City of Roseville Employees' Retirement System v. Apple Inc. et al
Plaintiff: City of Roseville Employees' Retirement System and Steamfitters Local 449 Pension Plan
Defendant: Apple Inc., Luca Maestri and Timothy D. Cook
Petitioner: Michael Grecco, Shaikh M. Ahmad, Employees' Retirement System of the State of Rhode Island, Richard Rodriguez, Norfolk County Council as Administering Authority of the Norfolk Pension Fund and Shahtaj M. Ahmad
Interested Party: Priyam Reddy
Case Number: 4:2019cv02033
Filed: April 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 62 Declaration of James M. Wagstaffe in Support of #26 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel of the Employees' Retirement System of the State of Rhode Island and MOTION to Consolidate Cases ; Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof filed byEmployees' Retirement System of the State of Rhode Island. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) #26 ) (Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 7/8/2019)
July 8, 2019 Filing 61 REPLY (re #26 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel of the Employees' Retirement System of the State of Rhode Island and MOTION to Consolidate Cases ; Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof ) filed byEmployees' Retirement System of the State of Rhode Island. (Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 7/8/2019)
July 8, 2019 Filing 60 REPLY (re #36 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel ; Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof ) filed byNorfolk County Council as Administering Authority of the Norfolk Pension Fund. (Myers, Danielle) (Filed on 7/8/2019)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #58 Amended Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Francis P. McConville. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2019)
July 8, 2019 Filing 58 Amended MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Francis P. McConville ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13416531.) Filing fee previously paid on 06/07/2019 in related action 19-cv-02891 filed by Employees' Retirement System of the State of Rhode Island. (McConville, Francis) (Filed on 7/8/2019)
July 8, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Filing fee not paid. Please pay the filing fee through Pay.gov. The filing fee for pro hac vice is $310.00. [err701] Re: #56 MOTION for Leave to A ppear Pro Hac Vice filed by Employees' Retirement System of the State of Rhode Island (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2019)
July 2, 2019 Filing 57 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #42 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , #20 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , #36 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel ; Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof ) CORRECTION OF DOCKET #55 filed byEmployees' Retirement System of the State of Rhode Island. (Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 7/2/2019)
July 2, 2019 Filing 56 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . On behalf of Francis P. McConville filed by Employees' Retirement System of the State of Rhode Island. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(McConville, Francis) (Filed on 7/2/2019) Modified on 7/8/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
July 1, 2019 Filing 55 DISREGARD. ERROR IN FILING. SEE DOCKET #57 FOR CORRECT FILING. OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #42 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , #20 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , #36 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel ; Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof ) filed byEmployees' Retirement System of the State of Rhode Island. (Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 7/1/2019) Modified on 7/8/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
July 1, 2019 Filing 54 CERTIFICATE of Counsel Pursuant to Local Rule 3-7(d) by Mark Solomon on behalf of Norfolk County Council as Administering Authority of the Norfolk Pension Fund (Solomon, Mark) (Filed on 7/1/2019)
July 1, 2019 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Solomon (Solomon, Mark) (Filed on 7/1/2019)
July 1, 2019 Filing 52 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #42 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , #26 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel of the Employees' Retirement System of the State of Rhode Island and MOTION to Consolidate Cases ; Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof, #20 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel ) filed byNorfolk County Council as Administering Authority of the Norfolk Pension Fund. (Myers, Danielle) (Filed on 7/1/2019)
July 1, 2019 Filing 51 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #26 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel of the Employees' Retirement System of the State of Rhode Island and MOTION to Consolidate Cases ; Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof, #36 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel ; Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof ) filed byRichard Rodriguez. (Apton, Adam) (Filed on 7/1/2019)
June 28, 2019 Filing 50 NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION OF THE APPLE INVESTOR GROUP TO COMPETING MOTIONS FOR CONSOLIDATION, APPOINTMENT AS LEAD PLAINTIFF AND APPROVAL OF LEAD COUNSEL by Shahtaj M. Ahmad, Shaikh M. Ahmad, Michael Grecco re #42 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel (Pafiti, Jennifer) (Filed on 6/28/2019) Modified on 7/1/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #48 Stipulation Continuing Dates of Discovery Deadlines and Initial Case Management Conference. (fsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2019)
June 25, 2019 Filing 48 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER CONTINUING DATES OF DISCOVERY DEADLINES AND INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Apple Inc., Timothy D. Cook, Luca Maestri and City of Roseville Employees Retirement System. (Talarides, Alexander) (Filed on 6/25/2019) Modified on 6/26/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
June 25, 2019 Filing 47 ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order. The parties have failed to file an ADR Certification as required by the Initial Case Management Scheduling Order. Counsel shall comply promptly with the requirements of ADR L.R. 3-5(b) and shall file the ADR Certification. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(cmfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2019)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #24 Administrative Motion to relate cases 4:19-cv-2033-YGR and case 3:19-cv-2891-JD and ORDER RELATING CASES. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2019)
June 18, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Judge name or initials are incorrect on the related case information. Counsel need not re-file the document, but should reference the correct judge nam e/initials on future filings. The correct related case number should be 4:19-cv-2615 YGR. Re: #26 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel of the Employees' Retirement System of the State of Rhode Island and MOTION to Consolidate Cases ; Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof filed by Employees' Retirement System of the State of Rhode Island, #28 Certificate of Interested Entities, filed by Employees' Retirement System of the State of Rhode Island, #27 Declaration in Support,, filed by Employees' Retirement System of the State of Rhode Island, #33 Certificate of Counsel, filed by Employees' Retirement System of the State of Rhode Island, #34 Certificate of Counsel, filed by Employees' Retirement System of the State of Rhode Island, #31 Certificate of Counsel, filed by Employees' Retirement System of the State of Rhode Island, #20 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed by Richard Rodriguez, #30 Certificate of Counsel, filed by Employees' Retirement System of the State of Rhode Island, #25 Declaration in Support, filed by Steamfitters Local 449 Pension Plan, #21 Declaration in Support, filed by Richard Rodriguez, #24 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related filed by Steamfitters Local 449 Pension Plan, #23 Certificate of Counsel filed by Richard Rodriguez, #22 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by Richard Rodriguez, #29 Certificate of Counsel, filed by Employees' Retirement System of the State of Rhode Island, #32 Certificate of Counsel, filed by Employees' Retirement System of the State of Rhode Island (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2019)
June 17, 2019 Filing 45 Certificate of Interested Entities by Shahtaj M. Ahmad, Shaikh M. Ahmad, Michael Grecco re #42 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel (Pafiti, Jennifer) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 17, 2019 Filing 44 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re #42 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel by Jennifer Pafiti on behalf of Shahtaj M. Ahmad, Shaikh M. Ahmad, Michael Grecco (Pafiti, Jennifer) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 17, 2019 Filing 43 Declaration of Jennifer Pafiti in Support of #42 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed byShahtaj M. Ahmad, Shaikh M. Ahmad, Michael Grecco. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Loss Chart, #2 Exhibit B - Joint Declaration, #3 Exhibit C - Press Release, #4 Exhibit D - Certifications, #5 Exhibit E - Pomerantz Resume, #6 Exhibit F - Bernstein Liebhard Resume)(Related document(s) #42 ) (Pafiti, Jennifer) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 17, 2019 Filing 42 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed by Michael Grecco, Shaikh M. Ahmad, Shahtaj M. Ahmad. Motion Hearing set for 8/13/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 7/1/2019. Replies due by 7/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pafiti, Jennifer) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 17, 2019 Filing 41 CERTIFICATE of Counsel Pursuant to Local Rule 3-7(d) by Juan Carlos Sanchez on behalf of Norfolk County Council as Administering Authority of the Norfolk Pension Fund (Sanchez, Juan) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 17, 2019 Filing 40 CERTIFICATE of Counsel Pursuant to Local Rule 3-7(d) by Shawn A. Williams on behalf of Norfolk County Council as Administering Authority of the Norfolk Pension Fund (Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 17, 2019 Filing 39 CERTIFICATE of Counsel Pursuant to Local Rule 3-7(d) by Danielle Suzanne Myers on behalf of Norfolk County Council as Administering Authority of the Norfolk Pension Fund (Myers, Danielle) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 17, 2019 Filing 38 Certificate of Interested Entities by Norfolk County Council as Administering Authority of the Norfolk Pension Fund (Myers, Danielle) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 17, 2019 Filing 37 Declaration of Danielle S. Myers in Support of #36 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel ; Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof filed byNorfolk County Council as Administering Authority of the Norfolk Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Related document(s) #36 ) (Myers, Danielle) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 17, 2019 Filing 36 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel ; Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof filed by Norfolk County Council as Administering Authority of the Norfolk Pension Fund. Motion Hearing set for 8/13/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 7/1/2019. Replies due by 7/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Myers, Danielle) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 17, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Danielle Suzanne Myers (Myers, Danielle) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 17, 2019 Filing 34 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re #26 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel of the Employees' Retirement System of the State of Rhode Island and MOTION to Consolidate Cases ; Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof . On behalf of Francis P. McConville by James Matthew Wagstaffe on behalf of Employees' Retirement System of the State of Rhode Island (Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 17, 2019 Filing 33 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re #26 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel of the Employees' Retirement System of the State of Rhode Island and MOTION to Consolidate Cases ; Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof on behalf of Carol C. Villegas by James Matthew Wagstaffe on behalf of Employees' Retirement System of the State of Rhode Island (Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 17, 2019 Filing 32 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re #26 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel of the Employees' Retirement System of the State of Rhode Island and MOTION to Consolidate Cases ; Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof . On behalf of Eric J. Belfi by James Matthew Wagstaffe on behalf of Employees' Retirement System of the State of Rhode Island (Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 17, 2019 Filing 31 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re #26 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel of the Employees' Retirement System of the State of Rhode Island and MOTION to Consolidate Cases ; Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof on behalf of Frank Busch by James Matthew Wagstaffe on behalf of Employees' Retirement System of the State of Rhode Island (Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 17, 2019 Filing 30 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re #26 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel of the Employees' Retirement System of the State of Rhode Island and MOTION to Consolidate Cases ; Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof . On behalf of Christopher J. Keller by James Matthew Wagstaffe on behalf of Employees' Retirement System of the State of Rhode Island (Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 17, 2019 Filing 29 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re #26 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel of the Employees' Retirement System of the State of Rhode Island and MOTION to Consolidate Cases ; Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof by James Matthew Wagstaffe on behalf of Employees' Retirement System of the State of Rhode Island (Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 17, 2019 Filing 28 Certificate of Interested Entities by Employees' Retirement System of the State of Rhode Island re #26 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel of the Employees' Retirement System of the State of Rhode Island and MOTION to Consolidate Cases ; Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof (Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 17, 2019 Filing 27 Declaration of James M. Wagstaffe in Support of #26 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel of the Employees' Retirement System of the State of Rhode Island and MOTION to Consolidate Cases ; Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof filed byEmployees' Retirement System of the State of Rhode Island. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification, #2 Exhibit B - Loss Analysis, #3 Exhibit C - Notice, #4 Exhibit D - Notice, #5 Exhibit E - Labaton Sucharow Firm Resume, #6 Exhibit F - Biography of James M. Wagstaffe)(Related document(s) #26 ) (Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 17, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel of the Employees' Retirement System of the State of Rhode Island and, MOTION to Consolidate Cases ; Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof filed by Employees' Retirement System of the State of Rhode Island. Motion Hearing set for 8/13/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 7/1/2019. Replies due by 7/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 17, 2019 Filing 25 Declaration of Francis P. McConville in Support of #24 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related filed bySteamfitters Local 449 Pension Plan. (Related document(s) #24 ) (Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 17, 2019 Filing 24 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related filed by Steamfitters Local 449 Pension Plan. Responses due by 6/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 17, 2019 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re #20 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel by Adam Marc Apton on behalf of Richard Rodriguez (Apton, Adam) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 17, 2019 Filing 22 Certificate of Interested Entities by Richard Rodriguez re #20 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel (Apton, Adam) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 17, 2019 Filing 21 Declaration of Adam M. Apton in Support of #20 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed byRichard Rodriguez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #20 ) (Apton, Adam) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 17, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed by Richard Rodriguez. Motion Hearing set for 8/13/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 7/1/2019. Replies due by 7/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Apton, Adam) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #17 Administrative Motion to Relate Cases and ORDER RELATING CASES 4:19-cv-2033-YGR and 5:19-cv-2615-LHK. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2019)
June 4, 2019 Filing 18 Declaration of J. Alexander Hood II in Support of #17 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED filed byPriyam Reddy. (Related document(s) #17 ) (Pafiti, Jennifer) (Filed on 6/4/2019)
June 4, 2019 Filing 17 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED filed by Priyam Reddy. Responses due by 6/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pafiti, Jennifer) (Filed on 6/4/2019)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #12 Stipulation Continuing Date upon which Responsive Pleading is Due. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2019)
April 23, 2019 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by City of Roseville Employees' Retirement System. Service waived by Luca Maestri waiver sent on 4/19/2019, answer due 6/18/2019. (Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 4/23/2019)
April 23, 2019 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by City of Roseville Employees' Retirement System. Service waived by Timothy D. Cook waiver sent on 4/19/2019, answer due 6/18/2019. (Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 4/23/2019)
April 23, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by City of Roseville Employees' Retirement System. Service waived by Apple Inc. waiver sent on 4/19/2019, answer due 6/18/2019. (Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 4/23/2019)
April 23, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Continuing Date Upon Which Responsive Pleading is Due filed by Apple Inc., Timothy D. Cook, Luca Maestri and City of Roseville Employees Retirement System. (Talarides, Alexander) (Filed on 4/23/2019) Modified on 4/23/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
April 23, 2019 Filing 11 Certificate of Interested Entities by Apple Inc., Timothy D. Cook, Luca Maestri (Talarides, Alexander) (Filed on 4/23/2019)
April 23, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander K. Talarides for Defendants Apple Inc., Timothy D. Cook and Luca Maestri (Talarides, Alexander) (Filed on 4/23/2019)
April 23, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by James Neil Kramer for Defendants Apple Inc., Timothy D. Cook and Luca Maestri (Kramer, James) (Filed on 4/23/2019)
April 23, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Melinda Haag for Defendants Apple Inc., Timothy D. Cook and Luca Maestri (Haag, Melinda) (Filed on 4/23/2019)
April 17, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Apple Inc., Timothy D. Cook, Luca Maestri. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2019)
April 17, 2019 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Case Management Statement due by 7/8/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/15/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2019)
April 16, 2019 Filing 5 Civil Cover Sheet by City of Roseville Employees' Retirement System . (Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 4/16/2019)
April 16, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Case has been randomly assigned to judge. However, incorrect Civil Cover Sheet used at case opening of JS-CAND 44 (Rev. 08/18). Complete correct Civil Cov er Sheet of JS-CAND 44 (Rev 06/17) and re-file in its entirety as a separate docket entry re : #1 Complaint, filed by City of Roseville Employees' Retirement System (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2019)
April 16, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2019)
April 16, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by City of Roseville Employees' Retirement System (Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 4/16/2019)
April 16, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 4/16/2019)
April 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Violations of the Federal Securities Laws with jury demand against Apple Inc., Timothy D. Cook, Luca Maestri ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13264437.). Filed by City of Roseville Employees' Retirement System. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 4/16/2019) Modified on 4/17/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Roseville Employees' Retirement System v. Apple Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Represented By: James Neil Kramer
Represented By: Alexander K. Talarides
Represented By: Melinda Haag
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luca Maestri
Represented By: James Neil Kramer
Represented By: Alexander K. Talarides
Represented By: Melinda Haag
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy D. Cook
Represented By: James Neil Kramer
Represented By: Alexander K. Talarides
Represented By: Melinda Haag
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Roseville Employees' Retirement System
Represented By: Shawn A. Williams
Represented By: Samuel H. Rudman
Represented By: Mary K. Blasy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steamfitters Local 449 Pension Plan
Represented By: James Matthew Wagstaffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michael Grecco
Represented By: Jennifer Pafiti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Shaikh M. Ahmad
Represented By: Jennifer Pafiti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Employees' Retirement System of the State of Rhode Island
Represented By: Francis P McConville
Represented By: James Matthew Wagstaffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Richard Rodriguez
Represented By: Adam Marc Apton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Norfolk County Council as Administering Authority of the Norfolk Pension Fund
Represented By: Shawn A. Williams
Represented By: Juan Carlos Sanchez
Represented By: Danielle Suzanne Myers
Represented By: Mark Solomon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Shahtaj M. Ahmad
Represented By: Jennifer Pafiti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Priyam Reddy
Represented By: Jennifer Pafiti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?