Haley v. Clark Construction Group-California, Inc.
Plaintiff: Lawrence Haley
Defendant: Clark Construction Group-California, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2018cv07542
Filed: December 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2019 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that the Case Management Conference, previously set for March 19, 2019, is continued to March 20, 2019, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m., in in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA. Case Management Statement due by March 13, 2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2019)
January 24, 2019 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE RE Docket No. #7 . The court has reviewed the motion and determined that no cases are related and no reassignments shall occur. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2019)
January 8, 2019 #Electronic filing error. REMINDER TO COUNSEL: Proposed Order missing suffix to Judge's Name. Counsel need not re-file document, but should reference Hon. Judge Haywo od S. Gilliam, Jr. in future filings if they wish to include reference to Judge's full assignment reference. This is a text only docket entry. There is no document associated with this entry. Re: #8 Opposition/Response to Motion filed by Clark Construction Group-California, Inc. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2019)
January 7, 2019 Filing 8 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #7 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Relate Cases ) filed byClark Construction Group-California, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order)(Lawson, Megan) (Filed on 1/7/2019)
January 3, 2019 Filing 7 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Relate Cases filed by Lawrence Haley. Responses due by 1/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Gray, Lateef) (Filed on 1/3/2019)
December 17, 2018 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/12/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/19/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2018) Modified on 12/17/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
December 17, 2018 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Clark Construction Group-California, Inc. re #2 Certificate of Interested Entities, #1 Notice of Removal, Civil Cover Sheet, ECF Registration Information, Filing Procedures, Notice of Lawsuit, Waiver of the Service of Summons, Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction, All Standing Orders (Lawson, Megan) (Filed on 12/17/2018)
December 14, 2018 Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2018)
December 14, 2018 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Clark Construction Group-California, Inc. re #2 Certificate of Interested Entities, #1 Notice of Removal, (Lawson, Megan) (Filed on 12/14/2018)
December 14, 2018 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Clark Construction Group-California, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Clark Construction Group, LLC for Clark Construction Group-California, Inc.. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Lawson, Megan) (Filed on 12/14/2018)
December 14, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Francisco Superior Court. Their case number is CGC-18-570851. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-12929808). Filed byClark Construction Group-California, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lawson, Megan) (Filed on 12/14/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haley v. Clark Construction Group-California, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark Construction Group-California, Inc.
Represented By: Megan M. Lawson
Represented By: Jessica R. Perry
Represented By: Lynne C. Hermle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Haley
Represented By: Adante Pointer
Represented By: John L. Burris
Represented By: Lateef Hasani Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?