Bashaw v. Nissan North America, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Cathy Bashaw
Defendant: Nissan North America, Inc. and Nissan Motor Co., Ltd.
Case Number: 4:2018cv07292
Filed: November 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Jeffrey Riehle (Riehle, Paul) (Filed on 1/25/2019)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #15 Stipulation Modifying Briefing Schedule for Plaintiff's #12 Motion for Consolidation and Appointment of Interim Class Counsel. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2019)
January 16, 2019 Reset Deadlines as to #12 MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases , See Docket No. #16 : Responses due by 2/7/2019 and Replies due by 2/28/2019. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2019)
January 15, 2019 Filing 15 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Modifying Briefing Schedule for Plaintiff's Motion for Consolidation and Appointment of Interim Class Counsel; Declaration of Matthew J. Adler in Support filed by Nissan North America, Inc. and Cathy Bashaw (Adler, Matthew) (Filed on 1/15/2019) Modified on 1/16/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #11 Motion to Relate Case to 18-cv-7815-DMR. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2019)
January 9, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION to Extend Deadline for Defendant Nissan North America, Inc. to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Cathy Bashaw and Nissan North America, Inc. (Smith, Joel) (Filed on 1/9/2019) Modified on 1/10/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
January 3, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Appoint Counsel , MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Cathy Bashaw. Motion Hearing set for 3/14/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Responses due by 1/17/2019. Replies due by 1/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of L. Timothy Fisher, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Fisher, Lawrence) (Filed on 1/3/2019)
December 31, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION to Relate Case filed by Cathy Bashaw. (Smith, Joel) (Filed on 12/31/2018)
December 12, 2018 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE. Notice is hereby given that a Case Management Conference has been set for March 5, 2019, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA. Case Management Statement due by February 26, 2019. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:18-cv-07292-HSG. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2018)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by the Executive Committee on 12/11/18. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2018)
December 10, 2018 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2018)
December 7, 2018 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Cathy Bashaw.. (Smith, Joel) (Filed on 12/7/2018)
December 6, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Nissan Motor Co., Ltd., Nissan North America, Inc.. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2018)
December 6, 2018 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/22/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/1/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2018)
December 3, 2018 Filing 4 AMENDED Civil Cover Sheet by Cathy Bashaw. (Smith, Joel) (Filed on 12/3/2018) Modified on 12/6/2018 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
December 3, 2018 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/17/2018. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2018)
December 3, 2018 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect Revision of Civil Cover Sheet used. Current Revision is JS 44 (Rev. 06/17) [err101].Please e-file an Amended Civil Cover Sheet only. Event is lo cated at: Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover Sheet Re:[1-1] Civil Cover Sheet filed by Cathy Bashaw (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2018)
November 30, 2018 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Smith, Joel) (Filed on 11/30/2018)
November 30, 2018 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT; Jury Trial Demanded against Nissan Motor Co., Ltd., Nissan North America, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 0971-12891204.). Filed by Cathy Bashaw. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Smith, Joel) (Filed on 11/30/2018) Modified on 12/6/2018 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bashaw v. Nissan North America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathy Bashaw
Represented By: Joel Dashiell Smith
Represented By: Frederick J. Klorczyk, III
Represented By: Lawrence Timothy Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nissan North America, Inc.
Represented By: Paul Jeffrey Riehle
Represented By: Matthew Jacob Adler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nissan Motor Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?