Denicolo v. The Hertz Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Ronald G Denicolo, Jr. and Michael G. Fox
Defendant: Viking Client Services, Inc., The Hertz Corporation and Viking Client Services, Inc. doing business as Viking Billing Service
Case Number: 4:2019cv00210
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Hixson
Referring Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
2 Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2021 Filing 149 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority/Relevant Issues Before the United States Supreme Court by Viking Client Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Schultz, James) (Filed on 1/5/2021) Modified on 1/6/2021 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
January 5, 2021 Filing 148 NOTICE of Firm Name Change by Viking Client Services, Inc. (Schultz, James) (Filed on 1/5/2021) Modified on 1/6/2021 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
November 17, 2020 Filing 147 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers: Motion Hearing held via Zoom and Submitted on 11/17/2020 re #130 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Michael G. Fox, Ronald G Denicolo, Jr. Total Time in Court: 29 minutes. Court Reporter: Pam Hebel. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/17/2020)
November 17, 2020 Filing 146 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING FOR THE Motion to Certify Class Hearing set for 11/17/2020 02:00 PM via Zoom Webinar Videoconference before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/ygr Please click the link below to jo in webinar (public hearings). If you are a case participant, you will join as an attendee, then you will be brought into the proceeding by court staff.https://cand-uscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1618764848?pwd=bW03Y2NvV0YrK2FQSkxoMXRxOWprQT09Webinar ID: 161 876 4848Password: 715550Local telephone dial-in:US: +1 (669) 254-5252 or +1 (646) 828-7666General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Motion Hearing set for 11/17/2020 02:00 PM via Zoom Webinar Videoconference before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. (Related documents(s) #130 ) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2020)
November 3, 2020 Filing 145 Supplemental memorandum in Support of Class Certification re #141 Order by Ronald G Denicolo, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hack, Christopher) (Filed on 11/3/2020) Modified on 11/4/2020 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
November 3, 2020 Filing 144 Supplemental Brief in Opposition re Motion for Class Certification #141 Order filed by Viking Client Services, Inc.. (Related document(s) #141 ) (Schultz, James) (Filed on 11/3/2020) Modified on 11/4/2020 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying #142 Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2020)
October 19, 2020 Filing 142 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration filed by Viking Client Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Memo for Reconsideration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Declaration)(Schultz, James) (Filed on 10/19/2020)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON CLASS CERTIFICATION AND DIRECTING SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING re #130 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Michael G. Fox, Ronald G Denicolo, Jr. Supplemental Responses due by 11/3/2020. Motion hearing of 10/20/2020 CONTINUED to 11/17/2020 at 2:00pm via Zoom platform. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 10/16/2020. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2020)
October 16, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #130 MOTION to Certify Class : Motion Hearing set for 11/17/2020 02:00 PM by Zoom Webinar Videoconference before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2020)
October 6, 2020 Filing 140 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 05/04/2020 before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers by Ronald G Denicolo, Jr, Michael G. Fox, for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (Belew, Leland) (Filed on 10/6/2020)
October 6, 2020 Filing 139 Transcript of Proceedings held on May 4, 2020, before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Court Reporter Diane E. Skillman, telephone number 925-899-2912, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #138 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/4/2021. (Related documents(s) #138 ) (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 10/6/2020)
October 2, 2020 Filing 138 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 05/04/2020 before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers by Viking Client Services, Inc., for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (Schultz, James) (Filed on 10/2/2020)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying #105 Motion of Defendant Viking for Summary Judgment. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2020)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #132 Motion to Sever and Dismiss Claims Against Hertz without Prejudice to Re-filing in a Separate Proceeding. The hearing set for 9/29/2020 is VACATED.(fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2020)
September 11, 2020 Filing 135 REPLY (re #132 MOTION to Sever or, in the Alternative, Stay Action ) filed byThe Hertz Corporation. (Hauck, Brian) (Filed on 9/11/2020)
September 4, 2020 Filing 134 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE to Hertz's Motion to Sever and Opposition to Stay(re #132 MOTION to Sever or, in the Alternative, Stay Action ) filed by Ronald G Denicolo, Jr, Michael G. Fox. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Belew Declaration in Support of Plaintiffs' Response to Hertz Motion to Sever)(Belew, Leland) (Filed on 9/4/2020) Modified on 9/8/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
August 28, 2020 Filing 133 REPLY (re #130 MOTION to Certify Class ) filed byRonald G Denicolo, Jr, Michael G. Fox. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Leland Belew)(Belew, Leland) (Filed on 8/28/2020)
August 21, 2020 Filing 132 MOTION to Sever or in the Alternative, Stay Action filed by The Hertz Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 9/29/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 9/4/2020. Replies due by 9/11/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John F. Ward, Jr. in Support of The Hertz Corporation's Motion to Sever Claims, or, in the Alternative, Stay Action, #2 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of John F. Ward, Jr., #3 Proposed Order)(Hauck, Brian) (Filed on 8/21/2020) Modified on 8/24/2020 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
July 31, 2020 Filing 131 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #130 MOTION to Certify Class ) filed byViking Client Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Schultz, James) (Filed on 7/31/2020)
July 8, 2020 Filing 130 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Ronald G Denicolo, Jr, Michael G. Fox. Motion Hearing set for 10/20/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 7/22/2020. Replies due by 7/29/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christopher M. Hack, #2 Proposed Order)(Hack, Christopher) (Filed on 7/8/2020)
May 27, 2020 Filing 129 NOTICE OF SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record as to The Hertz Corporation by The Hertz Corporation. (Hauck, Brian) (Filed on 5/27/2020) Modified on 5/28/2020 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
May 4, 2020 Filing 128 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers: Further Case Management Conference held on 5/4/2020. Motion Hearing held on 5/4/2020 re #105 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Viking Client Services, Inc. Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification filed 7/8/2020. Defendant Hertz's Dispositive Motion filed by 8/1/2020. Hearing on Class Certification and summary judgment is set for 10/20/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers.Total Time in Court: 53 minutes. Court Reporter: Diane Skillman. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/4/2020)
May 4, 2020 Filing 127 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice on behalf of The Hertz Corporation ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14433831.) filed by The Hertz Corporation. (Alderdice, Jacob) (Filed on 5/4/2020)
April 30, 2020 Filing 126 CLERKS NOTICE RE CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE SET ON Monday, 5/4/2020 Denicolo v The Hertz Corp. et al. 19-cv-0210-YGRThe Case Management- Conference hearing set in this case on 5/4/2020 will be held by Zoom Webinar at 4:00 PM.The parties also should be prepared to argue the pending motion of Viking Client Services Inc. for summary judgment. Members of the press and public may attend the hearing via webinar at the following link:https://us02web.zoom.us/j/94891230736?pwd=eFJURURiQWt5VFgraGRpdWRKc0FyQT09Password: 535199Or go to: https://zoom.us/join Webinar ID: 948 9123 0736 Password: 535199By Telephone +1 312 626 6799Webinar ID: 948 9123 0736 Password: 535199PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted remote access to court proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings (including those held by telephone or videoconference). See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. Any recording of a court proceeding held by video or teleconference, including screen-shots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the court.Please see [https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] for information on preparing for and participating in a Zoom Webinar. Counsel are instructed to familiarize themselves with and practice Zoom Webinar functions, and to test their internet, video, and audio capabilities prior to the hearing. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2020)
April 30, 2020 Filing 125 CLERK'S NOTICE CHANGING TIME OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE VIA ZOOM TO 4:00PM ON MONDAY 5/4/2020. Further Case Management Conference set for 5/4/2020 04:00 PM. The 1:15pm time is VACATED. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2020)
April 29, 2020 Filing 124 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Scheduling Change as to may 4, 2020 Case Management Conference filed by The Hertz Corporation, Viking Client Services, Inc., Michael G. Fox., and Ronald G. Denicolo, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ward, John) (Filed on 4/29/2020) Modified on 4/30/2020 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
April 29, 2020 Filing 123 CLERKS NOTICE RE CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE SET ON Monday, 5/4/2020 Denicolo v The Hertz Corp. et al. 19-cv-0210-YGRThe Case Management- Conference hearing set in this case on 5/4/2020 will be held by Zoom Webinar at 1:15 PM.The parties also should be prepared to argue the pending motion of Viking Client Services Inc. for summary judgment. Members of the press and public may attend the hearing via webinar at the following link:https://us02web.zoom.us/j/94891230736?pwd=eFJURURiQWt5VFgraGRpdWRKc0FyQT09Password: 535199Or go to: https://zoom.us/join Webinar ID: 948 9123 0736 Password: 535199By Telephone +1 312 626 6799Webinar ID: 948 9123 0736 Password: 535199PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted remote access to court proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings (including those held by telephone or videoconference). See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. Any recording of a court proceeding held by video or teleconference, including screen-shots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the court.Please see [https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] for information on preparing for and participating in a Zoom Webinar. Counsel are instructed to familiarize themselves with and practice Zoom Webinar functions, and to test their internet, video, and audio capabilities prior to the hearing. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2020)
April 29, 2020 Set/Reset Hearing Further Case Management Conference set for 5/4/2020 01:15 PM by Zoom platform. The 2:00pm time is vacated. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2020)
April 27, 2020 Filing 122 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Ronald G Denicolo, Jr, Michael G. Fox., Viking Client Services, Inc., and the Hertz Corporation. (Belew, Leland) (Filed on 4/27/2020) Modified on 4/28/2020 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
April 24, 2020 Filing 121 CLERK'S NOTICE: Given Plaintiffs' notice #120 regarding resolution of the parties' discovery dispute, notice is hereby given to all parties that the 4/29/2020 hearing before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu is VACATED. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2020)
April 24, 2020 Filing 120 NOTICE of Resolution of Discovery Dispute Regarding "Spin Reports" by Ronald G Denicolo, Jr, Michael G. Fox (Belew, Leland) (Filed on 4/24/2020) Modified on 4/27/2020 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER re #112 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by Michael G. Fox, Ronald G. Denicolo, Jr., Viking Client Services, Inc.: By no later than 10:00 a.m. PST on 4/27/2020, Defendant Viking Client Services shall file the two "spin reports" at issue in the parties' joint discovery letter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 4/24/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2020)
April 6, 2020 Filing 118 CLERK'S NOTICE: Notice is hereby given to all parties that Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu has scheduled a telephonic hearing on the joint discovery letter filed on 3/6/2020 #112 through the court's conference line. Parties must dial in to the conference line at least 10 minutes before the start of the calendar. The conference line number is 888-684-8852. The access code is 2071514. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2020) Modified on 4/6/2020 (ig, COURT STAFF).
April 6, 2020 Set/Reset hearing as to #112 Joint Discovery Letter Brief : Telephonic Hearing set for 4/29/2020 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2020)
March 30, 2020 Filing 117 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING APRIL 14, 2020 AT 2:00PM MOTION HEARINGS REGARDING ORDER SUSPENDING IN-PERSON APPEARANCES IN RESPONSE TO CORONAVIRUS (COVID-19)AT DKT. NO. #113 . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2020)
March 25, 2020 Filing 116 REPLY (re #105 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed byViking Client Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit R, #2 Exhibit S, #3 Reply to Separate Statement)(Schultz, James) (Filed on 3/25/2020)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER GRANTING #114 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #105 MOTION for Summary Judgment until March 25, 2020 filed by Viking Client Services, Inc.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 3/17/2020. (ygrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2020)
March 17, 2020 Filing 114 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #105 MOTION for Summary Judgment until March 25, 2020 filed by Viking Client Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Alltmont, Michael) (Filed on 3/17/2020)
March 17, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #105 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Replies due by 3/25/2020. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2020)
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER SUSPENDING IN-PERSON APPEARANCES IN RESPONSE TO CORONAVIRUS (COVID-19). Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 3/12/2020. (ygrlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2020)
March 6, 2020 Filing 112 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by Ronald G Denicolo, Jr, Michael G. Fox. and Viking Client Services, Inc. (Belew, Leland) (Filed on 3/6/2020) Modified on 3/9/2020 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
March 4, 2020 Filing 111 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #105 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed byRonald G Denicolo, Jr, Michael G. Fox. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs' Responsive Separate Statement, #2 Declaration of Leland H. Belew and Exhibits 1-17, #3 Proposed Order Denying Viking Client Services, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment)(Belew, Leland) (Filed on 3/4/2020)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 110 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu denying #102 Discovery Letter Brief. Any joint letter or status report due by 3/6/2020. Signed on 2/14/2020.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2020)
January 30, 2020 Filing 109 EXHIBITS I, K, L, M, N, Q (CD) re #105 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byViking Client Services, Inc.. (Related document(s) #105 ) (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2020)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #106 Stipulated Protective Order. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2020)
January 27, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #105 MOTION for Summary Judgment: Opposition filed by 3/4/2020. Reply filed by 3/18/2020. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2020)
January 27, 2020 Filing 107 Declaration of Leland H. Belew in Support of #106 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Protective Order Pursuant to Judge Ryu's Standing Order, Section 15(b) filed byRonald G Denicolo, Jr, Michael G. Fox. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Belew Declaration)(Related document(s) #106 ) (Belew, Leland) (Filed on 1/27/2020) Modified on 1/28/2020 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
January 27, 2020 Filing 106 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Protective Order filed by Ronald G Denicolo, Jr, Michael G. Fox, The Hertz Corporation, Viking Client Services Inc. (Belew, Leland) (Filed on 1/27/2020) Modified on 1/28/2020 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
January 27, 2020 Filing 105 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Viking Client Services, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 4/14/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by ** 3/4/2020** Replies due by ** 3/18/2020**. (Attachments: #1 Separate Statement Supporting Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Proposed Order)(Schultz, James) (Filed on 1/27/2020) Modified on 1/29/2020 (fs, COURT STAFF).
January 27, 2020 Filing 104 CLERK'S NOTICE: The parties filed a proposed protective order #103 but did not file an accompanying declaration in compliance with the court's Standing Order (section 15). Parties shall re-file their proposed protective order along with the required declaration and/or redline version within seven days of the date of this notice. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2020)
January 24, 2020 Filing 103 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Protective Order filed by Ronald G Denicolo, Jr, Michael G. Fox, Viking Client Services Inc., The Hertz Corporation. (Belew, Leland) (Filed on 1/24/2020) Modified on 1/27/2020 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
January 20, 2020 Filing 102 Discovery Letter Brief filed by Ronald G Denicolo, Jr, Michael G. Fox. (Belew, Leland) (Filed on 1/20/2020)
January 15, 2020 Set Deadlines/Hearings:, Set/Reset Deadlines as to : Defendant Viking's Dispositive Motion/Daubert Motions Hearing set for 4/14/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2020)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 101 CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 1/15/2020. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2020)
January 13, 2020 Filing 100 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers: Further Case Management Conference held on 1/13/2020. Plaintiff's Class Certification Motion filed by 5/15/2020. Defendant Response to Class Certification Motion due by 7/15/2020. Reply filed by 8/14/2020. Class Certification Motion Hearing set for 9/8/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Close of Fact Discovery WITH DEFENDANT HERTZ: 7/1/2020. Discovery and motion cutoffs AS BETWEEN PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT VIKING CLIENT SERVICES REMAINS THE SAME AS PREVIOUSLY ORDERED. [See Dkt. no. 88]. Joint Updated Case Management Statement due by 4/27/2020. Further Case Management Conference set for 5/4/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor.Total Time in Court: 26 minutes. Court Reporter: Raynee Mercado. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/13/2020)
January 10, 2020 Filing 99 CLERK'S NOTICE. Plaintiff Counsel Leland H. Belew shall contact CourtCall at (888) 882-6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic case management conference appearance on Monday, 1/13/2020 at specially set time of 1:00 PM before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. **See text order, docket no. 98 *** (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2020)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #96 Motion for Plaintiff attorney Leland H. Belew to Appear by Telephone for the 1/13/2020 at 1:00pm Case Management Conference in this matter. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2020)
January 9, 2020 Filing 97 Answer to Amended Complaint byThe Hertz Corporation. (Hauck, Brian) (Filed on 1/9/2020)
January 7, 2020 Filing 96 Request and Proposed Order Allowing Telephonic Attendance at CMC by Leland H. Belew by Ronald G Denicolo, Jr, Michael G. Fox. (Andrus, Lori) (Filed on 1/7/2020) Modified on 1/8/2020 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
January 7, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Judge initials are missing Re: #94 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by Michael G. Fox, Ronald G Denicolo, Jr. Counsel need not re-file the doc ument, but should reference the judge initials YGR after the case number on future filings. (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2020)
January 6, 2020 Filing 95 JOINT UPDATED CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Ronald G Denicolo, Jr, Michael G. Fox, Viking Client Services Inc, The Hertz Corporation. (Belew, Leland) (Filed on 1/6/2020) Modified on 1/7/2020 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
January 6, 2020 Filing 94 Certificate of Interested Entities by Ronald G Denicolo, Jr, Michael G. Fox (Belew, Leland) (Filed on 1/6/2020)
December 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #92 Administrative Motion Setting Deadline To File Response To Complaint. Hertz shall file response to Plaintiff's Complaint no later than January 9, 2020. (ygrlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/24/2019)
December 24, 2019 Filing 92 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION For Entry Of Order Setting Deadline To Respond To Plaintiff's Complaint filed by The Hertz Corporation. Responses due by 12/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Hauck, Brian) (Filed on 12/24/2019)
December 23, 2019 Filing 91 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options, filed by The Hertz Corporation (Hauck, Brian) (Filed on 12/23/2019) Modified on 12/26/2019 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
December 18, 2019 Filing 90 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING COMPLIANCE HEARING AND SETTING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Friday, 1/24/2020 at 9:01 AM Compliance Hearing is VACATED. Court sets Further Case Management Conference for Monday, 1/13/2020 at the specially set time of 01:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 1/6/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2019)
December 16, 2019 Filing 89 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Regarding the Status of Arbitration filed by Ronald G Denicolo, Jr., The Hertz Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hack, Christopher) (Filed on 12/16/2019) Modified on 12/17/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #87 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Close of Fact Discovery due by 1/20/2020. Dispositive/Daubert Motions due by 1/27/2020 and Class Certification Motion due by 1/27/2020. Replies due by 3/18/2020. Responses due by 3/4/2020. Dispostive/Daubert/Class Certification Motion Hearing set for 4/14/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2019)
November 21, 2019 Filing 87 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by Viking Client Services, Inc., Michael G. Fox, Ronald G. Denicolo, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Alltmont, Michael) (Filed on 11/21/2019) Modified on 11/21/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 86 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu re: #85 Discovery Letter Brief: the court adopts the proposed production schedule set forth in the parties' 11/6/2019 Discovery Letter Brief. Signed on 11/7/2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2019)
November 6, 2019 Filing 85 Joint Discovery Letter Brief Proposal for Production Deadlines filed by Ronald G Denicolo, Jr, Michael G. Fox, Viking Client Services Inc. (Belew, Leland) (Filed on 11/6/2019) Modified on 11/7/2019 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
November 5, 2019 Filing 84 ANSWER to Amended Complaint byViking Client Services, Inc.. (Alltmont, Michael) (Filed on 11/5/2019)
November 1, 2019 Filing 83 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu: Discovery Hearing #77 held on 11/1/2019. Joint Letter due by 11/6/2019. Court Reporter: Raynee Mercado. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/1/2019)
October 14, 2019 Filing 82 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Exhibits A-L against The Hertz Corporation and Viking Client Services, Inc. Filed by Ronald G Denicolo, Jr. (Belew, Leland) (Filed on 10/14/2019) Modified on 11/1/2019 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER Setting Telephonic Hearing on #77 Joint Discovery Letter Brief: Hearing set for 11/1/2019 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 10/10/2019. (dmrlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2019)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #79 Stipulation and Setting Deadline for Response. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2019)
October 2, 2019 Filing 79 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Granting Plaintiff Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by Ronald G Denicolo, Jr. and Viking Client Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Andrus, Lori) (Filed on 10/2/2019) Modified on 10/3/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
September 27, 2019 Filing 78 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to stay class discovery (Alltmont, Michael) (Filed on 9/27/2019)
September 25, 2019 Filing 77 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by Ronald G Denicolo, Jr. and Viking Client Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Belew, Leland) (Filed on 9/25/2019) Modified on 9/26/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
September 25, 2019 Filing 76 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers: Pre-filing Conference re Summary Judgment held on 9/25/2019.Plaintiff's Motion to Amend filed by 10/2/2019. Responses due by 10/9/2019. Replies due by 10/16/2019. Motion will be submitted on the papers.Total Time in Court: 58 minutes. Court Reporter: Pam Hebel. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/25/2019)
September 25, 2019 Filing 75 MOTION to Stay Class Discovery filed by Viking Client Services, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/5/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 10/9/2019. Replies due by 10/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Alltmont, Michael) (Filed on 9/25/2019)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #73 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Bryan C. Shartle. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2019)
September 20, 2019 Filing 73 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Bryan C. Shartle) ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13723617.) filed by Viking Client Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificat of Good Standing)(Shartle, Bryan) (Filed on 9/20/2019) Modified on 9/23/2019 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu re: #65 Discovery Letter Brief. Signed on 9/17/2019. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2019)
September 12, 2019 Filing 71 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING PRE-FILING CONFERENCE RE SUMMARY JUDGMENT. A Pre-filing Conference re Summary Judgment will be held on Wednesday, 9/25/2019 at 01:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2019)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 70 Notice of Reference and Order re: Discovery Procedures. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 9/10/2019. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2019)
September 9, 2019 Filing 69 Letter from Plaintiff Ronald G. DeNicolo in Response to Letter from Defendant Viking Client Services, Inc. requesting pre-filing conference. (Belew, Leland) (Filed on 9/9/2019)
September 4, 2019 Filing 68 Letter from Viking Client Services, LLC d/b/a Viking Billing Services requesting pre-filing conference. (Alltmont, Michael) (Filed on 9/4/2019)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu for Discovery purposes, including the pending discovery dispute at Dkt. no. 65. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 9/4/2019. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2019)
September 4, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu for Discovery (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2019)
August 29, 2019 Filing 65 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by Ronald G Denicolo, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Plaintiffs' RFPD Set 2)(Belew, Leland) (Filed on 8/29/2019)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER CONTINUING COMPLIANCE HEARING re #63 Statement filed by Ronald G Denicolo, Jr., The Hertz Corporation. Joint Status Statement re status of arbitration to be filed by 1/17/2020. Compliance hearing set for 8/30/2019 is CONTINUED to Friday, 1/24/2020 09:01 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 8/26/2019. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2019)
August 22, 2019 Filing 63 Joint Statement Regarding the Status of Arbitration by The Hertz Corporation, Ronald G. Denicolo, Jr.. (Hauck, Brian) (Filed on 8/22/2019) Modified on 8/23/2019 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #61 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney as to Damian P. Richard. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2019)
July 18, 2019 Filing 61 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Viking Client Services, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/13/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 8/1/2019. Replies due by 8/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Richard, Damian) (Filed on 7/18/2019)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 60 CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 5/8/2019. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2019)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT #55 by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. (ygrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2019)
May 6, 2019 Filing 59 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers: Initial Case Management Conference held on 5/6/2019. Close of Expert Discovery due by 12/6/2019. Close of Fact Discovery due by 12/6/2019. Dispositive Motions/Daubert Motions due by 12/13/2019. Class Certification Motion due by 12/13/2019. Opening Reports due by 10/4/2019. Rebuttal Reports due by 11/4/2019. Responses due by 1/13/2020. Replies due by 1/27/2020. Daubert Motions/Dispositive Motions and Class Certification Motion Hearing set for 2/28/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers.Total Time in Court: 23 minutes. Court Reporter: Pam Hebel. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/6/2019)
April 29, 2019 Filing 57 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Ronald G Denicolo, Jr., Viking Client Services Inc (Belew, Leland) (Filed on 4/29/2019) Modified on 4/29/2019 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
April 29, 2019 Filing 56 Certificate of Interested Entities by Viking Client Services, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent VCS Holdings, Inc. for Viking Client Services, Inc.. (Alltmont, Michael) (Filed on 4/29/2019)
April 29, 2019 Filing 55 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Protective Order filed by Ronald G Denicolo, Jr., Viking Client Services Inc (Belew, Leland) (Filed on 4/29/2019) Modified on 4/29/2019 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #53 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Michael D. Alltmont. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2019)
April 26, 2019 Filing 53 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13295003.) filed by Viking Client Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing)(Alltmont, Michael) (Filed on 4/26/2019)
April 26, 2019 Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by James K. Schultz (Schultz, James) (Filed on 4/26/2019)
April 19, 2019 Filing 51 Transcript of Proceedings held on April 9, 2019, before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Court Reporter Raynee H. Mercado, CSR, telephone number 510-565-7228, cacsr8258@gmail.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #49 Transcript Order, #48 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/16/2019. (Related document(s) #49 , #48 ) (rhm) (Filed on 4/19/2019)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO COMPEL AND STAYING ACTION AS TO DEFENDANT THE HERTZ CORPORATION ONLY; SETTING COMPLIANCE HEARING; AND SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #27 Motion to Compel. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2019)
April 10, 2019 Filing 49 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 4/9/2019 before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers by Ronald G Denicolo, Jr, for Court Reporter Raynee Mercado. (Andrus, Lori) (Filed on 4/10/2019)
April 10, 2019 Filing 48 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 04/09/2019 before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers by The Hertz Corporation, for Court Reporter Raynee Mercado. (Hartz, Lauren) (Filed on 4/10/2019)
April 9, 2019 Filing 47 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers: Motion Hearing held and submitted on 4/9/2019 re #27 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss or Stay Claims Against Hertz filed by The Hertz Corporation. Case Management Statement due by 4/29/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/6/2019 02:00 PM. Joint Status Report due by 8/23/2019. Compliance hearing re status of arbitration is set for 8/30/2019 09:01 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers.Total Time in Court: 17 minutes. Court Reporter: Raynee Mercado. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/9/2019)
April 9, 2019 Filing 46 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Strike Defendant Viking Client Services, Inc.'s Affirmative Defenses Nos. 2-7 (Andrus, Lori) (Filed on 4/9/2019)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #42 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Lauren J. Hartz. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2019)
April 4, 2019 Filing 44 Certificate of Interested Entities by The Hertz Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Hertz Global Holdings, Inc. for The Hertz Corporation. (Hauck, Brian) (Filed on 4/4/2019)
April 4, 2019 Filing 43 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Hertz Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Hertz Global Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Icahn Enterprises L.P. for The Hertz Corporation. (Hauck, Brian) (Filed on 4/4/2019)
April 4, 2019 Filing 42 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Lauren J. Hartz ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13231298.) filed by The Hertz Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Hauck, Brian) (Filed on 4/4/2019)
April 3, 2019 Filing 41 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE Defendant Viking Client Services, Inc. Affirmative Defenses Nos. 2-7 ) (re #35 MOTION to Strike #26 Answer to Complaint filed byViking Client Services, Inc.. (Richard, Damian) (Filed on 4/3/2019) Modified on 4/3/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER GRANTING HERTZ CORPORATION'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO POSTPONE ITS INITIAL DISCLOSURES; VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE PENDING RESOLUTION OF MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #37 Administrative Motion to Postpone its Initial Disclosures. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2019)
March 26, 2019 Filing 39 AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Complaint, byViking Client Services, Inc.. (Richard, Damian) (Filed on 3/26/2019)
March 25, 2019 Filing 38 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Belew, Leland) (Filed on 3/25/2019) Modified on 3/26/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
March 21, 2019 Filing 37 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Defer Hertz's Initial Disclosures and Participation in Case Management Statement and Conferences Pending Resolution of Hertz's Motion to Compel Arbitration filed by The Hertz Corporation. Responses due by 3/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John F. Ward, Jr., #2 Proposed Order)(Hauck, Brian) (Filed on 3/21/2019)
March 20, 2019 Filing 36 REPLY (re #27 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss or Stay Claims Against Hertz ) filed by The Hertz Corporation. (Hauck, Brian) (Filed on 3/20/2019) Modified on 3/20/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
March 19, 2019 Filing 35 MOTION to Strike #26 Answer to Complaint Defendant Viking Client Services, Inc. Affirmative Defenses Nos. 2-7 filed by Ronald G Denicolo, Jr. Motion Hearing set for 4/23/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 4/2/2019. Replies due by 4/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Andrus, Lori) (Filed on 3/19/2019)
March 19, 2019 Filing 34 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Stay Hertz's Obligation to Respond to Affirmative Discovery Pending Resolution of Hertz's Motion to Compel Arbitration filed by The Hertz Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hauck, Brian) (Filed on 3/19/2019)
March 13, 2019 Filing 33 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #27 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss or Stay Claims Against Hertz ) filed byRonald G Denicolo, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ronald G. DeNicolo, Jr., #2 Declaration of Leland H. Belew, #3 Exhibit A to Belew Declaration, #4 Exhibit B to Belew Declaration, #5 Proposed Order)(Belew, Leland) (Filed on 3/13/2019)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #28 Administrative Motion to Confirm Answer is not Due Until After this Court Resolves Hertz's Pending Motion to Compel Arbitration. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2019)
March 4, 2019 Filing 31 Statement of Non-Opposition filed byRonald G Denicolo, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lori Andrus)(Andrus, Lori) (Filed on 3/4/2019)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #24 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Michelle R. Singer. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2019)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #23 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to John F. Ward, Jr. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2019)
February 28, 2019 REMINDER: Counsel are instructed that all future filings shall bear the initials YGR immediately after the case number. Re: #23 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice John F. Ward, Jr. filed by The Hertz Corporation, #24 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Michelle R. Singer filed by The Hertz CorporationFor future filing, please be sure that the case number is correctly reflected on your documents as 4:19-cv-00210-YGR (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2019)
February 27, 2019 Filing 28 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Confirm Answer is Not Due Until After This Court Resolves Hertz's Pending Motion to Compel Arbitration filed by The Hertz Corporation. Responses due by 3/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michelle R. Singer, #2 Proposed Order)(Hauck, Brian) (Filed on 2/27/2019)
February 27, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss or Stay Claims Against Hertz filed by The Hertz Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 4/9/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 3/13/2019. Replies due by 3/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Adam R. Schloss, #2 Exhibit 1 to Schloss Declaration, #3 Declaration of Marybeth Mouriz, #4 Exhibit 1 to Mouriz Declaration, #5 Exhibit 2 to Mouriz Declaration, #6 Exhibit 3 to Mouriz Declaration, #7 Exhibit 4 to Mouriz Declaration, #8 Exhibit 5 to Mouriz Declaration, #9 Exhibit 6 to Mouriz Declaration, #10 Exhibit 7 to Mouriz Declaration, #11 Declaration of Shuaib Bulhan, #12 Proposed Order)(Hauck, Brian) (Filed on 2/27/2019)
February 27, 2019 Filing 26 ANSWER to Complaint byViking Client Services, Inc.. (Richard, Damian) (Filed on 2/27/2019)
February 27, 2019 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ronald G Denicolo, Jr (Andrus, Lori) (Filed on 2/27/2019)
February 27, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Michelle R. Singer ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13127379.) filed by The Hertz Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Singer, Michelle) (Filed on 2/27/2019)
February 27, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice John F. Ward, Jr. ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13127329.) filed by The Hertz Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Ward, John) (Filed on 2/27/2019)
February 19, 2019 Filing 22 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 4/8/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for MONDAY, 4/15/2019 02:00 PM before Judge Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2019)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #19 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Clint Krislov. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2019)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #18 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Christopher M. Hack. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2019)
February 15, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13099134.) filed by Ronald G Denicolo, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Letter of Good Standing)(Andrus, Lori) (Filed on 2/15/2019)
February 15, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13098964.) filed by Ronald G Denicolo, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Letter of Good Standing)(Andrus, Lori) (Filed on 2/15/2019)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Executive Committee on 2/14/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2019)
February 13, 2019 Filing 16 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2019)
February 13, 2019 Filing 15 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by The Hertz Corporation.. (Hauck, Brian) (Filed on 2/13/2019)
February 7, 2019 Filing 14 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Viking Client Services, Inc.. (Richard, Damian) (Filed on 2/7/2019)
February 4, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Damian Patrick Richard (Richard, Damian) (Filed on 2/4/2019)
January 31, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint filed by The Hertz Corporation. (Hauck, Brian) (Filed on 1/31/2019)
January 31, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Hauck (Hauck, Brian) (Filed on 1/31/2019)
January 30, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ronald G Denicolo, Jr to Defendant Viking Client Services, Inc. (Andrus, Lori) (Filed on 1/30/2019)
January 30, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ronald G Denicolo, Jr to Defendant Hertz Corporation (Andrus, Lori) (Filed on 1/30/2019)
January 29, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ronald G Denicolo, Jr.. (Andrus, Lori) (Filed on 1/29/2019)
January 15, 2019 Filing 7 EXHIBITS re #1 Complaint, filed byRonald G Denicolo, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit C, #3 Exhibit D, #4 Exhibit E, #5 Exhibit F, #6 Exhibit G, #7 Exhibit H, #8 Exhibit I, #9 Exhibit J, #10 Exhibit K)(Related document(s) #1 ) (Andrus, Lori) (Filed on 1/15/2019)
January 14, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to The Hertz Corporation, Viking Client Services, Inc. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2019)
January 11, 2019 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/4/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/11/2019 10:00 AM. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2019)
January 11, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/25/2019. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2019)
January 11, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Ronald G Denicolo, Jr (Andrus, Lori) (Filed on 1/11/2019)
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Andrus, Lori) (Filed on 1/11/2019)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Class Action Complaint against The Hertz Corporation, Viking Client Services, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12996337.). Filed byRonald G Denicolo, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Andrus, Lori) (Filed on 1/11/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Denicolo v. The Hertz Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viking Client Services, Inc.
Represented By: Damian Patrick Richard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Hertz Corporation
Represented By: John F. Ward, Jr.
Represented By: Brian Hauck
Represented By: Michelle R. Singer
Represented By: Jacob David Alderdice
Represented By: Lauren Jean Hartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viking Client Services, Inc. doing business as Viking Billing Service
Represented By: Bryan Christopher Shartle
Represented By: Michael David Alltmont
Represented By: James K. Schultz
Represented By: Damian Patrick Richard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald G Denicolo, Jr.
Represented By: Lori Erin Andrus
Represented By: Leland Humphrey Belew
Represented By: Jennie Lee Anderson
Represented By: Clinton Arthur Krislov
Represented By: Christopher M. Hack
Represented By: Paul Laprairie
Represented By: Christopher M Hack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael G. Fox
Represented By: Lori Erin Andrus
Represented By: Leland Humphrey Belew
Represented By: Jennie Lee Anderson
Represented By: Clinton Arthur Krislov
Represented By: Christopher M Hack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?