(PC) Vrh v. California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation et al

Plaintiff: Aaron Vrh
Defendant: Dr. Lee, Elton John Crenshaw, San Quentin State Prison and California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation
Case Number: 4:2019cv01329
Filed: March 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2019)
March 14, 2019 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of California Eastern; Case Number 1:19-cv-00274. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
March 12, 2019 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 4/19/2019. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2019)
March 7, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Order, Case Transferred Out to Another District served on Aaron Vrh. (Gonzalez, R)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Transferring Case to the Northern District of California, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/7/19. (Gonzalez, R)
February 27, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Aaron Vrh. (Marrujo, C)
February 27, 2019 Filing 1 (1983) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Aaron Vrh. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Marrujo, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Vrh v. California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elton John Crenshaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Quentin State Prison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Vrh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?