Lundy et al v. Facebook Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Myriah Watkins and Brendan Lundy
Defendant: Apple Inc, Facebook Inc., Alphabet, Inc. and Google, LLC
Case Number: 4:2018cv06793
Filed: November 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Referring Judge: Joseph C Spero
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed by Brendan Lundy, Myriah Watkins. Motion Hearing set for 2/5/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 1/3/2019. Replies due by 1/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order)(Ngo, Ivy) (Filed on 12/20/2018)
December 17, 2018 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING A CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 2/4/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/11/2019 at 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order) (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2018)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Executive Committee on 12/14/18. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2018)
December 13, 2018 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2018)
December 10, 2018 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Brendan Lundy, Myriah Watkins.. (Ngo, Ivy) (Filed on 12/10/2018)
November 26, 2018 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 12/10/2018. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2018)
November 15, 2018 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Google, LLC. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2018)
November 15, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Facebook Inc.. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2018)
November 15, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Apple Inc. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2018)
November 15, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Alphabet, Inc.. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2018)
November 15, 2018 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/1/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/8/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2018)
November 8, 2018 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/23/2018. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2018)
November 8, 2018 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Ngo, Ivy) (Filed on 11/8/2018)
November 8, 2018 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT; Jury Trial Demanded against Facebook, Inc., Google, LLC, Alphabet, Inc., Apple Inc. (Filing Fee $400.00, Receipt Number 0971-12835014) filed by Brendan Lundy, Myriah Watkins. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Ngo, Ivy) (Filed on 11/8/2018) Modified on 11/9/2018 (bwS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 11/15/2018 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lundy et al v. Facebook Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alphabet, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Myriah Watkins
Represented By: Ivy T Ngo
Represented By: Ivy T. Ngo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brendan Lundy
Represented By: Ivy T Ngo
Represented By: Ivy T. Ngo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?