(HC) Loyd v. Spearmen
Petitioner: Daniel Ray Loyd
Respondent: Warden Spearmen
Case Number: 4:2018cv07228
Filed: November 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Referring Judge: PSLC MSH
2 Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to the case. Signed by the Executive Committee on December 21, 2018. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2018)
December 21, 2018 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2018)
December 14, 2018 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Daniel Ray Loyd. (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Envelope)(jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2018)
December 11, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Daniel Ray Loyd. (Attachments: #1 Clerk's Notice from CAED, #2 Letter from Petitioner, #3 Envelope)(jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2018)
November 29, 2018 Filing 5 Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to a Magistrate Judge. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2018)
November 29, 2018 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 1/7/2019. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2018)
November 29, 2018 Filing 3 Case transferred in from District of California Eastern; Case Number 1:18-cv-01589. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Modified on 11/30/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
November 27, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Order, Case Transferred Out to Another District served on Daniel Ray Loyd. (Sant Agata, S)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/27/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
November 19, 2018 Filing 1 (2254) PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against Spearmen by Daniel Ray Loyd.(Hellings, J)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC) Loyd v. Spearmen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Daniel Ray Loyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Spearmen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?