United States of America v. One 1980 Cessna Aircraft, Model P210, FAA #N212SB

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: One 1980 Cessna Aircraft, Model P210, FAA #N212SB
Case Number: 4:2018cv06474
Filed: October 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2018 Filing 18 Declaration of Publication filed by United States of America. Last publication date November 24, 2018. (Lowder, Gregg) (Filed on 12/4/2018) Modified on 12/5/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
November 28, 2018 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America re #3 Notice (Other), #7 Warrant Issued, #11 Notice (Other), #6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, #1 Complaint (Lowder, Gregg) (Filed on 11/28/2018)
November 28, 2018 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America re #3 Notice (Other), #7 Warrant Issued, #11 Notice (Other), #6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, #1 Complaint (Lowder, Gregg) (Filed on 11/28/2018)
November 28, 2018 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America re #3 Notice (Other), #7 Warrant Issued, #11 Notice (Other), #6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, #1 Complaint (Lowder, Gregg) (Filed on 11/28/2018)
November 28, 2018 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America re #3 Notice (Other), #7 Warrant Issued, #11 Notice (Other), #6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, #1 Complaint (Lowder, Gregg) (Filed on 11/28/2018)
November 28, 2018 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America re #3 Notice (Other), #7 Warrant Issued, #11 Notice (Other), #6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, #1 Complaint (Lowder, Gregg) (Filed on 11/28/2018)
November 28, 2018 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America re 2 Case Assigned by Intake,,, #3 Notice (Other), #7 Warrant Issued, #11 Notice (Other), #6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, #1 Complaint (Lowder, Gregg) (Filed on 11/28/2018)
November 28, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE by United States of America (Memorandum Regarding Deadline for Filing Any Claim and Answer in US v. One Cessna Aircraft) (Lowder, Gregg) (Filed on 11/28/2018)
November 6, 2018 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by United States of America.. (Lowder, Gregg) (Filed on 11/6/2018)
October 30, 2018 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America re 2 Case Assigned by Intake,,, #3 Notice (Other), #7 Warrant Issued, #6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, #1 Complaint (Lowder, Gregg) (Filed on 10/30/2018)
October 26, 2018 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America re #7 Warrant Issued, #6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines (Lowder, Gregg) (Filed on 10/26/2018)
October 25, 2018 Filing 7 Warrant of Arrest of Property In Rem Issued as to One 1980 Cessna Aircraft, Model P210, FAA #N212SB. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2018)
October 24, 2018 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order: Case Management Statement due by 1/23/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/30/2019 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2018)
October 24, 2018 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America re 2 Case Assigned by Intake,,, #3 Notice (Other), #4 Proposed Warrant, #1 Complaint (Lowder, Gregg) (Filed on 10/24/2018)
October 24, 2018 Filing 4 Proposed Warrant. (Lowder, Gregg) (Filed on 10/24/2018)
October 24, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Forfeiture Action by United States of America (Lowder, Gregg) (Filed on 10/24/2018) Modified on 10/25/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
October 23, 2018 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/6/2018. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2018)
October 23, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Complaint for Civil Forfeiture) against One 1980 Cessna Aircraft, Model P210, FAA #N212SB. Filed byUnited States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lowder, Gregg) (Filed on 10/23/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. One 1980 Cessna Aircraft, Model P210, FAA #N212SB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One 1980 Cessna Aircraft, Model P210, FAA #N212SB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Gregg William Lowder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?