Toy et al v. Honeywell International Inc. et al
Plaintiff: AGNES TOY, THOMAS TOY and Thomas H. Toy, Sr.
Defendant: Viking Pump, Inc., Standard Motor Products, Inc., Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, BW/IP, Inc., Ford Motor Company, IMO Industries Inc., Crane Co., Warren Pumps LLC, M. Slayen and Associates, Inc., Blackmer Pump Company, Western Auto Supply Company, General Electric Company, Copes-Vulcan, Inc., Velan Valve Corp., Aurora Pump Company, Genuine Parts Company, Dezurik, Inc, Carrier Corporation, Honeywell International Inc., The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, Hill Brothers Chemical Company, The William Powell Company, Grinnell LLC, Alfa Laval Inc., Armstrong International, Inc., Thomas Dee Engineering Co., Inc., VIAD CORP, Parker-Hannifin Corporation, Fryer-Knowles, Inc., BORGWARNER MORSE TEC LLC, CLA-VAL Co., Flowserve US, Inc., Ingersoll-Rand Company, Pneumo Abex LLC, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Metalclad Insulation LLC, itt, llc, Hennessy Industries LLC, Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc., Dana Companies, LLC, CBS Corporation, Smothers Parts international, Viad Corp., NAPA, ITT LLC, National Automotive Parts Association, SB Decking Inc, Genuine Parts Company doing business as Rayloc also known as NAPA, Smothers Parts international doing business as Smothers Auto Parts & Performance Accessories, Hoffman Specialty MFG, Corp., Bell and Gossett Company, Westinghouse Electric Corporation, Allied-Products Liability Signal, Inc., The Dial Corporation, Grinnell LLC doing business as Grinnell Corporation, Viacom Inc, ITT Marlow, Metalclad Insulation Corporation, ITT Industries Inc, Hennessy Industries, Inc., ITT Corporation and ITT Fluid Products Corp
Case Number: 4:2019cv00336
Filed: January 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2019 Filing 93 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Genuine Parts Company. Motion Hearing set for 5/30/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Responses due by 3/18/2019. Replies due by 3/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Nilufar K. Majd, #3 Exhibit A to Majd Declaration, #4 Exhibit B to Majd Declaration, #5 Exhibit C to Majd Declaration, #6 Exhibit D to Majd Declaration, #7 Exhibit E to Majd Declaration, #8 Exhibit F to Majd Declaration, #9 Exhibit G to Majd Declaration, #10Proposed Order)(Majd, Nilufar) (Filed on 3/4/2019) Modified on 3/5/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting (Docket Nos. 118 in case 4:19-cv-00325-HSG; 113 in case 4:19-cv-00326-HSG; 85 in case 4:19-cv-00336-HSG) Stipulation re Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice of Defendant Hennessy Industries, LLC. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2019)
March 4, 2019 Filing 91 Certificate of Interested Entities by Genuine Parts Company (Majd, Nilufar) (Filed on 3/4/2019)
March 4, 2019 Filing 90 ANSWER to #64 Amended Complaint and Jury Demand byGenuine Parts Company. (Majd, Nilufar) (Filed on 3/4/2019) Modified on 3/5/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
March 4, 2019 Filing 89 NOTICE of Appearance by Nilufar Kashani Majd on behalf of Defendant Genuine Parts Company (Majd, Nilufar) (Filed on 3/4/2019)
March 4, 2019 Filing 88 NOTICE of Appearance by Francis Dennis Pond on behalf of Defendant Genuine Parts Company (Pond, Francis) (Filed on 3/4/2019)
March 4, 2019 Filing 87 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Graham on behalf of Defendant Genuine Parts Company (Graham, Michael) (Filed on 3/4/2019)
March 4, 2019 Filing 86 NOTICE of Appearance by Dana Leigh Burch on behalf of Defendant Genuine Parts Company (Burch, Dana) (Filed on 3/4/2019)
March 1, 2019 Filing 85 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice of Defendant Hennessy Industries, LLC filed by Hennessy Industries LLC. Thomas H. Toy, Sr. and Agnes Toy. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Shaw, Casey) (Filed on 3/1/2019) Modified on 3/4/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER by Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. In any future stipulations and proposed orders that are submitted in more than one of cases 19-cv-00325, 326 and 336, the request should be in a single filing that includes the caption for each applicable case. In other words, the parties should not submit multiple separate identical documents. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hsglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2019)
February 27, 2019 Filing 83 REPLY (re #41 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ) filed byWestern Auto Supply Company. (Majd, Nilufar) (Filed on 2/27/2019)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #76 STIPULATION for VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANY ONLY. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2019)
February 27, 2019 Filing 81 Answer to #64 Amended Complaint, byIMO Industries Inc. (Bailey, Bobbie) (Filed on 2/27/2019) Modified on 2/28/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
February 26, 2019 Filing 80 ANSWER to #64 Amended Complaint by Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc. (Bacon, Juniper) (Filed on 2/26/2019) Modified on 2/27/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
February 26, 2019 Filing 79 REPLY (re #39 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ) filed byNational Automotive Parts Association. (Majd, Nilufar) (Filed on 2/26/2019)
February 26, 2019 Filing 78 Answer to #64 Amended Complaint for Personal Injury- Asbestos by CBS Corporation. (Jamison, Kevin) (Filed on 2/26/2019) Modified on 2/27/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
February 26, 2019 Filing 77 ANSWER to #64 Amended Complaint by M. Slayen and Associates, Inc. (Kannett, Mark) (Filed on 2/26/2019) Modified on 2/27/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
February 26, 2019 Filing 76 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice of Specially Appearing Defendant Ford Motor Company Only filed by Ford Motor Company, Thomas H. Toy, Sr., and Agnes Toy. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ghanaat, Bina) (Filed on 2/26/2019) Modified on 2/27/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
February 26, 2019 #Electronic filing error. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Document also listed case numbers 4:19-cv-325-HSG and 4:19-cv-326-HSG. This case in NOT a consolidated case. If it is intended to be applied to the other case numbers, please e-file in those cases also. If the document is not applicable to that case, DO NOT include that case number on the documents and do not specify that 4:19-cv-325-HSG is the lead case number. [err102] Re: #73 Answer to Amended Complaint filed by IMO Industries Inc. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2019) Modified on 2/26/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
February 25, 2019 Filing 75 ANSWER to #64 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Ingersoll-Rand Company. (Galfayan, Arpi) (Filed on 2/25/2019) Modified on 2/26/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #71 Stipulation. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2019)
February 25, 2019 Filing 73 Answer to #64 Amended Complaint by IMO Industries Inc. (Bailey, Bobbie) (Filed on 2/25/2019) Modified on 2/26/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
February 22, 2019 Filing 72 Notice of Withdrawal of #37 Motion to Dismiss Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Genuine Parts Company (Majd, Nilufar) (Filed on 2/22/2019) Modified on 2/25/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
February 22, 2019 Filing 71 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Pneumo Abex LLC., Thomas H. Toy, Sr., and Agnes Toy. (Brydon, John) (Filed on 2/22/2019) Modified on 2/25/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
February 20, 2019 Filing 70 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #41 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ) filed byAgnes Toy, Thomas H. Toy, Sr. (Adams, Benjamin) (Filed on 2/20/2019)
February 20, 2019 Filing 69 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #39 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ) filed byAgnes Toy, Thomas H. Toy, Sr. (Adams, Benjamin) (Filed on 2/20/2019)
February 19, 2019 Filing 68 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #37 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ) filed byAgnes Toy, Thomas H. Toy, Sr. (Adams, Benjamin) (Filed on 2/19/2019)
February 14, 2019 Filing 67 Certificate of Interested Entities by Aurora Pump Company and Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 (Hansen, Haley) (Filed on 2/14/2019)
February 14, 2019 Filing 66 NOTICE of Appearance by Haley Lanell Hansen on behalf of Defendant Aurora Pump Company (Hansen, Haley) (Filed on 2/14/2019)
February 14, 2019 Filing 65 NOTICE of Filing State Court Answer by Aurora Pump Company (Hansen, Haley) (Filed on 2/14/2019) Modified on 2/15/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
February 12, 2019 Filing 64 AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Complaint for Personal Injury and Loss of Consortium against Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Alfa Laval Inc., Armstrong International, Inc., Aurora Pump Company, BW/IP, Inc., Blackmer Pump Company, Borgwarner Morse Tec LLC, CBS Corporation, CLA-VAL Co., Carrier Corporation, Copes-Vulcan, Inc., Crane Co., Dana Companies, LLC, Dezurik, Inc, Flowserve US, Inc., Ford Motor Company, Fryer-Knowles, Inc., General Electric Company, Genuine Parts Company, Grinnell LLC, Hennessy Industries LLC, Hill Brothers Chemical Company, Honeywell International Inc., IMO Industries Inc., ITT LLC, Ingersoll-Rand Company, M. Slayen and Associates, Inc., Metalclad Insulation LLC, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, National Automotive Parts Association, Parker-Hannifin Corporation, Pneumo Abex LLC, SB Decking Inc, Smothers Parts international, Standard Motor Products, Inc., The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, The William Powell Company, Velan Valve Corp., Viad Corp., Viking Pump, Inc., Warren Pumps LLC, Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc., Western Auto Supply Company. Filed byAgnes Toy, Thomas H. Toy, Sr. (Adams, Benjamin) (Filed on 2/12/2019)
February 12, 2019 #Electronic filing error. REMINDER TO COUNSEL: In the future, please attach all supporting document and proposed orders to the Motion. No further action is necessary. Re:[ 63] Proposed Order filed by Ford Motor Company (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2019)
February 12, 2019 Reset Hearings, See Re-Notices as to (37 in 4:19-cv-00325-HSG) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , (47 in 4:19-cv-00325-HSG) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , (50 in 4:19-cv-00325-HSG) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , (61 in 4:19-cv-00325-HSG) MOTION to Quash SECOND RE-NOTICE OF SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANYS MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION, PENDING IN STATE COURT, (45 in 4:19-cv-00326-HSG) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , (47 in 4:19-cv-00326-HSG) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , (26 in 4:19-cv-00326-HSG) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , (61 in 4:19-cv-00326-HSG) MOTION to Quash of Motion to Quash Service of Summons and Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, Pending in State Court (Second Re-Notice), (49 in 4:19-cv-00326-HSG) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , (55 in 4:19-cv-00336-HSG) MOTION to Quash Service of Summons and Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, Pending in State Court (Second Re-Notice) , (37 in 4:19-cv-00336-HSG) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , (41 in 4:19-cv-00336-HSG) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , (39 in 4:19-cv-00336-HSG) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Motion Hearing set for 5/2/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2019)
February 11, 2019 Filing 63 Proposed Order re #59 MOTION to Quash by Ford Motor Company. (Ghanaat, Bina) (Filed on 2/11/2019) Modified on 2/12/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
February 11, 2019 Filing 62 Second Re-Notice of #41 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Western Auto Supply Company. Motion Hearing set for 5/2/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Majd, Nilufar) (Filed on 2/11/2019) Modified on 2/12/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
February 11, 2019 Filing 61 Second Re-Notice of #39 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by National Automotive Parts Association. Motion Hearing set for 5/2/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Majd, Nilufar) (Filed on 2/11/2019) Modified on 2/12/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
February 11, 2019 Filing 60 Second Re-Notice of #37 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Genuine Parts Company. Motion Hearing set for 5/2/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.(Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Majd, Nilufar) (Filed on 2/11/2019) Modified on 2/12/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 2/12/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
February 11, 2019 Filing 59 Third Re-Notice of #55 MOTION to Quash filed by Ford Motor Company. Motion Hearing set for 5/2/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr. (Ghanaat, Bina) (Filed on 2/11/2019) Modified on 2/12/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
February 11, 2019 Filing 58 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE. Notice is hereby given that a Case Management Conference has been set for May 14, 2019, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA. Case Management Statement due by May 7, 2019. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:19-cv-00325-HSG, 4:19-cv-00326-HSG or 4:19-cv-00336-HSG. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2019)
February 11, 2019 Filing 57 CLERK'S NOTICE RE (Docket Nos. 61 in case nos. 19-cv-00325-HSG and 19-cv-00326- HSG and 55 in case no. 19-cv-00336-HSG) Motions to Quash. Notice is hereby given that the briefing schedule is: response is due February 22nd, and reply is due March 1st. The briefing set by counsel at the time the motions were re-filed/re-noticed are terminated. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2019)
February 11, 2019 Filing 56 CLERK'S NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that counsel must re-notice not re- file the (docket nos. 37, 47, 50 in case no. 19-cv-00325-HSG, 26, 45, 47, 49 in case no. 19-cv-00326-HSG and 37, 39 and 41 in case no. 19-cv-00336-HSG) motions to dismiss and the ( docket nos. 61 in case no. 19-cv-00325-HSG, 61 in case no. 19-cv-00326-HSG and 55 in case no. 19-cv-00336-HSG) motions to quash. Hearing dates of March 14th, are vacated. Counsel is directed to check the Court's scheduling notes before re-noticing the motion for a new hearing date. March 14th was not the Court's next available hearing date when the motions were e-filed. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2019)
February 8, 2019 Filing 55 MOTION to Quash Service of Summons and Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, Pending in State Court (Second Re-Notice) filed by Ford Motor Company. Motion Hearing set for 3/14/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Responses due by 2/21/2019. Replies due by 2/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A in Support of Re-Notice, #2 Proposed Order)(Ghanaat, Bina) (Filed on 2/8/2019) Modified on 2/11/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 2/12/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
February 8, 2019 Filing 54 Renotice motion hearing re #41 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed byWestern Auto Supply Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #41 ) (Majd, Nilufar) (Filed on 2/8/2019)
February 8, 2019 Filing 53 Renotice motion hearing re #39 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed byNational Automotive Parts Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #39 ) (Majd, Nilufar) (Filed on 2/8/2019)
February 8, 2019 Filing 52 Renotice motion hearing re #37 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed byGenuine Parts Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #37 ) (Majd, Nilufar) (Filed on 2/8/2019)
February 8, 2019 Filing 51 OBJECTIONS to Notice to Take the Vedeotaped Deposition of Thomas Toy, Sr. by Fryer-Knowles, Inc. (Bishop, Charles) (Filed on 2/8/2019) Modified on 2/11/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
February 8, 2019 Filing 50 Certificate of Interested Entities by IMO Industries Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Colfax Corporation, Corporate Parent Colfax Fluid Handling LLC, Corporate Parent IMO Holdings, Inc. for IMO Industries Inc.. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Bailey, Bobbie) (Filed on 2/8/2019)
February 8, 2019 Filing 49 Defendant Imo Industries, Inc.'s Answer to Complaint for Personal Injury and Loss of Consortium ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) byIMO Industries Inc.. (Bailey, Bobbie) (Filed on 2/8/2019)
February 8, 2019 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by Bobbie Rae Bailey of Bobbie R. Bailey, Frederick W. Gatt and Olga G. Pena (Bailey, Bobbie) (Filed on 2/8/2019) Modified on 2/11/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER, Case reassigned to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr. Judge Edward M. Chen no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 2/8/19. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2019)
February 7, 2019 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy David Milbrodt (Milbrodt, Jeremy) (Filed on 2/7/2019)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/7/2019. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2019)
February 7, 2019 Filing 44 **RE-FILED AS DOCKET NO. #55 ** MOTION to Quash Service of Summons and Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, Pending in State Court by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBIT A IN SUPPORT OF RE-NOTICE, #2 Proposed Order PROPOSED ORDER)(Ghanaat, Bina) (Filed on 2/7/2019) Modified on 2/11/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
February 7, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Bina Ghanaat SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANYS NOTICE OF SPECIAL APPEARANCE (Ghanaat, Bina) (Filed on 2/7/2019)
February 7, 2019 Filing 42 Declaration of Nilufar K. Majd in Support of #41 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed byWestern Auto Supply Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #41 ) (Majd, Nilufar) (Filed on 2/7/2019)
February 7, 2019 Filing 41 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Western Auto Supply Company. Motion Hearing set for 3/14/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 2/21/2019. Replies due by 2/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Proposed Order)(Majd, Nilufar) (Filed on 2/7/2019)
February 7, 2019 Filing 40 Declaration of Nilufar K. Majd in Support of #39 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed byNational Automotive Parts Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Related document(s) #39 ) (Majd, Nilufar) (Filed on 2/7/2019)
February 7, 2019 Filing 39 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by National Automotive Parts Association. Motion Hearing set for 3/14/2019 01:30 PM before Judge Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 2/21/2019. Replies due by 2/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Proposed Order)(Majd, Nilufar) (Filed on 2/7/2019)
February 7, 2019 Filing 38 Declaration of Nilufar K. Majd in Support of #37 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed byGenuine Parts Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) #37 ) (Majd, Nilufar) (Filed on 2/7/2019)
February 7, 2019 Filing 37 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Genuine Parts Company. Motion Hearing set for 3/14/2019 01:30 PM before Judge Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 2/21/2019. Replies due by 2/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Proposed Order)(Majd, Nilufar) (Filed on 2/7/2019)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER IN REASSIGNED CASE: Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/9/2019 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/2/2019. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/6/2019. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2019)
February 6, 2019 Filing 35 Case reassigned to Judge Edward M. Chen. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2019)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Cases 3:19-cv-00325-EMC and 4:19-cv-00326-HSG are RELATED. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/6/2019. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2019)
February 5, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Alan Steig (Steig, Thomas) (Filed on 2/5/2019)
February 5, 2019 Filing 32 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ingersoll-Rand Company.. (Galfayan, Arpi) (Filed on 2/5/2019)
February 5, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Carla Lynn Crochet (Crochet, Carla) (Filed on 2/5/2019)
February 4, 2019 Filing 30 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Ford Motor Company Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Ford Motor Company Specially Appearing Defendant Ford Motor Company's Disclosure Statement and Disclosure of Non-Party Interested Entities or Persons Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 and Local Rule 3-15 (Ghanaat, Bina) (Filed on 2/4/2019)
February 4, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE by Ford Motor Company Notice of "Specially Appearing Defendant Ford Motor Company's Motion To Quash Service of Summons and Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction," Pending in State Court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A in Support of Notice)(Ghanaat, Bina) (Filed on 2/4/2019)
February 2, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to defendant Thomas Dee Engineering Co., Inc., ONLY by Agnes Toy, Thomas H. Toy, Sr (Adams, Benjamin) (Filed on 2/2/2019)
January 31, 2019 Filing 27 Certificate of Interested Entities by Crane Co. identifying Other Affiliate American Home Assurance Company, Other Affiliate National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania, Other Affiliate Lexington Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Transit Casualty Company, Other Affiliate Government Employees Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Pacific Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Fireman's Fund Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Transamerica Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Insurance Company of North America, Other Affiliate First State Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Hartford, The, Other Affiliate Prudential Reinsurance Company, Other Affiliate American Excess Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Granite State Insurance Company, Other Affiliate American Reinsurance Company, Other Affiliate American Centennial Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Continental, Other Affiliate Employers Mutual Casualty Company, Other Affiliate INA, Other Affiliate Liberty Mutual, Other Affiliate The Home Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Century Indemnity Company, Other Affiliate Boston Old Colony Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Northbrook Excess and Surplus Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Underwriters at Lloyds of London and London Market Companies, Other Affiliate The Employer's Reinsurance Corporation of Kansas City, Kansas, Other Affiliate Midland Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Motor Vehicle Casualty Insurance, Other Affiliate Mission Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Dairyland Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Centaur Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Integrity Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Globe Indemnity, Other Affiliate Aetna, Other Affiliate New England Reinsurance Corporation, Other Affiliate Twin City Fire Insuracne Company, Other Affiliate The North River Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Aetna Casualty and Surety Company, Other Affiliate AIU Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Employers Insurance of Wausau for Crane Co.. (Soskin, Peter) (Filed on 1/31/2019)
January 31, 2019 Filing 26 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Crane Co. (Soskin, Peter) (Filed on 1/31/2019)
January 31, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Edward Soskin and Geoffrey M. Davis (Soskin, Peter) (Filed on 1/31/2019)
January 31, 2019 Filing 24 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byCrane Co.. (Soskin, Peter) (Filed on 1/31/2019)
January 30, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin H Adams for Plaintiffs (Adams, Benjamin) (Filed on 1/30/2019)
January 30, 2019 Filing 22 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO RELATE CASES filed by The William Powell Company. Responses due by 2/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew L. Sharp in Support of Defendant The WN. Powell Companys Administrative Motion to Relate Cases)(Sharp, Andrew) (Filed on 1/30/2019) Modified on 1/31/2019 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
January 29, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Diane Bergstrom Notice of Apperance for Mark S. Kannett and Juniper Bacon (Bergstrom, Emily) (Filed on 1/29/2019)
January 29, 2019 Filing 20 Certificate of Interested Entities by Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Weir Valves & Controls, USA, Inc. for Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc.. (Bergstrom, Emily) (Filed on 1/29/2019)
January 29, 2019 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Defendant Weir Valves & Controls, USA, Inc.'s Notice of Filing State Court Answer to Complaint byWeir Valves & Controls USA, Inc.. (Bergstrom, Emily) (Filed on 1/29/2019)
January 29, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Diane Bergstrom Notice of Apperance for Mark S. Kannett and P. Mark Mahoney (Bergstrom, Emily) (Filed on 1/29/2019)
January 29, 2019 Filing 17 Certificate of Interested Entities by M. Slayen and Associates, Inc. (Bergstrom, Emily) (Filed on 1/29/2019)
January 29, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Defendant M. Slayen and Associates, Inc.'s Notice of Filing State Court Answer to Complaint byM. Slayen and Associates, Inc.. (Bergstrom, Emily) (Filed on 1/29/2019)
January 25, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint byThe William Powell Company. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appearance, #2 Declination of Magistrate Jurisdiction)(Sharp, Andrew) (Filed on 1/25/2019)
January 25, 2019 Filing 14 Certificate of Interested Entities by Ingersoll-Rand Company identifying Corporate Parent Ingersoll-Rand PLC for Ingersoll-Rand Company. (Galfayan, Arpi) (Filed on 1/25/2019)
January 25, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE Of Filing State Court Answer to Complaint for Damages and Personal Injuries; Demand for Jury Trial by Ingersoll-Rand Company (Galfayan, Arpi) (Filed on 1/25/2019)
January 25, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF FILING State Court Answer to Removal Complaint by Fryer-Knowles, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit: Defendant Fryer-Knowles, Inc., a California Corporations Answer to Plaintiffs Complaint for Personal Injury and Loss of Consortium; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL)(Bishop, Charles) (Filed on 1/25/2019) Modified on 1/29/2019 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
January 24, 2019 Filing 11 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/11/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/18/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2019)
January 24, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE by Fryer-Knowles, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DEFENDANT FRYER-KNOWLES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATIONS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY AND LOSS OF CONSORTIUM; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL)(Bishop, Charles) (Filed on 1/24/2019)
January 24, 2019 Filing 9 Certificate of Interested Entities by Fryer-Knowles, Inc. (Bishop, Charles) (Filed on 1/24/2019)
January 24, 2019 #Electronic filing error Re: #10 Notice (Other), filed by Fryer-Knowles, Inc.. Incorrect event used. [err101] Please re-file in its entirety as <<<<. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2019)
January 22, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Finnell Cronin on Behalf of Defendant CBS Corporation, et al. (Cronin, Justin) (Filed on 1/22/2019)
January 22, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin Nicole Empting on Behalf of Defendant CBS Corporation, et al. (Empting, Erin) (Filed on 1/22/2019)
January 22, 2019 Filing 6 Joinder re #1 Notice of Removal filed by Defendant William Powell Company by CBS Corporation. (Jamison, Kevin) (Filed on 1/22/2019) Modified on 1/24/2019 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
January 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Douglas Jamison on Behalf of Defendant CBS Corporation, et al. (Jamison, Kevin) (Filed on 1/22/2019)
January 22, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CBS Corporation identifying Corporate Parent CBS Corporation, a Delaware corporation, f/k/a Viacom Inc., successor by merger to CBS Corporation, a Pennsylvania corporation, f/k/a Westinghouse Electric Corporation, Other Affiliate National Amusements, Inc., Other Affiliate NAI Entertainment Holdings LLC for CBS Corporation. re #3 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) on Behalf of Defendant CBS Corporation, et al. (Jamison, Kevin) (Filed on 1/22/2019)
January 22, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) and Demand for Jury byCBS Corporation. (Jamison, Kevin) (Filed on 1/22/2019)
January 22, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/5/2019. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2019)
January 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Alameda. Their case number is RG18932350. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-13018336). Filed byThe William Powell Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Interested Parties)(Sharp, Andrew) (Filed on 1/18/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Toy et al v. Honeywell International Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viking Pump, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Standard Motor Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BW/IP, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Paul Vincent Lankford
Represented By: Paul-Erik Lannus
Represented By: Bina Ghanaat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries Inc.
Represented By: Olga Guadalupe Pena
Represented By: Frederick W. Gatt
Represented By: Bobbie Rae Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Represented By: Geoffrey M Davis
Represented By: Peter Edward Soskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Slayen and Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Mark S. Kannett
Represented By: Patrick Mark Mahoney
Represented By: Emily Diane Bergstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blackmer Pump Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Auto Supply Company
Represented By: Dana Leigh Burch
Represented By: Frank D. Pond
Represented By: Nilufar Kashani Majd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Copes-Vulcan, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Velan Valve Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurora Pump Company
Represented By: Christine Dianne Calareso
Represented By: W. Joseph Gunter
Represented By: Haley Lanell Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genuine Parts Company
Represented By: Michael A. Graham
Represented By: Dana Leigh Burch
Represented By: Francis Dennis Pond
Represented By: Frank D. Pond
Represented By: Nilufar Kashani Majd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dezurik, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrier Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hill Brothers Chemical Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The William Powell Company
Represented By: Andrew Livingston Sharp
Represented By: Khaled Taqi-Eddin
Represented By: Douglas Garth Wah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grinnell LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfa Laval Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armstrong International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Dee Engineering Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VIAD CORP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parker-Hannifin Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fryer-Knowles, Inc.
Represented By: Charles Stewart Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BORGWARNER MORSE TEC LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLA-VAL Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowserve US, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingersoll-Rand Company
Represented By: Carla Lynn Crochet
Represented By: Arpi Galfayan
Represented By: Thomas Alan Steig
Represented By: Jeremy David Milbrodt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pneumo Abex LLC
Represented By: John R. Brydon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metalclad Insulation LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: itt, llc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hennessy Industries LLC
Represented By: Casey Carlton Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc.
Represented By: Mark S. Kannett
Represented By: Emily Diane Bergstrom
Represented By: Juniper Bacon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Companies, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: Kevin Douglas Jamison
Represented By: Justin Finnell Cronin
Represented By: Erin Nicole Empting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smothers Parts international
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viad Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NAPA
Represented By: Michael A. Graham
Represented By: Dana Leigh Burch
Represented By: Francis Dennis Pond
Represented By: Frank D. Pond
Represented By: Nilufar Kashani Majd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Automotive Parts Association
Represented By: Dana Leigh Burch
Represented By: Frank D. Pond
Represented By: Nilufar Kashani Majd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SB Decking Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genuine Parts Company doing business as Rayloc also known as NAPA
Represented By: Michael A. Graham
Represented By: Dana Leigh Burch
Represented By: Francis Dennis Pond
Represented By: Frank D. Pond
Represented By: Nilufar Kashani Majd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smothers Parts international doing business as Smothers Auto Parts & Performance Accessories
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hoffman Specialty MFG, Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bell and Gossett Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westinghouse Electric Corporation
Represented By: Kevin Douglas Jamison
Represented By: Justin Finnell Cronin
Represented By: Erin Nicole Empting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied-Products Liability Signal, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Dial Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grinnell LLC doing business as Grinnell Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viacom Inc
Represented By: Kevin Douglas Jamison
Represented By: Justin Finnell Cronin
Represented By: Erin Nicole Empting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT Marlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metalclad Insulation Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT Industries Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hennessy Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Casey Carlton Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT Fluid Products Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AGNES TOY
Represented By: Jessica M. Dean
Represented By: Benjamin H Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS TOY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas H. Toy, Sr.
Represented By: Jessica M. Dean
Represented By: Benjamin H Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?