Steamfitters Local 449 Pension Plan v. Apple, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Steamfitters Local 449 Pension Plan
Defendant: Apple, Inc., Luca Maestri and Timothy D. Cook
Case Number: 4:2019cv02891
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: James Donato
Referring Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 8/19/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/15/2019 is CONTINUED to Monday, 8/26/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2019)
June 24, 2019 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE Case Management Statement due by 7/8/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for Monday, 7/15/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor along with related cases set the same date and time. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2019)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for all further proceedings. Judge James Donato no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.Signed by Clerk on 6/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2019)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RELATING CASES 4:19-cv-2033-YGR and 3:19-cv-2891-JD. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 6/21/2019. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2019)
June 11, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Steamfitters Local 449 Pension Plan. Service waived by Luca Maestri waiver sent on 6/5/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (McConville, Francis) (Filed on 6/11/2019)
June 11, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Steamfitters Local 449 Pension Plan. Service waived by Timothy D. Cook waiver sent on 6/5/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (McConville, Francis) (Filed on 6/11/2019)
June 11, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Steamfitters Local 449 Pension Plan. Service waived by Apple, Inc. waiver sent on 6/5/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (McConville, Francis) (Filed on 6/11/2019)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #5 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Francis P. McConville. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2019)
June 7, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice . On behalf of Francis P. McConville ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13416531.) filed by Steamfitters Local 449 Pension Plan. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(McConville, Francis) (Filed on 6/7/2019)
May 24, 2019 Filing 4 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER SEC CLASS ACTION Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Case Management Statement due by 8/15/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/22/2019 10:00 AM. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2019)
May 24, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge James Donato. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2019)
May 24, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Steamfitters Local 449 Pension Plan (Busch, Frank) (Filed on 5/24/2019)
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13379405.). Filed bySteamfitters Local 449 Pension Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Busch, Frank) (Filed on 5/24/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Steamfitters Local 449 Pension Plan v. Apple, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luca Maestri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy D. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steamfitters Local 449 Pension Plan
Represented By: Frank H. Busch
Represented By: Francis P McConville
Represented By: James Matthew Wagstaffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?