Orr et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, FSB et al

Plaintiff: Patra K. Orr and Thomas W. Orr
Defendant: CitiBank Corporate Headquarters, McCarthy & Holthus,LLP, U.S. Bank National Association, Wells Fargo Bank, FSB, Quality Loan Service Corporation and All Persons or Entities Unknown
Case Number: 4:2019cv01226
Filed: March 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Sallie Kim
Referring Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER RE: PLAINTIFFS' FAILURE TO FILE AN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS re #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Wells Fargo Bank, FSB. Set/Reset Deadlines as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss : Responses due by 5/10/2019. Replies due by 5/17/2019. The Court further VACATES the hearing currently set for May 14, 2019. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/12/19. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2019)
April 12, 2019 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wells Fargo Bank, FSB Re Clerks Notice of Setting Case Management Conference; Standing Order in Civil Cases For Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers and Standing Order for All Judges of the Northern District of California (Reigle, Scott) (Filed on 4/12/2019)
April 12, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE That Stat Court Received Notice of Removal by Wells Fargo Bank, FSB re #1 Notice of Removal, (Reigle, Scott) (Filed on 4/12/2019) Modified on 4/15/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
April 9, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss: Motion Hearing set for Tuesday, 5/14/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2019)
April 9, 2019 Filing 24 Re-NOTICE of Motion to Dismiss by Wells Fargo Bank, FSB re #7 MOTION to Dismiss (Reigle, Scott) (Filed on 4/9/2019) Modified on 4/10/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
April 8, 2019 Filing 23 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 6/3/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for MONDAY, 6/10/2019 02:00 PM before Hon. Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2019)
April 4, 2019 Filing 22 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held on 4/4/2019 by Howard Herman (ec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2019) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
April 3, 2019 Filing 21 Case reassigned to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Judge Richard Seeborg no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2019)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER RELATING CASES 18-cv-4407-YGR and 19-cv-1226-RS. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2019)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER of referral for related case determination. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/27/19. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2019)The deputy clerk hereby certifies that on 3/27/19 a copy of this order was served by sending it via first-class mail to the address of each non-CM/ECF user listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing.
March 27, 2019 Filing 18 CLERK'S NOTICE RE REASSIGNED CASE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Richard Seeborg upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Seeborg's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. All pending motions will be taken off-calendar and must be re-noticed by the moving party for a new hearing according to Judge Seeborg's available dates, which are listed on his webpage under the section "Scheduling Notes." The new hearing date must be at least five weeks from the date the motion was filed and at least three weeks from the date the re-notice is filed. The due date for any opposition or reply papers not yet filed shall be calculated in accordance with Civil Local Rule 7-3. Case Management Statement due by 6/6/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/13/2019 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) The deputy clerk hereby certifies that on 3/27/19 a copy of this order was served by sending it via first-class mail to the address of each non-CM/ECF user listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2019)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Richard Seeborg for all further proceedings. Judge William H. Orrick no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Clerk on 3/27/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2019)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 03/26/2019. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2019)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge William H. Orrick for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Clerk on 3/25/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2019)
March 22, 2019 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2019)
March 21, 2019 Filing 13 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Wells Fargo Bank, FSB.. (Reigle, Scott) (Filed on 3/21/2019)
March 21, 2019 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 4/1/2019. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2019)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ***Please disregard, filed in error.*** ORDER RE: ATTENDANCE AT MEDIATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 3/15/2019. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2019) Modified on 3/15/2019 (ahm, COURT STAFF).
March 14, 2019 Filing 10 ADR Clerk's Notice Setting Early Assessment ADR Phone Conference in Mortgage Foreclosure Case on 4/4/19 at 10 a.m.. Please note that you must be logged into an ECF account of counsel of record in order to view this document. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(ec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2019)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order Referring Mortgage Foreclosure Case to ADR for Early Assessment Telephone Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 3/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2019)
March 13, 2019 Filing 8 Request for Judicial Notice in Support of re #7 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint filed by Wells Fargo Bank, FSB. (Related document(s) #7 ) (Reigle, Scott) (Filed on 3/13/2019)
March 13, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF MOTION & MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Wells Fargo Bank, FSB. Motion Hearing set for 4/22/2019 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Responses due by 3/27/2019. Replies due by 4/3/2019. (Attachments: #(1) [Proposed] Order)(Reigle, Scott) (Filed on 3/13/2019)
March 8, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Wells Fargo Bank, FSB of re #4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ADR DEADLINES (Reigle, Scott) (Filed on 3/8/2019)
March 8, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Wells Fargo Bank, FSB of re #2 Certificate of Interested Entities, re 3 Case Assigned by Intake, re #1 Notice of Removal - CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF REMOVAL-RELATED DOCUMENTS (Reigle, Scott) (Filed on 3/8/2019)
March 7, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Joint Case Management Statement due by 6/3/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/10/2019 at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2019)
March 6, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/20/2019. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2019)
March 6, 2019 Filing 2 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Wells Fargo Bank, FSB identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Co. for Wells Fargo Bank, FSB. (Reigle, Scott) (Filed on 3/6/2019)
March 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL BY DEFENDANT WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1441(b) & 1331 (Federal Question) from Sonoma County Superior Court. Their case number is 263852, (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0971-13149051). Filed by Wells Fargo Bank, FSB. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, #(2) Civil Cover Sheet)(Reigle, Scott) (Filed on 3/6/2019) Modified on 3/7/2019 (tnS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Orr et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, FSB et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CitiBank Corporate Headquarters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCarthy & Holthus,LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, FSB
Represented By: Scott Thomas Reigle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Loan Service Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Persons or Entities Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patra K. Orr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas W. Orr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?