Keyes v. Berryhill
Plaintiff: Allah Keyes
Defendant: Nancy A Berryhill
Case Number: 4:2019cv00345
Filed: January 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed in a Social Security Case Nancy A Berryhill served on 1/29/2019, answer due 4/29/2019. (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2019)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Acknowledgment of Receipt re #6 Summons Issued as to Nancy A Berryhill, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2019)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Nancy A Berryhill, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 USM 285)(cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2019)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and further Ordered for the Clerk to issue Summons and US Marshal serve. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2019)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SOCIAL SECURITY PROCEDURAL ORDER: (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2019)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2019)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis file d by Allah Keyes (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2019)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Allah Keyes. (Roussos, Georgeana) (Filed on 1/18/2019) Modified text to correct wrong event selected on 1/22/2019 (srnS, COURT STAFF).
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nancy A Berryhill. Filed byAllah Keyes. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Roussos, Georgeana) (Filed on 1/18/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Keyes v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allah Keyes
Represented By: Georgeana Katherine Roussos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?