Innovative Sports Management, Inc. v. Zerpa et al
Plaintiff: Innovative Sports Management, Inc. d/b/a Integrated Sports Media and Innovative Sports Management, Inc.
Defendant: Julio Antonio Martinez, Fusion Peruvian Grill Corporation and Pedro Zerpa
Case Number: 4:2019cv02791
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Referring Judge: Joseph C Spero
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47:553
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Filing 28 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Riley, Thomas) (Filed on 7/10/2019)
July 2, 2019 Filing 27 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (McCann, Trevor) (Filed on 7/2/2019)
July 1, 2019 Filing 26 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Fusion Peruvian Grill Corporation, Julio Antonio Martinez, Pedro Zerpa.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(McCann, Trevor) (Filed on 7/1/2019)
July 1, 2019 Filing 25 Certificate of Interested Entities by Fusion Peruvian Grill Corporation, Julio Antonio Martinez, Pedro Zerpa (McCann, Trevor) (Filed on 7/1/2019)
July 1, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Trevor Brandt McCann (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(McCann, Trevor) (Filed on 7/1/2019)
July 1, 2019 Filing 23 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byFusion Peruvian Grill Corporation, Julio Antonio Martinez, Pedro Zerpa. (McCann, Trevor) (Filed on 7/1/2019)
June 28, 2019 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Innovative Sports Management, Inc. re #12 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint, re: Julio Antonio Martinez (Riley, Thomas) (Filed on 6/28/2019)
June 28, 2019 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Innovative Sports Management, Inc. re #1 Complaint, #13 Summons Issued re: Fusion Peruvian Grill Corporation (Riley, Thomas) (Filed on 6/28/2019)
June 28, 2019 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Innovative Sports Management, Inc. re #1 Complaint, #11 Summons Issued re: Pedro Zerpa (Riley, Thomas) (Filed on 6/28/2019)
June 25, 2019 Filing 19 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Julio Antonio Martinez. (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2019)
June 25, 2019 Filing 18 Declaration of Jim Escobedo filed byFusion Peruvian Grill Corporation. (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2019) Modified on 6/27/2019 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
June 5, 2019 Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE. Notice is hereby given that a Case Management Conference has been set for August 27, 2019, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA. Case Management Statement due by August 20, 2019. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:19-cv-02791-HSG. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2019)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to case. Signed by the Clerk on 6/4/19. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2019)
June 4, 2019 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2019)
June 3, 2019 Filing 14 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Innovative Sports Management, Inc... (Riley, Thomas) (Filed on 6/3/2019)
May 28, 2019 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Defendant Fusion Peruvian Grill Corporation. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
May 28, 2019 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Defendant Julio Antonio Martinez. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
May 28, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Defendant Pedro Zerpa. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
May 24, 2019 Filing 10 Proposed Summons. (Riley, Thomas) (Filed on 5/24/2019)
May 24, 2019 Filing 9 Proposed Summons. (Riley, Thomas) (Filed on 5/24/2019)
May 24, 2019 Filing 8 Proposed Summons. (Riley, Thomas) (Filed on 5/24/2019)
May 23, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Re: #3 Proposed Summons filed by Innovative Sports Management, Inc., #4 Proposed Summons filed by Innovative Sports Management, Inc., #5 Propose d Summons filed by Innovative Sports Management, Inc. The Court will not issue blank summons. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Please re-file completed forms in their entirety. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2019)
May 23, 2019 Filing 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/16/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/23/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2019)
May 22, 2019 Filing 6 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/5/2019. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2019)
May 22, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. (Riley, Thomas) (Filed on 5/22/2019)
May 22, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. (Riley, Thomas) (Filed on 5/22/2019)
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Riley, Thomas) (Filed on 5/22/2019)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Innovative Sports Management, Inc. d/b/a Integrated Sports Media (Riley, Thomas) (Filed on 5/22/2019)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Pedro Zerpa, Julio Antonio Martinez, Fusion Peruvian Grill Corporation (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 0971-13370715.). Filed by Innovative Sports Management, Inc. d/b/a Integrated Sports Media. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Riley, Thomas) (Filed on 5/22/2019) Modified on 5/23/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Innovative Sports Management, Inc. v. Zerpa et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julio Antonio Martinez
Represented By: Trevor Brandt McCann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fusion Peruvian Grill Corporation
Represented By: Trevor Brandt McCann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pedro Zerpa
Represented By: Trevor Brandt McCann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Innovative Sports Management, Inc. d/b/a Integrated Sports Media
Represented By: Thomas Peter Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Innovative Sports Management, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Peter Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?