Uniloc USA, Inc. et al v. Apple Inc.
Plaintiff: UNILOC Luxembourg S.A. and Uniloc USA, Inc.
Defendant: Apple Inc
Case Number: 4:2019cv01696
Filed: April 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Susan van Keulen
Referring Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2019 Filing 71 CLERK'S NOTICE DETERMINING THAT NO CASES ARE RELATED. re dkt. 68 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related Under Civil Local Rule 3-12 in case 19-cv-01691-JST Uniloc USA, Inc., et al v. Apple Inc. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2019)
May 29, 2019 Filing 70 REPORT on the determination of an action regarding patent. (Attachments: #1 Dismissal)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2019)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE re Notice of Dismissal #68 . Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 5/29/19. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2019)
May 24, 2019 Filing 68 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice by UNILOC Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Foster, James) (Filed on 5/24/2019)
May 22, 2019 Filing 67 *****PLEASE DISREGARD. DOCKET ENTRY MADE IN ERROR.***** CLERK'S NOTICE DETERMINING THAT NO CASES ARE RELATED. re dkt. 68 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related Under Civil Local Rule 3-12 in case 19-cv-01691-JST Uniloc USA, Inc., et al v. Apple Inc. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2019) Modified on 5/22/2019 (mllS, COURT STAFF).
May 10, 2019 Filing 66 Certificate of Interested Entities by Apple Inc (Corbett, Christine) (Filed on 5/10/2019)
May 10, 2019 Filing 65 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Apple Inc. Motion Hearing set for 6/25/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 5/24/2019. Replies due by 5/31/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order Granting Apple Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss)(Corbett, Christine) (Filed on 5/10/2019)
April 16, 2019 Filing 64 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 6/17/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for MONDAY, 6/24/2019 02:00 PM before Hon. Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2019)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 4/10/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2019)
April 10, 2019 Filing 62 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2019)
April 9, 2019 Filing 61 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Apple Inc.. (Corbett, Christine) (Filed on 4/9/2019)
April 4, 2019 Filing 60 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs and Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 4/18/2019. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms.(ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2019)
April 4, 2019 Filing 59 CLERK'S NOTICE SCHEDULING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 4/5/2019. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 7/11/2019 at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2019)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen no longer assigned to case. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2019)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Clerk of Court to reassign this case to another Judge. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 04/04/2019. (djmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2019)
April 3, 2019 Filing 56 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/25/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/2/2019 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2019)
April 3, 2019 Filing 55 Case transferred in from District of Texas Western; Case Number 1:18-cv-00166. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
March 28, 2019 Filing 54 Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (dm)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER GRANTING #35 Motion to Change Venue. This cause is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER GRANTING #51 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm)
March 6, 2019 Filing 51 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Andrew Stein by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Guaragna, John)
March 1, 2019 Filing 50 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Apple Inc., re #35 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Defendant Apple Inc. (Attachments: #1 Guaragna Decl., #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8)(Guaragna, John)
February 15, 2019 Filing 49 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc., re #35 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Defendant Apple Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kevin Gannon, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Exhibit T, #22 Exhibit U, #23 Exhibit V, #24 Exhibit W, #25 Exhibit X, #26 Exhibit Y, #27 Exhibit Z, #28 Exhibit AA, #29 Exhibit BB, #30 Exhibit CC, #31 Exhibit DD, #32 Exhibit EE, #33 Exhibit FF, #34 Exhibit GG, #35 Exhibit HH, #36 Exhibit II, #37 Exhibit JJ, #38 Exhibit KK, #39 Declaration of James J. Foster, #40 Proposed Order)(Gannon, Kevin)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER Granting Joint Stipulation Setting Deadlines. ORDER continuing Initial Pretrial Conference until further notice. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm)
September 28, 2018 Filing 47 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Shawn A. Latchford on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Latchford, Shawn)
September 20, 2018 Filing 46 Transcript filed of Proceedings held on September 11, 2018, Proceedings Transcribed: Motions Hearing. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Arlinda Rodriguez, Telephone number: 512-391-8791. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 10/11/2018, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/22/2018, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/19/2018, (Rodriguez, Arlinda)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Mark Lane. (dm)
September 13, 2018 Motions No Longer Referred: #38 Opposed MOTION FOR AN INTERIM PROTECTIVE ORDER (dm)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER DENYING #38 Motion for an Interim Protective Order. Signed by Judge Mark Lane. (dm)
September 11, 2018 Filing 43 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mark Lane: Motion Hearing held on 9/11/2018 re #38 Opposed MOTION FOR AN INTERIM PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. Written order forthcoming. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter ERO.)(dm)
September 6, 2018 Filing 42 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Shawn A. Latchford on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. Attorney Shawn A. Latchford added to party Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A.(pty:pla), Attorney Shawn A. Latchford added to party Uniloc USA, Inc.(pty:pla) (Latchford, Shawn)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDERED that all pending and future nondispositive motions in this case relatedto the scope of venue discovery are REFERRED to United States Magistrate Judge Mark Lane for resolution. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER Setting Hearing on #38 Opposed MOTION FOR AN INTERIM PROTECTIVE ORDER : Motion Hearing set for 9/11/2018 09:30 AM before Judge Mark Lane,. Signed by Judge Mark Lane. (dm)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #38 Opposed MOTION FOR AN INTERIM PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel.. Referral Magistrate Judge: Mark Lane. (dm)
August 16, 2018 Filing 38 Opposed MOTION FOR AN INTERIM PROTECTIVE ORDER by Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Foster, James)
June 26, 2018 Filing 37 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc., re #35 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Defendant Apple Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kevin Gannon, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Declaration of James J. Foster, #22 Exhibit 1, #23 Proposed Order)(Gannon, Kevin)
June 19, 2018 Filing 36 Transcript filed of Proceedings held on June 12, 2018, Proceedings Transcribed: Initial Pretrial Conference. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Arlinda Rodriguez, Telephone number: 512-391-8791. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 7/10/2018, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/20/2018, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/17/2018, (Rodriguez, Arlinda)
June 12, 2018 Filing 35 MOTION to Transfer Venue by Apple Inc. (lt) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/13/2018: #1 Declaration of Michael Jaynes, #2 Declaration of John Guaragna, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Proposed Order) (lt).
June 12, 2018 Stay Lifted per Order #34 for the limited purpose of proceeding with Apple's Motion to Transfer Venue. (lt)
June 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER GRANTING Apple Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Motion to Transfer Venue (in 18cv158 Dkt. 34). ORDER that the stay is LIFTED for the limited purpose of proceeding with Apple's Motion to Transfer Venue. FURTHER ORDERED that parties shall file a joint proposed scheduling order relating to venue on or before July 10, 2018.. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt)
June 12, 2018 Filing 33 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lee Yeakel: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 6/12/2018 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Arlinda Rodriguez.)(dm)
May 23, 2018 Filing 32 NOTICE by Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. re #29 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Foster, James)
May 11, 2018 Case Stayed pending further order of the Court. (dm)
May 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER, ( Initial Pretrial Conference set for 6/12/2018 at 02:00 PM before Judge Lee Yeakel,). This action is STAYED.. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm)
May 9, 2018 Filing 30 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Apple Inc.. (Erickson, Brian)
May 9, 2018 Filing 29 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Erickson, Brian)
April 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER GRANTING Apple's Motion to Set Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Respond to #26 Amended Complaint. Apple Inc. answer due 5/9/2018. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt)
April 18, 2018 Filing 27 Unopposed MOTION to Set Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Respond re #26 Amended Complaint by Apple Inc.. (Guaragna, John)
April 12, 2018 Filing 26 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Apple Inc. amending, filed by Uniloc USA, Inc., Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Gannon, Kevin)
March 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER GRANTING #19 Motion for Andrew N. Stein to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Apple Inc. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt)
March 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING #18 Motion for Mark D. Fowler to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Apple Inc. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt)
March 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING #17 Motion for Summer Torrez to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Apple Inc. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt)
March 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING #15 Motion for Jonathan Hicks to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Apple Inc. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt)
March 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING #14 Motion for Christine K. Corbett to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Apple Inc. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt)
March 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING #16 Motion for Larissa Park to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Apple Inc. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt)
March 19, 2018 Filing 19 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Michael Guaragna for Andrew N. Stein ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-10585938) by on behalf of Apple Inc.. (Guaragna, John)
March 19, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Michael Guaragna for Mark D. Fowler ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-10583928) by on behalf of Apple Inc.. (Guaragna, John)
March 15, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Michael Guaragna for Summer Torrez ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-10575529) by on behalf of Apple Inc.. (Guaragna, John)
March 15, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Michael Guaragna for Larissa Park ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-10575500) by on behalf of Apple Inc.. (Guaragna, John)
March 15, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Michael Guaragna for Jonathan Hicks ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-10575451) by on behalf of Apple Inc.. (Guaragna, John)
March 15, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Michael Guaragna for Christine K. Corbett ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-10575279) by on behalf of Apple Inc.. (Guaragna, John)
March 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING Defendant's Unopposed #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint; Apple Inc.'s answer due 4/23/2018. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt)
March 13, 2018 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, or Otherwise Respond by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Guaragna, John)
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Lee Yeakel for all proceedings. Judge Robert Pitman no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (dm)
March 6, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Uniloc USA, Inc., Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A.. Apple Inc. served on 3/1/2018, answer due 3/22/2018. (Nelson, Edward)
February 22, 2018 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Apple Inc.. (cj)
February 22, 2018 Filing 8 Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office along with copy of Complaint. (cj)
February 22, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (cj)
February 22, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj)
February 22, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Anthony M. Vecchione on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Vecchione, Anthony)
February 22, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kevin Gannon on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Gannon, Kevin)
February 22, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Aaron S. Jacobs on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Jacobs, Aaron)
February 22, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James J. Foster on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Foster, James)
February 22, 2018 Filing 3 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Nelson, Edward)
February 22, 2018 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Nelson, Edward)
February 22, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-10489730), filed by Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Nelson, Edward) (Attachment 3 replaced and flattened on 2/22/2018) (cj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Uniloc USA, Inc. et al v. Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc
Represented By: Summer Torrez
Represented By: Christine K Corbett
Represented By: Mark D Fowler
Represented By: Jonathan H Hicks
Represented By: Larissa Bifano
Represented By: Brian K. Erickson
Represented By: Andrew N. Stein
Represented By: John Michael Guaragna
Represented By: Jeffrey Reuben Cole
Represented By: Larissa Susan Bifano
Represented By: Christine Kerba Corbett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNILOC Luxembourg S.A.
Represented By: James J. Foster
Represented By: Shawn A Latchford
Represented By: Kevin Gannon
Represented By: Edward Nelson, III
Represented By: Anthony M Vecchione
Represented By: Aaron S. Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Uniloc USA, Inc.
Represented By: James J. Foster
Represented By: Shawn A Latchford
Represented By: Kevin Gannon
Represented By: Edward Nelson, III
Represented By: Anthony M Vecchione
Represented By: Aaron S. Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?