Stonehocker v. Kindred Healthcare Operating, LLC
Plaintiff: Sarah Stonehocker
Defendant: Kindred Healthcare Operating, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv02494
Filed: May 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 16 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER For Leave For Defendant Kindred Healthcare Operating, LLC to File an Early Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Kindred Healthcare Operating, LLC and Sarah Stonehocker. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wang, Alice) (Filed on 7/3/2019) Modified on 7/5/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
June 3, 2019 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 8/12/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for MONDAY, 8/19/2019 02:00 PM before Hon. Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2019)
May 31, 2019 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE The court has reviewed the Sua Sponte Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship and determined that no cases are related and no reassignments shall occur. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2019)
May 31, 2019 Filing 13 Statement Order of Referral to Determine Whether Cases are Related re #12 Order, by Sarah Stonehocker. (Carlson, Matthew) (Filed on 5/31/2019) Modified on 5/31/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER OF REFERRAL TO DETERMINE IF CASES ARE RELATED. Case referred sua sponte to Hon. Judge Richard Seeborg to consider whether it is related to 3:16-cv-4889-RS. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 5/30/19. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2019)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 05/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2019)
May 22, 2019 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2019)
May 21, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Kindred Healthcare Operating, LLC.. (Wang, Alice) (Filed on 5/21/2019)
May 9, 2019 Filing 8 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Pilot Program for Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 7/ 31/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/7/2019 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2019)
May 9, 2019 Answer to Removal Complaint byKindred Healthcare Operating, LLC. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2019)
May 9, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kindred Healthcare Operating, LLC of Standing Orders, Filing Procedures, ECF Registration Information, and Notice of Assignment of Case to United States Magistrate Judge (Attachments: #1 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations))(Garcia, Lisa) (Filed on 5/9/2019)
May 9, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kindred Healthcare Operating, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal,, #2 Certificate of Interested Entities, #3 Certificate of Interested Entities, #4 Notice (Other) (Attachments: #1 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations) to Proof of Service)(Garcia, Lisa) (Filed on 5/9/2019)
May 8, 2019 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/22/2019. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2019)
May 8, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Kindred Healthcare Operating, LLC (Notice of Related Cases) (Wang, Alice) (Filed on 5/8/2019)
May 8, 2019 Filing 3 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Kindred Healthcare Operating, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Kindred Healthcare, LLC for Kindred Healthcare Operating, LLC. (Wang, Alice) (Filed on 5/8/2019)
May 8, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Kindred Healthcare Operating, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Kindred Healthcare, LLC, Other Affiliate Kindred Rehab Services, LLC for Kindred Healthcare Operating, LLC. (Wang, Alice) (Filed on 5/8/2019)
May 8, 2019 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Francisco Superior Court. Their case number is CGC-19-573756. (No Process)(Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-13330493). Filed byKindred Healthcare Operating, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alice Wang in Support of Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit A to Wang Declaration, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Declaration of Joseph Miller in Support of Notice of Removal, #9 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations) to Miller Declaration, #10 Declaration of Eric VanRude in Support of Notice of Removal, #11 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations) to VanRude Declaration, #12 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wang, Alice) (Filed on 5/8/2019) Modified on 5/9/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stonehocker v. Kindred Healthcare Operating, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kindred Healthcare Operating, LLC
Represented By: Alice Hsiu-Wen Wang
Represented By: Lisa Lin Garcia
Represented By: Elizabeth Porter Staggs-Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Stonehocker
Represented By: Matthew D. Carlson, Carls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?