West Coast Iron, Inc. v. Halbert Construction Company, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: West Coast Iron, Inc.
Defendant: Halbert Construction Company, Inc. and Western Surety Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv01087
Filed: February 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:270
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of entire case without prejudice by West Coast Iron, Inc. (Yurcich, Stephen) (Filed on 4/25/2019)
April 8, 2019 Filing 17 Refund Status re #16 Application for Refund APPROVED. (rghS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2019)
April 3, 2019 Filing 16 Application for Refund, Receipt Number 26FNDAQA tracking number 13128825 by West Coast Iron, Inc.. (Yurcich, Stephen) (Filed on 4/3/2019)
March 21, 2019 Filing 15 Refund Status re #14 Application for Refund DECLINED. (rghS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2019)
March 18, 2019 Filing 14 Application for Refund, Receipt Number 26FNDAQA tracking number 0971-13128825 by West Coast Iron, Inc.. (Yurcich, Stephen) (Filed on 3/18/2019)
March 14, 2019 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE. Notice is hereby given that a Case Management Conference has been set for June 4, 2019, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA. Case Management Statement due by May 28, 2019. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:19-cv-01087-HSG. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2019)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson no longer assigned to the case. Signed by the Clerk on 3/13/19. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2019)
March 13, 2019 Filing 11 Certificate of Interested Entities by West Coast Iron, Inc. (Yurcich, Stephen) (Filed on 3/13/2019)
March 13, 2019 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2019)
March 13, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by West Coast Iron, Inc... (Yurcich, Stephen) (Filed on 3/13/2019)
March 6, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Western Surety Company. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2019)
March 6, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Halbert Construction Company, Inc. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2019)
March 5, 2019 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. (Yurcich, Stephen) (Filed on 3/5/2019)
March 5, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. (Yurcich, Stephen) (Filed on 3/5/2019)
March 4, 2019 Filing 4 EXHIBITS re #1 Complaint, Exhibit A filed byWest Coast Iron, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Complaint)(Related document(s) #1 ) (Yurcich, Stephen) (Filed on 3/4/2019)
March 4, 2019 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/23/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/30/2019 10:00 AM. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2019)
March 1, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/15/2019. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2019)
February 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Breach of Contract against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13128825.). Filed byWest Coast Iron, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Yurcich, Stephen) (Filed on 2/27/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: West Coast Iron, Inc. v. Halbert Construction Company, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Halbert Construction Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Surety Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: West Coast Iron, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen Francis Yurcich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?