County of Alameda, California et al v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Plaintiff: County of Alameda, California and The People of the State of California
Defendant: Beverly Sackler, Mallinckrodt, LLC, Richard S. Sackler, Purdue Pharma L.P., Allergan, Inc., McKesson Corporation, Insys Therapeutics, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Actavis PLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Theresa Sackler, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Actavis LLC, Allergan plc, Cardinal Health, Inc., David A. Sackler, Cephalon Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc., Ilene Sackler Lefcourt, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Kathe A. Sackler, Jonathan D. Sackler, Mallinckrodt, PLC, Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Allergan USA, Inc., Irene Sackler Lefcourt and Allergan Finance, LLC
Not Classified By Court: California Attorney General's Office
Case Number: 4:2019cv02307
Filed: April 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Donna M Ryu
Referring Judge: Jon S Tigar
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Case transferred electronically to the Northern District of Ohio. New case number - 1:19-op-45726 (mclS, COURT STAFF) Modified on 8/27/2019 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the Northern District of Ohio by MDL Panel (MDL 2804). (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2019)
July 18, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE by Insys Therapeutics, Inc. OF BANKRUPTCY COURTS ORDER PARTIALLY STAYING CASE (Azlin, Kristina) (Filed on 7/18/2019)
June 28, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE by McKesson Corporation of Motion to Withdrawal of Rebecca G. Van Tassell (Van Tassell, Rebecca) (Filed on 6/28/2019)
June 11, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE by California Attorney General's Office of Related Case (Burkart, Michiyo) (Filed on 6/11/2019)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER STAYING ACTIONS PENDING JPML ACTION by Judge Jon S. Tigar.Associated Cases: 3:19-cv-02307-JST, 3:19-cv-02320-JST, 3:19-cv-02321-JST, 3:19-cv-02323-JST, 3:19-cv-02324-JST, 3:19-cv-02325-JST, 3:19-cv-02326-JST(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2019)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Order Vacating Hearing. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 5, 2019. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2019)
June 5, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Stephen Myers (Myers, Michael) (Filed on 6/5/2019)
May 30, 2019 Filing 26 REPLY (re #17 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation) - MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING LIKELY TRANSFER TO MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION filed by McKesson Corporation. (Shafroth, Nathan) (Filed on 5/30/2019)
May 30, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.. Responses due by 6/13/2019. Replies due by 6/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Endo Health Solutions Inc and Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.'s Motion for Tiffany M. Ikeda to Withdraw as Counsel)(Lombardo, John) (Filed on 5/30/2019)
May 28, 2019 Filing 24 REPLY (re #10 MOTION to Remand ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof ) filed byCounty of Alameda, California, The People of the State of California. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Request for Judicial Notice In Support of Motion to Remand)(Messenger, Lucas) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
May 23, 2019 Filing 23 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE to (re #17 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation ) filed by County of Alameda, California, The People of the State of California. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Adam Atamian, #2 Declaration of Danice D. Cook, #3 Declaration of Darcy Jones, #4 Declaration of Dr. Aaron Chapman, #5 Declaration of Fenton Culley, #6 Declaration of Greg Boswell, #7 Declaration of Kathleen Clanon, #8 Declaration of Kenneth Gominsky, Jr., #9 Declaration of Lieutenant Dave Klug, #10 Declaration of Matt Beyers, #11 Declaration of Matt Yparrea, #12 Declaration of Nathan Hobbs, #13 Declaration of Tim McDonald, #14 Declaration of Lucas A. Messenger, #15 Request for Judicial Notice, #16 Exhibits A-P to Request for Judicial Notice, #17 Exhibits Q-Y to Request for Judicial Notice, #18 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Messenger, Lucas) (Filed on 5/23/2019)
May 20, 2019 Filing 22 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE to (re #10 MOTION to Remand; Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof) - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO REMAND filed by McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Shafroth, Nathan) (Filed on 5/20/2019)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Order Granting Stipulation #20 Agreeing To Courts Proposal To Vacate Briefing Deadlines And Hearings In Remaining Cases by Judge Jon S. Tigar. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2019)
May 17, 2019 Filing 20 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER Agreeing to Court's Proposal to Vacate Briefing Deadlines and Hearings in Remaining Cases re #19 Order Relating Case filed by County of Alameda, California, The People of the State of California. (Attachments: #(1) [Proposed] Order)(Messenger, Lucas) (Filed on 5/17/2019)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER RELATING CASE 19-cv-2307-JST to 19-cv-02320-PJH,19-cv-02321-JD,19-cv-02323-RS,19-cv-02324-JST, 19-cv-02325-JD, 19-cv-02326-JSW. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 16, 2019. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2019)
May 9, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE filed by McKesson Corporation of Pendency of Other Action or Proceeding (Shafroth, Nathan) (Filed on 5/9/2019)
May 9, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE OF MOTION & MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation filed by McKesson Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 6/13/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 09, 19th Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 5/23/2019. Replies due by 5/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nathan E. Shafroth in Support of Motion to Stay, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8)(Shafroth, Nathan) (Filed on 5/9/2019)
May 9, 2019 Filing 16 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 8/14/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/21/2019 at 2:00 p.m. in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order for All Judges of the Northern District) (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2019)
May 8, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #10 MOTION to Remand. Responses due by 5/20/2019. Replies due by 5/28/2019. Motion Hearing set for 6/13/2019 at 2:00 p.m. in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2019)
May 8, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE filed by County of Alameda, California, The People of the State of California re #10 MOTION to Remand; Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof, re #11 Request for Judicial Notice - AMENDED NOTICE OF MOTION TO REMAND (Attachments: #(1) [Proposed] Order)(Messenger, Lucas) (Filed on 5/8/2019)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 05/08/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2019)
May 7, 2019 Filing 13 JOINT ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED; [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by McKesson Corporation. Responses due by 5/13/2019. (Shafroth, Nathan) (Filed on 5/7/2019)
May 7, 2019 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2019)
May 6, 2019 Filing 11 Request for Judicial Notice re #10 MOTION to Remand ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof filed byCounty of Alameda, California, The People of the State of California. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Related document(s) #10 ) (Messenger, Lucas) (Filed on 5/6/2019)
May 6, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Remand ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof filed by County of Alameda, California, The People of the State of California. Motion Hearing set for 6/13/2019 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Responses due by 5/20/2019. Replies due by 5/28/2019. (Messenger, Lucas) (Filed on 5/6/2019)
May 6, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by County of Alameda, California, The People of the State of California.. (Messenger, Lucas) (Filed on 5/6/2019)
May 6, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER FOR JOINT STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT filed by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Allergan PLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Allergan, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Irene Sackler Lefcourt, Mallinckrodt, LLC, Mallinckrodt, PLC, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Allergan Finance, LLC f/k/a Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Actavis PLC, Cephalon Inc., County of Alameda, California, The People of the State of California. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order PROPOSED ORDER FOR JOINT STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION)(Neglia, Ashley) (Filed on 5/6/2019) Modified on 5/7/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
May 6, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Ashley Elizabeth Neglia on behalf of Allergan USA, Inc. (Neglia, Ashley) (Filed on 5/6/2019)
May 3, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION for extension of time to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint filed by McKesson Corporation. (Shafroth, Nathan) (Filed on 5/3/2019)
May 1, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by McKesson Corporation re #1 Notice of Removal, (Shafroth, Nathan) (Filed on 5/1/2019)
April 30, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/24/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/31/2019 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2019)
April 29, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement and Certificate of Interested Entities by McKesson Corporation. (Shafroth, Nathan) (Filed on 4/29/2019) Modified on 4/30/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
April 29, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/13/2019. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2019)
April 29, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Alameda County Superior Court. Their case number is Alameda County Superior Court. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-13301059). Filed byMcKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Shafroth, Nathan) (Filed on 4/29/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: County of Alameda, California et al v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly Sackler
Represented By: Gregory P. Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt, LLC
Represented By: Rocky C. Tsai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard S. Sackler
Represented By: Gregory P. Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Represented By: Jae Hong Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan, Inc.
Represented By: Ashley Elizabeth Neglia
Represented By: Donna Marie Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Nathan E. Shafroth
Represented By: Rebecca Grace Van Tassell
Represented By: Raymond Gin Lu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insys Therapeutics, Inc.
Represented By: Kristina Starr Azlin
Represented By: Michael Stephen Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Frederick Company
Represented By: Jae Hong Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis PLC
Represented By: Donna Marie Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Collie Fitch James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theresa Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: John David Lombardo
Represented By: Tiffany M. Ikeda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Represented By: Collie Fitch James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan plc
Represented By: Ashley Elizabeth Neglia
Represented By: Donna Marie Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Represented By: Teresa Carey Chow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David A. Sackler
Represented By: Gregory P. Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc.
Represented By: Collie Fitch James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Collie Fitch James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: Collie Fitch James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortimer D.A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Represented By: John David Lombardo
Represented By: Tiffany M. Ikeda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Charles Coleman Lifland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Collie Fitch James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc.
Represented By: Jae Hong Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ilene Sackler Lefcourt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd
Represented By: Collie Fitch James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Charles Coleman Lifland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Corporation
Represented By: Sarah Barr Johansen
Represented By: Steven J. Boranian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathe A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan D. Sackler
Represented By: Gregory P. Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt, PLC
Represented By: Rocky C. Tsai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Charles Coleman Lifland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc.
Represented By: Charles Coleman Lifland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan USA, Inc.
Represented By: Ashley Elizabeth Neglia
Represented By: Donna Marie Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Irene Sackler Lefcourt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Finance, LLC
Represented By: Ashley Elizabeth Neglia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: County of Alameda, California
Represented By: Lucas Andrew Messenger
Represented By: Donna Raylene Ziegler
Represented By: Roman M. Silberfeld
Represented By: Bernice Conn
Represented By: Michael A. Geibelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The People of the State of California
Represented By: Lucas Andrew Messenger
Represented By: Roman M. Silberfeld
Represented By: Bernice Conn
Represented By: Michael A. Geibelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: California Attorney General's Office
Represented By: Michiyo Michelle Burkart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?