Board of Trustees of the Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California et al v. RMT Landscape Contractors, Inc.
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Laborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Laborers Vacation-Holiday Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Laborers Training and Retraining Trust Fund for Northern California and Board of Trustees of the Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California
Defendant: RMT Landscape Contractors, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv01771
Filed: April 3, 2019
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. § 1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Filing 20 CLERK'S NOTICE. You are hereby notified that the Case Management Conference set for 7/9/2019 is continued to 9/24/2019 at 1:30 pm. A joint case management statement is due by 9/17/2019. Please note this date is after the deadline to complete ENE. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2019)
June 21, 2019 Filing 19 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Board of Trustees of the Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Laborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Laborers Training and Retraining Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Laborers Vacation-Holiday Trust Fund for Northern California and RMT Landscape Contractors, Inc. (Bowen, Sarah) (Filed on 6/21/2019) Modified on 6/24/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
June 17, 2019 Filing 18 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Rodriguez, Bianca) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 17, 2019 Filing 17 Certificate of Interested Entities by Board of Trustees of the Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Laborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Laborers Training and Retraining Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Laborers Vacation-Holiday Trust Fund for Northern California (Bowen, Sarah) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 17, 2019 Filing 16 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options BY PARTIES AND COUNSEL (Bowen, Sarah) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting #14 Stipulation selecting ADR Process. (ivaS, COURTSTAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2019)
June 12, 2019 Filing 14 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Early Neutral Evaluation by Board of Trustees of the Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California filed by Board of Trustees of the Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Laborers Vacation-Holiday Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Laborers Training and Retraining Trust Fund for Northern California and Board of Trustees of the Laborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern California. (Bowen, Sarah) (Filed on 6/12/2019) Modified on 6/12/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
May 20, 2019 Filing 13 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by RMT Landscape Contractors, Inc... (Rodriguez, Bianca) (Filed on 5/20/2019)
May 17, 2019 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 5/31/2019. (ivaS, COURTSTAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2019)
May 16, 2019 Filing 11 Certificate of Interested Entities by RMT Landscape Contractors, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent RMT Landscape Contractors Inc, Corporate Parent Rick De Herrera for RMT Landscape Contractors, Inc.. (Rodriguez, Bianca) (Filed on 5/16/2019)
May 16, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Filer did not add all interested parties when prompted, i.e. Rick De Herrera. Re-file this document in its entirety and when prompted, enter all affiliates or corporate parents. Please re-file in its entirety Re: #10 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by RMT Landscape Contractors, Inc. (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2019)
May 15, 2019 Filing 10 Certificate of Interested Entities by RMT Landscape Contractors, Inc. (Rodriguez, Bianca) (Filed on 5/15/2019)
May 15, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint byRMT Landscape Contractors, Inc.. (Rodriguez, Bianca) (Filed on 5/15/2019)
May 15, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Board of Trustees of the Laborers Training and Retraining Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Laborers Vacation-Holiday Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Laborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern California. (Richman, Ronald) (Filed on 5/15/2019)
May 9, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Case number referenced on papers is incorrect. Counsel should re-file the document bearing the correct case number on this and all future filings (e.g. C 01771-KAW, incorrect; CV-19-01771-KAW, correct). Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #7 Summons Returned Executed, filed by Board of Trustees of the Laborers Vacation-Holiday Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Laborers Training and Retraining Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Laborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern California (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2019)
May 8, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Board of Trustees of the Laborers Training and Retraining Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Laborers Vacation-Holiday Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Laborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern California. RMT Landscape Contractors, Inc. served on 5/5/2019, answer due 5/28/2019. (Richman, Ronald) (Filed on 5/8/2019)
April 5, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to RMT Landscape Contractors, Inc. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2019)
April 4, 2019 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/2/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/9/2019 01:30 PM. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2019)
April 4, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. (Bowen, Sarah) (Filed on 4/4/2019)
April 4, 2019 Filing 3 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Board of Trustees of the Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Laborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Laborers Training and Retraining Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Laborers Vacation-Holiday Trust Fund for Northern California.. (Bowen, Sarah) (Filed on 4/4/2019)
April 3, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/17/2019. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2019)
April 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages for Breach of Collective Bargaining Agreement, to Recover Unpaid Trust Fund Contributions and for a Mandatory Injunction against RMT Landscape Contractors, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13228177). Filed by Board of Trustees of the Laborers Training and Retraining Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Laborers Vacation-Holiday Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Laborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern California. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Richman, Ronald) (Filed on 4/3/2019) Modified on 4/4/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Board of Trustees of the Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California et al v. RMT Landscape Contractors, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Laborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern California
Represented By: Ronald Lee Richman
Represented By: Sarah Kyong-Ju Lee Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Laborers Vacation-Holiday Trust Fund for Northern California
Represented By: Ronald Lee Richman
Represented By: Sarah Kyong-Ju Lee Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Laborers Training and Retraining Trust Fund for Northern California
Represented By: Ronald Lee Richman
Represented By: Sarah Kyong-Ju Lee Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California
Represented By: Ronald Lee Richman
Represented By: Sarah Kyong-Ju Lee Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RMT Landscape Contractors, Inc.
Represented By: Bianca Monique Rodriguez
Represented By: Richard N. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?