Todd v. Reichwein
Plaintiff: Peter Todd
Defendant: Sarah Michelle Reichwein and Isis Agora Lovecruft
Case Number: 4:2019cv01751
Filed: April 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Peter Todd re #14 Clerk's Notice,, re: Continuance of Initial Case Management Conference (Rosenfeld, Jeffrey) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 17, 2019 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE: The court is in receipt of Plaintiff's case management statement and request to continue the Initial Case Management Conference #13 . The request is granted. The Initial Case Management Conference currently set for 7/3/2019 01:30 PM has been continued to 9/4/2019 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu in Courtroom No. 4, Third Floor, U.S. District Court, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA 94612. The joint case management conference statement is due on 8/28/2019. Plaintiff shall serve the Defendant with a copy of this Clerk's Notice and file a proof of service with the court. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 13, 2019 Filing 13 PLAINTIFF'S CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT and Request to Continue Case Management Conference filed by Peter Todd. (Rosenfeld, Jeffrey) (Filed on 6/13/2019) Modified on 6/14/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
June 13, 2019 Filing 12 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Rosenfeld, Jeffrey) (Filed on 6/13/2019)
May 29, 2019 Filing 11 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Leave to Serve Summons and Complaint on Defendant by Alternative Means or in the Alternative to Extend Time to Complete Service (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Rosenfeld, Jeffrey) (Filed on 5/29/2019)
May 29, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Peter Todd. Service waived by Sarah Michelle Reichwein waiver sent on 5/14/2019, answer due 7/15/2019. (Rosenfeld, Jeffrey) (Filed on 5/29/2019)
May 8, 2019 Filing 9 Declaration of Jeffrey M. Rosenfeld in Support of #8 MOTION for Service by Publication or In The Alternative to Extend Time to Complete Service filed byPeter Todd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Q)(Related document(s) #8 ) (Rosenfeld, Jeffrey) (Filed on 5/8/2019)
May 8, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Service by Publication or In The Alternative to Extend Time to Complete Service filed by Peter Todd. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Peter Todd, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Rosenfeld, Jeffrey) (Filed on 5/8/2019)
April 11, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Peter Todd.. (Kronenberger, Karl) (Filed on 4/11/2019)
April 4, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Sarah Michelle Reichwein. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2019)
April 4, 2019 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/26/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/3/2019 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2019)
April 3, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/17/2019. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2019)
April 3, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Peter Todd (Rosenfeld, Jeffrey) (Filed on 4/3/2019)
April 3, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Rosenfeld, Jeffrey) (Filed on 4/3/2019)
April 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand for Injunctive Relief and Damages against Sarah Michelle Reichwein ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13227462.). Filed byPeter Todd. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rosenfeld, Jeffrey) (Filed on 4/3/2019) Modified on 4/4/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Todd v. Reichwein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah Michelle Reichwein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Isis Agora Lovecruft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Todd
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Rosenfeld
Represented By: Liana W Chen
Represented By: Karl Stephen Kronenberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?