Torres v. Biter

Petitioner: Ruben Torres
Respondent: Michael Biter
Case Number: 4:2018cv04723
Filed: August 6, 2018
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Kings
0 Judge: PSLC GRC
1 Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 5, 2018 4 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ruben Torres. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2018)
August 10, 2018 3 Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2018)
August 6, 2018 2 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 9/13/2018. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2018)
August 6, 2018 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Filed byRuben Torres. (Attachments: #1 Pt. 2, #2 Envelope)(jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Torres v. Biter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ruben Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Michael Biter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?