Williams v. Equifax Information Services LLC. et al

Plaintiff: Deborah R. Williams
Defendant: Capital One Auto Finance, Inc., Equifax Information Services LLC. and Transunion LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00175
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
0 Judge: Joseph C Spero
1 Judge: Jeffrey S White
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #15 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Heather M. Shumaker. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2019)
March 8, 2019 #Electronic filing error. REMINDER - All future Filings Shall Contain the Correct Case Number and Judge's Initials, 4:19-cv-176-JSW. [err201] Re: #13 Notice of Appearance fil ed by Transunion LLC. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2019)
March 8, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13154025.) filed by Transunion LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate Of Good Standing)(Shumaker, Heather) (Filed on 3/8/2019)
March 7, 2019 Filing 14 Certificate of Interested Entities by Transunion LLC identifying Corporate Parent T. Rowe Price Group, Inc., Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc. for Transunion LLC. (Streza, David) (Filed on 3/7/2019)
March 7, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by David James Streza (Streza, David) (Filed on 3/7/2019)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/20/19. Joint Case Management Statement due by 4/5/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/12/2019 11:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2019)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER, Case reassigned to Judge Jeffrey S. White. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 2/20/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2019)
February 19, 2019 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2019)
February 15, 2019 Filing 9 Certificate of Interested Entities by Deborah R. Williams (Beckom, Christopher) (Filed on 2/15/2019)
February 15, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Deborah R. Williams.. (Beckom, Christopher) (Filed on 2/15/2019)
January 28, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 2/11/2019. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2019)
January 17, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Re: #1 Complaint, filed by Deborah R. Williams. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Please re-file #1 -4 Certification of Intere sted Parties in its entirety as a separate entry. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2019)
January 17, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Capital One Auto Finance, Inc., Equifax Information Services LLC., Transunion LLC. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2019)
January 17, 2019 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/5/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/12/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2019)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero denying #2 Motion to Transfer Case without prejudice. (jcslc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2019)
January 10, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/24/2019. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2019)
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Deborah R. Williams. Motion Hearing set for 1/10/2019 02:00 PM before Judge ABC. Responses due by 1/17/2019. Replies due by 1/24/2019. (Beckom, Christopher) (Filed on 1/10/2019) Modified on 1/17/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against Equifax Information Services, LLC, Transunion, LLC, Capital One Auto Finance, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 0971-12991408.). Filed by Deborah R. Williams. (Attachments: #1 Summons TransUnion, #2 Summons Capital One, #3 Summons Equifax, #4 Notice of Interested Parties, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (Beckom, Christopher) (Filed on 1/10/2019) Modified on 1/17/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Equifax Information Services LLC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Auto Finance, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transunion LLC
Represented By: David James Streza
Represented By: Heather M. Shumaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah R. Williams
Represented By: Christopher Glenn Beckom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?