Ecklund v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Sharon Ecklund
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2018cv06256
Filed: October 12, 2018
Court: California Northern District Court
Presiding Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 18, 2018 8 PROOF OF SERVICE of Summons and Initiating Documents by Sharon Ecklund Feinberg, Daniel) (Filed on 10/18/2018) Modified on 10/18/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
October 17, 2018 7 Certificate of Interested Entities by Sharon Ecklund (Feinberg, Daniel) (Filed on 10/17/2018)
October 15, 2018 6 Summons Issued as to Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2018)
October 12, 2018 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/9/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/16/2019 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2018)
October 12, 2018 4 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Sharon Ecklund.. (Feinberg, Daniel) (Filed on 10/12/2018)
October 12, 2018 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/26/2018. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2018)
October 12, 2018 2 Proposed Summons. (Feinberg, Daniel) (Filed on 10/12/2018)
October 12, 2018 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No. 0971-12757688 against Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Filed bySharon Ecklund. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Feinberg, Daniel) (Filed on 10/12/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ecklund v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Ecklund
Represented By: Daniel Mark Feinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?