Zakinov et al v. Ripple Labs, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Avner Greenwald, David Oconer and Vladi Zakinov
Defendant: XRP II, LLC, Susan Athey, Ripple Labs, Inc., Eric van Miltenburg, Ben Lawsky, Ron Will, Ken Kurson, Takashi Okita, Christian Larsen, Anja Manuel, Antoinette O'Gorman, Zoe Cruz and Bradley Garlinghouse
Case Number: 4:2018cv06753
Filed: November 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Referring Judge: Phyllis J Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2018 Filing 21 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #18 Plaintiffs Zakinov and Oconer's Notice of Motion and Motion to Remand, #17 MOTION to Remand ) Defendants' Omnibus Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Plaintiff Avner Greenwald's and Vladi Zakinov's and David Oconer's Motions to Remand filed bySusan Athey, Zoe Cruz, Bradley Garlinghouse, Ken Kurson, Christian Larsen, Ben Lawsky, Anja Manuel, Antoinette O'Gorman, Takashi Okita, Ripple Labs, Inc., Ron Will, XRP II, LLC, Eric van Miltenburg. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Virginia F. Milstead and Exs. 1 through 4, #2 Proposed Order)(Morrison, Peter) (Filed on 12/28/2018)
December 12, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #18 Plaintiffs Zakinov and Oconer's Notice of Motion and Motion to Remand, #17 MOTION to Remand. Oppositions due by 12/28/2018. Replies due by 1/14/2019. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2018)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION SETTING A BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR PLAINTIFFS' MOTIONS TO REMAND PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULE 6-1(b) by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #19 Stipulation. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2018)
December 11, 2018 Filing 19 Stipulation Setting a Briefing Schedule for Plaintiffs' Motions to Remand Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 6-1(b) filed by Susan Athey, Zoe Cruz, Bradley Garlinghouse, Ken Kurson, Christian Larsen, Ben Lawsky, Anja Manuel, Antoinette O'Gorman, Takashi Okita, Ripple Labs, Inc., Ron Will, XRP II, LLC, Eric van Miltenburg, Avner Greenwald, David Oconer, Vladi Zakinov. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Morrison, Peter) (Filed on 12/11/2018) Modified on 12/12/2018 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
December 7, 2018 Filing 18 Plaintiffs Zakinov and Oconer's Notice of Motion and Motion to Remand; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by David Oconer, Vladi Zakinov. Motion Hearing set for 2/13/2019 09:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor before Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton. Responses due by 12/21/2018. Replies due by 12/28/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Brian O. O'Mara, #2 Proposed Order)(O'Mara, Brian) (Filed on 12/7/2018) Modified on 12/10/2018 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
December 7, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION to Remand filed by Avner Greenwald. Motion Hearing set for 2/13/2019 09:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor before Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton. Responses due by 12/21/2018. Replies due by 12/28/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 12/7/2018)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #15 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Lauren McCabe. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2018)
December 4, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Re: Lauren M. McCabe (CORRECTION OF DKT. #14) (Filing fee $310, receipt number 0971-12888397.) Filing fee previously paid on 11/30/18 filed by Avner Greenwald. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(McCabe, Lauren) (Filed on 12/4/2018) Modified on 12/4/2018 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
November 30, 2018 Filing 14 ***SEE CORRECTED FILING AT DOCKET ENTRY AT DOCKET #15 *** MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Re: Lauren M. McCabe (Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12888397) filed by Avner Greenwald. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(McCabe, Lauren) (Filed on 11/30/2018) Modified on 12/3/2018 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 12/4/2018 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
November 26, 2018 Filing 13 PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE TO #10 DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE TO STANDING ORDER REGARDING REMOVED CASES by Avner Greenwald. (Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 11/26/2018) Modified on 11/27/2018 (kcS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 11/27/2018 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
November 26, 2018 Filing 12 PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE TO #10 DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE TO STANDING ORDER REGARDING REMOVED CASES by David Oconer, Vladi Zakinov. (Oddo, Stephen) (Filed on 11/26/2018) Modified on 11/27/2018 (kcS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 11/27/2018 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 2/14/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/21/2019 at 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 11/19/18. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2018)
November 16, 2018 Filing 10 Defendants' Response to Standing Order Regarding Removed Cases by Susan Athey, Zoe Cruz, Bradley Garlinghouse, Ken Kurson, Christian Larsen, Ben Lawsky, Anja Manuel, Antoinette O'Gorman, Takashi Okita, Ripple Labs, Inc., Ron Will, XRP II, LLC, Eric van Miltenburg. (Morrison, Peter) (Filed on 11/16/2018) Modified on 11/19/2018 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
November 14, 2018 Case Reassigned to Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton. Judge William Alsup no longer assigned to the case. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2018)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RELATING CASE. C-18-6753-WHA is related to C-18-3286-PJH. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 11/14/18. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2018)
November 8, 2018 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Susan Athey, Zoe Cruz, Bradley Garlinghouse, Ken Kurson, Christian Larsen, Ben Lawsky, Anja Manuel, Antoinette O'Gorman, Takashi Okita, Ripple Labs, Inc., Ron Will, XRP II, LLC, Eric van Miltenburg re 3 Case Assigned by Intake,,, #1 Certificate of Interested Entities, #7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, #2 Notice of Removal,, #4 Notice of Appearance, #5 Notice of Appearance, #6 Stipulation, (Morrison, Peter) (Filed on 11/8/2018)
November 8, 2018 Filing 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras Case Management Statement due by 1/31/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/7/2019 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2018)
November 8, 2018 Filing 6 STIPULATION Regarding Defendants' Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond Pursuant to Civil L.R. 6-1(a) filed by Susan Athey, Zoe Cruz, Bradley Garlinghouse, Ken Kurson, Christian Larsen, Ben Lawsky, Anja Manuel, Antoinette O'Gorman, Takashi Okita, Ripple Labs, Inc., Ron Will, XRP II, LLC, Eric van Miltenburg. (Morrison, Peter) (Filed on 11/8/2018) Modified on 11/8/2018 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
November 8, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Virginia Faye Milstead (Milstead, Virginia) (Filed on 11/8/2018)
November 8, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by John M. Neukom (Neukom, John) (Filed on 11/8/2018)
November 7, 2018 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge William Alsup. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2018)
November 7, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Mateo County Superior Court. Their case number is 18-CIV-02845. (Filing Fee Paid of $400.00, Agency Tracking ID: 0971-12829624 ). Filed by Ben Lawsky, Eric van Miltenburg, XRP II, LLC, Ripple Labs, Inc., Takashi Okita, Antoinette O'Gorman, Bradley Garlinghouse, Zoe Cruz, Anja Manuel, Susan Athey, Christian Larsen, Ken Kurson, Ron Will. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-I, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Morrison, Peter) (Filed on 11/7/2018) Modified on 11/7/2018 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
November 7, 2018 Filing 1 Certificate of Interested Entities by Susan Athey, Zoe Cruz, Bradley Garlinghouse, Ken Kurson, Christian Larsen, Ben Lawsky, Anja Manuel, Antoinette O'Gorman, Takashi Okita, Ripple Labs, Inc., Ron Will, XRP II, LLC, Eric van Miltenburg identifying Corporate Parent Ripple Labs, Inc. for XRP II, LLC; Other Affiliate SBI Holdings Inc. for Ripple Labs, Inc.. (Morrison, Peter) (Filed on 11/7/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zakinov et al v. Ripple Labs, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XRP II, LLC
Represented By: Peter Bradley Morrison
Represented By: Virginia Faye Milstead
Represented By: John M. Neukom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Athey
Represented By: Peter Bradley Morrison
Represented By: Virginia Faye Milstead
Represented By: John M. Neukom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ripple Labs, Inc.
Represented By: Peter Bradley Morrison
Represented By: Virginia Faye Milstead
Represented By: John M. Neukom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric van Miltenburg
Represented By: Peter Bradley Morrison
Represented By: Virginia Faye Milstead
Represented By: John M. Neukom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ben Lawsky
Represented By: Peter Bradley Morrison
Represented By: Virginia Faye Milstead
Represented By: John M. Neukom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Will
Represented By: Peter Bradley Morrison
Represented By: Virginia Faye Milstead
Represented By: John M. Neukom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Kurson
Represented By: Peter Bradley Morrison
Represented By: Virginia Faye Milstead
Represented By: John M. Neukom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Takashi Okita
Represented By: Peter Bradley Morrison
Represented By: Virginia Faye Milstead
Represented By: John M. Neukom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christian Larsen
Represented By: Peter Bradley Morrison
Represented By: Virginia Faye Milstead
Represented By: John M. Neukom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anja Manuel
Represented By: Peter Bradley Morrison
Represented By: Virginia Faye Milstead
Represented By: John M. Neukom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antoinette O'Gorman
Represented By: Peter Bradley Morrison
Represented By: Virginia Faye Milstead
Represented By: John M. Neukom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zoe Cruz
Represented By: Peter Bradley Morrison
Represented By: Virginia Faye Milstead
Represented By: John M. Neukom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradley Garlinghouse
Represented By: Peter Bradley Morrison
Represented By: Virginia Faye Milstead
Represented By: John M. Neukom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Avner Greenwald
Represented By: Lauren Sager McCabe
Represented By: Thomas L Laughlin, IV
Represented By: Rhiana Swartz
Represented By: John T. Jasnoch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Oconer
Represented By: Eric M. Carrino
Represented By: Brian J. Robbins
Represented By: Brian O. O'Mara
Represented By: Stephen J. Oddo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vladi Zakinov
Represented By: Eric M. Carrino
Represented By: Brian J. Robbins
Represented By: Shawn A. Williams
Represented By: Brian Edward Cochran
Represented By: Brian O. O'Mara
Represented By: David Conrad Walton
Represented By: Stephen J. Oddo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?