Crisp et al v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al
Plaintiff: Idalia Duenes, Laurie Arreloa, Shawn Butkus, Jesse Gonzales, Marie Alonso, Tremayne Chapman, Ralph Knuth, Jennifer Porter, Janet Lynn Dockery, Don Steven Dalton, Craig Buck, Candee Fast, Jamie Blake, Jessica Esquer, Tariq Ahmad, Michelle Souza, Nakiia Delores Roberts, Raymond Mitchell, Maria Cano, Angela Marie Payne, Ricky Campbell, Nicolas Rado, Laura Nichols, Alex Diakogiannis, Willie Lee Jr., Lynn Wesley, Tariq Fattaah, Charrae Smith, Virginia Vanwinkle, Denisa Mitchell, Jacqueline Hicks, Kisha Crisp, Mary Newsom, Tabitha Redenbaugh, Misty Miley, Nina Ueda, Ladonna Binkerd, Doretha Braggs, Mario Trevino, Brenton Hale, Debra Stolte, Margo Firestone, Tabitha Mujihad, Valerie Miller, Amanda Collins, James Morris, Steven Fortner and Mary Newson
Defendant: McKesson Corporation, Otsuka America Pharmaceutical, Inc., Bristol-Myers Squibb Company and Otsuka Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd.
Case Number: 4:2018cv04806
Filed: August 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2018 Case has been successfully transferred to the Northern District of Florida. Their case number is 3:18-cv-2036. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2018)
August 21, 2018 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re #1 Notice of Removal, by Sharon D. Mayo on behalf of Bristol-Myers Squibb Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 8/21/2018)
August 20, 2018 Filing 12 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER. This action is transferred to the Northern District of Florida. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2018)
August 16, 2018 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE. Notice is hereby given that a Case Management Conference has been set for November 13, 2018, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA. Case Management Statement due by November 6, 2018. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:18-cv-04806-HSG. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2018)
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER, Case reassigned to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr. Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 8/16/18. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2018)
August 15, 2018 Filing 8 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Stay Proceedings Pending Transfer To The Abilify MDL filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Otsuka American Pharmaceutical, Inc., Otsuka Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd, and all Plaintiffs. (Gramacy, Ryan) (Filed on 8/15/2018) Modified on 8/16/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
August 15, 2018 Filing 7 Certificate of Interested Entities by Otsuka America Pharmaceutical, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Otsuka America, Inc. for Otsuka America Pharmaceutical, Inc.. (Enns, Krista) (Filed on 8/15/2018)
August 15, 2018 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2018)
August 15, 2018 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company.. (Gramacy, Ryan) (Filed on 8/15/2018)
August 9, 2018 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/1/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/8/2018 10:00 AM. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2018)
August 9, 2018 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/23/2018. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2018)
August 8, 2018 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company (Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 8/8/2018)
August 8, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Francisco Superior Court. Their case number is CGC-18-568685. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-12579611). Filed byBristol-Myers Squibb Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 8/8/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crisp et al v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Idalia Duenes
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laurie Arreloa
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn Butkus
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse Gonzales
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie Alonso
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tremayne Chapman
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph Knuth
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Porter
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Lynn Dockery
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Don Steven Dalton
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Buck
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Candee Fast
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Blake
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Esquer
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tariq Ahmad
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Souza
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nakiia Delores Roberts
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Mitchell
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Cano
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Marie Payne
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricky Campbell
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicolas Rado
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Nichols
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alex Diakogiannis
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Lee Jr.
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynn Wesley
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tariq Fattaah
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charrae Smith
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virginia Vanwinkle
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denisa Mitchell
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Hicks
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kisha Crisp
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Newsom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tabitha Redenbaugh
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Misty Miley
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nina Ueda
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ladonna Binkerd
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doretha Braggs
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mario Trevino
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenton Hale
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Stolte
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margo Firestone
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tabitha Mujihad
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie Miller
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Collins
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Morris
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Fortner
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Newson
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Otsuka America Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Represented By: Krista M. Enns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bristol-Myers Squibb Company
Represented By: Sharon D. Mayo
Represented By: Ryan Scott Gramacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Otsuka Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?