Coon v. F. Hoffmann-La Roche Ltd et al
Plaintiff: Matthew S. Coon
Defendant: Hoffman-La Roche Inc., Genentech, Inc., Hoffmann-La Roche Inc., Sean Johnston, F. Hoffmann-La Roche, Inc. and F. Hoffmann-La Roche Ltd
Case Number: 4:2019cv02342
Filed: April 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Referring Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 16, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Matthew S. Coon (Creed, Jesse) (Filed on 5/16/2019)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by The Clerk on 5/15/19. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2019)
May 14, 2019 Filing 20 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2019)
May 14, 2019 Filing 19 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Matthew S. Coon.. (Creed, Jesse) (Filed on 5/14/2019)
May 14, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Michael Sonstein (Sonstein, Gregory) (Filed on 5/14/2019)
May 14, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Richard Boyle (Boyle, Kevin) (Filed on 5/14/2019)
May 14, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Lawrence Kaufman (Kaufman, Peter) (Filed on 5/14/2019)
May 14, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Jesse Max Creed (Creed, Jesse) (Filed on 5/14/2019)
May 13, 2019 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. by 5/28/2019 Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2019)
May 10, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Genentech, Inc., Hoffmann-La Roche Inc. re #10 Renotice motion hearing (Guney, Alexander) (Filed on 5/10/2019)
May 10, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Genentech, Inc., Hoffmann-La Roche Inc. re #4 MOTION to Quash , Dismiss and Strike, #6 Certificate of Interested Entities, #9 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge, #8 Jury Demand, #5 Request for Judicial Notice, #7 Certificate of Interested Entities (Guney, Alexander) (Filed on 5/10/2019)
May 10, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Genentech, Inc., Hoffmann-La Roche Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, 2 Case Assigned by Intake (Guney, Alexander) (Filed on 5/10/2019)
May 8, 2019 Filing 10 Renotice motion hearing re #4 MOTION to Quash , Dismiss and Strike filed byGenentech, Inc., Hoffmann-La Roche Inc.. (Related document(s) #4 ) (Guney, Alexander) (Filed on 5/8/2019)
May 7, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Genentech, Inc., Hoffmann-La Roche Inc... (Guney, Alexander) (Filed on 5/7/2019)
May 7, 2019 Filing 8 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Genentech, Inc., Hoffmann-La Roche Inc.. (Guney, Alexander) (Filed on 5/7/2019)
May 7, 2019 Filing 7 Certificate of Interested Entities by Genentech, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Roche Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Roche Holding Ltd for Genentech, Inc.. (Guney, Alexander) (Filed on 5/7/2019)
May 7, 2019 Filing 6 Certificate of Interested Entities by Hoffmann-La Roche Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Roche Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Roche Holding Ltd for Hoffmann-La Roche Inc.. (Guney, Alexander) (Filed on 5/7/2019)
May 7, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Judicial Notice re #4 MOTION to Quash , Dismiss and Strike filed byGenentech, Inc., Hoffmann-La Roche Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #4 ) (Guney, Alexander) (Filed on 5/7/2019)
May 7, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Quash , Dismiss and Strike filed by Genentech, Inc., Hoffmann-La Roche Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/20/2019 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Responses due by 5/21/2019. Replies due by 5/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gerald Bohm ISO, #2 Proposed Order)(Guney, Alexander) (Filed on 5/7/2019)
May 1, 2019 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/25/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/1/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2019)
April 30, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/14/2019. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2019)
April 30, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Mateo County Superior Court. Their case number is 19CIV02086. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-13304703). Filed by F. Hoffmann-La Roche Ltd, Genentech, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration of Alexander Guney ISO, #3 Exhibit 1 to Guney Decl., #4 Exhibit 2 to Guney Decl.)(Guney, Alexander) (Filed on 4/30/2019) Modified on 5/1/2019 (slhS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coon v. F. Hoffmann-La Roche Ltd et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hoffman-La Roche Inc.
Represented By: Alexander A. Guney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genentech, Inc.
Represented By: Alexander A. Guney
Represented By: Michael F. Healy
Represented By: Emily Weissenberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hoffmann-La Roche Inc.
Represented By: Alexander A. Guney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F. Hoffmann-La Roche, Inc.
Represented By: Alexander A. Guney
Represented By: Michael F. Healy
Represented By: Emily Weissenberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F. Hoffmann-La Roche Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew S. Coon
Represented By: Kevin Richard Boyle
Represented By: Gregory Michael Sonstein
Represented By: Jesse Max Creed
Represented By: Peter Lawrence Kaufman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?