State of California et al v. Zinke et al
Plaintiff: California Air Resources Board, State of New Mexico, Xavier Becerra, Hector H. Balderas and State of California
Defendant: Bureau of Land Management, Joseph Balash, Department of the Interior and Ryan Zinke
Consolidated Plaintiff: Natural Resources Defense Council, Sierra Club, Dine Citizens Against Ruining Our Environment, Wilderness Workshop, Earthworks, Los Padres Forestwatch, San Juan Citizens Alliance, WildEarth Guardians, Environmental Defense Fund, Environmental Law and Policy Center, Western Organization of Resource Councils, Fort Berthold Protectors of Water and Earth Rights, Center For Biological Diversity, National Wildlife Federation, The Wilderness Society, Montana Environmental Information Center, Wyoming Outdoor Council and Citizens for a Healthy Community
Intervenor: Independent Petroleum Association of America and Western Energy Alliance
Intervenor Defendant: State of Wyoming
Consolidated Defendant: United States Department of the Interior
Case Number: 4:2018cv05712
Filed: September 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2018 Filing 48 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Center For Biological Diversity, Citizens for a Healthy Community, Dine Citizens Against Ruining Our Environment, Earthworks, Environmental Defense Fund, Environmental Law and Policy Center, Fort Berthold Protectors of Water and Earth Rights, Los Padres Forestwatch, Montana Environmental Information Center, National Wildlife Federation, Natural Resources Defense Council, San Juan Citizens Alliance, Sierra Club, The Wilderness Society, Western Organization of Resource Councils, WildEarth Guardians, Wilderness Workshop, Wyoming Outdoor Council (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Geis, Stacey) (Filed on 11/16/2018)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #5 Motion to Intervene re Western Energy Alliance and Independent Petroleum Association of America; denying as moot #46 Motion to Appear by Telephone. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2018)
November 6, 2018 Filing 46 MOTION to Appear by Telephone For the November 27, 2018 Motion Hearing filed by Independent Petroleum Association of America, Western Energy Alliance. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Macasinag, Emil) (Filed on 11/6/2018)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO CONSOLIDATE CASES by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers in case 4:18-cv-05712-YGR; granting (44) Stipulation in case 4:18-cv-05984-YGR. Case 4:18-cv-5984-YGR is CONSOLIDATED with case 4:18-cv-5712-YGR. All future pleadings shall be filed in the docket in case no. 4:18-cv-5712-YGR. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2018) Modified on 11/6/2018 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #40 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Erik E. Petersen. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2018)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #39 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Michael M. Robinson. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2018)
October 29, 2018 Filing 42 CORRECTED MOTION to Intervene filed by State of Wyoming. Motion Hearing set for 12/4/2018 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 11/13/2018. Replies due by 11/20/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Answer)(Marsh, Christian) (Filed on 10/29/2018) Modified on 10/30/2018 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
October 29, 2018 Filing 41 ***FILED IN ERROR. RE-FILED AT DKT. #42 ***MOTION to Intervene filed by State of Wyoming. Motion Hearing set for 12/4/2018 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 11/13/2018. Replies due by 11/20/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Answer)(Marsh, Christian) (Filed on 10/29/2018) Modified on 10/30/2018 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
October 29, 2018 Filing 40 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12800895.) filed by State of Wyoming. (Petersen, Erik) (Filed on 10/29/2018)
October 29, 2018 Filing 39 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12800847.) filed by State of Wyoming. (Robinson, Michael) (Filed on 10/29/2018)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER RELATING CASES 18-cv-5712-YGR and 18-cv-5984-EDL. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 10/25/18. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2018)
October 23, 2018 Filing 37 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 12/31/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for MONDAY, 1/7/2019 02:00 PM before Judge Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2018)
October 23, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #5 MOTION to Intervene by Proposed-Intervenors: Motion Hearing set for 11/27/2018 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2018)
October 22, 2018 Filing 36 Renotice motion hearing re #5 MOTION to Intervene by Proposed-Intervenors WESTERN ENERGY ALLIANCE AND INDEPENDENT PETROLEUM ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA filed byIndependent Petroleum Association of America, Western Energy Alliance. (Related document(s) #5 ) (Macasinag, Emil) (Filed on 10/22/2018)
October 19, 2018 Filing 35 CLERK'S NOTICE FOR COUNSEL TO RE-NOTICE MOTION TO INTERVENE FOR A HEARING DATE ON JUDGE GONZALEZ ROGERS CIVIL LAW AND MOTION CALENDAR RE #5 Motion and Amended Notice of Motion #10 and #14 Second Amended Motion. The Motion to Intervene may be re-noticed for TUESDAY 11/27/18 or a later Tuesday date on the Court's calendar; a Tuesday at 2:00 PM. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2018)
October 19, 2018 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Carter Fleeth Thurman (Thurman, Carter) (Filed on 10/19/2018)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #30 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to William Grantham. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2018)
October 16, 2018 Filing 32 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by State of California re #7 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint, #31 Certificate of Service, #3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, #29 Amended Complaint, #28 Order Reassigning Case,, Case Assigned/Reassigned, Filing Procedures (Oakland), ECF Registration Information, Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers' Standing Orders (Tharin, Mary) (Filed on 10/16/2018)
October 15, 2018 Filing 31 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by State of California re #7 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint, #3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, #29 Amended Complaint, #28 Order Reassigning Case,, Case Assigned/Reassigned, Filing Procedures (Oakland), ECF Registration Information, Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers' Standing Orders (Tharin, Mary) (Filed on 10/15/2018)
October 12, 2018 Filing 30 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice William Grantham ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12758838.) filed by State of New Mexico. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Grantham, William) (Filed on 10/12/2018)
October 10, 2018 Filing 29 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Joseph Balash, Bureau of Land Management, Department of the Interior, Ryan Zinke. Filed byState of California, Xavier Becerra, California Air Resources Board. (Torgun, George) (Filed on 10/10/2018)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 10/10/2018. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2018)
October 9, 2018 Filing 27 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2018)
October 9, 2018 Filing 26 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Joseph Balash, Bureau of Land Management, Department of the Interior, Ryan Zinke.. (Boronow, Clare) (Filed on 10/9/2018)
October 5, 2018 Filing 24 MOTION to Relate Case filed by Joseph Balash, Bureau of Land Management, Department of the Interior, Ryan Zinke. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Boronow, Clare) (Filed on 10/5/2018)
October 5, 2018 Filing 23 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Xavier Becerra, California Air Resources Board, State of California.. (Torgun, George) (Filed on 10/5/2018)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #22 Kathleen C. Schroder's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2018)
October 3, 2018 Filing 22 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Kathleen Schroder ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12734200.) filed by Independent Petroleum Association of America, Western Energy Alliance. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing - Colorado, #2 Certificate of Good Standing - New Mexico)(Schroder, Kathleen) (Filed on 10/3/2018)
October 3, 2018 Filing 21 Statement of Non-Opposition re #5 MOTION to Intervene by Proposed-Intervenors filed byState of California. (Related document(s) #5 ) (Torgun, George) (Filed on 10/3/2018)
October 2, 2018 Filing 20 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Xavier Becerra, California Air Resources Board, State of California.. (Torgun, George) (Filed on 10/2/2018)
October 2, 2018 Filing 19 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by State of New Mexico. (Biernoff, Ari) (Filed on 10/2/2018) Modified on 10/5/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
October 2, 2018 Filing 18 Statement of Non-Opposition re #5 MOTION to Intervene by Proposed-Intervenors filed byJoseph Balash, Bureau of Land Management, Department of the Interior, Ryan Zinke. (Related document(s) #5 ) (Boronow, Clare) (Filed on 10/2/2018)
October 2, 2018 Filing 17 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by State of California.. (Torgun, George) (Filed on 10/2/2018)
October 1, 2018 Filing 16 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs, Defendants and Intervenors shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 10/9/2018. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2018)
October 1, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Clare Marie Boronow (Boronow, Clare) (Filed on 10/1/2018)
September 28, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #5 MOTION to Intervene by Proposed-Intervenors. Motion Hearing set for 11/8/2018 11:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2018)
September 27, 2018 Filing 14 Second Amended Notice of Motion to Intervene by Independent Petroleum Association of America, Western Energy Alliance re #5 MOTION to Intervene re 8 Clerk's Notice, Terminate Hearings, 11 Clerk's Notice, (Macasinag, Emil) (Filed on 9/27/2018) Modified on 9/28/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
September 26, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Ari Biernoff on behalf of Plaintiff State of New Mexico (Biernoff, Ari) (Filed on 9/26/2018)
September 25, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Court's determination that cases are not related. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2018)
September 25, 2018 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE: Proposed Intervenors seek to notice their Motion to Intervene #5 for hearing on a date that is not an available hearing date on Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu's calendar. The 10/25/2018 hearing date is VACATED. Proposed Intervenors shall re-notice (not re-file) the motion for a hearing in compliance with Local Rule 7-2(a) and Judge Ryu's Standing Order. The briefing schedule remains in effect. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2018)
September 24, 2018 Filing 10 AMENDED Notice of Motion per Clerk's Notice Dkt. 8 by Independent Petroleum Association of America, Western Energy Alliance re #5 MOTION to Intervene by Proposed-Intervenors (Macasinag, Emil) (Filed on 9/24/2018) Modified on 9/25/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #6 Eric Waeckerlin's Motion for admission Pro Hac Vice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2018)
September 21, 2018 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE: Proposed Intervenors noticed their Motion to Intervene before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 10/25/2018 09:30 AM, who is not presiding over this case. The 10/25/2018 09:30 AM hearing date before Judge Beeler is VACATED. Proposed Intervenors shall re-notice (not re-file) the motion for a hearing before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu in compliance with Local Rule 7-2(a) and Judge Ryu's Standing Order. The briefing schedule remains in effect. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2018)
September 21, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Joseph Balash, Bureau of Land Management, Department of the Interior, Ryan Zinke. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2018)
September 20, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12697275.) filed by Eric P. Waeckerlin. (Waeckerlin, Eric) (Filed on 9/20/2018)
September 20, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Intervene by Proposed Intervenors filed by Western Energy Alliance, Independent Petroleum Association of America. Motion Hearing set for 10/25/2018 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Responses due by 10/4/2018. Replies due by 10/11/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Macasinag, Emil) (Filed on 9/20/2018) Modified on 9/21/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
September 20, 2018 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. (Tharin, Mary) (Filed on 9/20/2018)
September 19, 2018 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/12/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/19/2018 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2018)
September 19, 2018 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/3/2018. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2018)
September 18, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ryan Zinke ($400.00 Receipt No. 0971-12689695). Filed by State of California, State of New Mexico. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Tharin, Mary) (Filed on 9/18/2018) Modified on 9/19/2018 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of California et al v. Zinke et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bureau of Land Management
Represented By: Clare Marie Boronow
Represented By: Carter Fleeth Thurman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Balash
Represented By: Clare Marie Boronow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of the Interior
Represented By: Clare Marie Boronow
Represented By: Carter Fleeth Thurman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Zinke
Represented By: Clare Marie Boronow
Represented By: Carter Fleeth Thurman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: California Air Resources Board
Represented By: Mary Tharin
Represented By: George Matthew Torgun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of New Mexico
Represented By: Mary Tharin
Represented By: Ari Biernoff
Represented By: William G Grantham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xavier Becerra
Represented By: George Matthew Torgun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hector H. Balderas
Represented By: Ari Biernoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of California
Represented By: Mary Tharin
Represented By: George Matthew Torgun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Natural Resources Defense Council
Represented By: David Daniel Doniger
Represented By: Melissa Joy Lynch
Represented By: Stacey P. Geis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Sierra Club
Represented By: Robin L Cooley
Represented By: Joel Minor
Represented By: Stacey P. Geis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Dine Citizens Against Ruining Our Environment
Represented By: Laura H King
Represented By: Erik Schlenker-Goodrich
Represented By: Stacey P. Geis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Wilderness Workshop
Represented By: Laura H King
Represented By: Erik Schlenker-Goodrich
Represented By: Stacey P. Geis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Earthworks
Represented By: Laura H King
Represented By: Erik Schlenker-Goodrich
Represented By: Stacey P. Geis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Los Padres Forestwatch
Represented By: Laura H King
Represented By: Erik Schlenker-Goodrich
Represented By: Stacey P. Geis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: San Juan Citizens Alliance
Represented By: Laura H King
Represented By: Erik Schlenker-Goodrich
Represented By: Stacey P. Geis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: WildEarth Guardians
Represented By: Laura H King
Represented By: Erik Schlenker-Goodrich
Represented By: Stacey P. Geis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Environmental Defense Fund
Represented By: Susannah Landes Foster Weaver
Represented By: Rosalie Giselle Winn
Represented By: Toms E Carbonell
Represented By: Peter Michel Zalzal
Represented By: Stacey P. Geis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Environmental Law and Policy Center
Represented By: Scott Ray Strand
Represented By: Rachel Leigh Granneman
Represented By: Stacey P. Geis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Western Organization of Resource Councils
Represented By: Robin L Cooley
Represented By: Joel Minor
Represented By: Stacey P. Geis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Fort Berthold Protectors of Water and Earth Rights
Represented By: Robin L Cooley
Represented By: Joel Minor
Represented By: Stacey P. Geis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Center For Biological Diversity
Represented By: Laura H King
Represented By: Erik Schlenker-Goodrich
Represented By: Stacey P. Geis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: National Wildlife Federation
Represented By: Ann Brewster Weeks
Represented By: Laura H King
Represented By: Darin T. Schroeder
Represented By: Erik Schlenker-Goodrich
Represented By: Stacey P. Geis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: The Wilderness Society
Represented By: Robin L Cooley
Represented By: Joel Minor
Represented By: Stacey P. Geis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Montana Environmental Information Center
Represented By: Laura H King
Represented By: Erik Schlenker-Goodrich
Represented By: Stacey P. Geis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Wyoming Outdoor Council
Represented By: Laura H King
Represented By: Erik Schlenker-Goodrich
Represented By: Stacey P. Geis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Citizens for a Healthy Community
Represented By: Laura H King
Represented By: Erik Schlenker-Goodrich
Represented By: Stacey P. Geis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Independent Petroleum Association of America
Represented By: Kathleen Schroder
Represented By: Eric Waeckerlin
Represented By: Emil Anthony Macasinag
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Western Energy Alliance
Represented By: Kathleen Schroder
Represented By: Emil Anthony Macasinag
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: State of Wyoming
Represented By: Christian Lucier Marsh, Esq.
Represented By: Erik Edward Petersen
Represented By: Michael M. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: United States Department of the Interior
Represented By: Clare Marie Boronow
Represented By: Carter Fleeth Thurman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?