Sream, Inc. et al v. Sahebzada et al
Plaintiff: Sream, Inc. and RooR International, BV
Defendant: Mohammad Sahebzada and Does
Case Number: 4:2018cv05673
Filed: September 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #25 Motion to Appear by Telephone by Plaintiff's counsel. (Attachments: #1 Telephonic Appearance Procedures)(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2018)
October 24, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #21 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court . Motion Hearing set for 11/29/2018 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2018)
October 24, 2018 Filing 25 MOTION to Appear by Telephone at Motion for Default Judgment Hearing filed by RooR International, BV, Sream, Inc. (Vakil, Imran) (Filed on 10/24/2018) Modified on 10/25/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
October 24, 2018 Filing 24 Renotice motion hearing re #21 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to reset the hearing date to November 29, 2018 at 11:00 a.m. filed byRooR International, BV, Sream, Inc.. (Related document(s) #21 ) (Vakil, Imran) (Filed on 10/24/2018)
October 24, 2018 Filing 23 CLERK'S NOTICE: Plaintiffs' motion for default judgment as to Defendant Mohammad Sahebzada [Docket No. 21] was noticed for hearing on a date that is not an available hearing date on Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu's calendar. The November 27, 2018 hearing date is VACATED. Plaintiffs shall re-notice (not re-file) the motion for a hearing in compliance with Local Rule 7-2(a) and Judge Ryu's Standing Order. The briefing schedule remains in effect. Plaintiffs' motion for telephonic appearance at said hearing is terminated as moot. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (dmrlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2018)
October 23, 2018 Filing 22 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by RooR International, BV, Sream, Inc.. (Vakil, Imran) (Filed on 10/23/2018)
October 23, 2018 Filing 21 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to filed by RooR International, BV, Sream, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/27/2018 11:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Responses due by 11/6/2018. Replies due by 11/13/2018. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Vakil Decl., #3 Mottsheard Decl. (Exhibit D enclosed), #4 Proposed Order, #5 Proof of Service)(Vakil, Imran) (Filed on 10/23/2018) Modified on 10/25/2018 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu denying #17 Motion for Default Judgment. (dmrlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2018)
October 22, 2018 Filing 19 Clerk's Notice ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Mohammad Sahebzada. (Related documents(s) #14 )(jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2018)
October 20, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION to Appear by Telephone at Hearing on November 27, 2018 (11 a.m.) filed by RooR International, BV, Sream, Inc.. (Vakil, Imran) (Filed on 10/20/2018)
October 20, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to filed by RooR International, BV, Sream, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/27/2018 11:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Responses due by 11/5/2018. Replies due by 11/13/2018. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Vakil Decl., #3 Mottsheard Decl. (Exhibit D enclosed), #4 Proposed Order, #5 Proof of Service)(Vakil, Imran) (Filed on 10/20/2018)
October 16, 2018 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by RooR International, BV, Sream, Inc. re #15 Order (Vakil, Imran) (Filed on 10/16/2018)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER re #14 MOTION for Entry of Default by the Court filed by RooR International, BV, Sream, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 10/16/2018. (dmrlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2018)
October 15, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION for Entry of Default by the Court filed by RooR International, BV, Sream, Inc. (Vakil, Imran) (Filed on 10/15/2018) Modified on 10/16/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
October 8, 2018 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sream, Inc., RooR International, BV. Mohammad Sahebzada served on 9/21/2018, answer due 10/12/2018. (Vakil, Imran) (Filed on 10/8/2018)
September 27, 2018 Filing 12 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by RooR International, BV, Sream, Inc... (Vakil, Imran) (Filed on 9/27/2018)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER (AS MODIFIED) by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #10 Plaintiffs' Motion to Appear by Telephone at the 12/19/2018 01:30 PM Initial Case Management Conference. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2018)
September 26, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by RooR International, BV, Sream, Inc.. (Vakil, Imran) (Filed on 9/26/2018)
September 18, 2018 Filing 9 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Trademark Infringement. (Attachments: #1 Complaint)(jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2018)
September 18, 2018 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Mohammad Sahebzada. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2018)
September 17, 2018 Filing 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/12/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/19/2018 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2018)
September 17, 2018 Filing 6 Civil Cover Sheet by RooR International, BV, Sream, Inc. . (Vakil, Imran) (Filed on 9/17/2018)
September 17, 2018 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/1/2018. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2018)
September 17, 2018 Filing 4 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by RooR International, BV, Sream, Inc. (Vakil, Imran) (Filed on 9/17/2018)
September 17, 2018 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by RooR International, BV, Sream, Inc. (Vakil, Imran) (Filed on 9/17/2018)
September 17, 2018 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Vakil, Imran) (Filed on 9/17/2018)
September 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mohammad Sahebzada ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12684236.). Filed bySream, Inc., RooR International, BV. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Vakil, Imran) (Filed on 9/17/2018)
September 17, 2018 #Electronic filing error. Case has been randomly assigned to Judge, however incorrect Civil Cover Sheet used when filing initial documents of JS-44 (Rev 8/16). Please complete current Civil Cover Sheet of JS-CAND-44 (Rev. 06/17) and file Correct Civil Cover Sheet as separate docket entry re: #1 Complaint, filed by RooR International, BV, Sream, Inc. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sream, Inc. et al v. Sahebzada et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mohammad Sahebzada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sream, Inc.
Represented By: Imran Vakil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RooR International, BV
Represented By: Imran Vakil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?