Lagana v. State of California et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Victor Lagana
Defendant: City & County of San Francisco, Starbucks Corporation, State of California, Gavin Newsom, B.A.R.T. Police Department, Kamala Harris and Pasquale Rotella
Case Number: 4:2019cv00455
Filed: January 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: PSLC GRC
Referring Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2019 Filing 7 Letter re In Forma Pauperis from Joseph V. Lagana. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/5/2019: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope) (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
February 8, 2019 Filing 6 EXHIBITS 1-5 filed byJoseph Victor Lagana. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2019)
February 6, 2019 Filing 5 Declaration of Joseph Lagana in support of in forma pauperis status filed byJoseph Victor Lagana. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2019)
February 6, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for U.S. Marshal to serve all documents filed by Joseph Victor Lagana. Responses due by 3/6/2019. Replies due by 3/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2019)
January 25, 2019 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 3/4/2019. (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2019)
January 25, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Joseph Victor Lagana. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2019)
January 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against B.A.R.T. Police Department, City & County of San Francisco, Kamala Harris, Gavin Newsom, Pasquale Rotella, Starbucks Corporation, State of California Filed byJoseph Victor Lagana. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lagana v. State of California et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City & County of San Francisco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starbucks Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gavin Newsom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B.A.R.T. Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kamala Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pasquale Rotella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Victor Lagana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?