Johnson v. Byer Properties, L.P. et al

Plaintiff: Scott Johnson
Defendant: Joel E. Quinones, Byer Properties, L.P. and Cecilia R. Quinones
Case Number: 4:2018cv04240
Filed: July 16, 2018
Court: California Northern District Court
0 Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
1 Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: American with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 7, 2018 13 Certificate of Interested Entities by Byer Properties, L.P., Cecilia R. Quinones, Joel E. Quinones (Vaughan, Cris) (Filed on 9/7/2018)
September 7, 2018 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Byer Properties, L.P., Cecilia R. Quinones, Joel E. Quinones. (Vaughan, Cris) (Filed on 9/7/2018) Modified on 9/10/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
August 23, 2018 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scott Johnson. Joel E. Quinones served on 8/23/2018, answer due 9/13/2018. (Carson, Chris) (Filed on 8/23/2018)
August 20, 2018 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scott Johnson. Cecilia R. Quinones served on 8/18/2018, answer due 9/10/2018. , SUMMONS Returned Executed in a Social Security Case by Scott Johnson. Cecilia R. Quinones served on 8/18/2018, answer due 9/10/2018. (Carson, Chris) (Filed on 8/20/2018)
July 20, 2018 Case REASSIGNED to Judge Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins no longer assigned to case. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2018)
July 20, 2018 9 This case will be randomly reassigned to a District Judge outside the San Jose Division pursuant to the Caseload Rebalancing Pilot Program approved by the Court effective March 1, 2018. For information, visit our web page at #http://cand.uscourts.gov/news/225. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2018)
July 19, 2018 8 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2018)
July 18, 2018 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Scott Johnson.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Carson, Chris) (Filed on 7/18/2018)
July 16, 2018 6 Summons Issued as to Byer Properties, L.P., Cecilia R. Quinones, Joel E. Quinones. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2018)
July 16, 2018 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order for Cases Asserting Denial of Right of Access under Americans with Disabilities Act. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2018)
July 16, 2018 4 Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/30/2018. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2018)
July 16, 2018 3 Proposed Summons. (Carson, Chris) (Filed on 7/16/2018)
July 16, 2018 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Scott Johnson re #1 Complaint, (Carson, Chris) (Filed on 7/16/2018)
July 16, 2018 1 COMPLAINT For Damages And Injunctive Relief For Violations Of: Americans With Disabilities Act; Unruh Civil Rights Act against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12513682.). Filed byScott Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Carson, Chris) (Filed on 7/16/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Byer Properties, L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joel E. Quinones
Represented By: Cris Campbell Vaughan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Byer Properties, L.P.
Represented By: Cris Campbell Vaughan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cecilia R. Quinones
Represented By: Cris Campbell Vaughan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Johnson
Represented By: Khushpreet R. Mehton
Represented By: Phyl Grace
Represented By: Chris Carson
Represented By: Dennis Jay Price, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?