Toy et al v. Honeywell International, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: agnes toy, Thomas h. toy, sr, Thomas H. Toy and Agnus Toy
Defendant: Alfa Laval, Inc., Standard Motor Products, Inc., Smothers Parts international, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Ford Motor Company, Crane Co., Copes-Vulcan, Inc., Blackmer Pump Company, Honeywell Internatinal, Inc., General Electric Company, Dana Companies LLC, Velan Valve Corp., Aurora Pump Company, Ingersoll Rand Company, GRINNELL LLC (FKA GRINNELL CORPORATION, AKA GRINNELL FIRE), Genuine Parts Company, Dezurik, Inc, VIAD CORP, Hennessy Industries LLC, The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, Hill Brothers Chemical Company, BW/IP, Inc,, metalclad insulation, llc, Armstrong International, Inc., Thomas Dee Engineering Co., Inc., Carrier Corporation, Fryer-Knowles, Inc., BORGWARNER MORSE TEC LLC, cla-valco, Flowserve US, Inc., Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, itt, llc, Pneumo-Abex LLC, National Automotive Parts Association, M. Slayen & Assoc, Inc., CBS Corporation, IMO Industries, Inc., SB Decking Inc, Viking Pump, Inc., Viad Corp., Warren Pumps LLC, M. Slayen and Associates, Inc., Napa, The William Powell Company, Grinnell LLC, Parker-Hannifin Corporation, Cla-Val Co., Western Auto Supply Company, Smothers Parts International, Inc., Metalclad Insulation LLC and Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00326
Filed: January 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2019 Filing 126 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Alfa Laval, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Alfa Laval AB for Alfa Laval, Inc.. (Yuen, Nicole) (Filed on 3/7/2019)
March 7, 2019 #Electronic filing error.Document lists Alfa Laval AB as parent corporation. Names of interested entities or person MUST be entered at the prompt. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #125 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by Alfa Laval, Inc. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2019)
March 6, 2019 Filing 125 **RE-FILED AT DOCKET NO. #126 ** Corporate Disclosure Statement by Alfa Laval, Inc. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 (Yuen, Nicole) (Filed on 3/6/2019) Modified on 3/7/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 3/8/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
March 6, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]. Name of Interested Entities or corporate parents must be entered at the prompt. Correct event is found under Civil Events > Other Filings > Notices > Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 DisclosuresThis filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #124 Statement filed by Alfa Laval, Inc. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2019)
March 6, 2019 #Electronic filing error. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Holly Acevedo and Janell Alberto. The docket shows a different address from what is appearing on the dkt. #122 : Notice of Appearance filed by Alfa Laval, Inc. Please update your personal profile in ECF. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2019)
March 5, 2019 Filing 124 **RE-FILED AT DOCKET NO. #126 ** Statement Disclosure Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 by Alfa Laval, Inc. (Yuen, Nicole) (Filed on 3/5/2019) Modified on 3/6/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 3/8/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
March 5, 2019 Filing 123 ANSWER to #79 Amended Complaint for Personal Injury and Loss of Consortium by Alfa Laval, Inc. (Yuen, Nicole) (Filed on 3/5/2019) Modified on 3/6/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
March 5, 2019 Filing 122 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole Denine Brown Yuen for Defendant Alfa Laval, Inc. (Yuen, Nicole) (Filed on 3/5/2019) Modified on 3/6/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
March 4, 2019 Filing 121 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Genuine Parts Company. Motion Hearing set for 5/30/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Responses due by 3/18/2019. Replies due by 3/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Nilufar K. Majd, #3 Exhibit A to Majd Declaration, #4 Exhibit B to Majd Declaration, #5 Exhibit C to Majd Declaration, #6 Exhibit D to Majd Declaration, #7 Exhibit E to Majd Declaration, #8 Exhibit F to Majd Declaration, #9 Exhibit G to Majd Declaration, #10 Proposed Order)(Majd, Nilufar) (Filed on 3/4/2019) Modified on 3/5/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting (Docket Nos. 118 in case 4:19-cv-00325-HSG; 113 in case 4:19-cv-00326-HSG; 85 in case 4:19-cv-00336-HSG) Stipulation re Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice of Defendant Hennessy Industries, LLC. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2019)
March 4, 2019 Filing 119 Certificate of Interested Entities by Genuine Parts Company (Majd, Nilufar) (Filed on 3/4/2019)
March 4, 2019 Filing 118 ANSWER to #79 Amended Complaint and Jury Demand by Genuine Parts Company. (Majd, Nilufar) (Filed on 3/4/2019) Modified on 3/5/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
March 4, 2019 Filing 117 NOTICE of Appearance by Nilufar Kashani Majd on behalf of Defendant Genuine Parts Company (Majd, Nilufar) (Filed on 3/4/2019)
March 4, 2019 Filing 116 NOTICE of Appearance by Francis Dennis Pond on behalf of Defendant Genuine Parts Company (Pond, Francis) (Filed on 3/4/2019)
March 4, 2019 Filing 115 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Graham on behalf of Defendant Genuine Parts Company (Graham, Michael) (Filed on 3/4/2019)
March 4, 2019 Filing 114 NOTICE of Appearance by Dana Leigh Burch on behalf of Defendant Genuine Parts Company (Burch, Dana) (Filed on 3/4/2019)
March 1, 2019 Filing 113 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice of Defendant Hennessy Industries, LLC filed by Hennessy Industries LLC., Thomas H. Toy, and Agnus Toy. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Shaw, Casey) (Filed on 3/1/2019) Modified on 3/4/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER by Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. In any future stipulations and proposed orders that are submitted in more than one of cases 19-cv-00325, 326 and 336, the request should be in a single filing that includes the caption for each applicable case. In other words, the parties should not submit multiple separate identical documents. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hsglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2019)
February 27, 2019 Filing 111 ANSWER to #79 Amended Complaint by BW/IP, Inc,. (Yuen, Nicole) (Filed on 2/27/2019) Modified on 2/28/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
February 27, 2019 Filing 110 REPLY (re #49 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ) filed byWestern Auto Supply Company. (Majd, Nilufar) (Filed on 2/27/2019)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #100 Re Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice of Specially Appearing Defendant Ford Motor Company Only. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2019)
February 27, 2019 Filing 108 Answer to #79 Amended Complaint by IMO Industries, Inc. (Bailey, Bobbie) (Filed on 2/27/2019) Modified on 2/28/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 2/28/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
February 27, 2019 Filing 107 Answer to #79 Amended Complaint for Personal Injury and Loss of Consortium by Armstrong International, Inc. (Blomquist, Sonja) (Filed on 2/27/2019) Modified on 2/28/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
February 26, 2019 Filing 106 Answer to #79 Amended Complaint for Personal Injury and Loss of Consortium by Dezurik, Inc. (Stewart, Gilliam) (Filed on 2/26/2019) Modified on 2/27/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
February 26, 2019 Filing 105 ANSWER to #79 Amended Complaint by Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc. (Bacon, Juniper) (Filed on 2/26/2019) Modified on 2/27/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
February 26, 2019 Filing 104 REPLY (re #47 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ) filed byNational Automotive Parts Association. (Majd, Nilufar) (Filed on 2/26/2019)
February 26, 2019 Filing 103 Answer to #79 Amended Complaint for Personal Injury- Asbestos byCBS Corporation. (Jamison, Kevin) (Filed on 2/26/2019) Modified on 2/27/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
February 26, 2019 Filing 102 ANSWER to #79 Amended Complaint by Honeywell Internatinal, Inc. (Ongaro, David) (Filed on 2/26/2019) Modified on 2/27/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
February 26, 2019 Filing 101 ANSWER to #79 Amended Complaint by M. Slayen and Associates, Inc. (Kannett, Mark) (Filed on 2/26/2019) Modified on 2/27/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
February 26, 2019 Filing 100 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice of Specially Appearing Defendant Ford Motor Company Only filed by Ford Motor Company, Thomas H. Toy, and Agnus Toy. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ghanaat, Bina) (Filed on 2/26/2019) Modified on 2/27/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
February 25, 2019 Filing 99 ANSWER to #79 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Ingersoll Rand Company. (Galfayan, Arpi) (Filed on 2/25/2019) Modified on 2/26/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #95 Stipulation. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2019)
February 25, 2019 Filing 97 Answer to #79 Amended Complaint for Personal Injury and Loss of Consortium by Aurora Pump Company. (Hansen, Haley) (Filed on 2/25/2019) Modified on 2/26/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
February 22, 2019 Filing 96 Notice of Withdrawal of #45 Motion to Dismiss Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Genuine Parts Company (Majd, Nilufar) (Filed on 2/22/2019) Modified on 2/25/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
February 22, 2019 Filing 95 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Pneumo-Abex LLC., Thomas H. Toy, and Agnus Toy. (Brydon, John) (Filed on 2/22/2019) Modified on 2/25/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
February 20, 2019 Filing 94 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #49 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ) filed byAgnus Toy, Thomas H. Toy. (Adams, Benjamin) (Filed on 2/20/2019)
February 20, 2019 Filing 93 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #47 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ) filed byAgnus Toy, Thomas H. Toy. (Adams, Benjamin) (Filed on 2/20/2019)
February 20, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]. Correct Event is Motion to Substitute Attorney. Event can be found under Civil events > Motions and Related Filings >gt ; Motions-General > Substitute Attorney.Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #91 Motion for Consent Order Granting Substitution of Attorney filed by Parker-Hannifin Corporation (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2019)
February 19, 2019 Filing 92 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #45 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ) filed byAgnus Toy, Thomas H. Toy. (Adams, Benjamin) (Filed on 2/19/2019)
February 19, 2019 Filing 91 Motion for Consent Order Granting Substitution of Attorney by Joseph Blaise Adams (Adams, Joseph) (Filed on 2/19/2019) Modified on 2/20/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
February 15, 2019 #Electronic filing error. REMINDER TO COUNSEL: In the future, please be sure that the case number is correctly reflected on your documents as 4:19-cv-00326-HSG. Re:[9 0] Objection filed by Honeywell Internatinal, Inc. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2019)
February 14, 2019 Filing 90 OBJECTIONS to Plaintiffs' Notice of Taking Deposition of Thomas H. Toy, Sr. by Honeywell Internatinal, Inc.. (Turner, Glen) (Filed on 2/14/2019)
February 14, 2019 Filing 89 Notice of Withdrawal of #26 Motion to Dismiss Complaint (Turner, Glen) (Filed on 2/14/2019) Modified on 2/15/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER by Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING #87 administrative motion to extend time. The motion fails to provide any reason for the request, or to explain why it was not made until the day Plaintiffs' opposition was due. See Civil Local Rule 6-3. The Court DIRECTS Plaintiffs to meet and confer with Defendants today to discuss a stipulated briefing schedule, and to confirm whether the parties agree that the filing of the first amended complaint mooted the motion to dismiss. Plaintiffs shall file a renewed administrative motion only if they are unable to agree on a stipulated schedule for any remaining briefing, and only if the motion to dismiss has not been mooted.(This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(hsglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2019)
February 12, 2019 Filing 87 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #26 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Agnus Toy, Thomas H. Toy. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Adams, Benjamin) (Filed on 2/12/2019)
February 12, 2019 Filing 86 NOTICE of Adoption of Previously Filed State Court Answer to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint for Wrongful Death and Survival Actions by SB Decking Inc. (Clayton, Trina) (Filed on 2/12/2019) Modified on 2/13/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
February 12, 2019 Filing 85 Certificate of Interested Entities by Dezurik, Inc and Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 (Stewart, Gilliam) (Filed on 2/12/2019)
February 12, 2019 Filing 84 NOTICE of Appearance by Gilliam Fipp Stewart for Dezurik, Inc. (Stewart, Gilliam) (Filed on 2/12/2019)
February 12, 2019 Filing 83 NOTICE of Filing State Court Answer by Dezurik, Inc (Stewart, Gilliam) (Filed on 2/12/2019) Modified on 2/13/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
February 12, 2019 Filing 82 Certificate of Interested Entities by SB Decking Inc identifying Corporate Parent Quaker Chemical Corporation for SB Decking Inc. (Clayton, Trina) (Filed on 2/12/2019)
February 12, 2019 Filing 81 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by SB Decking Inc.. (Clayton, Trina) (Filed on 2/12/2019)
February 12, 2019 Filing 80 NOTICE of Appearance by Trina Marie Clayton (Clayton, Trina) (Filed on 2/12/2019)
February 12, 2019 Reset Hearings, See Re-Notices as to (37 in 4:19-cv-00325-HSG) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , (47 in 4:19-cv-00325-HSG) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , (50 in 4:19-cv-00325-HSG) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , (61 in 4:19-cv-00325-HSG) MOTION to Quash SECOND RE-NOTICE OF SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANYS MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION, PENDING IN STATE COURT, (45 in 4:19-cv-00326-HSG) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , (47 in 4:19-cv-00326-HSG) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , (26 in 4:19-cv-00326-HSG) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , (61 in 4:19-cv-00326-HSG) MOTION to Quash of Motion to Quash Service of Summons and Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, Pending in State Court (Second Re-Notice), (49 in 4:19-cv-00326-HSG) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , (55 in 4:19-cv-00336-HSG) MOTION to Quash Service of Summons and Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, Pending in State Court (Second Re-Notice) , (37 in 4:19-cv-00336-HSG) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , (41 in 4:19-cv-00336-HSG) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , (39 in 4:19-cv-00336-HSG) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Motion Hearing set for 5/2/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2019)
February 12, 2019 #Electronic filing error. REMINDER TO COUNSEL: In the future, please attach all supporting documents and proposed orders to the Motion. Re: #78 Proposed Order filed by F ord Motor Company (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2019)
February 12, 2019 Filing 79 AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Complaint for Personal Injury and Loss of Consortium against Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Alfa Laval, Inc., Armstrong International, Inc., Aurora Pump Company, BW/IP, Inc,, Blackmer Pump Company, Borgwarner Morse Tec LLC, CBS Corporation, Carrier Corporation, Cla-Val Co., Copes-Vulcan, Inc., Crane Co., Dana Companies LLC, Dezurik, Inc, Flowserve US, Inc., Ford Motor Company, Fryer-Knowles, Inc., General Electric Company, Genuine Parts Company, Grinnell LLC, Hennessy Industries LLC, Hill Brothers Chemical Company, Honeywell Internatinal, Inc., IMO Industries, Inc., ITT, LLC, Ingersoll Rand Company, M. Slayen and Associates, Inc., Metalclad Insulation LLC, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, National Automotive Parts Association, Parker-Hannifin Corporation, Pneumo-Abex LLC, SB Decking Inc, Smothers Parts International, Inc., Standard Motor Products, Inc., The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, The William Powell Company, Velan Valve Corp., Viad Corp., Viking Pump, Inc., Warren Pumps LLC, Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc., Western Auto Supply Company. Filed byThomas H. Toy, Agnus Toy. (Adams, Benjamin) (Filed on 2/12/2019)
February 11, 2019 Filing 78 Proposed Order re #65 MOTION to Quash by Ford Motor Company. (Ghanaat, Bina) (Filed on 2/11/2019) Modified on 2/12/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
February 11, 2019 Filing 77 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin Nicole Empting on Behalf of Defendant CBS Corporation, et al. (Empting, Erin) (Filed on 2/11/2019)
February 11, 2019 Filing 76 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Finnell Cronin on Behalf of Defendant CBS Corporation, et al. (Cronin, Justin) (Filed on 2/11/2019)
February 11, 2019 Filing 75 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Douglas Jamison on Behalf of Defendant CBS Corporation, et al. (Jamison, Kevin) (Filed on 2/11/2019)
February 11, 2019 Filing 74 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CBS Corporation identifying Corporate Parent CBS Corporation, a Delaware corporation, f/k/a Viacom Inc., successor by merger to CBS Corporation, a Pennsylvania corporation, f/k/a Westinghouse Electric Corporation, Other Affiliate National Amusements, Inc., Other Affiliate NAI Entertainment Holdings LLC for CBS Corporation. re #73 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) and Demand for Jury (Jamison, Kevin) (Filed on 2/11/2019)
February 11, 2019 Filing 73 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) and Demand for Jury byCBS Corporation. (Jamison, Kevin) (Filed on 2/11/2019)
February 11, 2019 Filing 72 Second Re-Notice of #49 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Western Auto Supply Company. Motion Hearing set for 5/2/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Majd, Nilufar) (Filed on 2/11/2019) Modified on 2/12/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 2/12/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
February 11, 2019 Filing 71 Second Re-Notice of #47 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by National Automotive Parts Association. Motion Hearing set for 5/2/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Majd, Nilufar) (Filed on 2/11/2019) Modified on 2/12/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
February 11, 2019 Filing 70 Second Re-Notice of #45 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Genuine Parts Company. Motion Hearing set for 5/2/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Majd, Nilufar) (Filed on 2/11/2019) Modified on 2/12/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
February 11, 2019 Filing 69 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Aurora Pump Company (Hansen, Haley) (Filed on 2/11/2019)
February 11, 2019 Filing 68 Certificate of Interested Entities by Aurora Pump Company and Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 (Hansen, Haley) (Filed on 2/11/2019)
February 11, 2019 Filing 67 NOTICE of Appearance by Haley Lanell Hansen for Aurora Pump Company (Hansen, Haley) (Filed on 2/11/2019)
February 11, 2019 Filing 66 NOTICE of Filing State Court Answer by Aurora Pump Company (Hansen, Haley) (Filed on 2/11/2019) Modified on 2/12/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
February 11, 2019 Filing 65 Third Re-Notice of #61 MOTION to Quash filed by Ford Motor Company. Motion Hearing set for 5/2/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr. (Ghanaat, Bina) (Filed on 2/11/2019) Modified on 2/12/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
February 11, 2019 Filing 64 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE. Notice is hereby given that a Case Management Conference has been set for May 14, 2019, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA. Case Management Statement due by May 7, 2019. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:19-cv-00325-HSG, 4:19-cv-00326-HSG or 4:19-cv-00336-HSG. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2019)
February 11, 2019 Filing 63 CLERK'S NOTICE RE (Docket Nos. 61 in case nos. 19-cv-00325-HSG and 19-cv-00326- HSG and 55 in case no. 19-cv-00336-HSG) Motions to Quash. Notice is hereby given that the briefing schedule is: response is due February 22nd, and reply is due March 1st. The briefing set by counsel at the time the motions were re-filed/re-noticed are terminated. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2019)
February 11, 2019 Filing 62 CLERK'S NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that counsel must re-notice not re- file the (docket nos. 37, 47, 50 in case no. 19-cv-00325-HSG, 26, 45, 47, 49 in case no. 19-cv-00326-HSG and 37, 39 and 41 in case no. 19-cv-00336-HSG) motions to dismiss and the ( docket nos. 61 in case no. 19-cv-00325-HSG, 61 in case no. 19-cv-00326-HSG and 55 in case no. 19-cv-00336-HSG) motions to quash. Hearing dates of March 14th, are vacated. Counsel is directed to check the Court's scheduling notes before re-noticing the motion for a new hearing date. March 14th was not the Court's next available hearing date when the motions were e-filed. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2019)
February 8, 2019 Filing 61 MOTION to Quash of Motion to Quash Service of Summons and Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, Pending in State Court (Second Re-Notice) filed by Ford Motor Company. Motion Hearing set for 3/14/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Responses due by 2/21/2019. Replies due by 2/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A in Support of Re-Notice, #2 Proposed Order)(Ghanaat, Bina) (Filed on 2/8/2019) Modified on 2/11/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 2/12/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
February 8, 2019 Filing 60 Renotice motion hearing re #49 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed byWestern Auto Supply Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #49 ) (Majd, Nilufar) (Filed on 2/8/2019)
February 8, 2019 Filing 59 Renotice motion hearing re #47 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed byNational Automotive Parts Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #47 ) (Majd, Nilufar) (Filed on 2/8/2019)
February 8, 2019 Filing 58 Renotice motion hearing re #45 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed byGenuine Parts Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #45 ) (Majd, Nilufar) (Filed on 2/8/2019)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER, Case reassigned to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr. Judge Edward M. Chen no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 2/8/19. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2019)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/7/2019. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2019)
February 7, 2019 Filing 55 RE-FILED AT DOCKET NO. #61 ** MOTION to Quash Service of Summons and Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, Pending in State Court by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A in Support of Re-Notice OF, #2 Proposed Order)(Ghanaat, Bina) (Filed on 2/7/2019) Modified on 2/11/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
February 7, 2019 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by Bina Ghanaat SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANYS NOTICE OF SPECIAL APPEARANCE (Ghanaat, Bina) (Filed on 2/7/2019)
February 7, 2019 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by Sonja E. Blomquist (Blomquist, Sonja) (Filed on 2/7/2019)
February 7, 2019 Filing 52 Certificate of Interested Entities by Armstrong International, Inc. (Blomquist, Sonja) (Filed on 2/7/2019)
February 7, 2019 Filing 51 Notice of Filing State Court ANSWER to Complaint byArmstrong International, Inc.. (Blomquist, Sonja) (Filed on 2/7/2019)
February 7, 2019 Filing 50 Declaration of Nilufar K. Majd in Support of #49 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed byWestern Auto Supply Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #49 ) (Majd, Nilufar) (Filed on 2/7/2019)
February 7, 2019 Filing 49 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Western Auto Supply Company. Motion Hearing set for 3/14/2019 01:30 PM before Judge Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 2/21/2019. Replies due by 2/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Proposed Order)(Majd, Nilufar) (Filed on 2/7/2019)
February 7, 2019 Filing 48 Declaration of Nilufar K. Majd in Support of #47 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed byNational Automotive Parts Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Related document(s) #47 ) (Majd, Nilufar) (Filed on 2/7/2019)
February 7, 2019 Filing 47 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by National Automotive Parts Association. Motion Hearing set for 3/14/2019 01:30 PM before Judge Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 2/21/2019. Replies due by 2/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Proposed Order)(Majd, Nilufar) (Filed on 2/7/2019)
February 7, 2019 Filing 46 Declaration of Nilufar K. Majd in Support of #45 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed byGenuine Parts Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) #45 ) (Majd, Nilufar) (Filed on 2/7/2019)
February 7, 2019 Filing 45 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Genuine Parts Company. Motion Hearing set for 3/14/2019 01:30 PM before Judge Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 2/21/2019. Replies due by 2/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Proposed Order)(Majd, Nilufar) (Filed on 2/7/2019)
February 6, 2019 Filing 44 Certificate of Interested Entities by BW/IP, Inc, (Yuen, Nicole) (Filed on 2/6/2019)
February 6, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE OF RE-FILING OF STATE COURT ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) byBW/IP, Inc,. (Yuen, Nicole) (Filed on 2/6/2019)
February 6, 2019 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole Denine Brown Yuen (Yuen, Nicole) (Filed on 2/6/2019)
February 6, 2019 Filing 41 CLERK'S NOTICE: Motion Hearing re #26 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction set for 2/28/2019 is vacated and rescheduled for 3/14/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. This motion hearing is set alongside other motions in related cases. Briefing remains unchanged. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2019)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER IN REASSIGNED CASE: Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/9/2019 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/2/2019. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/6/2019. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2019)
February 6, 2019 Filing 39 Case reassigned to Judge Edward M. Chen. Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2019)
February 6, 2019 Filing 38 ***PLEASE DISREGARD ENTRY***SEE DOCKET #39******Case reassigned to Judge Edward M. Chen. Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2019) Modified on 2/6/2019 (haS, COURT STAFF).
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER RELATING CASE. Cases 3:19-cv-00325-EMC and 3:19-cv-00336-JSC are RELATED. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/6/2019. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2019)
February 4, 2019 Filing 36 Rule 7.1 Disclosures of Non-Party Interested Entities or Persons Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 and Local Rule 3-15 by Ford Motor Company (Ghanaat, Bina) (Filed on 2/4/2019) Modified on 2/5/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
February 4, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE of "Specially Appearing Defendant Ford Motor Company's Motion To Quash Service of Summons and Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction," Pending in State Court by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A in support of Notice)(Ghanaat, Bina) (Filed on 2/4/2019) Modified on 2/5/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
February 2, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to defendant Thomas Dee Engineering Co., Inc., ONLY by Agnus Toy, Thomas H. Toy (Adams, Benjamin) (Filed on 2/2/2019)
January 31, 2019 #Electronic filing error.[err401] In the future pursuant to L.R. 3-12(b), the motion should be e-filed in the lower case number only and a courtesy copy must be lodged with the ass igned Judge in each case. Re: #28 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO RELATE CASES filed by The William Powell Company. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2019)
January 31, 2019 Reset Hearing as to #26 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, See Docket No. #32 : Motion Hearing set for 2/28/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2019)
January 30, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin H Adams for Plaintiffs (Adams, Benjamin) (Filed on 1/30/2019)
January 30, 2019 Filing 32 Renotice motion hearing re #26 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed byHoneywell Internatinal, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #26 ) (Ongaro, David) (Filed on 1/30/2019)
January 30, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Glen Elliot Turner on behalf of Honeywell International Inc. (Turner, Glen) (Filed on 1/30/2019)
January 30, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Kirsten McNelly Bibbes on behalf of Honeywell International Inc. (Bibbes, Kirsten) (Filed on 1/30/2019)
January 30, 2019 Filing 29 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE. Notice is hereby given that a Case Management Conference has been set for May 7, 2019, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA. Case Management Statement due by April 30, 2019. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:19-cv-00326-HSG. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2019)
January 30, 2019 Filing 28 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO RELATE CASES filed by The William Powell Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew L. Sharp in Support)(Sharp, Andrew) (Filed on 1/30/2019) Modified on 1/31/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 1/31/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
January 30, 2019 Filing 27 CLERK'S NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that counsel must re-notice not re- file the #26 motion to dismiss. Hearing date of February 28th, is vacated. The briefing schedule remains in effect. Counsel is directed to check the Court's scheduling notes before re-noticing the motion for a new hearing date. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2019)
January 29, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Honeywell Internatinal, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 2/28/2019 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Responses due by 2/12/2019. Replies due by 2/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Glen Turner)(Ongaro, David) (Filed on 1/29/2019)
January 29, 2019 Filing 25 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Honeywell Internatinal, Inc... (Ongaro, David) (Filed on 1/29/2019)
January 29, 2019 Filing 24 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Honeywell Internatinal, Inc.. (Ongaro, David) (Filed on 1/29/2019)
January 29, 2019 Filing 23 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Honeywell Internatinal, Inc. (Ongaro, David) (Filed on 1/29/2019)
January 29, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by David Raymond Ongaro , Kirsten McNelly Bibbes, Glen Turner (Ongaro, David) (Filed on 1/29/2019)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 1/29/2019. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2019)
January 28, 2019 Filing 20 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2019)
January 25, 2019 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byViad Corp.. (Davis, Whitney) (Filed on 1/25/2019)
January 25, 2019 Filing 18 Certificate of Interested Entities or Persons by Grinnell LLC. (Eagan, Michael) (Filed on 1/25/2019) Modified on 2/5/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
January 25, 2019 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement and Notice of Interested Parties by Grinnell LLC identifying Corporate Parent TYCO INTERNATIONAL plc for Grinnell LLC. (Eagan, Michael) (Filed on 1/25/2019) Modified on 2/5/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
January 25, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance of Counsel for Grinnell LLC by Michael Quinn Eagan, Jr (Eagan, Michael) (Filed on 1/25/2019) Modified on 2/5/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
January 25, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE by Grinnell LLC of Filing of State Court Answer to Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Eagan, Michael) (Filed on 1/25/2019) Modified on 2/5/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
January 25, 2019 Filing 14 Certificate of Interested Entities or Persons by ITT, LLC. (Eagan, Michael) (Filed on 1/25/2019) Modified on 2/5/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
January 25, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement and Notice of Interested Parties by ITT, LLC. (Eagan, Michael) (Filed on 1/25/2019) Modified on 2/5/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
January 25, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance for ITT LLC by Michael Quinn Eagan, Jr. (Eagan, Michael) (Filed on 1/25/2019) Modified on 2/5/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
January 25, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE by ITT, LLC of Filing State Court Answer to Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Eagan, Michael) (Filed on 1/25/2019) Modified on 2/5/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
January 25, 2019 Filing 10 Certificate of Interested Entities or Persons by Hill Brothers Chemical Company. (Eagan, Michael) (Filed on 1/25/2019) Modified on 2/5/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
January 25, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement and Notice of Interested Parties Entities by Hill Brothers Chemical Company identifying Corporate Parent Hill Brothers Chemical Company for Hill Brothers Chemical Company. (Eagan, Michael) (Filed on 1/25/2019) Modified on 2/5/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
January 25, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Quinn Eagan, Jr for Hill Brothers Chemical Company (Eagan, Michael) (Filed on 1/25/2019) Modified on 2/5/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
January 25, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand Demand for Jury Trial by Hill Brothers Chemical Company. (Eagan, Michael) (Filed on 1/25/2019) Modified on 2/5/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
January 25, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ingersoll Rand Company.. (Galfayan, Arpi) (Filed on 1/25/2019)
January 25, 2019 Filing 5 Certificate of Interested Entities by Ingersoll Rand Company identifying Corporate Parent Ingersoll-Rand PLC for Ingersoll Rand Company. (Galfayan, Arpi) (Filed on 1/25/2019)
January 25, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Ingersoll Rand Company Of Filing State Court Answer to Complaint for Damages and Personal Injuries; Demand for Jury Trial (Galfayan, Arpi) (Filed on 1/25/2019)
January 22, 2019 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/24/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/1/2019 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2019)
January 22, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/5/2019. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2019)
January 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL of Complaint from Alameda County Superior Court. Their case number is RG18932350. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-13017322). Filed byVIAD CORP. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Decl. of Whitney A. Davis, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Case Cover Sheet, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service Proof of Service of Notice of Removal and Declaration of Whitney A. Davis, and Exhibits A through E, #4 Supplement Viad Corp Disclosure Statement and Proof of Service thereof)(Davis, Whitney) (Filed on 1/18/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Toy et al v. Honeywell International, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfa Laval, Inc.
Represented By: Janell Maria Alberto
Represented By: Holly Elizabeth Acevedo
Represented By: Nicole Denine Brown Yuen
Represented By: Emily M Cunningham
Represented By: Keith Michael Ameele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Standard Motor Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smothers Parts international
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Paul Vincent Lankford
Represented By: Bina Ghanaat
Represented By: Paul-Erik Lannus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Copes-Vulcan, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blackmer Pump Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell Internatinal, Inc.
Represented By: Glen Elliot Turner
Represented By: Kirsten McNelly Bibbes
Represented By: David Raymond Ongaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Companies LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Velan Valve Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurora Pump Company
Represented By: Christine Dianne Calareso
Represented By: W. Joseph Gunter
Represented By: Haley Lanell Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingersoll Rand Company
Represented By: Thomas Alan Steig
Represented By: Jeremy David Milbrodt
Represented By: Arpi Galfayan
Represented By: Carla Lynn Crochet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GRINNELL LLC (FKA GRINNELL CORPORATION, AKA GRINNELL FIRE)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genuine Parts Company
Represented By: Dana Leigh Burch
Represented By: Paul Vincent Lankford
Represented By: Michael A. Graham
Represented By: Francis Dennis Pond
Represented By: Bina Ghanaat
Represented By: Nilufar Kashani Majd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dezurik, Inc
Represented By: Christine Dianne Calareso
Represented By: W. Joseph Gunter
Represented By: Gilliam Fipp Stewart
Represented By: Haley Lanell Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VIAD CORP
Represented By: Whitney A. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hennessy Industries LLC
Represented By: Casey Carlton Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hill Brothers Chemical Company
Represented By: Joseph Duffy
Represented By: Michael Quinn Eagan, Jr.
Represented By: Amy Jo Talarico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BW/IP, Inc,
Represented By: Suzanna L. Minasian
Represented By: Keith Michael Ameele
Represented By: Nicole Denine Brown Yuen
Represented By: Dennis Michael Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: metalclad insulation, llc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armstrong International, Inc.
Represented By: Catherine Ellen Golden
Represented By: Sonja E. Blomquist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Dee Engineering Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrier Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fryer-Knowles, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BORGWARNER MORSE TEC LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: cla-valco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowserve US, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: itt, llc
Represented By: Joseph Duffy
Represented By: Michael Quinn Eagan, Jr.
Represented By: Amy Jo Talarico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pneumo-Abex LLC
Represented By: John R. Brydon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Automotive Parts Association
Represented By: Dana Leigh Burch
Represented By: Frank D. Pond
Represented By: Nilufar Kashani Majd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Slayen & Assoc, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: Kevin Douglas Jamison
Represented By: Justin Finnell Cronin
Represented By: Erin Nicole Empting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Olga Guadalupe Pena
Represented By: Bobbie Rae Bailey
Represented By: Frederick W. Gatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SB Decking Inc
Represented By: Trina Marie Clayton
Represented By: Florence Anne McClain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viking Pump, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viad Corp.
Represented By: Whitney A. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Slayen and Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Mark S. Kannett
Represented By: Emily Diane Bergstrom
Represented By: Patrick Mark Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Napa
Represented By: Dana Leigh Burch
Represented By: Paul Vincent Lankford
Represented By: Michael A. Graham
Represented By: Francis Dennis Pond
Represented By: Bina Ghanaat
Represented By: Frank D. Pond
Represented By: Nilufar Kashani Majd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The William Powell Company
Represented By: Khaled Taqi-Eddin
Represented By: Andrew Livingston Sharp
Represented By: Douglas Garth Wah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grinnell LLC
Represented By: Joseph Duffy
Represented By: Michael Quinn Eagan, Jr.
Represented By: Amy Jo Talarico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parker-Hannifin Corporation
Represented By: Joseph Blaise Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cla-Val Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Auto Supply Company
Represented By: Dana Leigh Burch
Represented By: Frank D. Pond
Represented By: Nilufar Kashani Majd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smothers Parts International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metalclad Insulation LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc.
Represented By: Emily Diane Bergstrom
Represented By: Juniper Bacon
Represented By: Mark S. Kannett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: agnes toy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas h. toy, sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas H. Toy
Represented By: Benjamin H Adams
Represented By: Jessica M. Dean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Agnus Toy
Represented By: Benjamin H Adams
Represented By: Jessica M. Dean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?