Overpeck et al v. Fedex Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Kevin Sterling and Herman Overpeck
Defendant: FedEx Ground Package System, Inc. and Fedex Corporation
Case Number: 4:2018cv07553
Filed: December 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2019 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE TO DEFENDANTS Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 2/15/2019. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2019)
February 1, 2019 Filing 11 PLEASE DISREGARD DOCKET ENTRY #11 DUE TO WRONG ATTACHMENT, PLEASE SEE DOCKET ENTRY #12 INSTEAD FOR THE CORRECT CLERK'S NOTICE. CLERK'S NOTICE TO DEFENDANT Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 2/15/2019. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2019) Modified on 2/1/2019 (ig, COURT STAFF).
January 29, 2019 Filing 10 JOINT STIPULATION to Extend Defendants' Deadline to File an Answer [Local Rule 6-1(a)] filed by FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., Fedex Corporation., Kevin Sterling, and Herman Overpeck (Ahearn, Christopher) (Filed on 1/29/2019) Modified on 1/30/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
January 15, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Herman Overpeck, Kevin Sterling re #8 Clerk's Notice, (Piller, Nathan) (Filed on 1/15/2019)
January 14, 2019 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE: Notice is hereby given to all parties that the Initial Case Management Conference previously set for 3/20/2019 01:30 PM has been rescheduled to 4/3/2019 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. The Joint Case Management Statement is due no later than 3/27/2019. Plaintiff shall serve the Defendants with a copy of this Clerk's Notice and file a proof of service with the court. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2019)
December 27, 2018 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Herman Overpeck, Kevin Sterling.. (Konecky, Joshua) (Filed on 12/27/2018)
December 18, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., Fedex Corporation. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2018)
December 17, 2018 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. (Piller, Nathan) (Filed on 12/17/2018)
December 17, 2018 #Electronic filing error. The Defendants names on the summons must match the defendants names listed on the Complaint exactly. This filing will not be processed by the clerks offi ce.Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #2 Proposed Summons filed by Herman Overpeck, Kevin Sterling (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2018)
December 14, 2018 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Pilot Program for Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 3/ 13/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/20/2019 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2018)
December 14, 2018 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/28/2018. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2018)
December 14, 2018 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Piller, Nathan) (Filed on 12/14/2018)
December 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., Fedex Corporation ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12931902.). Filed byHerman Overpeck, Kevin Sterling. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Piller, Nathan) (Filed on 12/14/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Overpeck et al v. Fedex Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FedEx Ground Package System, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher M. Ahearn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fedex Corporation
Represented By: Christopher M. Ahearn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Sterling
Represented By: Joshua Geoffrey Konecky
Represented By: Nathan Bunnell Piller
Represented By: Jeremy David Pasternak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herman Overpeck
Represented By: Joshua Geoffrey Konecky
Represented By: Nathan Bunnell Piller
Represented By: Jeremy David Pasternak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?