AU Optronics Corporation America v. Vista Peak Ventures, LLC
Plaintiff: AU Optronics Corporation America
Defendant: Vista Peak Ventures, LLC
Case Number: 4:2018cv04638
Filed: August 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Referring Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2018 Filing 27 REPLY (re #17 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Transfer or Stay, Counts One through Three of Plaintiff's Complaint ) filed byVista Peak Ventures, LLC. (Belloli, Marc) (Filed on 9/13/2018)
September 6, 2018 Filing 26 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #17 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Transfer or Stay, Counts One through Three of Plaintiff's Complaint ) filed byAU Optronics Corporation America. (Harrison, Bryan) (Filed on 9/6/2018)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #24 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Bryan G. Harrison.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2018)
August 29, 2018 Filing 24 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Bryan G. Harrison ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12637648.) filed by AU Optronics Corporation America. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing)(Harrison, Bryan) (Filed on 8/29/2018)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #18 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Daniel F. Olejko. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2018)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #20 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for T. William Kennedy.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2018)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #19 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Patrick J. Conroy. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2018)
August 28, 2018 Filing 20 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for T. William Kennedy ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12633646.) filed by Vista Peak Ventures, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Kennedy, Thomas) (Filed on 8/28/2018)
August 28, 2018 Filing 19 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Patrick J. Conroy ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12633623.) filed by Vista Peak Ventures, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Conroy, Patrick) (Filed on 8/28/2018)
August 28, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Daniel F. Olejko ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12633414.) filed by Vista Peak Ventures, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Olejko, Daniel) (Filed on 8/28/2018)
August 23, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Transfer or Stay, Counts One through Three of #1 Complaint filed by Vista Peak Ventures, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 11/29/2018 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Responses due by 9/6/2018. Replies due by 9/13/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Daniel F. Olejko, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Proposed Order)(Belloli, Marc) (Filed on 8/23/2018) Modified on 8/24/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
August 9, 2018 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by AU Optronics Corporation America re #13 Summons Returned Executed, #14 Order, Case Assigned/Reassigned, #11 Order Reassigning Case,,,,, Case Assigned/Reassigned,,,, 10 Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only,, 15 Clerk's Notice,, #12 Notice of Appearance (Tom, Meagan) (Filed on 8/9/2018)
August 7, 2018 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE. Notice is hereby given that a Case Management Conference has been set for November 6, 2018, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA. Case Management Statement due by October 30, 2018. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:18-cv-04638-HSG. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2018)
August 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER, Case reassigned to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 8/6/18. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2018)
August 2, 2018 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by AU Optronics Corporation America. Vista Peak Ventures, LLC served on 8/2/2018, answer due 8/23/2018. (McClendon, Regina) (Filed on 8/2/2018)
August 2, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Meagan S. Tom (Tom, Meagan) (Filed on 8/2/2018)
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim for all further proceedings pursuant to Notice of Pendency of other Action Involving Same Patent U.S. Patent No. (5,929,947 (the 947 patent), U.S. Patent No. 6,579,749 the 749 patent), U.S. Patent No. 6,674,093 (the093 patent), U.S. Patent No. 6,800,872 (the 872 patent), U.S. Patent No. 6,891,196 (the 196 patent), U.S. Patent No. 7,088,401 (the 401 patent), U.S. Patent No. 6,404,474 (the 474 patent), U.S. Patent No. 6,657,699 (the 699 patent), U.S. Patent No. 7,009,673 (the 673 patent), U.S. Patent No. 7,499,119 (the 119 patent), U.S. Patent No. 6,781,643 (the 643 patent), U.S. Patent No. 7,046,327 (the 327 patent), and U.S. Patent No. 6,730,970 (the 970 patent), collectively, the Asserted Patents. See Vista Peak Ventures, LLC v. AU Optronics Corp., Case Nos. 2:18-cv-00276-JRG, 10, 22, 34, 46, 57, 68, 80; 2:18-cv-00278-JRG, 10, 33, 44, 45, 56; and 2:18-cv-00279-JRG, 10, 34, 45.) and Order of Reassignment. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins no longer assigned to the case. Reassignment Order signed by Executive Committee Executive Committee on 8/2/2018. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2018)
August 1, 2018 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2018)
August 1, 2018 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by AU Optronics Corporation America.. (McClendon, Regina) (Filed on 8/1/2018)
August 1, 2018 Filing 8 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Patent Infringement (cc: form mailed to register). (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2018)
August 1, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Vista Peak Ventures, LLC. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2018)
August 1, 2018 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/24/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/31/2018 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2018)
August 1, 2018 Filing 5 Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/15/2018. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2018)
August 1, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action Involving Same Patent by AU Optronics Corporation America (McClendon, Regina) (Filed on 8/1/2018)
August 1, 2018 Filing 3 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons filed by AU Optronics Corporation America identifying Corporate Parent AU Optronics Corp. for AU Optronics Corporation America. (McClendon, Regina) (Filed on 8/1/2018)
August 1, 2018 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (McClendon, Regina) (Filed on 8/1/2018)
August 1, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment and Equitable Relief; Demand for Jury Trial against Vista Peak Ventures, LLC, (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0971-12559175). Filed by AU Optronics Corporation America. (Attachments: #(1) Civil Cover Sheet)(McClendon, Regina) (Filed on 8/1/2018) Modified on 8/2/2018 (tnS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AU Optronics Corporation America v. Vista Peak Ventures, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vista Peak Ventures, LLC
Represented By: Daniel Fletcher Olejko
Represented By: Marc Christopher Belloli
Represented By: Thomas William Kennedy, Jr.
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Conroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AU Optronics Corporation America
Represented By: Regina Jill McClendon
Represented By: Meagan S. Tom
Represented By: Bryan G Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?