Inn Foods, Inc., a California corporation v. T. P. Seafood & Meat Company, Inc., a California corporation et al

Plaintiff: Inn Foods, Inc., a California corporation and Inn Foods, Inc.
Defendant: Henry Yip and T. P. Seafood & Meat Company, Inc., a California corporation
Case Number: 4:2019cv01067
Filed: February 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Hixson
Referring Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07:499
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 3/27/2019. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2019)
March 22, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice by Inn Foods, Inc. (Meuers, Lawrence) (Filed on 3/22/2019)
March 13, 2019 REMINDER: Counsel are instructed that all future filings shall bear the initials YGR immediately after the case number pursuant to the order reassigning case (document #9 ) Re: #11 Summons Returned Executed filed by Inn Foods, Inc., a California corporation, #12 Summons Returned Executed filed by Inn Foods, Inc., a California corporation (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2019)
March 12, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Inn Foods, Inc., a California corporation. Henry Yip served on 3/6/2019, answer due 3/27/2019. (Meuers, Lawrence) (Filed on 3/12/2019)
March 12, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Inn Foods, Inc., a California corporation. T. P. Seafood & Meat Company, Inc., a California corporation served on 3/6/2019, answer due 3/27/2019. (Meuers, Lawrence) (Filed on 3/12/2019)
March 8, 2019 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 6/10/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for Monday, 6/17/2019 02:00 PM before Judge Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2019)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Executive Committee on 3/1/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2019)
February 28, 2019 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2019)
February 28, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to T. P. Seafood & Meat Company, Inc., a California corporation, Henry Yip. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2019)
February 28, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Inn Foods, Inc., a California corporation.. (Meuers, Lawrence) (Filed on 2/28/2019)
February 27, 2019 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/23/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/30/2019 10:00 AM. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2019)
February 27, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/13/2019. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2019)
February 27, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Meuers, Lawrence) (Filed on 2/27/2019)
February 27, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Inn Foods, Inc., a California corporation (Meuers, Lawrence) (Filed on 2/27/2019)
February 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13126238.). Filed byInn Foods, Inc., a California corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Invoice, #2 Exhibit B - Bill of Lading, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Meuers, Lawrence) (Filed on 2/27/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Inn Foods, Inc., a California corporation v. T. P. Seafood & Meat Company, Inc., a California corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Inn Foods, Inc., a California corporation
Represented By: Lawrence Henry Meuers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Inn Foods, Inc.
Represented By: Lawrence Henry Meuers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Yip
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. P. Seafood & Meat Company, Inc., a California corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?