Uniloc 2017 LLC v. Apple Inc.
Plaintiff: Uniloc 2017 LLC
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv01949
Filed: April 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S White
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #47 Stipulation STAYING CASE PENDING RESOLUTION OF INTER PARTES REVIEW PROCEEDINGS. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2019)
June 4, 2019 Filing 47 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER STAYING CASE PENDING RESOLUTION OF INTER PARTES REVIEW PROCEEDINGS filed by Apple, Inc., Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Pieja, Michael) (Filed on 6/4/2019) Modified on 6/5/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO RELATE. Signed by Judge Alsup on 5/24/2019. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2019)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #40 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Re: Lauren Abendshien. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2019)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #39 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Re: Emma C. Ross. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2019)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #38 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Re: Alan E. Littmann. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2019)
May 16, 2019 Filing 42 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Michael Thomas Pieja of John Michael Guaragna (Pieja, Michael) (Filed on 5/16/2019)
May 16, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Michael Thomas Pieja of Brian K. Erickson (Pieja, Michael) (Filed on 5/16/2019)
May 16, 2019 Filing 40 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Re: Lauren Abendshien (Filing fee $310, receipt number 0971-13353354) filed by Apple, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Abendshien, Lauren) (Filed on 5/16/2019) Modified on 5/16/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
May 16, 2019 Filing 39 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Re: Emma C. Ross (Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13353341) filed by Apple, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Ross, Emma) (Filed on 5/16/2019) Modified on 5/16/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
May 16, 2019 Filing 38 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Re: Alan E. Littmann (Filing fee $310, receipt number 0971-13353318) filed by Apple, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Littmann, Alan) (Filed on 5/16/2019) Modified on 5/16/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
May 16, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth Frederick Baum (Baum, Kenneth) (Filed on 5/16/2019)
April 23, 2019 Filing 36 Certificate of Interested Entities by Apple, Inc. (Pieja, Michael) (Filed on 4/23/2019)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/15/19. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2019)
April 12, 2019 Filing 34 CLERK'S NOTICE Acknowledging Receipt of Case Transfer in from the Western District of Texas, Case No. 1:18-cv-992-LY. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2019)
April 11, 2019 Filing 33 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Case Management Statement due by 7/5/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/12/2019 11:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2019)
April 11, 2019 Filing 32 Case transferred in from District of Texas Western; Case Number 1:18-cv-00992. Case file, copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Modified on 4/12/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER GRANTING #23 Motion to Change Venue. Case is transferred to the Northern District of California. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (afd)
March 1, 2019 Filing 30 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Apple Inc., re #23 MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 USC Sec. 1404(a) filed by Defendant Apple Inc. (Attachments: #1 Guaragna Decl., #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8)(Guaragna, John)
February 15, 2019 Filing 29 STIPULATION (Joint Stipulation Regarding Page Limits) by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Guaragna, John)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Granting Joint Stipulation Setting Deadlines. ORDER continuing Initial Pretrial Conference until further notice. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm)
January 28, 2019 Filing 27 STIPULATION (Joint Stipulation Setting Deadlines) by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Guaragna, John)
December 27, 2018 Filing 26 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Apple Inc..(Pieja, Michael)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER, (Initial Pretrial Conference set for 2/1/2019 02:00 PM before Judge Lee Yeakel). Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (td)
December 27, 2018 Filing 24 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #23 MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 USC Sec. 1404(a) by Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Gannon, Kevin)
December 21, 2018 Filing 23 MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 USC Sec. 1404(a) by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Jaynes Decl., #2 Guaragna Decl., #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Proposed Order)(Guaragna, John)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING #20 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dl)
December 19, 2018 Filing 21 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Apple Inc.. (Guaragna, John)
December 18, 2018 Filing 20 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation (Motion to Transfer Venue) by Apple Inc.. (Guaragna, John)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING #13 Motion by Emma C. Ross to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (td)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING #12 Motion by Michael Pieja to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (td)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING #14 Motion by Doug Winnard to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (td)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING #11 Motion by Alan Littmann to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (td)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING #10 Motion by Lauren Abendshien to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (td)
December 14, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Michael Guaragna for Doug Winnard ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11559606) by on behalf of Apple Inc.. (Guaragna, John)
December 14, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Michael Guaragna for Emma C. Ross ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11559579) by on behalf of Apple Inc.. (Guaragna, John)
December 14, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Michael Guaragna for Michael Pieja ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11559542) by on behalf of Apple Inc.. (Guaragna, John)
December 14, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Michael Guaragna for Alan Littmann ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11559518) by on behalf of Apple Inc.. (Guaragna, John)
December 14, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Michael Guaragna for Lauren Abendshien ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11559453) by on behalf of Apple Inc.. (Guaragna, John)
December 14, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Michael Guaragna on behalf of Apple Inc.. Attorney John Michael Guaragna added to party Apple Inc.(pty:dft) (Guaragna, John)
November 19, 2018 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Apple Inc. (td)
November 19, 2018 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Latchford, Shawn)
November 19, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Shawn A. Latchford on behalf of Uniloc 2017 LLC (Latchford, Shawn)
November 19, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kevin Gannon on behalf of Uniloc 2017 LLC (Gannon, Kevin)
November 19, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Aaron S. Jacobs on behalf of Uniloc 2017 LLC (Jacobs, Aaron)
November 19, 2018 Filing 3 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Jacobs, Aaron)
November 19, 2018 Filing 2 Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office with copy of Complaint. (afd)
November 17, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Uniloc 2017 LLC. (afd)
November 17, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (afd)
November 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-11468205). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A (U.S. Patent No. 8,539,552))(Jacobs, Aaron) (Attachment 1 replaced on 11/19/2018 to flatten image) (afd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Uniloc 2017 LLC v. Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Pieja
Represented By: Lauren Abendshien
Represented By: Emma C. Ross
Represented By: Doug Winnard
Represented By: Brian K. Erickson
Represented By: Alan Littmann
Represented By: John Michael Guaragna
Represented By: Michael Thomas Pieja
Represented By: Lauren C Abendshien
Represented By: Alan E. Littmann
Represented By: Emma Christine Ross
Represented By: Kenneth Frederick Baum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Uniloc 2017 LLC
Represented By: Aaron S. Jacobs
Represented By: Kevin Gannon
Represented By: Edward Nelson, III
Represented By: Shawn A Latchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?