R. Alexander Acosta v. International Longshore and Warehouse Union
Plaintiff: R. Alexander Acosta
Defendant: International Longshore and Warehouse Union
Case Number: 4:2019cv02103
Filed: April 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 0401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint byInternational Longshore and Warehouse Union. (Morton, Eleanor) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
May 14, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsay Rose Nicholas (Nicholas, Lindsay) (Filed on 5/14/2019)
April 30, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by International Longshore and Warehouse Union.. (Morton, Eleanor) (Filed on 4/30/2019)
April 30, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Eleanor I. Morton (Morton, Eleanor) (Filed on 4/30/2019)
April 19, 2019 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Pilot Program for Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 7/ 24/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/31/2019 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2019)
April 18, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by R. Alexander Acosta (Robinson, Kimberly) (Filed on 4/18/2019)
April 18, 2019 Filing 3 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by R. Alexander Acosta.. (Robinson, Kimberly) (Filed on 4/18/2019)
April 18, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/2/2019. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2019)
April 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against International Longshore and Warehouse Union. Filed by Secretary of United States Department of Labor. (Fee waived and no process) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Robinson, Kimberly) (Filed on 4/18/2019) Modified on 4/19/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: R. Alexander Acosta v. International Longshore and Warehouse Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Longshore and Warehouse Union
Represented By: Eleanor I. Morton
Represented By: Lindsay Rose Nicholas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R. Alexander Acosta
Represented By: Kimberly Anne Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?