Innovative Sports Management, Inc. v. Valenzuela et al
Plaintiff: Innovative Sports Management, Inc. d/b/a Integrated Sports Media and Innovative Sports Management, Inc.
Defendant: Felipe Valenzuela and Mancora Cebicheria, Corporation
Case Number: 4:2019cv02785
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Sallie Kim
Referring Judge: Jeffrey S White
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Filing 22 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Riley, Thomas) (Filed on 7/10/2019)
July 2, 2019 Filing 21 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (McCann, Trevor) (Filed on 7/2/2019)
July 1, 2019 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Innovative Sports Management, Inc. re:Felipe Valenzuela (Riley, Thomas) (Filed on 7/1/2019)
July 1, 2019 Filing 19 Certificate of Interested Entities by Mancora Cebicheria, Corporation, Felipe Valenzuela (McCann, Trevor) (Filed on 7/1/2019)
July 1, 2019 Filing 18 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Mancora Cebicheria, Corporation, Felipe Valenzuela.. (McCann, Trevor) (Filed on 7/1/2019)
July 1, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Trevor Brandt McCann (McCann, Trevor) (Filed on 7/1/2019)
July 1, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byMancora Cebicheria, Corporation, Felipe Valenzuela. (McCann, Trevor) (Filed on 7/1/2019)
June 19, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re: Order Setting Case Management Conference and Requiring Joint Case Management Conference Statement by Innovative Sports Management, Inc. (Riley, Thomas) (Filed on 6/19/2019) Modified on 6/20/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 6/7/19. Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/30/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/6/2019 11:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2019)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jeffrey S. White for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 6/7/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2019)
June 7, 2019 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2019)
June 3, 2019 Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Innovative Sports Management, Inc.. (Riley, Thomas) (Filed on 6/3/2019)
May 28, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Defendant Felipe Valenzuela. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
May 28, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Defendant Mancora Cebicheria, Corporation. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
May 24, 2019 Filing 8 Proposed Summons. (Riley, Thomas) (Filed on 5/24/2019)
May 24, 2019 Filing 7 Proposed Summons. (Riley, Thomas) (Filed on 5/24/2019)
May 23, 2019 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/19/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/26/2019 at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2019)
May 22, 2019 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/5/2019. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2019)
May 22, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. (Riley, Thomas) (Filed on 5/22/2019)
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Riley, Thomas) (Filed on 5/22/2019)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 Certification of Interested Parties filed by Innovative Sports Management, Inc.. (Riley, Thomas) (Filed on 5/22/2019)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0971-13370295). Filed by Innovative Sports Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #(1) Civil Cover Sheet)(Riley, Thomas) (Filed on 5/22/2019) Modified on 5/23/2019 (tnS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Innovative Sports Management, Inc. v. Valenzuela et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Innovative Sports Management, Inc. d/b/a Integrated Sports Media
Represented By: Thomas Peter Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Innovative Sports Management, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Peter Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Felipe Valenzuela
Represented By: Trevor Brandt McCann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mancora Cebicheria, Corporation
Represented By: Trevor Brandt McCann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?