Grady et al v. Marriott International, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Mark Kleiman and Brian Grady
Defendant: Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, LLC and Marriott International, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2018cv07358
Filed: December 6, 2018
Court: California Northern District Court
0 Judge: Phyllis J Hamilton
1 Judge: Elizabeth D Laporte
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order 14 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING DECISION BY JPML AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #13 Stipulation. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2018)
December 20, 2018 13 Stipulation To Suspend Proceedings Pending Decision By JPML filed by Marriott International, Inc., Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, LLC, Mark Kleiman, Brian Grady. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Chow, Teresa) (Filed on 12/20/2018) Modified on 12/21/2018 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order 12 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by the Executive Committee on 12/20/18.(srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2018)
December 19, 2018 11 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2018)
December 19, 2018 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Marriott International, Inc., Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, LLC.. (Chow, Teresa) (Filed on 12/19/2018)
December 18, 2018 9 Certificate of Interested Entities by Marriott International, Inc., Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Marriott International, Inc., Other Affiliate Mars Merger Sub, LLC for Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, LLC. (Chow, Teresa) (Filed on 12/18/2018)
December 18, 2018 8 Certificate of Interested Entities by Marriott International, Inc., Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, LLC (Chow, Teresa) (Filed on 12/18/2018)
December 10, 2018 7 Summons Issued as to Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, LLC. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2018)
December 10, 2018 6 Summons Issued as to Marriott International, Inc.(aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2018)
December 10, 2018 5 Proposed Summons. (Grover, Eric) (Filed on 12/10/2018)
December 7, 2018 4 Proposed Summons. (Grover, Eric) (Filed on 12/7/2018)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/5/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/12/2019 10:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 12/6/18. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2018)
December 6, 2018 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/20/2018. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2018)
December 6, 2018 1 COMPLAINT Class Action ComplaintAND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; (NO PROCESS); against Marriott International, Inc., Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12904641.). Filed byBrian Grady, Mark Kleiman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Grover, Eric) (Filed on 12/6/2018) Modified on 12/7/2018 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grady et al v. Marriott International, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Kleiman
Represented By: Eric A. Grover
Represented By: Alexander Shahin Vahdat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Grady
Represented By: Eric A. Grover
Represented By: Alexander Shahin Vahdat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, LLC
Represented By: Teresa Carey Chow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marriott International, Inc.
Represented By: Teresa Carey Chow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?