Kerkorian et al v. Nissan North America, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: DAVID TURNER and VAUGHN KERKORIAN
Defendant: Nissan Motor Co., Ltd. and Nissan North America, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2018cv07815
Filed: December 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
0 Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
1 Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2019 Filing 31 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #23 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Transfer Case ) filed byVaughn Kerkorian, David Turner. (Smith, Joel) (Filed on 2/28/2019)
February 26, 2019 Filing 30 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Nissan North America, Inc., Vaughn Kerorian and David Turner. (Riehle, Paul) (Filed on 2/26/2019) Modified on 2/27/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
February 20, 2019 Reset Deadlines as to #23 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Transfer Case , See Docket Nos. #29 : Responses due by 2/28/2019 and Replies due by 3/14/2019. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2019)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #28 Stipulation Modifying Briefing Schedule for Defendant NNA's #23 Motions to Dismiss or Transfer in the Bashaw and Kerkorian Actions. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2019)
February 19, 2019 Filing 28 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Modifying Briefing Schedule for Defendant NNA's Motions to Dismiss or Transfer in the Bashaw and Kerkorian Actions filed by Vaughn Kerkorian, David Turner, and Nissan North America, Inc. (Smith, Joel) (Filed on 2/19/2019) Modified on 2/20/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
February 12, 2019 Filing 27 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Riehle, Paul) (Filed on 2/12/2019)
February 11, 2019 Filing 26 CLERK'S NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that the hearings on the (docket no. 12 on case no. 18-cv-7292-HSG) motion to consolidate and appointment of interim class counsel and the (docket nos. 19 in case no. 18-cv- 7292-HSG and 18 in 18-cv-7815-HSG) motions to dismiss or transfer, previously set for March 14th, are continued to April 11, 2019 before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2019)
February 8, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13077243.) filed by Nissan North America, Inc.. (Cauley, E) (Filed on 2/8/2019)
February 7, 2019 Filing 24 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nissan North America, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Nissan Motor Co., Ltd. for Nissan North America, Inc. (Riehle, Paul) (Filed on 2/7/2019) Modified on 2/8/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
February 7, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss , MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Nissan North America, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 3/14/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Responses due by 2/21/2019. Replies due by 2/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Martin Lambrecht, #2 Declaration of Lori McPherson, #3 Proposed Order)(Riehle, Paul) (Filed on 2/7/2019)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #21 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2019)
January 29, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13042902.) filed by Vaughn Kerkorian, David Turner. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing)(Schlanger, Daniel) (Filed on 1/29/2019)
January 24, 2019 #Electronic filing error. REMINDER TO COUNSEL: Counsel is instructed that all future filings shall bear the initialsHSG immediately after the case number. Re: #19 No tice of Appearance filed by Vaughn Kerkorian (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2019)
January 23, 2019 Filing 20 STIPULATION to Extend Deadline for Defendant Nissan North America, Inc. to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Vaughn Kerkorian, David Turner, and Nissan North America, Inc. (Smith, Joel) (Filed on 1/23/2019) Modified on 1/24/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
January 23, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Jaimie Mak (Mak, Jaimie) (Filed on 1/23/2019)
January 14, 2019 Filing 18 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE. Notice is hereby given that a Case Management Conference has been set for March 5, 2019, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA. Case Management Statement due by February 26, 2019. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:18-cv-07815-HSG. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2019)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 1/11/2019. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2019)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER RELATING CASE to 18-cv-7292-HSG. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 1/11/2019. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2019) Modified on 1/14/2019 TO CORRECT RELATED CASE NO. (ndrS, COURT STAFF).
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #10 W. Daniel "Dee" Miles, III's Motion for admission Pro Hac Vice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2019)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #9 H. Clay Barnett, III's Motion for admission Pro Hac Vice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2019)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #8 Michael L. Murphy's Motion for admission Pro Hac Vice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2019)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #7 Benjamin L. Bailey's Motion for admission Pro Hac Vice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2019)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #6 Jonathan D. Boggs' Motion for admission Pro Hac Vice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2019)
January 4, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for W.Daniel "Dee" Miles, III ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12971620.) filed by Vaughn Kerkorian, David Turner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Miles, Wilson) (Filed on 1/4/2019)
January 3, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for H. Clay Barnett, III ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12968342.) filed by Vaughn Kerkorian, David Turner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Barnett, H. Clay) (Filed on 1/3/2019)
January 3, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Michael L. Murphy ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12967375.) filed by Vaughn Kerkorian, David Turner. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Murphy, Michael) (Filed on 1/3/2019)
January 3, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Benjamin L. Bailey ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12967368.) filed by Vaughn Kerkorian, David Turner. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Bailey, Benjamin) (Filed on 1/3/2019)
January 3, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Jonathan D. Boggs ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12967362.) filed by Vaughn Kerkorian, David Turner. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Boggs, Jonathan) (Filed on 1/3/2019)
January 2, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Nissan Motor Co., Ltd., Nissan North America, Inc.(jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2019)
December 31, 2018 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/27/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/3/2019 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/31/2018)
December 31, 2018 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/14/2019. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/31/2018)
December 31, 2018 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Fisher, Lawrence) (Filed on 12/31/2018)
December 31, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nissan Motor Co., Ltd., Nissan North America, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12962924.). Filed byVAUGHN KERKORIAN, DAVID TURNER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fisher, Lawrence) (Filed on 12/31/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kerkorian et al v. Nissan North America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID TURNER
Represented By: Lawrence Timothy Fisher
Represented By: Benjamin L. Bailey
Represented By: Daniel Adam Schlanger
Represented By: H. Clay Barnett, III
Represented By: Joel Dashiell Smith
Represented By: Wilson Daniel Miles, III
Represented By: Michael L. Murphy
Represented By: Jonathan David Boggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VAUGHN KERKORIAN
Represented By: Lawrence Timothy Fisher
Represented By: Benjamin L. Bailey
Represented By: Daniel Adam Schlanger
Represented By: H. Clay Barnett, III
Represented By: Joel Dashiell Smith
Represented By: Wilson Daniel Miles, III
Represented By: Michael L. Murphy
Represented By: Jonathan David Boggs
Represented By: Jaimie Mak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nissan Motor Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nissan North America, Inc.
Represented By: Paul Jeffrey Riehle
Represented By: E Paul Cauley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?