Pit River Tribe et al v. Bureau of Land Management et al
Plaintiff: Pit River Tribe, Native Coalition for Medicine Lake Highlands Defense, Medicine Lake Citizens for a Quality Environment and Mount Shasta Regional Ecology Center
Defendant: Bureau of Land Management, Calpine Corporation, Department of the Interior and CPN Telephone Flat, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv02002
Filed: April 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Referring Judge: Phyllis J Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT AND CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #29 Stipulation. Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/10/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/17/2019 at 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 29 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for enlargment of time to respond to the complaint and continue the case management conference filed by Bureau of Land Management, Department of the Interior, Calpine Corporation, CPN Telephone Flat Inc, Pit Rive Tribe, et al. (Brar, Amarveer) (Filed on 6/14/2019) Modified on 6/17/2019 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/11/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/18/2019 at 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 5/23/19. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2019)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by The Clerk on 5/23/19. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2019)
May 23, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Amarveer S. Brar (Brar, Amarveer) (Filed on 5/23/2019)
May 22, 2019 Filing 25 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2019)
May 22, 2019 Filing 24 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by CPN Telephone Flat, Inc., Calpine Corporation.. (Emrich, Andrew) (Filed on 5/22/2019)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #22 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Thomas L. Sansonetti representing Defendant Calpine Corporation. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2019)
May 9, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Thomas L. Sansonetti ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13333652.) filed by CPN Telephone Flat, Inc., Calpine Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Sansonetti, Thomas) (Filed on 5/9/2019)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #20 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Jeffrey S. Pope representing Defendants Calpine Corp. and CPN Telephone Flat, Inc. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2019)
May 9, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13332259.) filed by CPN Telephone Flat, Inc., Calpine Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Wyoming Certificate of Good Standing)(Pope, Jeffrey) (Filed on 5/9/2019)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #16 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Andrew Charles Emrich representing Defendants Calpine Corp. and CPN Telephone Flat, Inc. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2019)
May 8, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE by CPN Telephone Flat, Inc., Calpine Corporation re #1 Complaint, Stipulated Notice of Enlargement of Time to Answer Complaint (Antonopoulos, Rosemary) (Filed on 5/8/2019)
May 8, 2019 Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants Calpine Corporation and CPN Telephone Flat, Inc. shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 5/22/2019. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2019)
May 8, 2019 Filing 16 First MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13328911.) filed by CPN Telephone Flat, Inc., Calpine Corporation. (Emrich, Andrew) (Filed on 5/8/2019)
May 2, 2019 Filing 15 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Medicine Lake Citizens for a Quality Environment, Mount Shasta Regional Ecology Center, Native Coalition for Medicine Lake Highlands Defense, Pit River Tribe.. (Sivas, Deborah) (Filed on 5/2/2019)
May 2, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Medicine Lake Citizens for a Quality Environment, Mount Shasta Regional Ecology Center, Native Coalition for Medicine Lake Highlands Defense, Pit River Tribe Proof of Service to U.S. Dept. of the Interior (Sivas, Deborah) (Filed on 5/2/2019)
May 2, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Medicine Lake Citizens for a Quality Environment, Mount Shasta Regional Ecology Center, Native Coalition for Medicine Lake Highlands Defense, Pit River Tribe Proof of Service to Bureau of Land Management (Sivas, Deborah) (Filed on 5/2/2019)
May 2, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Medicine Lake Citizens for a Quality Environment, Mount Shasta Regional Ecology Center, Native Coalition for Medicine Lake Highlands Defense, Pit River Tribe Proof of Service to CPN Telephone Flat, Inc. (Sivas, Deborah) (Filed on 5/2/2019)
May 2, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Medicine Lake Citizens for a Quality Environment, Mount Shasta Regional Ecology Center, Native Coalition for Medicine Lake Highlands Defense, Pit River Tribe Proof of Service to Calpine Corporation (Sivas, Deborah) (Filed on 5/2/2019)
April 30, 2019 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 5/14/2019. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2019)
April 16, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Department of the Interior (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2019)
April 16, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Bureau of Land Management, CPN Telephone Flat, Inc., Calpine Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2019)
April 16, 2019 Filing 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/11/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/18/2019 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2019)
April 15, 2019 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. (Sivas, Deborah) (Filed on 4/15/2019)
April 15, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. (Sivas, Deborah) (Filed on 4/15/2019)
April 15, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. (Sivas, Deborah) (Filed on 4/15/2019)
April 15, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Sivas, Deborah) (Filed on 4/15/2019)
April 15, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/29/2019. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2019)
April 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13259889.). Filed byMount Shasta Regional Ecology Center, Native Coalition for Medicine Lake Highlands Defense, Medicine Lake Citizens for a Quality Environment, Pit River Tribe. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Sivas, Deborah) (Filed on 4/15/2019)
April 15, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used re: #1 .[err101]. The correct event is Proposed Summons. The summons should NOT be filed as an attachment to the Complaint. The co rrect event can be found at Civil Events > Other Filings > Other Documents > Proposed Summons. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Please re-file the proposed summons using the instructions above. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pit River Tribe et al v. Bureau of Land Management et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bureau of Land Management
Represented By: Amarveer S. Brar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Calpine Corporation
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Pope
Represented By: Rosemary Antonopoulos
Represented By: Thomas Lawrence Sansonetti
Represented By: Andrew C. Emrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of the Interior
Represented By: Amarveer S. Brar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CPN Telephone Flat, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Pope
Represented By: Rosemary Antonopoulos
Represented By: Thomas Lawrence Sansonetti
Represented By: Andrew C. Emrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pit River Tribe
Represented By: Deborah Ann Sivas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Native Coalition for Medicine Lake Highlands Defense
Represented By: Deborah Ann Sivas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Medicine Lake Citizens for a Quality Environment
Represented By: Deborah Ann Sivas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mount Shasta Regional Ecology Center
Represented By: Deborah Ann Sivas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?