Bruce v. Azar et al
Plaintiff: Steven Bruce
Defendant: Blue Shield of California, Alex Azar, II, Envision Insurance Company and Alex M. Azar, II
Case Number: 4:2018cv05022
Filed: August 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Referring Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2020 Filing 117 Transcript of Proceedings held on December 5, 2019, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam. Court Reporter Diane E. Skillman, telephone number 925-899-2812, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #107 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/13/2020. (Related documents(s) #107 ) (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 1/13/2020)
January 6, 2020 Filing 116 Transcript of Proceedings held on 02/28/19, before Judge Gilliam. Court Reporter Pamela Batalo Hebel, telephone number 626-688-7509; pamela_batalo-hebel@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #115 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 1/27/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/6/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/6/2020. (Related documents(s) #115 ) (Batalo, Pam) (Filed on 1/6/2020)
January 2, 2020 Filing 115 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 2/28/19 before Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr by Steven Bruce, for Court Reporter Pam Batalo. (Bruce, Steven) (Filed on 1/2/2020)
December 26, 2019 Filing 113 AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL by Steven Bruce . Appeal Record due by 1/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Representation Statement)(Bruce, Steven) (Filed on 12/26/2019)
December 24, 2019 Filing 114 USCA Case Number 19-17565 Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals for #113 Amended Notice of Appeal filed by Steven Bruce. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/24/2019)
December 23, 2019 Filing 112 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Steven Bruce. (Appeal fee of $505 receipt number 0971-14009022 paid.) (Attachments: #1 Representation Statement)(Bruce, Steven) (Filed on 12/23/2019)
December 16, 2019 Filing 111 CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Alex M. Azar, II against Steven Bruce. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2019)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. ON CROSS( #90 , #94 ) MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT.(This orders denies docket nos. #90 , #100 and #102 and grants docket no. #94 ). (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2019)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER by Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING #108 Plaintiff's Administrative Motion. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hsglc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2019)
December 16, 2019 ELECTRONIC FILING ERROR. In the future, please include a proposed order with your motion in compliance with the Local Rules. re #108 Administrative Motion. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2019)
December 15, 2019 Filing 108 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Deem Second Amended Complaint Amended Consistent with Evidence at Oral Argument on December 5, 2019 filed by Steven Bruce. Responses due by 12/18/2019. (Bruce, Steven) (Filed on 12/15/2019) Modified on 12/16/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
December 9, 2019 Filing 107 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 12/05/2019 before Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr by Steven Bruce, for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (Bruce, Steven) (Filed on 12/9/2019)
December 9, 2019 Electronic Filing Error. Incorrect Event Used. Correct event is "Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11." Event can be found under Civil Events > Motions and Related Filings > Motions-General > Administrative Motion. Also, In the future, please attach a proposed order in compliance with the Local Rules. No further action necessary re #104 Admin Motion for Interlocutory Appeal After Oral Argument (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2019) Modified on 12/9/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 12/10/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 105 Order denying #104 Plaintiff's Admin Motion for Interlocutory Appeal After Oral Argument entered by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Modified on 12/9/2019 to reflect corrected title of the motion) (hsglc2S, COURT STAFF).
December 8, 2019 Filing 104 Administrative Motion for Interlocatory Appeal After Oral Argument on December 5, 2019 [Rule 7-11] filed by Steven Bruce. Responses due by 12/10/2019. (Bruce, Steven) (Filed on 12/8/2019) Modified on 12/9/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
December 5, 2019 Filing 106 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr.: Motion Hearing held on 12/5/2019. Total Time in Court: 18 Minutes. Court Reporter: Diane Skillman. Plaintiff Attorney: Steven BruceDefendant Attorney: Kim Robinson. Cross-motions for summary judgment (docket nos. #90 and #94 ) are argued and submitted by the parties and taken under submission by the Court. Written order to issue. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/5/2019)
November 29, 2019 Filing 103 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #102 Second ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION file additional documents re #99 Reply to Opposition/Response, #100 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION re Additional Filing of One Defendant's Documents in Resolution of a Disputed Material Fact, #94 Cross MOTION for Summa ) filed byAlex M. Azar, II. (Robinson, Kimberly) (Filed on 11/29/2019)
November 27, 2019 Filing 102 Second ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION re: Additional Filing of Four of Defendant's Documents in Resolution of a Disputed Material Fact in Both Parties' Motions for Summary Judgment filed by Steven Bruce. Responses due by 12/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Study from NIH website, #2 Supplement Study from NIH website, #3 Supplement Study from NIH website, #4 Supplement Study from NIH website, #5 Proposed Order)(Bruce, Steven) (Filed on 11/27/2019) Modified on 12/2/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
November 19, 2019 Filing 101 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #100 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION re Additional Filing of One Defendant's Documents in Resolution of a Disputed Material Fact ) filed byAlex M. Azar, II. (Robinson, Kimberly) (Filed on 11/19/2019)
November 18, 2019 Filing 100 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION re Additional Filing of One Defendant's Documents in Resolution of a Disputed Material Fact #99 Reply to Opposition/Response, #90 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #94 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment - CORRECTION OF DOCKET #92 , #98 Reply to Opposition/Response, #96 Reply to Opposition/Response, filed by Steven Bruce. Responses due by 11/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supplement HHS post)(Bruce, Steven) (Filed on 11/18/2019) Modified on 11/19/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 11/19/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
October 28, 2019 Filing 99 REPLY (re #94 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment - CORRECTION OF DOCKET #92 ) filed byAlex M. Azar, II. (Robinson, Kimberly) (Filed on 10/28/2019)
October 21, 2019 Filing 98 REPLY (re #90 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #94 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment - CORRECTION OF DOCKET #92 ) CORRECTED [pg 4:4-5] filed bySteven Bruce. (Attachments: #1 Declaration A1 Robinson, #2 Declaration A2 Chandler)(Bruce, Steven) (Filed on 10/21/2019)
October 17, 2019 Filing 97 CLERK'S NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that the hearings on the ( #90 , #94 ) cross-motions for summary judgment, previously set for February 20, 2020 are advanced to December 5, 2019 before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2019)
October 14, 2019 Filing 96 **RE-FILED AT DOCKET NO. #98 ** REPLY (re #90 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #94 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment - CORRECTION OF DOCKET #92 ) filed bySteven Bruce. (Attachments: #1 Declaration A1 Robinson, #2 Declaration A2 Chandler)(Bruce, Steven) (Filed on 10/14/2019) Modified on 10/22/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
October 2, 2019 Reset Hearing as to #90 MOTION for Summary Judgment , See Docket No. 95 : Motion Hearing set for 2/20/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2019)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER by Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING #93 the stipulation to change date and time of the hearing. The Court RESETS the November 14, 2019 hearing on #90 Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment to February 20, 2020 at 2:00 p.m., to be heard with the hearing on #94 Defendant's cross motion for summary judgment. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hsglc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2019)
October 2, 2019 Filing 94 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment - CORRECTION OF DOCKET #92 filed by Alex M. Azar, II. Motion Hearing set for 2/20/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Responses due by 10/15/2019. Replies due by 10/29/2019. (Robinson, Kimberly) (Filed on 10/2/2019)
October 1, 2019 Filing 93 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #88 Order filed by Alex M. Azar, II. and Steven Bruce (Robinson, Kimberly) (Filed on 10/1/2019) Modified on 10/2/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
October 1, 2019 Filing 92 **RE-FILED AT DOCKET NO. #94 ** Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiff's #90 Summary Judgment Motion filed by Alex M. Azar, II. Motion Hearing set for 2/20/2020 02:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Responses due by 10/15/2019. Replies due by 10/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Robinson, Kimberly) (Filed on 10/1/2019) Modified on 10/2/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 10/2/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 10/2/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
August 15, 2019 Filing 91 Notice of Withdrawal of Individual Counsel Christopher A. Rheinheimer by Amy B. Briggs (Briggs, Amy) (Filed on 8/15/2019) Modified on 8/16/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
August 6, 2019 Filing 90 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Steven Bruce. Motion Hearing set for 11/14/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Responses due by 10/1/2019. Replies due by 10/15/2019. (Bruce, Steven) (Filed on 8/6/2019)
July 25, 2019 Filing 89 Defendant's ANSWER to Amended Complaint byAlex M. Azar, II. (Robinson, Kimberly) (Filed on 7/25/2019)
July 22, 2019 Set Deadlines, See Docket No. #88 : Motions due by 9/3/2019; Cross Motions / Responses due by 10/1/2019; Replies/Opposition due by 10/15/2019 and Reply due by 10/29/2019. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2019)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 88 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 7/22/2019. (hsglc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2019)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #86 Proposed Consent Order Granting Motion to Substitution of Attorney. Attorney Zoya Yarnykh terminated. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2019) Modified on 7/22/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
July 18, 2019 Filing 86 Consent Order Granting Substitution of Attorney filed by Steven Bruce. (Bruce, Steven) (Filed on 7/18/2019) Modified on 7/19/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
July 8, 2019 Filing 85 UPDATED JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Alex M. Azar, II and Steven Bruce. (Robinson, Kimberly) (Filed on 7/8/2019) Modified on 7/9/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
June 19, 2019 Filing 84 OBJECTIONS to Order Granting Alex Azar's Motion to Dismiss by Steven Bruce. (Yarnykh, Zoya) (Filed on 6/19/2019)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING ( #36 , #39 , #40 ) MOTIONS TO DISMISS AND ADMINISTRATIVE #64 MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL, AND DENYING ( #24 , #70 ) MOTIONS TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD. Case Management Statement due by 7/16/2019 and Further Case Management Conference set for 7/23/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2019) Modified on 6/18/2019 to correct typo (ndrS, COURT STAFF).
May 8, 2019 Filing 82 CLERK'S NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that the Court takes the pending second #70 motion to supplement the administrative record re docket no. #69 filings under submission. The hearing previously scheduled for May 22, 2019 at 2:00 p.m. is vacated. The Court will issue a written order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2019)
April 10, 2019 Filing 81 CLERK'S NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that the hearing on the #70 second motion to supplement the administrative record, previously set for May 16, 2019, is continued to May 22, 2019 before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:30 p.m., in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2019)
March 18, 2019 Filing 80 NOTICE by Steven Bruce of Unavailability of Counsel (Yarnykh, Zoya) (Filed on 3/18/2019)
March 12, 2019 Filing 79 REPLY (re #70 Second MOTION to Supplement the Administrative Record re #69 Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11 ) filed bySteven Bruce. (Yarnykh, Zoya) (Filed on 3/12/2019)
March 7, 2019 #Electronic filing error. REMINDER TO COUNSEL: In the future, please attach all supporting documents to the initiating document. Re: #78 Declaration in Support filed by Ale x M. Azar, II, #77 Opposition/Response to Motion filed by Alex M. Azar, II (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2019)
March 6, 2019 Filing 78 Declaration of Kimberly A. Robinson in Support of #77 Opposition/Response to Motion filed byAlex M. Azar, II. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #77 ) (Robinson, Kimberly) (Filed on 3/6/2019)
March 6, 2019 Filing 77 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #70 Second MOTION to Supplement the Administrative Record re #69 Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11 ) filed byAlex M. Azar, II. (Robinson, Kimberly) (Filed on 3/6/2019)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Denying #74 Administrative Motion for Additional Briefing. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2019)
March 5, 2019 Filing 75 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #74 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Additional Briefing Re: DHHS's Motion to Dismiss re #39 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ) filed byAlex M. Azar, II. (Robinson, Kimberly) (Filed on 3/5/2019)
March 5, 2019 Filing 74 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Additional Briefing Re: DHHS's Motion to Dismiss re #39 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Steven Bruce. Responses due by 3/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Yarnykh, Zoya) (Filed on 3/5/2019)
February 28, 2019 Filing 73 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr.: Motion Hearing held on 2/28/2019. Total Time in Court: 16 Minutes. Court Reporter: Pamela Batalo-Hebel. Plaintiff Attorney: Zoya Yarnykh. Defendant Attorney: Kim Robinson, Elizabeth Treckler and Christopher Rheinheimer. Defendants motions to dismiss (docket nos. #36 , #39 , #40 ) are argued and submitted by the parties, and taken under submission by the Court. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/28/2019)
February 22, 2019 Reset Hearing as to #70 Second MOTION to Supplement the Administrative Record, See Docket No. #72 :Motion Hearing set for 5/16/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2019)
February 21, 2019 Filing 72 Renotice motion hearing re #70 Second MOTION to Supplement the Administrative Record re #69 Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11 filed bySteven Bruce. (Related document(s) #70 ) (Yarnykh, Zoya) (Filed on 2/21/2019)
February 21, 2019 Filing 71 CLERK'S NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that counsel must re-notice not re- file the Second #70 Motion to Supplement the Administrative Record. Hearing date of May 9th, is vacated. The briefing schedule remains in effect. Counsel is directed to check the Court's scheduling notes before re-noticing the motion for a new hearing date. May 9th was not the Court's next available hearing date when this motion was e-filed. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2019)
February 20, 2019 Filing 70 Second MOTION to Supplement the Administrative Record re #69 Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11 filed by Steven Bruce. Motion Hearing set for 5/9/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Responses due by 3/6/2019. Replies due by 3/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Zoya Yarnykh, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Proposed Order)(Yarnykh, Zoya) (Filed on 2/20/2019) Modified on 2/21/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DIRECTING ADDITIONAL BRIEFING AND DENYING #67 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A REPLY. Motions due by 2/22/2019. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2019)
February 7, 2019 Filing 68 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #67 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to File Reply re 63 Clerk's Notice, 62 Order, #66 Statement ) filed byAlex M. Azar, II. (Robinson, Kimberly) (Filed on 2/7/2019) Modified on 2/8/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
February 7, 2019 Filing 67 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to File Reply re 63 Clerk's Notice, 62 Order, #66 Statement filed by Steven Bruce. Responses due by 2/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A to Yarnykh Decl., #3 Proposed Order)(Yarnykh, Zoya) (Filed on 2/7/2019) Modified on 2/8/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 2/8/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
February 7, 2019 Filing 66 Statement re 62 Order, #65 Statement by Alex M. Azar, II. (Robinson, Kimberly) (Filed on 2/7/2019) Modified on 2/8/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
February 6, 2019 Filing 65 Statement re the Administrative Record 62 Order by Steven Bruce. (Yarnykh, Zoya) (Filed on 2/6/2019) Modified on 2/7/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
February 5, 2019 Filing 64 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Alex M. Azar, II. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Supplement, #4 Supplement, #5 Declaration, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit)(Robinson, Kimberly) (Filed on 2/5/2019)
February 4, 2019 Set Deadline, See Docket No. 62 : Joint Statement due by 2/7/2019. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2019)
February 4, 2019 Filing 63 CLERK'S NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that the ( #36 , #39 , #40 ) motions to dismiss, previously set for March 7, 2019, are advanced to February 28, 2019, at 2:00 p.m., before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2019)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER by Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. VACATING the February 7, 2019 hearing on the Motion to Supplement the Administrative Record, Dkt. No. 24, in light of the parties' joint statement, Dkt. No. 61. The Court DIRECTS Plaintiff to file a statement on or before February 7, 2019 either: (1) withdrawing the motion, or (2) indicating that the matter has not yet been resolved. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hsglc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2019)
January 30, 2019 Filing 61 Joint Statement re 50 Case Management Conference - Initial,,, Set Deadlines,, by Alex M. Azar, II. and Steven Bruce (Robinson, Kimberly) (Filed on 1/30/2019) Modified on 1/31/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #59 Administrative Motion to Lift Stay.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2019)
January 29, 2019 Filing 59 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Lift Stay re #57 Order on Motion to Stay filed by Alex M. Azar, II. Responses due by 2/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Robinson, Kimberly) (Filed on 1/29/2019)
January 2, 2019 Filing 58 Opposition re #57 Order on Motion to Stay filed by Steven Bruce. (Related document(s) #57 ) (Yarnykh, Zoya) (Filed on 1/2/2019) Modified on 1/3/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING DEFENDANTS ADMINISTRATIVE #56 MOTION TO STAY THE CASE PENDING RESTORATION OF FUNDING.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2019)
December 31, 2018 Filing 56 MOTION to Stay filed by Alex M. Azar, II. Motion Hearing set for 3/28/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Responses due by 1/14/2019. Replies due by 1/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Robinson, Kimberly) (Filed on 12/31/2018)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #54 Stipulation to extend time to lodge certified record. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2018)
December 19, 2018 Filing 54 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER re #20 Stipulation to extend time to lodge certified record filed by Alex M. Azar, II, Steven Bruce. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Robinson, Kimberly) (Filed on 12/19/2018) Modified on 12/19/2018 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
December 4, 2018 Filing 53 REPLY in Support of ( #40 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint ) filed by Envision Insurance Company. (Treckler, Elizabeth) (Filed on 12/4/2018) Modified on 12/5/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
December 4, 2018 Filing 52 REPLY in Support of (re #36 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint ) filed by Blue Shield of California. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Objection to Plaintiff's Evidence)(Briggs, Amy) (Filed on 12/4/2018) Modified on 12/5/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
December 4, 2018 Filing 51 REPLY (re #39 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ) filed byAlex M. Azar, II. (Robinson, Kimberly) (Filed on 12/4/2018)
November 27, 2018 Filing 50 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr:. Initial Case Management Conference held on 11/27/2018. FTR Time: 2:12-2:22. Plaintiff Attorney: Zoya Yarnykh. Defendant Attorney: Kimberly Robinson, Christopher Rheinheimer and Elizabeth Treckler appearing via courtcall. Parties are directed to meet and confer regarding the pending motion to supplement to the administrative record (docket no. #24 ) and e-file by January 4, 2019 a joint statement advising the Court whether the motion is moot, the scope of the motion has narrowed, or nothing has changed. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/27/2018)
November 27, 2018 Filing 49 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #40 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint ) filed bySteven Bruce. (Yarnykh, Zoya) (Filed on 11/27/2018)
November 27, 2018 Filing 48 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #36 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint ) filed bySteven Bruce. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Steven Bruce)(Yarnykh, Zoya) (Filed on 11/27/2018)
November 27, 2018 Filing 47 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #39 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ) filed bySteven Bruce. (Yarnykh, Zoya) (Filed on 11/27/2018)
November 26, 2018 Filing 46 CLERK'S NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that the hearings on the ( #36 , #39 and #40 ) motions to dismiss, previously set for February 28, 2019, are continued to March 7, 2019, at 2:00 p.m., before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2018)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #44 Motion to Appear by Telephone. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582-6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2018)
November 19, 2018 Filing 44 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Envision Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Treckler, Elizabeth) (Filed on 11/19/2018)
November 16, 2018 Filing 43 Certificate of Interested Entities by Envision Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Rite Aid Corporation for Envision Insurance Company. (Treckler, Elizabeth) (Filed on 11/16/2018)
November 16, 2018 Filing 42 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Envision Insurance Company.. (Treckler, Elizabeth) (Filed on 11/16/2018)
November 15, 2018 Filing 41 REPLY (re #24 MOTION Supplement Admin. Record ) filed bySteven Bruce. (Yarnykh, Zoya) (Filed on 11/15/2018)
November 14, 2018 #Electronic filing error. REMINDER TO COUNSEL: Proposed Order missing suffix to Judge's Name. Counsel need not re-file document, but should reference Hon. Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. in future filings if they wish to include reference to Judge's full assignment reference. This is a text only docket entry. There is no document associated with this entry. Re: #36 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Blue Shield of California (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2018) Modified on 11/14/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
November 13, 2018 Filing 40 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Envision Insurance Company. Motion Hearing set for 2/28/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Responses due by 11/27/2018. Replies due by 12/4/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Treckler, Elizabeth) (Filed on 11/13/2018)
November 13, 2018 Filing 39 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Alex M. Azar, II. Motion Hearing set for 2/28/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Responses due by 11/27/2018. Replies due by 12/4/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit)(Robinson, Kimberly) (Filed on 11/13/2018)
November 13, 2018 Filing 38 Certificate of Interested Entities by Blue Shield of California (Briggs, Amy) (Filed on 11/13/2018)
November 13, 2018 Filing 37 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Blue Shield of California.. (Briggs, Amy) (Filed on 11/13/2018)
November 13, 2018 Filing 36 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's #19 First Amended Complaint filed by Blue Shield of California. Motion Hearing set for 2/28/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Responses due by 11/27/2018. Replies due by 12/4/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Briggs, Amy) (Filed on 11/13/2018) Modified on 11/14/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
November 13, 2018 Filing 35 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Alex M. Azar, II, Envision Insurance Company, and Blue Shield of California. (Robinson, Kimberly) (Filed on 11/13/2018) Modified on 11/14/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
November 8, 2018 Filing 34 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #24 MOTION Supplement Admin. Record ) filed byAlex M. Azar, II. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Robinson, Kimberly) (Filed on 11/8/2018)
November 6, 2018 Filing 33 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Rheinheimer, Christopher) (Filed on 11/6/2018)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER by Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING Dkt. No. #25 Administrative Motion to Shorten Time. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(hsglc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2018)
October 30, 2018 Electronic Filing Error: Incorrect Event Used. Correct event is "Re-Notice Motion." Event can be fount under Civil Events > Motions and Related Filings > Other Supporting Documents. Corrected by the Clerk's Office. No further action is required. re #27 Re-Notice of Motion re 24 MOTION Supplement Admin. Record filed by Steven Bruce, #29 Re-Notice of Motion re #24 MOTION Supplement Admin. Record filed by Steven Bruce. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2018)
October 30, 2018 Filing 31 CLERK'S NOTICE RE Docket No. #24 . Notice is hereby given that docket nos. 26 and 28 reflected the incorrectly briefing deadlines. Response is due November 8, 2018 and reply is due November 15, 2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2018)
October 29, 2018 Filing 30 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #25 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Shorten Time re #24 MOTION Supplement Admin. Record ) filed byAlex M. Azar, II. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Robinson, Kimberly) (Filed on 10/29/2018)
October 29, 2018 Filing 29 Re-Notice of Motion re #24 MOTION Supplement Admin. Record filed by Steven Bruce. Motion Hearing set for 2/7/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr. (Yarnykh, Zoya) (Filed on 10/29/2018) Modified on 10/30/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
October 29, 2018 Filing 28 CLERK'S NOTICE RE Docket No. #27 . Notice is hereby given that counsel must re- notice again not re-file the #24 motion to supplement the administrative record. Hearing date of December 6, 2018 is vacated. Response is due October 8, 2015 and reply is due October 15, 2018. Counsel is directed to check the Court's scheduling notes before re-noticing the motion for a new hearing date. December 6th was not the Court's next available hearing date when this motion was e-filed. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2018)
October 29, 2018 Filing 27 Re-Notice of Motion re #24 MOTION Supplement Admin. Record filed by Steven Bruce. Motion Hearing set for 12/6/2018 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr. (Yarnykh, Zoya) (Filed on 10/29/2018) Modified on 10/29/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 10/30/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
October 26, 2018 Filing 26 CLERK'S NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that counsel must re-notice not re-file the #24 motion to supplement the administrative record. Hearing date of November 8, 2018, is vacated. Response is due October 8, 2018 and reply is due October 15, 2018. Counsel is directed to check the Court's scheduling notes before re-noticing the motion for a new hearing date. If the #25 administrative motion to shorten time is granted, the Court will advance the briefing and the hearing date. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2018) Modified on 1/31/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
October 25, 2018 Filing 25 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Shorten Time re #24 MOTION Supplement Admin. Record filed by Steven Bruce. Responses due by 10/29/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Proposed Order)(Yarnykh, Zoya) (Filed on 10/25/2018)
October 25, 2018 Filing 24 MOTION Supplement Admin. Record filed by Steven Bruce. Motion Hearing set for 11/8/2018 02:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Responses due by 11/1/2018. Replies due by 11/8/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Proposed Order)(Yarnykh, Zoya) (Filed on 10/25/2018)
October 17, 2018 Filing 23 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Alex M. Azar, II.. (Robinson, Kimberly) (Filed on 10/17/2018)
October 11, 2018 Filing 22 STIPULATION To Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to #19 Amended Complaint filed by Envision Insurance Company and Steven Bruce. (Treckler, Elizabeth) (Filed on 10/11/2018) Modified on 10/12/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
October 8, 2018 Filing 21 STIPULATION to Extend Time To Answer or Otherwise Respond to #19 First Amended Complaint re #19 Amended Complaint filed by Blue Shield of California and Steven Bruce. (Briggs, Amy) (Filed on 10/8/2018) Modified on 10/9/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 10/9/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
October 4, 2018 Filing 20 STIPULATION to extend time to respond to complaint filed by Alex M. Azar, II. and Steven Bruce. (Robinson, Kimberly) (Filed on 10/4/2018) Modified on 10/5/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
September 20, 2018 Filing 19 AMENDED COMPLAINT First against All Defendants. Filed bySteven Bruce. (Yarnykh, Zoya) (Filed on 9/20/2018)
September 19, 2018 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Steven Bruce. Service waived by Blue Shield of California waiver sent on 8/22/2018, answer due 10/22/2018. (Yarnykh, Zoya) (Filed on 9/19/2018)
September 11, 2018 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Steven Bruce. Service waived by Envision Insurance Company waiver sent on 8/22/2018, answer due 10/22/2018. (Yarnykh, Zoya) (Filed on 9/11/2018)
August 23, 2018 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Steven Bruce. Alex Azar, II served on 8/22/2018, answer due 10/22/2018. (U.S. Attorney), SUMMONS Returned Executed by Steven Bruce. Alex Azar, II served on 8/22/2018, answer due 10/22/2018. (Yarnykh, Zoya) (Filed on 8/23/2018)
August 23, 2018 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. Correct event is "Summons Returned Executed." Event found under Initial Pleadings and Service > Service of Process.[err 101] Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #13 Certificate of Service filed by Steven Bruce (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2018)
August 22, 2018 Filing 15 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Blue Shield of California on 08/22/2018 by Steven Bruce. Waiver of Service due by 9/21/2018. (Yarnykh, Zoya) (Filed on 8/22/2018)
August 22, 2018 Filing 14 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Envision Insurance Company on 08/22/2018 by Steven Bruce. Waiver of Service due by 9/21/2018. (Yarnykh, Zoya) (Filed on 8/22/2018)
August 22, 2018 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Steven Bruce Azar Summons with Proof of Service (Yarnykh, Zoya) (Filed on 8/22/2018)
August 22, 2018 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE. Notice is hereby given that a Case Management Conference has been set for November 27, 2018, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA. Case Management Statement due by November 20, 2018. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:18-cv-05022-HSG. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2018)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER, Case reassigned to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr. Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 8/21/18. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2018)
August 20, 2018 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2018)
August 20, 2018 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Steven Bruce.. (Yarnykh, Zoya) (Filed on 8/20/2018)
August 17, 2018 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Alex Azar, II, Blue Shield of California, Envision Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2018)
August 16, 2018 Filing 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/8/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/15/2018 10:00 AM. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2018)
August 16, 2018 Filing 6 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/30/2018. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2018)
August 16, 2018 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. (Yarnykh, Zoya) (Filed on 8/16/2018)
August 16, 2018 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. (Yarnykh, Zoya) (Filed on 8/16/2018)
August 16, 2018 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Yarnykh, Zoya) (Filed on 8/16/2018)
August 16, 2018 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet by Steven Bruce . (Yarnykh, Zoya) (Filed on 8/16/2018)
August 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12601865.). Filed bySteven Bruce. (Yarnykh, Zoya) (Filed on 8/16/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bruce v. Azar et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Shield of California
Represented By: Amy B. Briggs
Represented By: Christopher Aaron Rheinheimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Azar, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Envision Insurance Company
Represented By: Elizabeth M Treckler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex M. Azar, II
Represented By: Kimberly Anne Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Bruce
Represented By: Zoya Yarnykh
Represented By: Steven F. Bruce, PWDF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?