farris, Melva Farris. (Jones, Trey) (Filed on 11/27/2018)
November 21, 2018 Filing 104 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy David Milbrodt (Milbrodt, Jeremy) (Filed on 11/21/2018)
November 20, 2018 Filing 103 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE to (re #96 MOTION to Dismiss Fifth Cause of Action) - Plaintiffs' Opposition to Honeywell International Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Fifth Cause of Action for Market Share Liability filed by Gary Farris, Melva Farris. (Jones, Trey) (Filed on 11/20/2018)
November 19, 2018 Filing 102 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Alan Steig (Steig, Thomas) (Filed on 11/19/2018)
November 19, 2018 Filing 101 Velan Valve Corp. ANSWER to Amended Complaint byVelan Valve Corp.. (Barton, Arlene) (Filed on 11/19/2018)
November 16, 2018 Filing 100 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Maremont Corporation.. (Galfayan, Arpi) (Filed on 11/16/2018)
November 9, 2018 Filing 99 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Livingston Sharp ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT CLEAVER-BROOKS, INC. (formerly known as AQUA-CHEM, INC.) (and erroneously sued as successor-in-interest to DAVIS ENGINEERING (Sharp, Andrew) (Filed on 11/9/2018)
November 8, 2018 Filing 98 ANSWER to Plaintiffs' Complaint for Damages and Notice of Request for Jury Trial filed by Cleaver-Brooks, Inc.. (Sharp, Andrew) (Filed on 11/8/2018)
November 6, 2018 Filing 97 Request for Judicial Notice in Support of re #96 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Fifth Cause of Action for Market Share Liability filed by Honeywell International, Inc.. (Related document(s) #96 ) (Ongaro, David) (Filed on 11/6/2018)
November 6, 2018 Filing 96 NOTICE OF MOTION & MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Fifth Cause of Action for Market Share Liability filed by Honeywell International, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 12/13/2018 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 09, 19th Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 11/20/2018. Replies due by 11/27/2018. (Attachments: #(1) Declaration of Kenneth Natelborg, #(2) [Proposed] Order)(Ongaro, David) (Filed on 11/6/2018)
November 6, 2018 Filing 95 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Honeywell International, Inc.. (Ongaro, David) (Filed on 11/6/2018)
November 6, 2018 Filing 94 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Honeywell International, Inc. (Ongaro, David) (Filed on 11/6/2018)
November 6, 2018 Filing 93 NOTICE of Appearance by David Raymond Ongaro , Kirsten McNelly Bibbes and Glen Turner (Ongaro, David) (Filed on 11/6/2018)
November 6, 2018 Filing 92 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons filed by Toshiba America Business Solutions, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Toshiba Corporation, Other Affiliate T-Tec for Toshiba America Business Solutions, Inc. re #62 Answer to Amended Complaint (Passalacqua, Lisa) (Filed on 11/6/2018)
November 6, 2018 Filing 91 NOTICE of Appearance by Arlene Carol-Mendoza Barton VELAN VALVE CORP. (Barton, Arlene) (Filed on 11/6/2018)
November 6, 2018 Filing 90 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Velan Valve Corp... (Barton, Arlene) (Filed on 11/6/2018)
November 6, 2018 Filing 89 Initial Disclosure Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Rule 26 filed by Velan Valve Corp. identifying Corporate Parent Velan Inc. for Velan Valve Corp.. (Barton, Arlene) (Filed on 11/6/2018)
November 6, 2018 Filing 88 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by Velan Valve Corp. identifying Corporate Parent Velan Inc. for Velan Valve Corp.. (Barton, Arlene) (Filed on 11/6/2018)
November 6, 2018 Filing 87 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin Nicole Empting on Behalf of Defendant CBS Corporation, et al. (Empting, Erin) (Filed on 11/6/2018)
November 6, 2018 Filing 86 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Finnell Cronin on Behalf of Defendant CBS Corporation, et al. (Cronin, Justin) (Filed on 11/6/2018)
November 6, 2018 Filing 85 Disclosures of Non-Party Interested Entities or Persons Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Rule 7.1 and Local Civil Rule 3-15 filed by CBS Corporation identifying Corporate Parent CBS Corporation, a Delaware corporation, f/k/a Viacom Inc., successor by merger to CBS Corporation, a Pennsylvania corporation, f/k/a Westinghouse Electric Corporation, Other Affiliate National Amusements, Inc., Other Affiliate NAI Entertainment Holdings LLC for CBS Corporation. (Jamison, Kevin) (Filed on 11/6/2018)
November 6, 2018 Filing 84 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Douglas Jamison on Behalf of Defendant CBS Corporation, et al. (Jamison, Kevin) (Filed on 11/6/2018)
November 6, 2018 Filing 83 DEFENDANT'S ANSWER to the First Amended Complaint for Personal Injury (Asbestos) and Demand for Jury Trial filed by CBS Corporation. (Jamison, Kevin) (Filed on 11/6/2018)
November 5, 2018 Filing 82 Answer to re #46 Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint for Personal Injury (Survivorship) file by Crane Co.. (Davis, Geoffrey) (Filed on 11/5/2018)
November 2, 2018 Filing 81 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Galfayan, Arpi) (Filed on 11/2/2018)
November 1, 2018 Filing 80 NOTICE by Pneumo Abex, L.L.C. of Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Rule 26(a)(l) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Brydon, John) (Filed on 11/1/2018)
November 1, 2018 Filing 79 Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 and Certification of Interested Entities or Persons filed by Pneumo Abex, L.L.C. identifying Corporate Parent The Pneumo Abex Asbestos Claim Settlement Trust for Pneumo Abex, L.L.C.. (Brydon, John) (Filed on 11/1/2018)
November 1, 2018 Filing 78 NOTICE of Appearance by John R. Brydon (Brydon, John) (Filed on 11/1/2018)
November 1, 2018 Filing 77 Certificate of Interested Entities by Warren Pumps, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Colfax Corporation, Other Affiliate IMO Industries for Warren Pumps, LLC. (Tran, Ronald) (Filed on 11/1/2018)
November 1, 2018 Filing 76 NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald Q Tran - Defendant Warren Pumps, LLC's Notice of Appearance (Tran, Ronald) (Filed on 11/1/2018)
November 1, 2018 Filing 75 ANSWER to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint for Personal Injury (Survivorship) filed by Warren Pumps, LLC. (Tran, Ronald) (Filed on 11/1/2018)
November 1, 2018 Filing 74 Certificate of Interested Entities by Maremont Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Meritor, Inc. for Maremont Corporation. (Galfayan, Arpi) (Filed on 11/1/2018)
November 1, 2018 Filing 73 ANSWER to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint for Personal Injury filed by Maremont Corporation. (Galfayan, Arpi) (Filed on 11/1/2018)
November 1, 2018 Filing 72 ANSWER to Plaintiffs' Complaint for Personal Injury (Survivorship) with Jury Demand byBorgWarner Mose TEC LLC. (Clawson, Kyle) (Filed on 11/1/2018)
November 1, 2018 Filing 71 Certificate of Interested Entities by BorgWarner Mose TEC LLC identifying Corporate Parent Borg Warner, Inc. for BorgWarner Mose TEC LLC. (Clawson, Kyle) (Filed on 11/1/2018)
November 1, 2018 Filing 70 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle J. Clawson and Michael E. Sandgren for Defendant BorgWarner Morse TEC LLC As Successor-By-Merger To Borg-Warner Corporation (Clawson, Kyle) (Filed on 11/1/2018)
October 31, 2018 Filing 69 Certification of Interested Entities filed by Copes-Vulcan Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Electrolux Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Electrolux Home Products, Inc., a Delaware Corporation for Copes-Vulcan Inc. re #67 Notice of Appearance (Gage, Nicole) (Filed on 10/31/2018)
October 31, 2018 Filing 68 AMENDED ANSWER to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint for Personal Injury (Survivorship) filed by Copes-Vulcan Inc.. (Gage, Nicole) (Filed on 10/31/2018)
October 31, 2018 Filing 67 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole Elisabet Gage (Gage, Nicole) (Filed on 10/31/2018)
October 31, 2018 Filing 66 ANSWER to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint for Personal Injury (Survivorship) filed by Copes-Vulcan Inc.. (Gage, Nicole) (Filed on 10/31/2018)
October 30, 2018 Filing 65 Certification as to Interested Parties (Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1; L.R. 3-15) filed by CLA-VAL Co. identifying Corporate Parent Griswold Industries for CLA-VAL Co.. (Lister, John) (Filed on 10/30/2018)
October 30, 2018 Filing 64 NOTICE of Appearance by John Russell Lister and Charles Kanter on behalf of Defendant Cla-Val Co. (Lister, John) (Filed on 10/30/2018)
October 30, 2018 Filing 63 ANSWER to First Amended Complaint for Personal Injury (Survivorship) filed by CLA-VAL Co.. (Lister, John) (Filed on 10/30/2018)
October 29, 2018 Filing 62 ANSWER to First Amended Complaint, and Demand for Jury Trial filed by Toshiba America Business Solutions, Inc.. (Engel, Robert) (Filed on 10/29/2018)
October 29, 2018 Filing 61 ANSWER to First Amended Complaint for Personal Injury (Asbestos) and Jury Demand filed by General Electric Company. (Johnson, Derek) (Filed on 10/29/2018)
October 29, 2018 Filing 60 ANSWER to Complaint for Personal Injury (Survivorship); Demand for Jury Trial filed by Pneumo Abex, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #(1) Certificate/Proof of Service)(Brydon, John) (Filed on 10/29/2018)
October 29, 2018 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacqueline Kirk Dubois (Dubois, Jacqueline) (Filed on 10/29/2018)
October 26, 2018 Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance by Casey Carlton Shaw for Hennessy Industries, LLC (Shaw, Casey) (Filed on 10/26/2018)
October 26, 2018 Filing 57 NOTICE of Appearance by Ian Garth Williamson for Hennessy Industries, LLC (Williamson, Ian) (Filed on 10/26/2018)
October 26, 2018 Filing 56 Certificate of Interested Entities by Hennessy Industries, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Hennessy Industries LLC for Hennessy Industries, Inc.. (Williamson, Ian) (Filed on 10/26/2018)
October 26, 2018 Filing 55 HENNESSY INDUSTRIES, INC.'s ANSWER to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed by Hennessy Industries, Inc.. (Williamson, Ian) (Filed on 10/26/2018)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #50 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER that Answer by Ricoh USA, Inc. to Plaintiffs' Original Complaint be Deemed Answer to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed by Ricoh USA, Inc.. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 16, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2018)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #51 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED]ORDER that Answer by Ricoh Company, Ltd. to Plaintiffs' Original Complaint be Deemed Answer to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed by Ricoh Company, Ltd. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 16, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2018)
October 15, 2018 Filing 52 ANSWER to Plaintiffs' Fist Amended Complaint for Personal Injury (Survivorship) filed by Carrier Corporation. (Tran, Ronald) (Filed on 10/15/2018)
October 15, 2018 Filing 51 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER that Answer by Ricoh Company, Ltd. to Plaintiffs' Original Complaint be Deemed Answer to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed by Ricoh Company, Ltd.. (Back, Mary) (Filed on 10/15/2018)
October 15, 2018 Filing 50 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER that Answer by Ricoh USA, Inc. to Plaintiffs' Original Complaint be Deemed Answer to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed by Ricoh USA, Inc.. (Back, Mary) (Filed on 10/15/2018)
October 12, 2018 #Electronic filing error. Document not properly linked. [err102]Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #49 Answer to Amended Complaint filed by Pa rker-Hannifin Corporation. (mclS, COURT STAFF)
October 11, 2018 Filing 49 ANSWER to #46 Amended Complaint byParker-Hannifin Corporation. (Patterson, Christopher) (Filed on 10/11/2018) Modified on 10/12/2018 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
October 5, 2018 Filing 48 Summons Issued as to Defendants 3M Company, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Allied Packing & Supply, Inc., BorgWarner Mose TEC LLC, CBS Corporation, CLA-VAL Co., Cleaver-Brooks, Inc., Copes-Vulcan Inc., Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, Fraser's Boiler Service, Inc., Hennessy Industries, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc., Kyocera Corporation, Kyocera International, Inc., Maremont Corporation, O'Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC, Pneumo Abex, L.L.C., Toshiba America Business Solutions, Inc., Velan Valve Corp., Vigor Industrial LLC & Warren Pumps, LLC. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2018)
October 5, 2018 Filing 47 Proposed Summons. (Jones, Trey) (Filed on 10/5/2018)
October 4, 2018 Filing 46 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT for Personal Injury (Survivorship); Demand for Jury Trial against All Defendants. Filed by Melva Farris, Gary Farris. (Jones, Trey) (Filed on 10/4/2018)
October 2, 2018 #Electronic filing error Re: #44 Proposed Summons filed by Gary Farris & Melva Farris. This filing will not be processed by the Clerk's Office. The case number is incorrect. Please re-submit the proposed summons with the correct case number and additionally DO NOT submit multiple summons. You may submit one summons with all defendants listed on an attachment (excluding defendants Crane Co., IMO Industries Inc., Ricoh Company, Ltd. and Ricoh USA, Inc. as they have already filed an Answer). (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2018)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #43 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference and Related Deadlines filed by Gary Farris, Melva Farris. Case Management Statement due by 11/21/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/5/2018 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 2, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2018)
September 27, 2018 Filing 44 Proposed Summons. (Attachments: #1 Summons Allied Packing & Supply, Inc., #2 Summons Borgwarner Morse Tec LLC, #3 Summons Carrier Corporation, #4 Summons CBS Corporation, #5 Summons Cleaver-Brooks, Inc., #6 Summons Crane Co., #7 Summons Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, #8 Summons Fraser's Boiler Service, Inc., #9 Summons General Electric Company, #10 Summons Hennessy Industries, Inc., #11 Summons Honeywell International Inc., #12 Summons IMO Industries Inc., #13 Summons Kyocera Corporation, #14 Summons Kyocera International, #15 Summons Maremont Corporation, #16 Summons O'Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC, #17 Summons Parker-Hannifin Corporation, #18 Summons Pneumo Abex, L.L.C., #19 Summons Ricoh Company, LTD, #20 Summons Ricoh USA, Inc., #21 Summons Toshiba America, Inc., #22 Summons Toshiba Corporation, #23 Summons Velan Valve Corp., #24 Summons Warren Pumps, LLC, #25 Summons Vigor Industrial LLC)(Jones, Trey) (Filed on 9/27/2018)
September 26, 2018 Filing 43 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference and Related Deadlines filed by Gary Farris, Melva Farris. (Jones, Trey) (Filed on 9/26/2018)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #41 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER to Dismiss Defendant Toshiba America, Inc. and Specially Appearing Party Toshiba Corporation, and to Amend the Complaint filed by TOSHIBA AMERICA, INC. (individually and as General Manager of TOSHIBA CORPORATION). Amended Pleadings due by 10/9/2018. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 24, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2018)
September 21, 2018 Filing 41 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER to Dismiss Defendant Toshiba America, Inc. and Specially Appearing Party Toshiba Corporation, and to Amend the Complaint filed by TOSHIBA AMERICA, INC. (individually and as General Manager of TOSHIBA CORPORATION). (Engel, Robert) (Filed on 9/21/2018)
September 6, 2018 Filing 40 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons filed by RICOH COMPANY, LTD. (erroneously sued and served as "RICOH COMPANY LTD. (individually and as successor-in-interest to SAVIN CORPORATION and served through its General Manager, RICOH USA, INC.) (Back, Mary) (Filed on 9/6/2018)
September 6, 2018 Filing 39 Corporate Disclosure Statement by RICOH COMPANY, LTD. (erroneously sued and served as "RICOH COMPANY LTD. (individually and as successor-in-interest to SAVIN CORPORATION and served through its General Manager, RICOH USA, INC.)&qu (Back, Mary) (Filed on 9/6/2018)
September 6, 2018 Filing 38 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) byRICOH COMPANY, LTD. (erroneously sued and served as "RICOH COMPANY LTD. (individually and as successor-in-interest to SAVIN CORPORATION and served through its General Manager, RICOH USA, INC.)"). (Back, Mary) (Filed on 9/6/2018)
August 30, 2018 Filing 37 ANSWER to Plaintiffs' Complaint for Personal Injury (Notice of Removal) filed by RICOH USA, Inc. (erroneously sued and served as "RICOH USA, INC. (individually and as successor-in-interest to SAVIN CORPORATION and as general manager of RICOH COMPANY, LTD.)"). (Attachments: #(1) Certificate of Interested Entities or Persons, #(2) Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Back, Mary) (Filed on 8/30/2018)
August 27, 2018 Filing 36 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint filed by RICOH COMPANY, LTD. (individually and as successor-in-interest to SAVIN CORPORATION and served through its General Manager RICOH USA, INC.). (Back, Mary) (Filed on 8/27/2018)
August 24, 2018 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Paige Gardiner for Defendant General Electric Company (Gardiner, Katherine) (Filed on 8/24/2018)
August 24, 2018 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Elizabeth Anselmo for Defendant General Electric Company (Anselmo, Emily) (Filed on 8/24/2018)
August 24, 2018 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles T. Sheldon for Defendant General Electric Company (Sheldon, Charles) (Filed on 8/24/2018)
August 24, 2018 Filing 32 Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure Rule 7.1 filed by General Electric Company (Johnson, Derek) (Filed on 8/24/2018)
August 24, 2018 Filing 31 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons filed by General Electric Company (Johnson, Derek) (Filed on 8/24/2018)
August 24, 2018 Filing 30 NOTICE by General Electric Company of Refiling State Court Answer (Johnson, Derek) (Filed on 8/24/2018)
August 24, 2018 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Derek S. Johnson for Defendant General Electric Company (Johnson, Derek) (Filed on 8/24/2018)
August 14, 2018 Filing 28 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint filed by RICOH USA, INC. (individually and as successor-in-interest to SAVIN CORPORATION and as general manager of RICOH COMPANY, LTD.). (Back, Mary) (Filed on 8/14/2018)
July 31, 2018 Filing 27 NOTICE filed by Carrier Corporation of Notice of Filing State Court Answer to Complaint for Personal Injury (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Tran, Ronald) (Filed on 7/31/2018)
July 31, 2018 Filing 26 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 and Local Rule 7.1-1 filed by Carrier Corporation identifying Other Affiliate United Technologies Corporation for Carrier Corporation. (Tran, Ronald) (Filed on 7/31/2018)
July 31, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald Q Tran (Tran, Ronald) (Filed on 7/31/2018)
July 24, 2018 Filing 24 ANSWER to Complaint for Personal Injury (Survivorship) (Notice of Removal) filed by IMO Industries, Inc.. (Bailey, Bobbie) (Filed on 7/24/2018)
July 24, 2018 Filing 23 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 10/15/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/24/2018 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order for All Judges of the Northern District) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2018)
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Judge William H. Orrick no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 7/23/18. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2018)
July 23, 2018 Filing 21 Certificate of Interested Parties filed by IMO INDUSTRIES, INC. (sued individually and as successor-in-interest to DELAVAL TURBINE, INC.) identifying Corporate Parent Colfax Corporation, Corporate Parent Colfax Fluid Handling LLC, Corporate Parent IMO Holdings, Inc. for IMO INDUSTRIES, INC. (sued individually and as successor-in-interest to DELAVAL TURBINE, INC.). (Bailey, Bobbie) (Filed on 7/23/2018)
July 23, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Bobbie Rae Bailey Lead Trial Counsel, Frederick W. Gatt, Attorney to be Noticed, Olga G. Pena, Attorney to be Noticed (Bailey, Bobbie) (Filed on 7/23/2018)
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 07/23/2018. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2018)
July 19, 2018 Filing 18 Defendant Crane Co.'s ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand; by CRANE CO. (individually and successor-in-interest to COCHRANE CORPORATION,. (Soskin, Peter) (Filed on 7/19/2018) Modified on 7/20/2018 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge William H. Orrick for all further proceedings. Judge Susan Illston no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 7/19/18. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2018)
July 19, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Kum for Defendant Parker Hannifin Corporation (sued individually and as successor-in-interest to Sacoma Sierra, Inc. (Kum, Robert) (Filed on 7/19/2018)
July 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 7/18/18. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2018)
July 18, 2018 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by PARKER-HANNIFIN CORPORATION (individually and as successor-in-interest toSACOMA-SIERRA INC.) re #13 Certificate of Interested Entities, #11 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge, #10 Notice (Other), #12 Certificate of Interested Entities and Notice of Re-Filing of State Court Answer on Behalf of Defendant Parker Hannifin Corporation (Patterson, Christopher) (Filed on 7/18/2018)
July 18, 2018 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PARKER-HANNIFIN CORPORATION (individually and as successor-in-interest toSACOMA-SIERRA INC.) (Patterson, Christopher) (Filed on 7/18/2018)
July 18, 2018 Filing 12 Certificate of Interested Entities by PARKER-HANNIFIN CORPORATION (individually and as successor-in-interest toSACOMA-SIERRA INC.) (Patterson, Christopher) (Filed on 7/18/2018)
July 18, 2018 Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by PARKER-HANNIFIN CORPORATION (individually and as successor-in-interest toSACOMA-SIERRA INC.).. (Patterson, Christopher) (Filed on 7/18/2018)
July 18, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE by PARKER-HANNIFIN CORPORATION (individually and as successor-in-interest toSACOMA-SIERRA INC.) Notice of Re-Filing of State Court Answer on Behalf of Defendant Parker Hannifin Corporation (Patterson, Christopher) (Filed on 7/18/2018)
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Susan Illston for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 7/17/18. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2018)
July 16, 2018 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2018)
July 13, 2018 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by CRANE CO. (individually and successor-in-interest to COCHRANE CORPORATION,.. (Davis, Geoffrey) (Filed on 7/13/2018)
July 13, 2018 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CRANE CO. (individually and successor-in-interest to COCHRANE CORPORATION, (Davis, Geoffrey) (Filed on 7/13/2018)
July 13, 2018 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Entities by CRANE CO. (individually and successor-in-interest to COCHRANE CORPORATION, identifying Corporate Parent Crane Co., Other Affiliate hartford, Other Affiliate National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania, Other Affiliate Highlands Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Lexington Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Transit Casualty Company, Other Affiliate Government Employees Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Pacific Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Aetna Casualty & Surety Company, Other Affiliate Twin City Fire Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Insurance Company of North America, Other Affiliate First State Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Prudential Reinsurance Company, Other Affiliate American Excess Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Granite State Insurance Company, Other Affiliate American Reinsurance Company, Other Affiliate American Centennial Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Employers Mutual Casualty Company, Other Affiliate INA, Other Affiliate Liberty Mutual, Other Affiliate The Home Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Century Indemnity Company, Other Affiliate Boston Old Colony Insurance Company, Other Affiliate American Home Assurance Company, Other Affiliate Northbrook Excess and Surplus Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Underwriters at Lloyds of London and London Market Companies, Other Affiliate The Employer's Reinsurance Corporation of Kansas City, Kansas, Other Affiliate Midland Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Motor Vehicle Casualty Insurance, Other Affiliate Mission Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Dairyland Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Centaur Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Integrity Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Globe Indemnity, Other Affiliate New England Reinsurance Corporation, Other Affiliate Continential, Other Affiliate The North River Insurance Company, Other Affiliate AIU Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Employers Insurance of Wausau for CRANE CO. (individually and successor-in-interest to COCHRANE CORPORATION,. (Davis, Geoffrey) (Filed on 7/13/2018)
July 13, 2018 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/27/2018. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2018)
July 12, 2018 Filing 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/4/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/11/2018 10:00 AM. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2018)
July 12, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Edward Soskin (Soskin, Peter) (Filed on 7/12/2018)
July 12, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL; Demand for Jury Trial from Alameda County Superior Court. Their case number is RG-18-905040, (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0971-12508364). Filed by CRANE CO. (individually and successor-in-interest to COCHRANE CORPORATION). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBIT 1 - 2A, #2 Exhibit EXHIBIT 2B - EXHIBIT 3A, #3 Exhibit EXHIBIT 3B - EXHIBIT 3D, #4 Exhibit EXHIBIT 3E - EXHIBIT 3G, #5 Exhibit EXHIBIT 3H, #6 Exhibit EXHIBIT 3I - EXHIBIT 3L, #7 Exhibit EXHIBIT 3M - EXHIBIT 3N, #8 Exhibit EXHIBIT 3O - EXHIBIT 3Q, #9 Exhibit EXHIBIT 3R - EXHIBIT 3T, #10 Exhibit EXHIBIT 3U - EXHIBIT 4C, #11 Exhibit EXHIBIT 4D - EXHIBIT 4F, #12 Exhibit EXHIBIT 4G - EXHIBIT 4O, #13 Exhibit EXHIBIT 4P - EXHIBIT 4W, #14 Exhibit EXHIBIT 4X - EXHIBIT 5, #15 Civil Cover Sheet)(Davis, Geoffrey) (Filed on 7/12/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Farris et al v. 3M Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO INDUSTRIES, INC. (sued individually and as successor-in-interest to DELAVAL TURBINE, INC.)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BORGWARNER MORSE TEC LLC individually and as successor-in-interest, parent, alter ego and equitable trustee of BORG-WARNER CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VIGOR INDUSTRIAL LLC (individually and as successor-in-interest to TODD SHIPYARD CORPORATION)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATION;
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICOH USA, INC. (individually and as successor-in-interest to SAVIN CORPORATION and as general manager of RICOH COMPANY, LTD.)
Represented By: Mary Katherine Back
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied Packing and Supply, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Charles T. Sheldon
Represented By: Emily Elizabeth Anselmo
Represented By: Katherine Paige Gardiner
Represented By: Derek S. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Velan Valve Corp.
Represented By: G. Kenneth Robertson
Represented By: Lisa Lurline Oberg
Represented By: Samuel David Jubelirer
Represented By: Arlene Carol-Mendoza Barton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PNEUMO ABEX, L.L.C (individually and as successor-in-interest to PNEUMO ABEX CORPORATION AND ABEX CORPORATION)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrier Corporation
Represented By: James P. Cunningham
Represented By: Ronald Q Tran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PARKER-HANNIFIN CORPORATION (individually and as successor-in-interest toSACOMA-SIERRA INC.)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLEAVER-BROOKS, INC. (individually and as successor-in-interest to DAVIS ENGINEERING COMPANY formerly known as AQUA-CHEM, INC. doing business as CLEAVER-BROOKS DIVISION)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION (individually and as successor-in-interest to BUFFALO PUMPS, INC.)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., (f/k/a ALLIED SIGNAL, INC., as successor-in-interest to the BENDIX CORPORATION)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HENNESSY INDUSTRIES, INC. (individually and as successor-in-interest to AMMCO TOOLS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOSHIBA CORPORATION (served through its General Manager TOSHIBA AMERICA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maremont Corporation
Represented By: Arpi Galfayan
Represented By: Thomas Alan Steig
Represented By: Jeremy David Milbrodt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLA-VAL CO.
Represented By: Charles H. Kanter
Represented By: John Russell Lister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICOH COMPANY, LTD. (individually and as successor-in-interest to SAVIN CORPORATION and served through its General Manager RICOH USA, INC.)
Represented By: Mary Katherine Back
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Copes-Vulcan Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOSHIBA AMERICA, INC. (individually and as General Manager of TOSHIBA CORPORATION)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M COMPANYf/k/a MINNESOTA MINING & MANUFACTURING COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KYOCERA INTERNATIONAL, INC. (individually and as successor-in-interest to MITA INDUSTRIAL COMPANY, LTD. and as general manager of KYOCERA CORPORATION)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KYOCERA CORPORATION (individually and as successor-in-interest to MITA INDUSTRIAL COMPANY, LTD. and served through its General Manager KYOCERA INTERNATIONAL, INC.)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRANE CO. (individually and successor-in-interest to COCHRANE CORPORATION,
Represented By: Geoffrey M Davis
Represented By: Peter Edward Soskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS CORPORATION (f/k/a VIACOM, INC. as successor-by-merger to CBS CORPORATION f/k/a WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICOH USA, Inc. (erroneously sued and served as "RICOH USA, INC. (individually and as successor-in-interest to SAVIN CORPORATION and as general manager of RICOH COMPANY, LTD.)")
Represented By: Mary Katherine Back
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation
Represented By: James G Scadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company
Represented By: Stephanie G Peatman
Represented By: Mordecai D. Boone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICOH COMPANY, LTD. (erroneously sued and served as "RICOH COMPANY LTD. (individually and as successor-in-interest to SAVIN CORPORATION and served through its General Manager, RICOH USA, INC.)&qu
Represented By: Mary Katherine Back
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BorgWarner Mose TEC LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parker-Hannifin Corporation
Represented By: Christopher Sean Patterson
Represented By: Robert Kum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Olga Guadalupe Pena
Represented By: Frederick W. Gatt
Represented By: Bobbie Rae Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied Packing & Supply, Inc.
Represented By: Theodore Thomas Cordery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Represented By: Peter Edward Soskin
Represented By: Geoffrey M Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ricoh Company, Ltd.
Represented By: Mary Katherine Back
Represented By: Tina Broccardo Van Dam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba America, Inc.
Represented By: Robert G. Engel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Copes-Vulcan, Inc.
Represented By: Nicole Elisabet Gage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba America Business Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Lisa Silva Passalacqua
Represented By: Robert G. Engel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International, Inc.
Represented By: Glen Elliot Turner
Represented By: Kirsten McNelly Bibbes
Represented By: David Raymond Ongaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleaver-Brooks, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Livingston Sharp
Represented By: Jennifer M McCormick
Represented By: Gary David Sharp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hennessy Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Xiao Jing Diego Wu Min
Represented By: Jacqueline Kirk Dubois
Represented By: Casey Carlton Shaw
Represented By: Ian Garth Williamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vigor Industrial LLC
Represented By: Demian David Steele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Borgwarner Morse Tec LLC
Represented By: Michael Eric Sandgren
Represented By: Kyle J. Clawson
Represented By: Samuel David Jubelirer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyocera Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fraser's Boiler Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O'Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation
Represented By: Charles S. Park
Represented By: Edward R. Hugo
Represented By: G. Kenneth Robertson,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ricoh USA, Inc.
Represented By: Mary Katherine Back
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps, LLC
Represented By: James P. Cunningham
Represented By: Ronald Q Tran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyocera International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: Kevin Douglas Jamison
Represented By: Justin Finnell Cronin
Represented By: Erin Nicole Empting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pneumo Abex, L.L.C.
Represented By: John R. Brydon
Represented By: Paul M. Bessette
Represented By: Edward P Tugade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSK Auto, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleaver-Brooks, Inc. individually and as successor-in-interest to Davis Engineering Company, formerly-known as Aqua-Chem, Inc., doing business as Cleaver-Brooks Division
Represented By: Andrew Livingston Sharp
Represented By: Jennifer M McCormick
Represented By: Gary David Sharp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied Signal, Inc.
Represented By: Glen Elliot Turner
Represented By: Kirsten McNelly Bibbes
Represented By: David Raymond Ongaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viacom, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin Douglas Jamison
Represented By: Justin Finnell Cronin
Represented By: Erin Nicole Empting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minnesota Mining & Manufacturing Company
Represented By: Stephanie G Peatman
Represented By: Mordecai D. Boone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MELVA FARRIS
Represented By: Trey Jones
Represented By: Lee William Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GARY FARRIS
Represented By: Trey Jones
Represented By: Lee William Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?