United States of America v. Stemm et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Daryl E. Stemm, US Bank, National Association and Deanna R. Stemm
Case Number: 4:2018cv05147
Filed: August 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Referring Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7402
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2018 Filing 13 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Daryl E. Stemm.. (Berke-Dreyfuss, Elizabeth) (Filed on 9/28/2018)
September 28, 2018 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint [with Certificate of Service attached] byDaryl E. Stemm. (Berke-Dreyfuss, Elizabeth) (Filed on 9/28/2018)
September 24, 2018 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint byUS Bank, National Association. (Illman, Erin) (Filed on 9/24/2018) Modified on 9/25/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
September 12, 2018 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint byDeanna R. Stemm. (Kahn, Jeffrey) (Filed on 9/12/2018) Modified on 9/13/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
August 28, 2018 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE. Notice is hereby given that a Case Management Conference has been set for November 27, 2018, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA. Case Management Statement due by November 20, 2018. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:18-cv-05147-HSG. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2018)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings pursuant to Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment to a U.S. District Court Judge. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins no longer assigned to the case. Reassignment Order signed by Executive Committee on 8/27/2018. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2018)
August 24, 2018 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2018)
August 23, 2018 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by United States of America.. (Moore, Thomas) (Filed on 8/23/2018)
August 23, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Daryl E. Stemm, Deanna R. Stemm, US Bank, National Association. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2018)
August 23, 2018 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/14/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/21/2018 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2018)
August 22, 2018 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/5/2018. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2018)
August 22, 2018 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Moore, Thomas) (Filed on 8/22/2018)
August 22, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed byUnited States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Moore, Thomas) (Filed on 8/22/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Stemm et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daryl E. Stemm
Represented By: Elizabeth Berke-Dreyfuss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Bank, National Association
Represented By: Erin Jane Illman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deanna R. Stemm
Represented By: Jeffrey Burton Kahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Thomas Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?