CI & T, INC. v. Nielsen et al
Plaintiff: CI & T, INC.
Defendant: Kirstjen M Nielsen, Matthew Whitaker, The United States of America and L. Francis Cissna
Case Number: 4:2019cv00831
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Referring Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2019 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 5/27/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for MONDAY, 6/3/2019 02:00 PM before Hon. Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2019)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 03/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2019)
March 25, 2019 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ivaS, COURTSTAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2019)
March 20, 2019 Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by CI & T, INC... (Shepherd, Shannon) (Filed on 3/20/2019)
March 8, 2019 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 3/22/2019. (ivaS, COURTSTAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2019)
March 1, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to L. Francis Cissna, Kirstjen M Nielsen, The United States of America, Matthew Whitaker, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2019)
March 1, 2019 Filing 8 Proposed Summons. (Shepherd, Shannon) (Filed on 3/1/2019)
March 1, 2019 #Electronic filing error. A maximum of THREE summons will be issued. Please list all defendants on ONE summons or multiple defendants on THREE summons and re-file in its entirety Re: #7 Proposed Summons filed by CI & T, INC. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2019)
February 28, 2019 Filing 7 Proposed Summons. (Attachments: #1 Summons Proposed Summons, #2 Summons Proposed Summons, #3 Summons Proposed Summons)(Shepherd, Shannon) (Filed on 2/28/2019)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore finding as moot #4 Motion for Pro Hac Vice; granting #5 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Shannon M. Shepherd. (ivaS, COURTSTAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2019)
February 22, 2019 Filing 5 Amended MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13107907.) Filing fee previously paid on 2/21/2019 filed by CI & T, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Shepherd, Shannon) (Filed on 2/22/2019)
February 21, 2019 #Electronic filing error. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. A certificate of Good Standing is required with the application for Pro Hac Vice. Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #4 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13107907.) filed by CI & T, INC. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2019)
February 20, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13107907.) filed by CI & T, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Illinois Law License)(Shepherd, Shannon) (Filed on 2/20/2019)
February 19, 2019 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/14/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/21/2019 01:30 PM. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2019)
February 15, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/1/2019. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2019)
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13097159.)(no process). Filed by CI & T, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cereghino, Jeffrey) (Filed on 2/15/2019) Modified on 2/19/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CI & T, INC. v. Nielsen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirstjen M Nielsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Francis Cissna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CI & T, INC.
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Cereghino
Represented By: Shannon Marie Shepherd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?