Alec Otto v. Nano f/k/a Raiblocks f/k/a Hieusys LLC et al
Plaintiff: James Fabian and Alec Otto
Defendant: B.G. Services SRL f/k/a Bitgrail SRL f/k/a Webcoin Solutions, Francesco "The Bomber" Firano, Nano f/k/a RaiBlocks f/k/a Hieusys, LLC, Zach Shapiro, Colin Lemahieu, Troy Retzer and Mica Busch
Intervenor: Peter Dedes, Matthew Battistini, Craig Clemens, Edward Seimon, Jesse Case, Kadeem Blanchard, Robert Ireland, Michael Oliver, James Supple, Michael Migliero, Kyle Penn and Anan Thamarnan
Case Number: 4:2019cv00054
Filed: January 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2021 Filing 175 NOTICE by James Fabian, Alec Otto NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL (Mah, Rosanne) (Filed on 2/4/2021)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting #173 Administrative Motion for Leave to File an Oversized Joint Discovery Letter Brief. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2021)
January 26, 2021 Filing 173 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Leave to File an Oversized Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by Alec Otto. Responses due by 2/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Donald J. Enright in Support of Administrative Motion, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Administrative Motion)(Enright, Donald) (Filed on 1/26/2021)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER SETTING DEADLINE FOR LETTER BRIEF SUBMISSION AND SETTING HEARING DATE. Discovery Hearing set for 2/16/2021 08:00 AM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 1/25/2021. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2021)
January 22, 2021 Filing 171 RESPONSE re #170 Brief Request by Plaintiff for Telephonic Conference by Mica Busch, Colin Lemahieu, Nano f/k/a RaiBlocks f/k/a Hieusys, LLC, Troy Retzer, Zach Shapiro. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Peter Fox, #2 Exhibit A)(Byrne, Paul) (Filed on 1/22/2021)
January 22, 2021 Filing 170 Brief Request for Teleconference filed byAlec Otto. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Donald J. Enright in Support of Request for Teleconference, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Enright, Donald) (Filed on 1/22/2021)
December 8, 2020 Filing 169 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing one day to TUESDAY, 5/25/2021 AT 2:00 PM. Set/Reset Deadlines as to: #168 Second MOTION to Certify Class. Motion Hearing set for 5/25/2021 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. The 5/24/2021 date is vacated. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.), (Related documents(s) #168 )(fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2020)
December 8, 2020 Filing 168 Second MOTION to Certify Class filed by Alec Otto. Motion Hearing set for 5/24/2021 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 2/26/2021. Replies due by 4/9/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Donald J. Enright in Support of Plaintiff's Renewed Motion for Class Certification, #2 Exhibit A to the Enright Declaration, #3 Exhibit B to the Enright Declaration, #4 Exhibit C to the Enright Declaration, #5 Exhibit D to the Enright Declaration, #6 Declaration of David Silver in Support of Plaintiff's Renewed Motion for Class Certification, #7 Exhibit A to the Silver Declaration, #8 Declaration of John A. Carriel in Support of Plaintiff's Renewed Motion for Class Certification, #9 Exhibit A to the Carriel Declaration, #10 Proposed Order granting Plaintiff's Renewed Motion for Class Certification)(Carriel, John) (Filed on 12/8/2020)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #163 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Jason S. Miller. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2020)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER [*AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT*] by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #165 Stipulation re Revised Class Certification and Discovery Briefing Schedule. Close of Expert Discovery due by 3/26/2021. Renewed Motion for Class Certification filed by 12/8/2020. Responses and Expert Rebuttal due by 2/26/2021. Replies due by 4/9/2021. Class Certification Motion Hearing set for 5/24/2021 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2020)
November 16, 2020 Filing 165 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re Dkt. 160: Proposed Revised Schedule for Discovery and Class Certification Briefing filed by Alec Otto, Troy Retzer, Mica Busch, Zach Shapiro, and colin Lemahieu. (Enright, Donald) (Filed on 11/16/2020) Modified on 11/17/2020 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
November 9, 2020 Filing 164 AMENDED ANSWER to the First Supplemental Complaint byMica Busch, Colin Lemahieu, Nano f/k/a RaiBlocks f/k/a Hieusys, LLC, Troy Retzer, Zach Shapiro. (Byrne, Paul) (Filed on 11/9/2020)
November 5, 2020 Filing 163 Amended MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15152689.) Filing fee previously paid on 11/04/2020 filed by Alec Otto. (Miller, Jason) (Filed on 11/5/2020)
November 4, 2020 Filing 162 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15152689.) filed by Alec Otto. (Miller, Jason) (Filed on 11/4/2020)
November 2, 2020 Filing 161 NOTICE and Supplement To Dkt. 58 Amended Complaint Re Dkt. 160 by Alec Otto (Enright, Donald) (Filed on 11/2/2020) Modified on 11/3/2020 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER : (1) GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW PLAINTIFF JAMES FABIAN AND MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION WITHOUT PREJUDICE; (2) DEEMING WITHDRAWN MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION; AND (3) GRANTING IN PART MOTION TO INTERVENE, LEAVE TO FILE A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT, LEAVE TO AMEND THE CAPTION, AND LEAVE TO FILE A RENEWED MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers; withdrawing #144 Motion to Certify Class; granting #150 Motion to Withdraw ; granting in part #151 Motion to Intervene; granting in part Motion to Amend Caption. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2020)
October 20, 2020 Filing 159 NOTICE re Dkt. 158, Selection of Proposed Plaintiff by Matthew Battistini, Kadeem Blanchard, Jesse Case, Craig Clemens, Peter Dedes, Robert Ireland, Michael Migliero, Michael Oliver, Alec Otto, Kyle Penn, Edward Seimon, James Supple, Anan Thamarnan (Enright, Donald) (Filed on 10/20/2020) Modified on 10/21/2020 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
October 13, 2020 Filing 158 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers: Motion Hearing held via Zoom and submitted on 10/13/2020 re #150 MOTION to Withdraw James Fabian as Plaintiff and Motion for Class Certification Without Prejudice filed by James Fabian, #151 MOTION to Intervene Plaintiffs MOTION for Leave to File a Second Amended Complain filed by James Fabian. Plaintiff to notice by 10/20/2020.Total Time in Court: 37 minutes. Court Reporter: Diane Skillman. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/13/2020)
October 9, 2020 Filing 157 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING as to the Motion Hearing #150 and #151 set for 10/13/2020 02:00 PM before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/ygr Please click the link below to join webinar (public hearings). If you a re a case participant, you will join as an attendee, then you will be brought into the proceeding by court staff.https://cand-uscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1618764848?pwd=bW03Y2NvV0YrK2FQSkxoMXRxOWprQT09Webinar ID: 161 876 4848Password: 715550Local telephone dial-in:US: +1 (669) 254-5252 or +1 (646) 828-7666General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zo om/. Motion Hearing set for 10/13/2020 02:00 PM before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. (Related documents(s) #150 , #151 ) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2020)
September 28, 2020 Filing 156 REPLY (re #151 MOTION to Intervene Plaintiffs MOTION for Leave to File a Second Amended Complain ) filed byCraig Clemens, Anan Thamarnan, Alec Otto, Kyle Penn, James Supple, Michael Migliero, Peter Dedes, Jesse Case, Michael Oliver, Robert Ireland, Edward Seimon, Matthew Battistini, Kadeem Blanchard. (Enright, Donald) (Filed on 9/28/2020)
September 28, 2020 Filing 155 REPLY (re #150 MOTION to Withdraw James Fabian as Plaintiff and Motion for Class Certification Without Prejudice ) filed byJames Fabian. (Enright, Donald) (Filed on 9/28/2020)
September 21, 2020 Filing 154 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #151 MOTION to Intervene Plaintiffs MOTION for Leave to File a Second Amended Complain ) filed byMica Busch, Colin Lemahieu, Nano f/k/a RaiBlocks f/k/a Hieusys, LLC, Troy Retzer, Zach Shapiro. (Byrne, Paul) (Filed on 9/21/2020)
September 21, 2020 Filing 153 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #150 MOTION to Withdraw James Fabian as Plaintiff and Motion for Class Certification Without Prejudice ) filed byMica Busch, Colin Lemahieu, Nano f/k/a RaiBlocks f/k/a Hieusys, LLC, Troy Retzer, Zach Shapiro. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Peter Scoolidge)(Byrne, Paul) (Filed on 9/21/2020)
September 9, 2020 Filing 152 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING MOTION HEARING DATE AS TO MOTIONS AT Dkt. Nos. 150 and 151. Set/Reset Deadlines as to #151 MOTION to Intervene ; Plaintiffs MOTION for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint, #150 MOTION to Withdraw James Fabian as Plaintiff and Motion for Class Certification Without Prejudice. Motion Hearing set for Tuesday, 10/13/2020 02:00 PM via Zoom before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Zoom link information will be posted on the docket in advance of the hearing. Zoom link information is also on the Judge's page on the court website: www.cand.uscourts.gov (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.), (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2020)
September 7, 2020 Filing 151 MOTION to Intervene Plaintiffs, MOTION for Leave to Amend Complaint and Case Caption; Leave to File Renewed Motion for Class Certification filed by James Fabian. Responses due by 9/21/2020. Replies due by 9/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Donald J. Enright in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Intervene; Leave to Amend Complaint and Case Caption; Leave to File Renewed Motion for Class Certification, #2 Exhibit A_Proposed Second Amended Class Action Complaint, #3 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion to Intervene; Leave to Amend Complaint and Case Caption; Leave to File Renewed Motion for Class Certification)(Enright, Donald) (Filed on 9/7/2020) Modified on 9/8/2020 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
September 7, 2020 Filing 150 MOTION to Withdraw James Fabian as Plaintiff and Motion for Class Certification Without Prejudice filed by James Fabian. Responses due by 9/21/2020. Replies due by 9/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Donald J Enright In Support of Lead Plaintiff's Motion to Withdraw Without Prejudice, #2 Exhibit A_Declaration of James Fabian In Support of Motion to Withdraw Without Prejudice, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Lead Plaintiff's Motion to Withdraw Without Prejudice)(Enright, Donald) (Filed on 9/7/2020)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER : (1) SUA SPONTE RELATING CLEMENS ACTION; (2) DENYING MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE; AND (3) DISMISSING WITHOUT PREJUDICE CLEMENS ACTION by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying #143 Motion to Consolidate Cases. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2020)
August 24, 2020 Filing 148 REPLY (re #143 MOTION to Consolidate Cases ) filed byJames Fabian. (Enright, Donald) (Filed on 8/24/2020)
August 17, 2020 Filing 147 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #143 MOTION to Consolidate Cases ) filed byMica Busch, Colin Lemahieu, Nano f/k/a RaiBlocks f/k/a Hieusys, LLC, Troy Retzer, Zach Shapiro. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Peter Fox)(Byrne, Paul) (Filed on 8/17/2020)
August 5, 2020 Filing 146 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING MOTION HEARING DATE FOR DKT. NO. 143. #143 MOTION to Consolidate Cases : Motion Hearing set for 9/8/2020 02:00 PM By Zoom before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.), Set/Reset Deadlines as to (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2020)
August 4, 2020 Filing 145 NOTICE re Filing of Expert Disclosure Class Certification Opposition by Mica Busch, Colin Lemahieu, Nano f/k/a RaiBlocks f/k/a Hieusys, LLC, Troy Retzer, Zach Shapiro re #118 Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11,, (Byrne, Paul) (Filed on 8/4/2020) Modified on 8/5/2020 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
August 4, 2020 Filing 144 MOTION to Certify Class filed by James Fabian. Motion Hearing set for 1/12/2021 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 10/20/2020. Replies due by 12/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Donald J. Enright In Support Of Motion For Class Certification, #2 Exhibit A-O_Client Declarations, #3 Exhibit P-1 and P-2, #4 Exhibit Q_Expert Report of David Weisberger, #5 Exhibit R_Levi & Korsinsky Firm Resume, #6 Declaration of David Silver In Support of Motion For Class Certification, #7 Exhibit S_Silver Miller Firm Resume, #8 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Class Certification)(Enright, Donald) (Filed on 8/4/2020)
August 3, 2020 Filing 143 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by James Fabian. Responses due by 8/17/2020. Replies due by 8/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Donald J. Enright in Support of Lead Plaintiff's Motion to Consolidate, #2 Exhibit A_Related Action Complaint, #3 Proposed Order Granting Lead Plaintiff's Motion to Consolidate)(Enright, Donald) (Filed on 8/3/2020)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER (1) DENYING MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM NON-DISPOSITIVE PRETRIAL ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE; AND (2) GRANTING-IN-PART AND DENYING-IN-PART UNOPPOSED ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AN OVERSIZED BRIEF by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers; denying #128 Motion ; granting in part and denying in part #139 Administrative Motion. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2020)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting #140 Stipulation. (sklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2020)
July 29, 2020 Filing 140 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Remote Depositions filed by Mica Busch, Colin Lemahieu, Nano f/k/a RaiBlocks f/k/a Hieusys, LLC, Troy Retzer, Zach Shapiro and James Fabian. (Byrne, Paul) (Filed on 7/29/2020) Modified on 7/30/2020 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
July 28, 2020 Filing 139 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Leave To File Oversized Brief In Support Of Forthcoming Motion For Class Certification filed by James Fabian. Responses due by 8/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations) Stipulation Consenting to Oversized Brief and Proposed Order)(Enright, Donald) (Filed on 7/28/2020)
July 23, 2020 Filing 138 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim: Motion Hearing Re: #134 Discovery Letter Brief by Zoom held on 7/23/2020. The Court DENIES the motion to compel further production of documents as MOOT. The Court DENIES the motion to compel further responses to interrogatories, as Plaintiff has represented that the answers are complete. The Court DENIES the request by Defendants to force Plaintiff to categorize the documents by request for production. (Zoom Recording Time: 9:32-9:53.) Attorney for Plaintiff: Peter Fox. Attorney for Defendants: Donald Enright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/23/2020)
July 21, 2020 Filing 137 REPLY (re #128 MOTION for Relief from Nondispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge (Dkt. No. 122) ) filed byJames Fabian. (Enright, Donald) (Filed on 7/21/2020)
July 17, 2020 Filing 136 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Notice is given that a Motion Hearing Re: #134 Joint Discovery Letter Brief is set for 7/23/2020 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. For Zoom connection, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/This proceeding will be a Zoom video conferencing webinar. PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III.Case participants may also receive an email invitation from the court with different information which should be followed.All counsel, members of the public and press please click the link or use the information below to join the webinar: https://cand-uscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1606612971?pwd=U0o4Z3FmSU4zcmE1MjMzMjN5dllEdz09Meeting ID: 160 661 2971Password: 028445Dial by your location+1 929 205 6099 US (New York)+1 253 215 8782 US+1 301 715 8592 US+1 312 626 6799 US (Chicago)+1 346 248 7799 US (Houston)+1 669 900 6833 US (San Jose)Find your local number: https://zoom.us/u/ac4JkPfcjoFor important information and guidance on technical preparation, please see #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2020)
July 16, 2020 Filing 135 Declaration of Peter J Fox in Support of #134 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed byMica Busch, Colin Lemahieu, Nano f/k/a RaiBlocks f/k/a Hieusys, LLC, Troy Retzer, Zach Shapiro. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Related document(s) #134 ) (Byrne, Paul) (Filed on 7/16/2020)
July 16, 2020 Filing 134 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by Mica Busch, Colin Lemahieu, Nano f/k/a RaiBlocks f/k/a Hieusys, LLC, Troy Retzer, Zach Shapiro. (Byrne, Paul) (Filed on 7/16/2020)
July 14, 2020 Filing 133 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #128 MOTION for Relief from Nondispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge (Dkt. No. 122) ) filed byMica Busch, Colin Lemahieu, Nano f/k/a RaiBlocks f/k/a Hieusys, LLC, Troy Retzer, Zach Shapiro. (Byrne, Paul) (Filed on 7/14/2020)
July 1, 2020 Filing 132 FIRST AMENDED ANSWER by Mica Busch, Colin Lemahieu, Nano f/k/a RaiBlocks f/k/a Hieusys, LLC, Troy Retzer, Zach Shapiro. (Byrne, Paul) (Filed on 7/1/2020) Modified on 7/2/2020 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
July 1, 2020 Filing 131 Lead Plaintiff's Report of Class Certification Expert Witnesses and Summary of Anticipated Expert Testimony Pertaining to Class Certification by James Fabian. (Enright, Donald) (Filed on 7/1/2020) Modified on 7/2/2020 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
July 1, 2020 Filing 130 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by James Fabian Notice of Service of Process on B.G. Services, S.R.L. and Francesco Firano (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Donald J. Enright In Support of Service of Process on B.G. Services, S.R.L. and Francesco Firano, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Enright, Donald) (Filed on 7/1/2020)
June 30, 2020 Filing 129 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING HEARING DATE ON MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM NONDISPOSITIVE ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Set/Reset Deadlines as to #128 MOTION for Relief from Nondispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge (Dkt. No. 122). Motion Hearing set for 8/4/2020 02:00 PM before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Hearing will be held via the Court's Zoom platform. Information will be posted on the docket in advance of the hearing. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.), (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2020)
June 30, 2020 Filing 128 MOTION for Relief from Nondispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge (Dkt. No. 122) filed by James Fabian. Responses due by 7/14/2020. Replies due by 7/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Lead Plaintiff's Motion for Relief from Nondispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge)(Enright, Donald) (Filed on 6/30/2020)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER : (1) GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO EFFECT ALTERNATIVE SERVICE; (2) GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION TO STRIKE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES RAISED IN THE ANSWER; (3) DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FORUM NON CONVENIENS by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers; granting #81 Motion ; granting in part and denying in part #84 Motion to Strike ; denying #85 Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 7/3/2020. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2020)
June 19, 2020 Filing 126 CLERK'S NOTICE Vacating Hearing: Based on Plaintiff's Notice of withdrawal at docket no. #124 the motion hearing set for 6/22/2020 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim is vacated. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2020)
June 19, 2020 Filing 125 NOTICE by James Fabian of Service of Motion to Compel (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Donald J. Enright in Support of Notice of Service of Motion to Compel, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Enright, Donald) (Filed on 6/19/2020)
June 17, 2020 Filing 124 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion 114 to Compel Third Party Discovery (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Donald J. Enright In Support of Lead Plaintiff's Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Compel Third Party Discovery from Bank of America, #2 Exhibit A_Proof of Service on Bank of America)(Enright, Donald) (Filed on 6/17/2020)
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER REGARDING SERVICE OF MOTION TO COMPEL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 6/16/2020. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2020)
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim denying #117 Discovery Letter Brief. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2020)
June 16, 2020 Filing 121 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING: Notice is given that the Motion Hearing Re: #114 Motion to Compel set for 6/22/2020 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim will be a Zoom video conferencing webinar. PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III.Case participants may also receive an email invitation from the court with different information which should be followed.All counsel, members of the public and press please click the link or use the information below to join the webinar: https://cand-uscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1605940117?pwd=a1BVMVNUWWJ1WWFGYmNsUzFTYnVTZz09Meeting ID: 160 594 0117Password: 566046Dial by your location+1 929 205 6099 US (New York)+1 253 215 8782 US+1 301 715 8592 US+1 312 626 6799 US (Chicago)+1 346 248 7799 US (Houston)+1 669 900 6833 US (San Jose)Find your local number: https://zoom.us/u/ac4JkPfcjoFor important information and guidance on technical preparation, please see #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mklS, COURT STAFF) ( Filed on 6/16/2020)
May 29, 2020 Filing 120 NOTICE OF REFERRAL FOR DISCOVERY. Motion Hearing Re: #114 MOTION to Compel Third Party Discovery set for 6/22/2020 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 5/29/2020. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2020)
May 28, 2020 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim for Discovery (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2020)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for all Discovery purposes, including REFERRING MOTION: #117 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by James Fabian, #114 MOTION to Compel Third Party Discovery filed by James Fabian. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 5/27/2020. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2020)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting in part and denying in part #109 Administrative Motion for Relief for a Continuance of Deadlines; Revised Pretrial Order. Close of Expert Discovery due by 12/1/2020. Motion for Class Certification filed by 8/4/2020. Opening Reports due by 8/4/2020. Rebuttal Reports due by 10/20/2020. Replies due by 12/1/2020. Responses due by 10/20/2020. Class Certification Motion Hearing set for 1/12/2021 02:00 PM before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2020)
May 14, 2020 Filing 117 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by James Fabian. (Carriel, John) (Filed on 5/14/2020)
May 13, 2020 Filing 116 Declaration of Donald Enright Attesting to Proof of Service by James Fabian (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A_Proof of Service on Bank of America, #2 Exhibit B_Fax Confirmation)(Enright, Donald) (Filed on 5/13/2020) Modified on 5/14/2020 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
May 13, 2020 Filing 115 Supplemental Brief re #111 Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11, Order on Motion for Leave to File, #85 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint for Forum Non Conveniens filed byMica Busch, Colin Lemahieu, Nano f/k/a RaiBlocks f/k/a Hieusys, LLC, Troy Retzer, Zach Shapiro. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Supp Evid ISO Defendants' Mtn to Dismiss)(Related document(s) #111 , #85 ) (Byrne, Paul) (Filed on 5/13/2020)
May 11, 2020 Filing 114 MOTION to Compel Third Party Discovery filed by James Fabian. Motion Hearing set for 6/16/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 5/26/2020. Replies due by 6/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Donald J. Enright In Support of Motion to Compel Third Party Discovery, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Third Party Discovery)(Enright, Donald) (Filed on 5/11/2020)
May 11, 2020 Filing 113 RESPONSE to Evidence Submitted by Defendants at Docket Number 106-1 by James Fabian. (Enright, Donald) (Filed on 5/11/2020)
May 4, 2020 Filing 112 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #109 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Continuance to Deadlines Set By Dkt. 80 Minute Entry ) filed byMica Busch, Colin Lemahieu, Nano f/k/a RaiBlocks f/k/a Hieusys, LLC, Troy Retzer, Zach Shapiro. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Peter Fox)(Byrne, Paul) (Filed on 5/4/2020)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #106 Administrative Motion for Leave to File New Evidence; granting #107 Motion for Leave to File Motion to Compel Discovery. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2020)
May 1, 2020 Filing 110 NOTICE Regarding Dkt. No. 80 Class Experts Disclosure by James Fabian (Enright, Donald) (Filed on 5/1/2020) Modified on 5/4/2020 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
April 30, 2020 Filing 109 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Continuance to Deadlines Set By Dkt. 80 Minute Entry filed by James Fabian. Responses due by 5/4/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Donald J. Enright In Support of Administrative Motion for Relief, #2 Exhibit Exhibits A and A-1 to Enright Declaration, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B to Enright Declaration, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C to Enright Declaration, #5 Exhibit Exhibits D and D-1 to Enright Declaration, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E to Enright Declaration, #7 Exhibit Exhibit F to Enright Declaration, #8 Exhibit Exhibit G to Enright Declaration, #9 Exhibit Exhibit H to Enright Declaration, #10 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Administrative Motion for Relief)(Enright, Donald) (Filed on 4/30/2020)
April 24, 2020 Filing 108 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #106 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION For Leave to File New Evidence ) filed byJames Fabian. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Denying Defendants' Administrative Motion to File New Evidence)(Enright, Donald) (Filed on 4/24/2020)
April 22, 2020 Filing 107 MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Compel Discovery filed by James Fabian. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Donald J. Enright in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Enright, Donald) (Filed on 4/22/2020) Modified on 4/23/2020 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
April 20, 2020 Filing 106 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION For Leave to File New Evidence re #85 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint for Forum Non Conveniens filed by Mica Busch, Colin Lemahieu, Nano f/k/a RaiBlocks f/k/a Hieusys, LLC, Troy Retzer, Zach Shapiro. Responses due by 4/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Peter Fox, #2 Declaration of Monica Iacoviello, #3 Proposed Order)(Byrne, Paul) (Filed on 4/20/2020) Modified on 4/21/2020 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
March 24, 2020 Filing 105 NOTICE of Change of Firm Affiliation and Change of Address for John A Carriel by James Fabian (Carriel, John) (Filed on 3/24/2020) Modified on 3/25/2020 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 104 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #103 Stipulation. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2020)
February 18, 2020 Filing 103 [Proposed] STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by James Fabian, Colin Lemahieu, Troy Retzer, Mica Busch, and Zach Shapiro. (Enright, Donald) (Filed on 2/18/2020) Modified on 2/19/2020 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
February 11, 2020 Filing 102 OBJECTIONS to re #101 Request for Judicial Notice by Mica Busch, Colin Lemahieu, Nano f/k/a RaiBlocks f/k/a Hieusys, LLC, Troy Retzer, Zach Shapiro. (Scoolidge, Peter) (Filed on 2/11/2020)
February 10, 2020 Filing 101 Request for Judicial Notice re #95 Objection filed byJames Fabian. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #95 ) (Enright, Donald) (Filed on 2/10/2020)
February 7, 2020 Filing 100 Transcript of Proceedings held on November 18, 2019, before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Court Reporter Raynee H. Mercado, CSR, telephone number 510-565-7228, cacsr8258@gmail.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #83 Transcript Order, ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/7/2020. (Related document(s) #83 ) (rhm) (Filed on 2/7/2020)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER VACATING HEARING. The hearing set for February 11, 2020 is VACATED. In light of this Order the #96 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for a Continuance of the February 11, 2020 Hearing re #84 MOTION to Strike, #85 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 2/5/2020. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2020)
February 3, 2020 Filing 98 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE re #95 OBJECTIONS filed by Mica Busch, Colin Lemahieu, Nano f/k/a RaiBlocks f/k/a Hieusys, LLC, Troy Retzer, Zach Shapiro. (Scoolidge, Peter) (Filed on 2/3/2020) Modified on 2/4/2020 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
February 3, 2020 Filing 97 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #96 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for a Continuance of Hearing on #84 MOTION to Strike, #85 Motion to Dismiss ) filed byMica Busch, Colin Lemahieu, Nano f/k/a RaiBlocks f/k/a Hieusys, LLC, Troy Retzer, Zach Shapiro. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Fox Declaration, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Scoolidge, Peter) (Filed on 2/3/2020)
January 30, 2020 Filing 96 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for a Continuance of Hearing on #84 MOTION to Strike, #85 Motion to Dismiss filed by James Fabian. Responses due by 2/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Enright, Donald) (Filed on 1/30/2020) Modified on 1/31/2020 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 1/31/2020 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
January 29, 2020 Filing 95 OBJECTIONS to Improper Reply Evidence and Arguments Pursuant to Local Rule 7-3(d)(1) re #94 Reply to Opposition/Response,, #93 Exhibits by James Fabian. (Enright, Donald) (Filed on 1/29/2020) Modified on 1/30/2020 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
January 22, 2020 Filing 94 REPLY (re #85 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint for Forum Non Conveniens ) filed byMica Busch, Colin Lemahieu, Nano f/k/a RaiBlocks f/k/a Hieusys, LLC, Troy Retzer, Zach Shapiro. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Fox Declaration, #2 Declaration Retzer Declaration, #3 Declaration LeMahieu Declaration, #4 Declaration Busch Declaration, #5 Declaration Shapiro Declaration, #6 Declaration Sbisa Declaration, #7 Declaration LawLinguist Declaration)(Scoolidge, Peter) (Filed on 1/22/2020)
January 21, 2020 #Electronic filing error. No title page re #93 EXHIBITS re #85 -2 Declaration of M.Lacoviello filed by Mica Busch, Colin Lemahieu, Nano f/k/a RaiBlocks f/k/a Hieusys, LLC, Troy Retzer, Zach Shapiro. Please refer to Civil Local Rules 3-4 re first page requirement. Counsel need not re-file the document, but should comply on future filings. (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2020)
January 17, 2020 Filing 93 EXHIBITS re #85 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint for Forum Non Conveniens re Declaration of M.Lacoviello # 85-2 filed byMica Busch, Colin Lemahieu, Nano f/k/a RaiBlocks f/k/a Hieusys, LLC, Troy Retzer, Zach Shapiro. (Related document(s) #85 ) (Byrne, Paul) (Filed on 1/17/2020)
January 16, 2020 Filing 92 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing as to Motion to Strike [Dkt. no. 84].The Motion to Strike Hearing previously noticed for 2/4/2020 is CONTINUED to Tuesday, 2/11/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. The 2/4/2020 hearing date is VACATED. Set/Reset Deadlines as to #84 MOTION to Strike #70 Answer to Amended Complaint. (Related documents(s) #84 ). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
January 15, 2020 Filing 91 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #85 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint for Forum Non Conveniens ) filed byJames Fabian. (Enright, Donald) (Filed on 1/15/2020)
January 13, 2020 Filing 90 REPLY (re #84 MOTION to Strike #70 Answer to Amended Complaint ) filed byJames Fabian. (Enright, Donald) (Filed on 1/13/2020)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER VACATING HEARING. The hearing set for January 14, 2020 is VACATED. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 1/10/2020. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2020)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #87 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Devon Galloway. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2020)
January 7, 2020 Filing 87 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Devon Galloway ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14045562.) filed by Zach Shapiro. (Galloway, Devon) (Filed on 1/7/2020) Modified on 1/8/2020 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
January 6, 2020 Filing 86 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #84 MOTION to Strike #70 Answer to Amended Complaint ) filed byMica Busch, Colin Lemahieu, Nano f/k/a RaiBlocks f/k/a Hieusys, LLC, Troy Retzer, Zach Shapiro. (Scoolidge, Peter) (Filed on 1/6/2020)
December 23, 2019 Filing 85 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint for Forum Non Conveniens, filed by Mica Busch, Colin Lemahieu, Nano f/k/a RaiBlocks f/k/a Hieusys, LLC, Troy Retzer, Zach Shapiro. Motion Hearing set for 2/11/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 1/15/2020. Replies due by 1/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Caiazza Declaration, #2 Declaration Iacoviello Declaration, #3 Declaration Belmont Declaration, #4 Declaration Scoolidge Declaration, #5 Declaration Weg Declaration, #6 Declaration LeMahieu-Hieusys Declaration, #7 Declaration Retzer Declaration, #8 Declaration Busch Declaration, #9 Declaration Shapiro Declaration)(Scoolidge, Peter) (Filed on 12/23/2019) Modified on 12/26/2019 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
December 23, 2019 Filing 84 MOTION to Strike #70 Answer to Amended Complaint filed by James Fabian. Motion Hearing set for 2/4/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 1/6/2020. Replies due by 1/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses, #2 Proposed Order)(Enright, Donald) (Filed on 12/23/2019)
December 23, 2019 Filing 83 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/18/2020 before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers by Mica Busch, Colin Lemahieu, Nano f/k/a RaiBlocks f/k/a Hieusys, LLC, Troy Retzer, Zach Shapiro, for Court Reporter Raynee Mercado. (Byrne, Paul) (Filed on 12/23/2019)
November 27, 2019 Filing 82 Notice of Withdrawal as Counsel by Zach Shapiro. (Garcia, Vanessa) (Filed on 11/27/2019) Modified on 11/27/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
November 26, 2019 Filing 81 MOTION for Leave to Effect Alternative Service on Defendants Francesco Firano and BG Services, S.R.L. filed by James Fabian. Motion Hearing set for 1/14/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 12/13/2019. Replies due by 12/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Effect Alternative Service, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Proposed Order)(Enright, Donald) (Filed on 11/26/2019) Modified on 11/27/2019 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
November 18, 2019 Filing 80 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers: Initial Case Management Conference held on 11/18/2019. Re Class Certification: Close of Expert Discovery due by 9/30/2020. Motion for Alternative Service filed by 11/27/2019. Responses due by 12/13/2019. Replies due by 12/20/2019. Motion Hearing set for 1/14/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Rebuttal Reports due by 8/17/2020. Opening Reports due by 6/2/2020. Defense to file Motion re Forum Non Conveniens by 12/23/19. Opposition filed 1/15/2020. Reply filed 1/22/2020.Hearing set for 2/11/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Class Certification Motion filed 6/2/2020. Opposition filed 8/17/2020. Reply filed 9/30/2020. Class Certification Motion Hearing set for 10/20/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers.Total Time in Court: 42 minutes. Court Reporter: Raynee Mercado. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/18/2019)
November 17, 2019 Filing 79 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Enright, Donald) (Filed on 11/17/2019)
November 14, 2019 Filing 78 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options filed by Defendants Hieusys, LLC, Colin LeMahieu, Troy Retzer, Mica Busch and Zack Shapiro (Byrne, Paul) (Filed on 11/14/2019)
November 14, 2019 Filing 77 Joint Certification of Interested Entities or Persons. Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Mica Busch, Colin Lemahieu, Nano f/k/a RaiBlocks f/k/a Hieusys, LLC, Troy Retzer, Zach Shapiro (Byrne, Paul) (Filed on 11/14/2019) Modified on 11/15/2019 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #74 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to David C. Silver. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2019)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #71 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Donald J. Enright. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2019)
November 12, 2019 Filing 74 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice David C. Silver ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13881174.) filed by James Fabian. (Silver, David) (Filed on 11/12/2019) Modified on 11/13/2019 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
November 11, 2019 Filing 73 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by James Fabian, Zach Shapiro. (Mah, Rosanne) (Filed on 11/11/2019) Modified on 11/11/2019 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
November 11, 2019 Filing 72 NOTICE of Change of Address by Rosanne L. Mah (Mah, Rosanne) (Filed on 11/11/2019)
November 11, 2019 Filing 71 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Donald J. Enright ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13876376.) filed by James Fabian. (Enright, Donald) (Filed on 11/11/2019) Modified on 11/12/2019 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
October 25, 2019 Filing 70 ANSWER to Amended Complaint byMica Busch, Colin Lemahieu, Nano f/k/a RaiBlocks f/k/a Hieusys, LLC, Troy Retzer, Zach Shapiro. (Scoolidge, Peter) (Filed on 10/25/2019)
October 23, 2019 Filing 69 Transcript of Proceedings held on 09/24/19, before Judge Gonzalez Rogers. Court Reporter Pamela Batalo Hebel, telephone number 626-688-7509; pamela_batalo-hebel@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #68 Transcript Order, ) Redaction Request due 11/13/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/25/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/21/2020. (Related documents(s) #68 ) (Batalo, Pam) (Filed on 10/23/2019)
October 15, 2019 Filing 68 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 9/24/2019 before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers by Mica Busch, Colin Lemahieu, Nano f/k/a RaiBlocks f/k/a Hieusys, LLC, Troy Retzer, Zach Shapiro, for Court Reporter Pam Batalo. (Byrne, Paul) (Filed on 10/15/2019)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER SETTING RESPONSE DEADLINE AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Defendants' answer to plaintiff's remaining claims filed by 10/25/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for Monday, 11/18/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 11/11/2019. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 10/9/2019. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2019)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting in part and denying in part #60 Motion to Dismiss. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2019)
September 24, 2019 Filing 65 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers: Motion Hearing re Dkt. no. 60 held and submitted on 9/24/2019. Total Time in Court: 1:14. Court Reporter: Pam Hebel. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/24/2019)
September 5, 2019 Filing 64 REPLY (re #60 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint ) filed byMica Busch, Colin Lemahieu, Nano f/k/a RaiBlocks f/k/a Hieusys, LLC, Troy Retzer, Zach Shapiro. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Monica Iacoviello)(Byrne, Paul) (Filed on 9/5/2019)
August 29, 2019 Filing 63 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #60 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint ) filed byJames Fabian. (Carriel, John) (Filed on 8/29/2019)
August 16, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #60 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. Responses due by 8/29/2019. Replies due by 9/5/2019. Motion Hearing set for 9/24/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2019)
August 16, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101] This is not a motion. The correct event is Civil Events > Motions and Related Filings > Other Supporting Documents > Memorandum in Support. Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. #60 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Mica Busch, Colin Lemahieu, Nano f/k/a RaiBlocks f/k/a Hieusys, LLC, Troy Retzer, Zach Shapiro. Modified on 8/16/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
August 15, 2019 Filing 62 Proposed Order re #60 Motion to Dismiss by Mica Busch, Colin Lemahieu, Nano f/k/a RaiBlocks f/k/a Hieusys, LLC, Troy Retzer, Zach Shapiro. (Byrne, Paul) (Filed on 8/15/2019) Modified on 8/16/2019 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
August 15, 2019 Filing 61 NOTICE of Hearing re #60 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Mica Busch, Colin Lemahieu, Nano f/k/a RaiBlocks f/k/a Hieusys, LLC, Troy Retzer, Zach Shapiro (Byrne, Paul) (Filed on 8/15/2019) Modified on 8/16/2019 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
August 15, 2019 Filing 60 MOTION/Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Defendants Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint filed by Mica Busch, Colin Lemahieu, Nano f/k/a RaiBlocks f/k/a Hieusys, LLC, Troy Retzer, Zach Shapiro. Motion Hearing set for 9/24/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 8/29/2019. Replies due by 9/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Byrne, Paul) (Filed on 8/15/2019) Modified on 8/16/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/16/2019 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
August 15, 2019 Filing 59 ***FILED IN ERROR*** MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Mica Busch, Colin Lemahieu, Nano f/k/a RaiBlocks f/k/a Hieusys, LLC, Troy Retzer, Zach Shapiro. Motion Hearing set for 9/24/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 8/29/2019. Replies due by 9/5/2019. (Byrne, Paul) (Filed on 8/15/2019) Modified on 8/16/2019 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
July 25, 2019 Filing 58 FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed by James Fabian. (Mah, Rosanne) (Filed on 7/25/2019) Modified on 7/26/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
July 25, 2019 Filing 57 Transcript of Proceedings held on June 25, 2019, before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Court Reporter Raynee H. Mercado, CSR, telephone number 510-565-7228, cacsr8258@gmail.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #54 Transcript Order, #55 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/16/2019. (Related document(s) #54 , #55 ) (rhm) (Filed on 7/25/2019)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #33 Motion to Dismiss with leave to amend. Amended Pleadings due by 7/25/2019. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2019)
July 3, 2019 Filing 55 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 06/25/2019 before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers by James Fabian, for Court Reporter Raynee Mercado. (Carriel, John) (Filed on 7/3/2019)
June 28, 2019 Filing 54 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on June 25, 2019 before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers by Mica Busch, Colin Lemahieu, Nano f/k/a RaiBlocks f/k/a Hieusys, LLC, Troy Retzer, Zach Shapiro, for Court Reporter Raynee Mercado. (Byrne, Paul) (Filed on 6/28/2019)
June 25, 2019 Filing 53 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers: Motion Hearing held on 6/25/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 7/25/2019. Responses due 3 weeks from filing of the Amended Complaint: by 8/15/2019.Total Time in Court: 56 minutes. Court Reporter: Raynee Mercado. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/25/2019)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #48 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Todd Friedman. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #46 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to John S. Carriel. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #45 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Vanessa I. Garcia. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #44 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Shawn P Naunton. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 13, 2019 Filing 48 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13435526.) filed by James Fabian. (Friedman, Todd) (Filed on 6/13/2019)
June 10, 2019 Filing 47 REPLY (re #33 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint ) filed byMica Busch, Colin Lemahieu, Nano f/k/a RaiBlocks f/k/a Hieusys, LLC, Troy Retzer, Zach Shapiro. (Byrne, Paul) (Filed on 6/10/2019)
June 7, 2019 Filing 46 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13418213.) filed by James Fabian. (Carriel, John) (Filed on 6/7/2019)
June 4, 2019 Filing 45 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13406404.) filed by Zach Shapiro. (Garcia, Vanessa) (Filed on 6/4/2019)
June 4, 2019 Filing 44 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13404851.) filed by Zach Shapiro. (Naunton, Shawn) (Filed on 6/4/2019)
May 17, 2019 Filing 43 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #33 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint ) PLAINTIFFS MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS HIEUSYS, LLC, COLIN LEMAHIEU, MICA BUSCH, ZACH SHAPIRO, AND TROY RETZERS MOTION TO DISMISS filed byJames Fabian. (Mah, Rosanne) (Filed on 5/17/2019)
May 14, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #33 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint: Responses due by 5/17/2019. Replies due by 6/10/2019. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2019)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #39 Stipulation Permitting Extension. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2019)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #40 Stipulation for Leave to File Oversize Brief. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2019)
May 10, 2019 Filing 40 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO PLAINTIFFS ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AN OVERSIZE BRIEF IN OPPOSITION TO THE PENDING MOTION TO DISMISS re #33 First MOTION to Dismiss filed by James Fabian, Hieusys, LLC, Colin LeMahieu, Troy Retzer, and Mica Busch . (Mah, Rosanne) (Filed on 5/10/2019) Modified on 5/13/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
May 10, 2019 Filing 39 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER PERMITTING A PLAINTIFF A ONE-WEEK EXTENSION TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS re #33 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by James Fabian and Zach Shapiro. (Mah, Rosanne) (Filed on 5/10/2019) Modified on 5/13/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #24 Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2019)
April 4, 2019 Filing 37 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.In light of the pending Motion to Dismiss the Monday, April 8, 2019 at 2:00 PM Case Management Conference is VACATED. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2019)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #32 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Peter Scoolidge. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2019)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #31 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Peter Fox. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2019)
April 3, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #33 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. Responses due by 5/10/2019. Replies due by 5/31/2019. Motion Hearing set for 6/4/2019 is CONTINUED to Tuesday, 6/25/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2019)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #29 Administrative Motion to Enlarge Page Limitations for Joint Motion. Replies due by 5/31/2019. Responses due by 5/10/2019. Hearing date continued to 6/25/19 at 2:00pm.(fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2019)
March 29, 2019 Filing 33 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Mica Busch, Colin Lemahieu, Nano f/k/a RaiBlocks f/k/a Hieusys, LLC, Troy Retzer, Zach Shapiro. Motion Hearing set for 6/4/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 5/10/2019. Replies due by 5/31/2019. (Attachments: #1 MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS HIEUSYS, LLC, COLIN LEMAHIEU, MICA BUSCH, ZACK SHAPIRO, AND TROY RETZER MOTION TO DISMISS THE COMPLAINT, #2 [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING THE DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS THE COMPLAINT)(Byrne, Paul) (Filed on 3/29/2019)
March 29, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Peter Scoolidge ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13217171.) filed by Mica Busch, Colin Lemahieu, Nano f/k/a RaiBlocks f/k/a Hieusys, LLC, Troy Retzer. (Scoolidge, Peter) (Filed on 3/29/2019)
March 29, 2019 Filing 31 First MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Peter Fox ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13216927.) filed by Mica Busch, Colin Lemahieu, Nano f/k/a RaiBlocks f/k/a Hieusys, LLC, Troy Retzer. (Fox, Peter) (Filed on 3/29/2019)
March 28, 2019 Filing 30 Renotice motion hearing re #29 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Extend Page Limit Unopposed, for Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed byMica Busch, Colin Lemahieu, Nano f/k/a RaiBlocks f/k/a Hieusys, LLC, Troy Retzer, Zach Shapiro. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support, #2 Ex. A, Stipulation and Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #29 ) (Byrne, Paul) (Filed on 3/28/2019)
March 28, 2019 Filing 29 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Extend Page Limit Unopposed, for Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by Mica Busch, Colin Lemahieu, Nano f/k/a RaiBlocks f/k/a Hieusys, LLC, Troy Retzer, Zach Shapiro. Responses due by 3/29/2019. (Byrne, Paul) (Filed on 3/28/2019)
March 28, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Joseph Byrne, Esq for Defendants Hieusys, LLC, Colin LeMahieu, Troy Retzer, Zack Shapiro, and Mica Busch (Byrne, Paul) (Filed on 3/28/2019)
March 15, 2019 REMINDER: Counsel are instructed that all future filings shall bear the initials YGR immediately after the case number Re: #27 Waiver of Service Executed filed by James Fabian (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2019)
March 14, 2019 Filing 27 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by James Fabian. Service waived by Zach Shapiro waiver sent on 1/28/2019, answer due 3/29/2019. (Mah, Rosanne) (Filed on 3/14/2019)
March 12, 2019 #Electronic filing error. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office Re: #26 Proposed Summons filed by James Fabian. Defendant Mica Busch waived service of summons (see document #21 ) (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2019)
March 11, 2019 Filing 26 Proposed Summons. (Mah, Rosanne) (Filed on 3/11/2019)
March 11, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #24 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel. Responses due by 3/22/2019. Replies due by 3/29/2019. Motion Hearing set for 4/16/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2019)
March 8, 2019 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES in Support of re #24 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed byJames Fabian. (Related document(s) #24 ) (Mah, Rosanne) (Filed on 3/8/2019) Modified on 3/10/2019 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
March 8, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed by James Fabian. (Attachments: #1 Declaration , #2 Proposed Order )(Mah, Rosanne) (Filed on 3/8/2019) Modified on 3/10/2019 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
February 7, 2019 REMINDER: Counsel are instructed that all future filings shall bear the initials YGR immediately after the case number. Re: #22 Waiver of Service Executed filed by James Fabian, #23 Waiver of Service Executed filed by James Fabian, #21 Waiver of Service Executed filed by James Fabian. Moving forward, please be sure that the case number is correctly reflected on your documents as 4:19-cv-00054-YGR. (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2019)
February 6, 2019 Filing 23 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by James Fabian. Service waived by Nano f/k/a RaiBlocks f/k/a Hieusys, LLC waiver sent on 1/28/2019, answer due 3/29/2019. (Mah, Rosanne) (Filed on 2/6/2019)
February 6, 2019 Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by James Fabian. Service waived by Colin Lemahieu waiver sent on 1/28/2019, answer due 3/29/2019. (Mah, Rosanne) (Filed on 2/6/2019)
February 6, 2019 Filing 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by James Fabian. Service waived by Mica Busch waiver sent on 1/28/2019, answer due 3/29/2019. (Mah, Rosanne) (Filed on 2/6/2019)
January 14, 2019 #Electronic filing error. No title page. Please refer to Civil Local Rules 3-4 re first page requirement. Please re-file in its entirety re: #20 Notice filed by James Fabian (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2019)
January 11, 2019 Filing 20 ***NO TITLE PAGE. TO BE RE-FILED*** NOTICE by James Fabian PSLRA Notice of Nano f-k-a RaiBlocks lawsuit (Mah, Rosanne) (Filed on 1/11/2019) Modified on 1/14/2019 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
January 7, 2019 Filing 19 Summons Issued as to B.G. Services SRL f/k/a Bitgrail SRL f/k/a Webcoin Solutions, Mica Busch, Francesco "The Bomber" Firano, Colin Lemahieu, Nano f/k/a RaiBlocks f/k/a Hieusys, LLC, Troy Retzer, Zach Shapiro. (Attachments: #1 Lemahieu, #2 Busch, #3 Shapiro, #4 Retzer, #5 BG Services, #6 Firano)(cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2019)
January 7, 2019 Filing 18 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER SEC CLASS ACTION. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras SEC Class Action Notice due by 1/24/2019. Case Management Statement due by 4/1/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/8/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2019)
January 3, 2019 Filing 17 Case assigned to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2019)
January 3, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATION OF REPRESENTATIVE PLAINTIFF PURSUANT TO FEDERAL SECURITIES LAWS by James Fabian (Mah, Rosanne) (Filed on 1/3/2019) Modified on 1/6/2019 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
January 3, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of Counsel CERTIFICATION OF TODD R. FRIEDMAN PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 3-7(d) by Rosanne L. Mah on behalf of James Fabian (Mah, Rosanne) (Filed on 1/3/2019)
January 3, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of Counsel CERTIFICATION OF JASON S. MILLER PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 3-7(d) by Rosanne L. Mah on behalf of James Fabian (Mah, Rosanne) (Filed on 1/3/2019)
January 3, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of Counsel CERTIFICATION OF DAVID C. SILVER PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 3-7(d) by Rosanne L. Mah on behalf of James Fabian (Mah, Rosanne) (Filed on 1/3/2019)
January 3, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of Counsel CERTIFICATION OF JOHN A. CARRIEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 3-7(d) by Rosanne L. Mah on behalf of James Fabian (Mah, Rosanne) (Filed on 1/3/2019)
January 3, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Counsel CERTIFICATION OF DONALD J. ENRIGHT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 3-7(d) by Rosanne L. Mah on behalf of James Fabian (Mah, Rosanne) (Filed on 1/3/2019)
January 3, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Counsel CERTIFICATION OF ROSANNE L. MAH PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 3-7(d) by Rosanne L. Mah on behalf of James Fabian (Mah, Rosanne) (Filed on 1/3/2019)
January 3, 2019 Filing 9 Certificate of Interested Entities by James Fabian (Mah, Rosanne) (Filed on 1/3/2019)
January 3, 2019 Filing 8 Proposed Summons. (Mah, Rosanne) (Filed on 1/3/2019)
January 3, 2019 Filing 7 Proposed Summons. (Mah, Rosanne) (Filed on 1/3/2019)
January 3, 2019 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. (Mah, Rosanne) (Filed on 1/3/2019)
January 3, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. (Mah, Rosanne) (Filed on 1/3/2019)
January 3, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. (Mah, Rosanne) (Filed on 1/3/2019)
January 3, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Mah, Rosanne) (Filed on 1/3/2019)
January 3, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Mah, Rosanne) (Filed on 1/3/2019)
January 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12971128.). Filed byJames Fabian. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mah, Rosanne) (Filed on 1/3/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alec Otto v. Nano f/k/a Raiblocks f/k/a Hieusys LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B.G. Services SRL f/k/a Bitgrail SRL f/k/a Webcoin Solutions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francesco "The Bomber" Firano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nano f/k/a RaiBlocks f/k/a Hieusys, LLC
Represented By: Paul Joseph Byrne, Esq.
Represented By: Peter Scoolidge
Represented By: Peter Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zach Shapiro
Represented By: Paul Joseph Byrne, Esq.
Represented By: Devon Wayne Galloway
Represented By: Shawn P. Naunton
Represented By: Vanessa Isabel Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colin Lemahieu
Represented By: Paul Joseph Byrne, Esq.
Represented By: Peter Scoolidge
Represented By: Peter Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Troy Retzer
Represented By: Paul Joseph Byrne, Esq.
Represented By: Peter Scoolidge
Represented By: Peter Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mica Busch
Represented By: Paul Joseph Byrne, Esq.
Represented By: Peter Scoolidge
Represented By: Peter Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Fabian
Represented By: Rosanne L. Mah
Represented By: John A. Carriel
Represented By: David Chad Silver
Represented By: Donald J. Enright
Represented By: Todd Rapp Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alec Otto
Represented By: Donald J. Enright
Represented By: Jason S. Miller
Represented By: Rosanne L. Mah
Represented By: John A. Carriel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Peter Dedes
Represented By: Donald J. Enright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Matthew Battistini
Represented By: Donald J. Enright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Craig Clemens
Represented By: Donald J. Enright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Edward Seimon
Represented By: Donald J. Enright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Jesse Case
Represented By: Donald J. Enright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Kadeem Blanchard
Represented By: Donald J. Enright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Robert Ireland
Represented By: Donald J. Enright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Michael Oliver
Represented By: Donald J. Enright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: James Supple
Represented By: Donald J. Enright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Michael Migliero
Represented By: Donald J. Enright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Kyle Penn
Represented By: Donald J. Enright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Anan Thamarnan
Represented By: Donald J. Enright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?