Philpot v. Entravision Communications Corporation
Plaintiff: Larry G Philpot
Defendant: Entravision Communications Corporation
Case Number: 4:2018cv07255
Filed: November 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 31, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 31, 2018 Filing 12 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Larry G Philpot.. (Bunsow, Hillary) (Filed on 12/31/2018)
December 17, 2018 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff and Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 12/31/2018. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2018)
December 17, 2018 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 12/31/2018. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2018)
November 30, 2018 Filing 9 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding copyright infringement (cc: form mailed to register). (Attachments: #1 Attachments)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2018)
November 30, 2018 Filing 8 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/26/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/5/2019 01:30 PM. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2018)
November 30, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Entravision Communications Corporation. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2018)
November 30, 2018 Filing 6 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/14/2018. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2018)
November 30, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Stephan Mancuso (Mancuso, Nicholas) (Filed on 11/30/2018)
November 30, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Hillary Noelle Bunsow (Bunsow, Hillary) (Filed on 11/30/2018)
November 30, 2018 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Larry G Philpot Plaintiff's Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 and Certification as to Non-Party Interested Entities or Pursuant to Civ. L.R. 3-15 (Zachary, Michael) (Filed on 11/30/2018)
November 30, 2018 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Zachary, Michael) (Filed on 11/30/2018)
November 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT, VIOLATIONS OF THE DIGITAL MILLENNIUM COPYRIGHT ACT with jury demand against Entravision Communications Corporation ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12887781.). Filed by Larry G Philpot. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Zachary, Michael) (Filed on 11/30/2018) Modified on 11/30/2018 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Philpot v. Entravision Communications Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry G Philpot
Represented By: Nicholas Stephan Mancuso
Represented By: Hillary Noelle Bunsow
Represented By: Michael Norman Zachary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Entravision Communications Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?