Love v. Aranda
Plaintiff: Samuel Love
Defendant: Victor Aranda
Case Number: 4:2019cv01839
Filed: April 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: American with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byVictor Aranda. (Kozlow, Andrew) (Filed on 6/28/2019)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #9 Stipulation. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2019)
May 31, 2019 #Electronic filing error. No title Page. Certificates/Proofs of Service e-filed separately and not as an attachment, require a title page. Please refer to Civil Local Rules 3-4 re first page requirement. Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #10 Certificate of Service filed by Samuel Love, #11 Certificate of Service filed by Samuel Love (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2019)
May 31, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Samuel Love re #9 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 5/31/2019)
May 31, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Samuel Love re #8 Proposed Order (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 5/31/2019)
May 30, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER and Request to Extend the Answer Deadline and Forego the Joint Site Inspection filed by Samuel Love and Victor Aranda. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 5/30/2019) Modified on 5/30/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
May 30, 2019 Filing 8 Proposed Order and Consent Decree by Samuel Love and Victor Aranda. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 5/30/2019) Modified on 5/30/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
May 7, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Samuel Love. Victor Aranda served on 5/6/2019, answer due 5/28/2019. (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 5/7/2019)
April 8, 2019 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order for Cases Asserting Denial of Right of Access under Americans with Disabilities Act. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2019)
April 8, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Victor Aranda. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2019)
April 5, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2019)
April 5, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 4/5/2019)
April 5, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Samuel Love re #1 Complaint, (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 4/5/2019)
April 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Damages And Injunctive Relief For Violations Of: Americans With Disabilities Act; Unruh Civil Rights Act against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13234845.). Filed bySamuel Love. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 4/5/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Love v. Aranda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Love
Represented By: Amanda Lockhart Seabock
Represented By: Chris Carson
Represented By: Dennis Jay Price, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victor Aranda
Represented By: Andrew John Kozlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?